ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-02832-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Arizona Public Service Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher James Carney +1 202 305 7597 +1 202 514 8624 chris.carney@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/18/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, SNF
  Entries (103) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Judgment*
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $30,222,146.00. Costs to plaintiff. (dls)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Published Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
    PUBLISHED OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Sr. Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (jw4)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: 7/23/2009 Notice of Additional Authority
      NOTICE of Additional Authority (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Fagg, Arnold)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: 6/4/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-107) held on May 28, 2009 before Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/11/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2009. (dw1)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: 6/4/2009 Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript
          Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on May 28, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Post-Trial Brief
            POST TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiff's Reply, filed by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: 4/24/2009 Post-Trial Brief
              POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Carney, Christopher)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 Post-Trial Brief
                POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 Response
                  RESPONSE to Defendant's Proffer Regarding the Rate of Acceptance, filed by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, list of exhibits, # (2) Exhibit 2, index of trial testimony, # (3) Exhibit 3, excerpts from trial testimony, # (4) Exhibit 4, excerpts from trial testimony)(Fagg, Arnold)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 Transcript - Cumulative Index
                    Cumulative Index (pages 1-10) for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 28, 2009 through February 4, 2009. Filed with plaintiff and defendant's exhibits. (dw1)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER:Plaintiff's Post Trial Brief and Reponse to Defendant's Proffer due 3/20/2009. Defendant's Post Trial Response Brief due 4/24/2009. Plaintiff's Post Trial Reply Brief due by 5/15/2009. Closing Argument set for 5/28/2009 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Sr. Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. Signed by Sr. Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (jpk1)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 ~Notice (other)
                        NOTICE, filed by USA Defendant's Proffer Regarding The Rate Of Acceptance (Attachments: # (1) Appendix, # (2) Appendix, # (3) Appendix, # (4) Appendix, # (5) Appendix, # (6) Appendix, # (7) Appendix, # (8) Appendix, # (9) Appendix, # (10) Appendix)(Sullivan, Marian)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009 Joint Status Report
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT and Proposed Post-trial Briefing Schedule, filed by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: 2/5/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (1422-1698) held on February 4, 2009 before Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/12/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/9/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2009. (dw1)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: 2/5/2009 Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript
                              Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on February 4, 2009 in Phoenix, Arizona. (dw1)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1092-1421) held on February 3, 2009 before Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/10/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2009. (dw1)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009 Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript
                                  Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on February 3, 2009 in Phoenix, Arizona. (dw1)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 787-1091) held on February 2, 2009 before Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/10/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2009. (dw1)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009 Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript
                                      Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on February 2, 2009 in Phoenix, Arizona. (dw1)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: 2/2/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 493-786) held on January 30, 2009 before Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/9/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/5/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2009. (dw1)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: 2/2/2009 Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript
                                          Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on January 30, 2009 in Phoenix, Arizona. (dw1)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: 2/2/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 248-492) held on January 29, 2009 before Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/9/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/5/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2009. (dw1)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: 2/2/2009 Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript
                                              Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on January 29, 2009 in Phoenix, Arizona. (dw1)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-247) held on January 28, 2009 before Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/5/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2009. (dw1)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript
                                                  Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on January 28, 2009 in Phoenix, Arizona. (dw1)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/28/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-71) held on January 16, 2009 before Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/3/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2009. (dw1)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/28/2009 Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript
                                                      Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on January 16, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009 Objection to Exhibit List
