ENERGY NORTHWEST v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00010-EJD
District Judge Edward J. Damich, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Energy Northwest, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman Melvin Hirsch +1 312 923 2782 +1 312 840 7782 nhirsch@jenner.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon Ann Snyder +1 202 616 0347 +1 202 514 7969 sharon.snyder@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/7/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, SNF
  Entries (240) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 175 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 Court Filing
ORDER granting [173] Agreed Motion to Set Pre-trial Schedule. The status conference scheduled on September 17, 2008, is VACATED. The revised pre-trial deadlines are set forth in this Order. The pre-trial conference shall be held in Washington, D.C. on January 9, 2009, at 10:00 A.M. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
    LREF
    Legal Document 174 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008, Terminated: 9/12/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
    MOTION for Extension of Time until September 22, 2008 to Defendant's Reply To Plaintiff's Opposition To Government's Motion To Coordinate, MOTION for Extension of Time until September 22, 2008 to File Response or Reply as to [171] Response to Motion, filed by USA.Response due by 9/29/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008
      ORDER granting [174] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. Defendant shall file its reply to Plaintiff's response to the motion to coordinate discovery on or before September 22, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
        LREF
        Legal Document 173 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008, Terminated: 9/12/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
        Unopposed MOTION To Set Pre-Trial Schedule, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 9/29/2008.(Hirsch, Norman)
          LREF
          Legal Document 172 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008
          NOTICE, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST re [163] Order, Energy Nortwhest's Supplemental Expert Disclosures (Hirsch, Norman)
            LREF
            Legal Document 171 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008
            RESPONSE to [165] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Reply due by 9/15/2008. (Hirsch, Norman)
              LREF
              Legal Document 170 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008
              RESPONSE to [148] Objection to Exhibit List, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST. (Hirsch, Norman)
                LREF
                Legal Document 169 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008
                MOTION Revised Notice Of Designation Of Deposition And Prior Trial Testimony Or, In The Alternative, Motion For Leave To Admit Prior Testimony Into Evidence, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 9/15/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Volume I, # (2) Appendix Volume II, # (3) Appendix Volume III, # (4) Appendix Volume IV, # (5) Appendix Volume V, # (6) Appendix Volume VI, # (7) Appendix Volume VII)(Hirsch, Norman)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 168 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008
                  RESPONSE to [149] Objection to Exhibit List, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Filing, # (2) Government response to ENW objections)(Luongo, Jeremiah)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 167 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008
                    Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on August 18, 2008. (lld)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Court Filing
                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on August 18, 2008 before Chief Judge Damich. (pgs. 1-55) Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 8/29/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2008. (lld)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 165 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
                        MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 164 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Court Filing
                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for September 17, 2008, at 10:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 163 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Court Filing
                            ORDER: Based on the recent decisions from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit in three spent nuclear fuel cases and the agreement of the parties, the previous pretrial deadlines and the trial date in this matter are VACATED. Trial in this matter is now scheduled to begin on February 2, 2009. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008
                              Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 8/18/2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich: Telephonic Status Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(EJ1)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Court Filing
                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-119) held on August 5, 2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 8/20/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2008. (dw1)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 161 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008
                                  Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on August 5, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 160 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Court Filing
                                    ORDER denying [123] Defendant's Motion to Strike Energy Northwest's Notice of Designation of Deposition and Prior Trial Testimony. The parties should be prepared to discuss the need for the designated deposition and trial testimony at the status conference on August 18, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008
                                      ORDER granting [159] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Memorandum of Fact and Law. A new date for the submission of the Government's memorandum of fact and law shall be discussed at the status conference on August 18, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 159 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008, Terminated: 8/12/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to to File Memorandum of Law and Facts, filed by USA.Response due by 8/28/2008.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 158 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Court Filing
                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for August 18, 2008, at 11:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008
                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines for 08/05/2008 proceeding: Transcript due from Heritage by 8/18/2008. (lld)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008
                                              ORDER: Pursuant to the request of the parties at the August 5, 2008 hearing on the motions in limine, any responses to objections to the opposing party's proposed trial exhibits shall be filed on or before August 26, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008
                                                Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, D.C. on 8/5/2008, before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich: Hearing regarding the parties' Motions in Limine. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(ahb) Modified on 8/6/2008 to edit date format.(dls).
