PANSIER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-02845-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GARY L. PANSIER, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/22/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $3000000
Nature of Suit 528 - Miscellaneous - Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 6/9/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
    UNPUBLISHED ORDER granting [4] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA, and denying[6] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by GARY L. PANSIER. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing the complaint. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Response to Motion
      RESPONSE to [6] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by USA. Reply due by 5/14/2004. Service: 04/30/2004.(lld, )
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Description not available
        REPLY to Response to Motion re [4] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA. (Includes response to Motion for Judgment upon the Pleadings) Service: 04/30/2004.(lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [7] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [6] Pltf's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, and Reply to [4] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1). Response and Reply due by 5/3/2004. Signed by Judge Reginald W. Gibson. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Response to Motion
            OBJECTION to [7] Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [6] Pltf's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, until 5/3/2004, filed by GARY L. PANSIER. Reply due by 5/6/2004. Service: 4/22/2004.(jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004, Terminated: 4/30/2004 Terminated:
              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [6] Pltf's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, until 5/3/2004, by USA.Service: 4/14/2004. Response due by 5/3/2004. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Response to Motion
                RESPONSE to [4] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), Together with Pltf's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, filed by GARY L. PANSIER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 4/19/2004. Service: 3/17/2004.(jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Terminated:
                  MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, Together with Response to Dft's Motion to Dismiss, by GARY L. PANSIER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 3/17/2004. Response due by 4/19/2004. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER: On 3/15/2004, the Clerk's Office received pltf's motion for judgment on the pleadings. The motion was not filed on receipt as it lacked a certificate of service in the form specified by RCFC 5.1. Pltf's tendered motion for judgment on the pleadings together with his letter, dated 3/12/2004, which shall be deemed to comprise a certificate of serice, shall be FILED by leave of court. As so filed Pltf's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings shall be deemed to also comprise pltf's response to Dft's Motion to Dismiss, filed 2/19/2004, with dft's time to reply and respond to run from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Terminated:
                      MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), and MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by USA.Service: 2/19/2004. Response due by 3/22/2004. (jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA. Service: 1/8/2004.(jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                          Case Assigned to Judge James F. Merow. (lg1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against USA (DOJ) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059381), filed by GARY L. PANSIER.Answer Due by 2/20/2004.(lg1, )
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 46 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?