PORTLAND GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00009-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 24, 2016 at 3:27 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo EUGENE, OREGON CITY OF, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
acting by and through the EUGENE WATER AND ELECTRIC BOARD, a municipal utility corporation of the State of Oregon Michael J. Henke +1 202 639 6529 +1 202 639 6604 mhenke@velaw.com
No Logo Pacificorp, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an Oregon corporation Michael J. Henke +1 202 639 6529 +1 202 639 6604 mhenke@velaw.com
No Logo Portland General Electric Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "PORTLAND GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY"

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an Oregon corporation Michael J. Henke +1 202 639 6529 +1 202 639 6604 mhenke@velaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Beau Bryan +1 202 616 8299 +1 202 307 2503 patrick.bryan@usdoj.gov
Space Luke Arthur Edward Pazicky +1 202 305 1709 +1 202 514 8624 luke.a.pazicky@usdoj.gov
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/6/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $217000000
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, PROTO, SNF, STAYED
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 39 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [38] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by PORTLAND GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, EUGENE, OREGON CITY OF, PACIFICORP.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Fagg, Arnold)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
    ORDER Striking Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (alc)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008
      ORDER granting [38] Motion to Coordinate Discovery and Develop a Litigation Plan for the Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ff)
        LREF
        Legal Document 38 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
        MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
          LREF
          Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Court Filing
          ORDER STAYING CASE Status Report due by 12/15/2008 Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ff)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008
            Case Stayed (ff)
              LREF
              Legal Document 36 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                LREF
                Legal Document 35 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/26/2007 Court Filing
                STATUS REPORT ORDERJoint Status Report due by 6/30/2008. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Fagg, Arnold)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Court Filing
                    STATUS REPORT ORDER Joint Status Report due by 12/14/2007 Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Beau Bryan for USA. (Bryan, Patrick)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Averbach, Andrew)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: 12/21/2006 Court Filing
                          STATUS REPORT ORDER, ORDER STAYING CASE Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2007. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, ) Modified on 12/21/2006 (mb2, ).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Court Filing
                              STATUS REPORT ORDER, ORDER STAYING CASE Status Report due by 12/15/2006. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, ) Modified on 7/24/2006 (mb2, ).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006 Court Filing
                                  NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Eric G. Bruggink for all further proceedings. Judge Margaret M. Sweeney no longer assigned to the case. (mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Court Filing
                                    ORDER reassigning case to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006 Court Filing
                                      NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Margaret Sweeney for all further proceedings. Judge Eric G. Bruggink no longer assigned to case. (mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006 Court Filing
                                        ORDER reassigning case to Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Court Filing
                                          STATUS REPORT ORDER, ORDER STAYING CASE Status Report due by 6/30/2006. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005
                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by PORTLAND GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Court Filing
                                              STATUS REPORT ORDER, ORDER STAYING CASE Status Report due by 12/15/2005 Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005
                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by PORTLAND GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, EUGENE, OREGON CITY OF, PACIFICORP, USA. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Court Filing
                                                  STATUS REPORT ORDER, ORDER STAYING CASE Status Report due by 6/24/2005. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004
                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/28/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004, Terminated: 12/28/2004 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
                                                      Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Brad Fagg in place of Michael J. Henke by PORTLAND GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, EUGENE, OREGON CITY OF, PACIFICORP. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/28/2004, Entered: 1/4/2005 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                        ***Attorney Arnold Bradley Fagg for PACIFICORP; PORTLAND GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY and EUGENE, OREGON CITY OF added. Attorney Michael J. Henke terminated. (dw1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004
                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST). (Henke, Michael)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Court Filing
                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Court Filing
                                                              ORDER: Discovery in this case on the rate of acceptance or damages issues, and/or any discovery duplicative of information from previous coordinated discovery in SNF cases is hereby STAYED until Friday, December 31, 2004. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt : Pre-Discovery Status Conference held on 04/30/04. (lag, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                  RESPONSE to [10] Status Conference Order, regarding conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004
                                                                  DISCOVERY REPORT by EUGENE, OREGON CITY OF, PACIFICORP, PORTLAND GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Henke, Michael) Modified on 4/21/2004 to match plaintiff's pdf (dw1).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER scheduling pre-discovery Conference on 4/30/2004 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt; and directing parties to submit to chambers, with a copy to Judge Sypolt, reports as set forth in this order. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, ) Modified on 4/13/2004 to include docket text re: submission of reports. (dls).
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004
                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 4/19/2004. (dw1)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004
                                                                        RESPONSE to [5] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery Regarding Rate And Schedule IssuesPlaintiffs' Joinder in Defendant's Motion to Stay All Proceedings filed by EUGENE, OREGON CITY OF, PACIFICORP, PORTLAND GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 4/19/2004. (Henke, Michael) Modified on 4/7/2004 to change reply date (dw1).
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [5] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery Regarding Rate And Schedule Issues,(until 4/8/2004), Upon Behalf Of Both Parties by USA Response due by 4/8/2004. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, ) Modified on 3/24/2004 (dw1).
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004, Terminated: 3/24/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [5] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery Regarding Rate And Schedule Issues,until 4/8/2004, Upon Behalf Of Both Parties by USA. Response due by 4/8/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified to clarify docket text on 3/23/2004 (dw1). Modified on 3/23/2004 (dw1, ).
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery Regarding Rate And Schedule Issues by USA. Response due by 3/25/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                                                                                  NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [98-126C, 98-154C, 98-474C, 98-483C, 98-484C,98-485C, 98-486C, 98-488C, 98-614C, 98-621C,99-447C, 00-440C, 00-697C, 00-703C, 01-115C, 01-116C, 01-249C, 01-551C, 02-898C, 02-926C, 02-1894C,] by PACIFICORP, PORTLAND GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, THE CITY OF EUGENE, OREGON. Service: 1/6/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                      Case Assigned to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lg1, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004 Complaint
                                                                                        COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059447), filed by PACIFICORP, PORTLAND GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, THE CITY OF EUGENE, OREGON.Answer Due by 3/8/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Disclosure Statement)(lg1, )
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 266 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?