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 157 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008
                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: [123] Motion to Strike, [138] Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Regarding Plaintiff's Designation of Deposition and Trial Testimony, filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 156 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008
                                                    STIPULATION of Exhibits (Joint First Amended), filed by all parties. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008
                                                      ORDER granting [154] Joint MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Joint Exhibit List. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 155 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008
                                                        Exhibit List of Exhibits to Which Neither Party Objects, filed by all parties. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 154 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008, Terminated: 8/1/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                          Joint MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Joint Exhibit List, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST, USA.Response due by 8/18/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 153 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008
                                                            Exhibit List, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 152 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008
                                                              Exhibit List - Final, filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008
                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/1/2008. (jt1)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008
                                                                  ORDER granting [151] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Out of Time. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion for Leave to Admit Prior Testimony into Evidence on or before August 1, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 151 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008, Terminated: 7/31/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion for Leave To Admit Prior Testimony Into Evidence Out of Time, filed by USA.Response due by 8/15/2008.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 150 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER regarding the schedule for the August 5, 2008, hearing on the motions in limine. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008
                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2008 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jt1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 149 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008
                                                                          Objection to Exhibit List, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST. Related document: [99] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 148 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008
                                                                            Objection to Exhibit List, filed by USA. Related document: [99] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 147 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008
                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [123] MOTION to Strike Energy Northwest's Notice of Designation of Deposition and Prior Trial Testimony and, in the Alternative, Motion in limine to Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations as Substantive Evidence Pursuant to RCFC 32(a) and Federal MOTION to Strike Energy Northwest's Notice of Designation of Deposition and Prior Trial Testimony and, in the Alternative, Motion in limine to Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations as Substantive Evidence Pursuant to RCFC 32(a) and Federal, filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008
                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 7/25/2008. (jt1)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008
                                                                                  ORDER granting [146] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Strike Notice of Designation of Deposition Testimony on or before July 25, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 146 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008, Terminated: 7/23/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until July 25, 2008 to File Response or Reply as to [141] Response to Motion,, To Strike Notice Of Designation of Deposition Testimony, filed by USA.Response due by 8/7/2008.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 145 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008
                                                                                      Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST. (Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 144 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER denying [142] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (sg)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 143 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008
                                                                                          RESPONSE to [142] MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief And To File Under Seal, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Reply due by 7/28/2008. (Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 142 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008, Terminated: 7/17/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief And To File Under Seal, filed by USA.Response due by 8/1/2008.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 141 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008
                                                                                              RESPONSE to [123] MOTION to Strike Energy Northwest's Notice of Designation of Deposition and Prior Trial Testimony and, in the Alternative, Motion in limine to Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations as Substantive Evidence Pursuant to RCFC 32(a) and Federal MOTION to Strike Energy Northwest's Notice of Designation of Deposition and Prior Trial Testimony and, in the Alternative, Motion in limine to Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations as Substantive Evidence Pursuant to RCFC 32(a) and Federal, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Reply due by 7/21/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 140 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008, Terminated: 7/7/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until July 18, 2008 to File Memorandum Of Fact And Law, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 7/24/2008.(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 139 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008, Terminated: 7/7/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until July 9, 2008 to Respond To Government's Motion To Strike, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 7/24/2008.(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [139] Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Government's Motion to Strike. Plaintiff shall file a response to the Government's motion to strike on or before Wednesday, July 9, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [140] Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Memorandum of Fact and Law. Plaintiff's Memorandum of Fact and Law shall be filed on or before Friday, July 18, 2008. Defendant's Memorandum of Fact and Law shall be filed on or before Friday, August 15, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 138 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008