                                                        Objection to Exhibit List, filed by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. Related document: [69] Exhibit List filed by USA.(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009 Objection to Exhibit List
                                                          Objection to Exhibit List, filed by USA. Related document: [61] Exhibit List filed by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY.(Acevedo, Mariana)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Sealed Legal Document 72 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: 1/14/2009 Response to Motion
                                                            **SEALED**RESPONSE to [67] MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Testimony Of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Mr. Francis P. Ferraraccio, filed by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY.Reply due by 1/30/2009. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009 Witness List
                                                              Witness List, filed by USA. (Carney, Christopher)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009 Trial Brief
                                                                TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Carney, Christopher)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009 Exhibit
                                                                  Exhibit List, filed by USA. (Carney, Christopher)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: 1/8/2009
                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Response to Government's Motion In Limine, to be filed on January 14, 2009, filed by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY.Response due by 1/26/2009.(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 67 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                      **SEALED** MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Testimony Of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Mr. Francis P. Ferraraccio, filed by USA.Response due by 1/26/2009. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [64] Motion for Leave to File First Amended List of Exhibits Signed by Sr. Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (jpk1)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [63] Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Signed by Sr. Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (jpk1)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Exhibit List, filed by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY.Response due by 1/23/2009. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix First Amended Exhibit List)(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion In Limine To Exclude The Testimony Of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Mr. Francis P. Ferraraccio Under Seal, filed by USA.Response due by 1/22/2009.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: 12/18/2008 Witness List
                                                                                Witness List, filed by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: 12/18/2008 Exhibit
                                                                                  Exhibit List, filed by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: 12/18/2008 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                    Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: 12/3/2008 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      PRETRIAL ORDER Plaintiff's Exhibit List due by 12/18/2008. Plaintiff's Witness List due by 12/18/2008. Plaintiff's Pretrial Brief due by 12/18/2008. Defendant's Exhibit List due by 1/13/2009. Defendant's Witness List due by 1/13/2009. Defendant's Pretrial Brief due by 1/13/2009. Motions in limine due by 1/7/2009. Responses to motions in limine due by 1/14/2009. Site visit set for 1/27/2009. Trial set for 1/28/2009 10:00 AM in Phoenix, AZ before Sr. Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. Signed by Sr. Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (jpk1)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 12/1/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-27) held on November 18, 2008 before Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 12/2/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2009. (dw1)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 12/1/2008 Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript
                                                                                          Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on November 18, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: 11/7/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [54] MOTION for Status Conference and for Scheduling Order, filed by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: 11/7/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                              RESPONSE to [54] MOTION for Status Conference and for Scheduling Order, filed by USA.Reply due by 11/24/2008. (Carney, Christopher)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: 11/6/2008 Motion for Status Conference
                                                                                                MOTION for Status Conference and for Scheduling Order, filed by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY.Response due by 11/24/2008.(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 52 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [50] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: 9/22/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [50] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [49] extension of discovery to September 15, 2008 and discovery related to damages until October 15, 2008. Signed by Sr. Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (SWF)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 50 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
                                                                                                        MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 49 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008, Terminated: 8/27/2008 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Amend Schedule for Discovery, filed by USA.Response due by 9/4/2008.(Carney, Christopher)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 48 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER - The parties' joint status report raises a number of issues that we await defendant's motion(s) to resolve. Signed by Sr. Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (SWF)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 47 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008
                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 46 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [45] Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery to be completed by 8/20/2008. Submission of Expert Reports due by 8/20/2008. Signed by Sr. Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (mc3) Modified on 6/6/2008 to edit docket text.(dls).