                                                                                                        Supplemental MOTION To Admit Prior Testimony Into Evidence, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 7/21/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Supplemental Appendix Vol. XI)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 137 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008
                                                                                                          **SEALED**RESPONSE to [112] MOTION in Limine To Exclude Opinion Testimony Of Charles L. Stuart, filed by USA.Reply due by 7/14/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 136 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008
                                                                                                            **SEALED**RESPONSE to [114] MOTION in Limine To Exclude Opinion Testimony Of R. Larry Johnson, filed by USA.Reply due by 7/14/2008.(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 135 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008
                                                                                                              **SEALED**RESPONSE to [111] MOTION in Limine To Exclude Opinion Testimony Of Raymond Hartman, filed by USA.Reply due by 7/14/2008.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [125] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Responses to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Expert Witnesses Under Seal and For Enlargement of Time. Defendant shall file responses to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Raymond Hartman, Charles Stuart, and Larry Johnson under seal on or before 5:00 p.m. on July 1, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 134 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008
                                                                                                                  Witness List, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST. (Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 133 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [115] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Admission at Trial of Documents Prepared by Government Contractors, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Reply due by 7/14/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 132 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [108] MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Testimony Of Energy Northwest's Expert Witness, Ms. Eileen M. Supko, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Reply due by 7/14/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 131 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [109] MOTION in Limine To Strike Plaintiff's Claim For Interest, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Reply due by 7/14/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 130 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [113] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Rebuttal Testimony of Plaintiff Energy Northwest's Expert Witness, Eric Bush, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Reply due by 7/14/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 129 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008
                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Exhibits, filed by all parties. (Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 128 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008
                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Witnesses, filed by all parties. (Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 127 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008
                                                                                                                                STIPULATION -- Joint Stipulations of Fact, filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 126 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008
                                                                                                                                  Witness List, filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 125 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008, Terminated: 7/1/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Responses to Plaintiff's Motions to Exclude Expert Witnesses Under Seal and For Enlargement of Time, filed by USA.Response due by 7/17/2008.(Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 124 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [122] Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Amend Trial Preparation Order. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 123 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008, Terminated: 8/12/2008 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike Energy Northwest's Notice of Designation of Deposition and Prior Trial Testimony and, in the Alternative, Motion in limine to Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations as Substantive Evidence Pursuant to RCFC 32(a) and Federal Rule of Evidence 801(d)(2), filed by USA.Response due by 7/7/2008.(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 122 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008, Terminated: 6/25/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct [99] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by USA.Response due by 7/7/2008.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 121 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [120] Unopposed Motion for Amendment of Trial Preparation Order. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 120 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008, Terminated: 6/12/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct [99] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 6/27/2008.(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [119] Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Complete Two Depositions After the Close of Fact Discovery. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 119 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008, Terminated: 6/9/2008 Motion to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Take Deposition from John Swailes and Jonathon Hicks After The Close of Fact Discovery, filed by USA.Response due by 6/23/2008.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 118 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008
                                                                                                                                                    Corrected MOTION re Notice of Designation of Deposition and Prior Trial Testimony Or, In the Alternative, Motion for Leave to Admit Prior Testimony Into Evidence re Order on Motion for Leave to File,, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 6/20/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Corrected Appendix Vol. I, # (2) Corrected Appendix Vol. IA, # (3) Corrected Appendix Vol. II, # (4) Corrected Appendix Vol. III, # (5) Corrected Appendix Vol. IV, # (6) Corrected Appendix Vol. V, # (7) Corrected Appendix Vol. VI, # (8) Corrected Appendix Vol. VII, # (9) Corrected Appendix Vol. VIII, # (10) Corrected Appendix Vol. IX, # (11) Corrected Appendix Vol. X)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [117] Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Energy Northwest's Corrected Notice of Designation of Deposition and Prior Trial Testimony Or, In the Alternative, Motion for Leave to Admit Prior Testimony Into Evidence. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 117 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008, Terminated: 6/3/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Energy Northwest's Corrected Notice of Designation of Deposition and Prior Trial Testimony Or, In the Alternative, Motion for Leave to Admit Prior Testimony Into Evidence, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 6/19/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Corrected Notice of Designation of Deposition and Prior Trial Testimony Or, In the Alternative, Motion for Leave to Admit Prior Testimony Into Evidence, # (2) Corrected Appendix Vol. I, # (3) Corrected Appendix Vol. IA, # (4) Corrected Appendix Vol. II, # (5) Corrected Appendix Vol. III, # (6) Corrected Appendix Vol. IV, # (7) Corrected Appendix Vol. V, # (8) Corrected Appendix Vol. VI, # (9) Corrected Appendix Vol. VII, # (10) Corrected Appendix Vol. VIII, # (11) Corrected Appendix Vol. IX, # (12) Corrected Appendix Vol. X)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 116 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Admission of Prior Deposition and Trial Testimony Into Evidence, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 6/16/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Vol. I, # (2) Appendix Vol. IA, # (3) Appendix Vol. II, # (4) Appendix Vol. III, # (5) Appendix IV, # (6) Appendix V, # (7) Appendix VI, # (8) Appendix VII, # (9) Appendix VIII, # (10) Appendix IX, # (11) Appendix X)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 115 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine, filed by USA.Response due by 6/16/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix, # (2) Appendix, # (3) Appendix, # (4) Appendix)(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 114 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                        **SEALED** MOTION in Limine To Exclude Opinion Testimony Of R. Larry Johnson, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 6/16/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Volume I, # (2) Appendix Volume II, # (3) Appendix Volume III, # (4) Appendix Volume IV, # (5) Appendix Volume V, # (6) Appendix Volume VI)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 113 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                          **SEALED** MOTION in Limine, filed by USA.Response due by 6/16/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix, # (2) Appendix vol 11)(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 112 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                            **SEALED** MOTION in Limine To Exclude Opinion Testimony Of Charles L. Stuart, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 6/16/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Volume I, # (2) Appendix Volume II, # (3) Appendix Volume III, # (4) Appendix Volume IV, # (5) Appendix Volume V, # (6) Appendix Volume VI)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 111 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                              **SEALED** MOTION in Limine To Exclude Opinion Testimony Of Raymond Hartman, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 6/16/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Volume I, # (2) Appendix Volume II, # (3) Appendix Volume III, # (4) Appendix Volume IV, # (5) Appendix Volume V, # (6) Appendix Volume VI)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 110 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE, filed by USA re [99] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Regarding Proposed Sequestration Procedures (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 109 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                                  **SEALED** MOTION in Limine To Strike Plaintiff's Claim For Interest, filed by USA.Response due by 6/16/2008. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 108 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                                    **SEALED** MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Testimony Of Energy Northwest's Expert Witness, Ms. Eileen M. Supko, filed by USA.Response due by 6/16/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix, # (2) Appendix, # (3) Appendix)(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 107 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST re [99] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Memorandum Regarding Sequestration Procedures (Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 106 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE, filed by all parties re [99] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Joint Statement of Good Faith Conduct And Status Report Regarding Additional Trial Related Issues (Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [105] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Motions In Limine Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 105 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008, Terminated: 5/30/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendant's Motions in Limine To Be Filed May 30, 2008, filed by USA.Response due by 6/16/2008.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 104 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008, Terminated: 5/28/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Motions in Limine, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 6/16/2008.(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [104] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Motions In Limine Under Seal Electronically. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [101] Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery. Discovery shall remain open until June 13, 2008, to allow Plaintiff to take the RCFC 30(b)(6) deposition pursuant the Court's Order of April 21, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 103 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [101] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery,, filed by USA.Reply due by 5/27/2008. (Snyder, Sharon) Modified on 5/14/2008 to include reply deadline (mb2).
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 102 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: [101] MOTION for Extension of Time, until June 13, 2008, to Complete Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Taking the Deposition of a Rule 30(b)(6) Witness the Government Cannot Make Available During the Existing Period. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time on or before May 13, 2008, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 101 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008, Terminated: 5/14/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time,until June 13, 2008, to Complete Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Taking the Deposition of a Rule 30(b)(6) Witness the Government Cannot Make Available During the Existing Period, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 5/27/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [100] Defendant's Motion to Take Deposition Outside of the Fact Discovery Period. Based on the agreement of the parties and the representations at the status conference on January 29, 2008, Defendant shall take the deposition of John Swailes at a mutually agreeable date and time. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 100 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008, Terminated: 4/28/2008 Motion to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Take Deposition from John Swailes Outside of Fact Discovery Period, filed by USA.Response due by 5/12/2008.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 99 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [97] Joint Motion and Proposal for Trial Preparation Schedule. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 98 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [84] Motion for Protective Order. Discovery shall be reopened until May 23, 2008, solely to allow Energy Northwest to proceed with the RCFC 30(b)(6) deposition at a date and time mutually agreeable to the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 97 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008, Terminated: 4/21/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION To Enter Proposed Trial Preparation Schedule, filed by USA.Response due by 4/28/2008.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 96 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Supplemental Response To Defendant's Motion For A Protective Order, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) # (4))(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [95] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Pursuant to the Defendant's motion and the agreement of the parties, Defendant shall file a reply on or before March 19, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 95 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008, Terminated: 3/5/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Leave To File A Reply re [93] Response to Motion, by Defendant for A Protective Order, filed by USA.Response due by 3/20/2008.