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 45 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008, Terminated: 6/3/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until August 20, 2008 to Complete Discovery and Submit Expert Reports, filed by USA.Response due by 6/9/2008.(Carney, Christopher)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 44 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [43] Unopposed Motion for Extension of TimeExpert Report due by 6/20/2008. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (SWF)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 43 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008, Terminated: 1/18/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until June 20, 2008 to Submit Government's Expert Reports, filed by USA.Response due by 2/4/2008.(Carney, Christopher)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [41] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete DiscoveryJoint Proposed Discovery due by 6/20/2008.,Status Report due by 6/27/2008 Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (CLB)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007, Terminated: 7/30/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time,until June 20, 2008, to Complete Discovery, filed by USA.Response due by 8/13/2007.(Carney, Christopher)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 40 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Carney for USA. (Carney, Christopher)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 39 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007
                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 4/19/2007. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 38 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [37] Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(d) Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (clb, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 37 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006, Terminated: 2/6/2007 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 (d), filed by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY.Response due by 1/16/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    Stipulated Order Governing Review of the Department of Energy's Electronic "Record Information System" Database Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (clb, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      E-mail Preservation Order Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (clb, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 34 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [32] Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (clb, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER Striking [31] Order on Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (clb, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 32 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006, Terminated: 8/17/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order, filed by USA.Response due by 9/5/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006
                                                                                                                                              **STRUCK**ORDER granting [30] Motion for Protective Order. Protective Order, E-mail Preservation Order, Order Governing Access to "Record Information System" Database entered. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (clb, ) Modified on 8/17/2006 (mij, ).
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order , E-Mail Preservation Order, and Stipulated Order Governing Review of the Record Information System Database, filed by USA.Response due by 8/31/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER:, ORDER LIFTING STAY on 7/28/06, SCHEDULING ORDER:Discovery closes 12/20/2007 Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (clb, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [26] Motion for Extension of Time Status Report due by 7/10/2006 Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006, Terminated: 7/7/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/10/2006 to File The Parties' Joint Status Report, Pursuant To The Court's December 16, 2005 and July 5, 2006 Orders filed by USA.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 7/10/2006. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [24] Motion for Extension of Time Status Report due by 7/7/2006 Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (clb, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006, Terminated: 7/5/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until July 7, 2006 to Joint Status Report, filed by USA.Response due by 7/17/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER STAYING CASE Stayed until 6/30/2006 Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER STAYING CASE Status Report due by 12/15/2005 Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY, USA. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER STAYING CASE - Case stayed until June 24, pending rulings in other courts. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - Notice of Compliance due by 1/3/2005. Unless the parties can agree that the lead cases will be dispositive of this one, we expect to lift the stay and rule on pending motions, or the merits as the case may be, promptly.Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER - We ask the parties to contact the court to provide a status report in the event of any changes or progress in this case. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [13] Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement) (swf, ) Modified on 6/7/2004 for punctuation (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [12] Order regarding pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004, Terminated: 6/4/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay All Proceedings and Report in Response to Pre-Discovery Conference Notice by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. Response due by 5/10/2004 (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Parties Discovery Report(s) due by 4/23/2004. Pre-Discovery Conference set for 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER The Court will host a pre-discovery conference on April 30, 2004 with Judge Diane Sypolt as presiding judge, to explore the motion for stay and the discovery needed in the new SNF cases. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [10] Motion for Leave to File Answer one day out of time. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. . (swf, ) Modified on 3/24/2004 to clarify what the motion was granting (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004, Terminated: 3/23/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by USA. Response due by 4/5/2004 (Attachments: # (1))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [7] Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time filed on February 16 is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Granting [8] defendant's second unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to March 16. Answer Due by 3/16/2004. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004, Terminated: 3/3/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 3/16/2004 by USA. Response due by 3/19/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/16/2004, Entered: 2/16/2004, Terminated: 3/3/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 3/2/2004 by USA. Response due by 3/4/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/16/2004, Entered: 2/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. Service: 12/18/03.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [99-447C, 98-621C, 98-154C,02-1894C,02-926C, 98-485C, 03-2625C, 03-2627C, 03-2626C, 03-2622C,03-2663, 98-483C, 03-2505C, 00-440C,98-486C, 98-474C, 01-116C, 98-484C, 01-115C, 01-551C, 00-703C, 98-488C, 98-614C, 03-2623C, 03-2621C, 03-2624C, 01-249C, 02-898C, 00-697C and 98-126C] by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. Service: 12/18/03.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Assigned to Judge Robert H. Hodges. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059357), filed by ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY.Answer Due by 2/17/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?