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 94 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-30) held on January 29, 2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Transcript Tentative Deadlines for 1/29/08 proceeding before Chief Judge DamichTranscript due by 3/3/2008. (lld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 93 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                            **SEALED**RESPONSE to [84] MOTION for Protective Order (Supplemental Response), filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Reply due by 3/7/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix to Plaintiff's Supplemental Response to Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order (Part 1)# (2) Appendix to Plaintiff's Supplemental Response to Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order (Part 2))(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [92] Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Response to Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order Under Seal Electronically. Plaintiff's supplemental response shall be filed under seal on or before February 22, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 92 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008, Terminated: 2/22/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Supplemental Response to Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 3/10/2008.(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 91 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008, Terminated: 2/13/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until February 22, 2008 to Respond to Court's January 30, 2008 Order (Agreed), filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 3/3/2008.(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [91] Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Court's January 30, 2008 Order. Plaintiff's brief shall be filed on or before February 22, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 90 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [72] Motion to Compel Production of Documents Withheld Under the Deliberative Process Privilege and ordering briefing on Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order to Preclude Plaintiff's Noticed 30(b)(6) Deposition. Plaintiff's brief shall be filed on or before February 15, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [89] Agreed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Enlarge Rebuttal Expert Discovery Period by Two Weeks. Rebuttal Expert Reports shall be submitted on or before February 22, 2008. Expert Discovery shall be completed by March 28, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 89 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008, Terminated: 1/17/2008 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule To Enlarge Rebuttal Expert Discovery Period By Two Weeks, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 2/4/2008.(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 88 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for Tuesday, January 29, 2008, at 2:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: the December 21, 2007, deadline applies to submission of Defendant's expert report(s); Plaintiff's rebuttal expert report(s) shall be due on or before February 8, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [87] Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: the deadline for the exchange of expert reports is extended to and including December 21, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 87 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007, Terminated: 12/6/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until December 21, 2007 to Exchange expert reports, filed by USA.Response due by 12/24/2007.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 86 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [84] MOTION for Protective Order, filed by USA. (Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 85 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [84] MOTION for Protective Order, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Reply due by 10/15/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 84 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007, Terminated: 4/21/2008 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order, filed by USA.Response due by 10/1/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix)(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 83 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [82] Plaintiff's motion regarding non-discoverability of certain expert materials and communications, as stipulated and agreed to by the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 82 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007, Terminated: 9/12/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION Entry of Stipulation and Order Regarding Non-Discoverability of Certain Expert Materials and Communications, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 9/28/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Order Regarding Non-Discoverability of Certain Expert Materials and Communications)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 81 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [72] MOTION to Compel Production Of Documents Withheld Under The "Deliberative Process" Privilege, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 80 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                **SEALED**RESPONSE to [72] MOTION to Compel Production Of Documents Withheld Under The "Deliberative Process" Privilege, filed by USA.Reply due by 8/27/2007. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) Appendix # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10))(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 79 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: 8/14/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [77] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Response to [72] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Withheld Under the Deliberative Process Privilege: Defendant's Response shall be filed on or before August 17, 2007. Plaintiff's deadline to reply shall run from the date of Defendant's response (as re-filed under seal). Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 78 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [72] MOTION to Compel Production Of Documents Withheld Under The "Deliberative Process" Privilege, filed by USA.Reply due by 8/20/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix)(Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 77 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007, Terminated: 8/14/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response To Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Withheld Under Deliberative Process Privilege Under Seal, filed by USA.Response due by 8/23/2007.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [75] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission: Defendant's Response due by 8/24/2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [74] Defendant's (corrected) Unopposed Motion to Take Deposition from Jonathan Hicks. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [76] Defendant's Motion to Correct [74] Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Take Deposition Outside of Fact Discovery Period. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [73] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [72] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production Of Documents Withheld Under The "Deliberative Process" Privilege: Defendant's Response shall be filed by August 6, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 76 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007, Terminated: 8/6/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct Unopposed Motion to Take a Deposition Outside of Fact Discovery Period, filed by USA.Response due by 8/20/2007. (Attachments: # (1) corrected motion)(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 75 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007, Terminated: 8/6/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until August 24, 2007 to Respond to Request for Admissions, filed by USA.Response due by 8/20/2007.(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 74 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007, Terminated: 8/6/2007 Motion to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Take Deposition from Jonathan Hicks Outside of Fact Discovery Period, filed by USA.Response due by 8/16/2007.(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 73 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007, Terminated: 8/6/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [72] MOTION to Compel Production Of Documents Withheld Under The "Deliberative Process" Privilege, filed by USA.Response due by 8/13/2007.(Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 72 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007, Terminated: 1/30/2008 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Production Of Documents Withheld Under The "Deliberative Process" Privilege, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 7/30/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 71 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [69] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time/Revised Discovery Order: fact discovery shall conclude by August 3, 2007; expert discovery shall conclude by March 14, 2008; the meeting of counsel shall be held on or before May 23, 2008; the Final Pre-trial Conference shall be held on September 24, 2008, at 10:00 AM; trial shall commence on October 20, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 70 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [69] MOTION for Extension of Time,until August 3, 2007, to Complete Discovery And To Adjust All Other Schedule Dates By Three Months, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Reply due by 5/14/2007. (Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 69 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007, Terminated: 5/4/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time,until August 3, 2007, to Complete Discovery And To Adjust All Other Schedule Dates By Three Months, filed by USA.Response due by 5/14/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 68 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                **SEALED**RESPONSE to [67] Status Report, [66] Status Report Order, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 67 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  **SEALED**STATUS REPORT Corrected Version, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7))(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 66 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report from Plaintiff due on or before 12/19/2006. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 65 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [64] Defendant's unopposed Motion for Leave to File: Defendant's corrected status report shall be filed on or before 12/1/2006. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 64 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006, Terminated: 11/28/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        **SEALED**Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Status Report A Corrected Copy, filed by USA.Response due by 12/15/2006. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8))(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 63 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          **SEALED**STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6))(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 62 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [61] Defendant's unopposed Motion to Seal Document: the due date for the status report in question is extended to December 1, 2006. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/1/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 61 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006, Terminated: 11/21/2006 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Document Status Report due November 20, 2006, filed by USA.Response due by 12/7/2006.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 60 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's ANSWER to [58] Amended Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 1/8/2007.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 59 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006, Terminated: 11/9/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until November 20, 2006 to Submit Status Report, filed by USA.Response due by 11/27/2006.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [59] Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time:Defendant's Status Report due on or before 11/20/2006. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 58 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 57 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [56] Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Complaint: Plaintiff's amended pleading due on or before 10/27/2006; Defendant's response due on or before 11/15/2006. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 56 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006, Terminated: 10/19/2006 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [1] Complaint, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 11/2/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A -- Amended and Supplemental Complaint# (2) Exhibit B Blackline of Amended and Supplemental Complaint)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [54] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Protective Order. The parties shall note that paragraph 9 has been slightly changed from the text proposed. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (Attachments: # (1)) (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006, Terminated: 8/28/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order Governing The Production Of Confidential Materials, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2006.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 53 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER:fact discovery shall commence 11/1/2006 and conclude by 5/1/2007; Plaintiff's expert report shall be submitted by 6/15/2007; Defendant's expert report shall be submitted by 9/14/2007; rebuttal expert reports shall be submitted by 11/1/2007; expert discovery shall conclude by 12/14/2007; the parties' pre-trial meeting of counsel shall be held on 2/29/2008; the Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/16/2008 at 10:00 AM in the National Courts Building; trial is set to begin on 6/3/2008 at 10:00 AM in the National Courts Building. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [52] Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time within which to file proposed protective order: the parties' joint motion for a protective order shall be due by 8/22/2006. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 52 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006, Terminated: 8/14/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/22/2006 to To Submit The Parties' Proposed Protective Order, In Accordance With The Court's July 17, 2006 Order, filed by USA.Response due by 8/28/2006.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 50 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER governing discovery relating to the Department of Energy's electronic "Record Information System" database. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 49 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-Mail Preservation ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [48] Defendant's Motion for Entry of An E-Mail Preservation Order and a Stipulated Order Governing Review of the "Record Information System" Database. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [47] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file a proposed protective order: the parties' proposed protective order shall now be due by 8/11/2006. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 48 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006, Terminated: 8/7/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION For Entry Of An E-Mail Preservation Order And A Stipulated Order Regarding Access To The "Record Information System" Database, Pursuant To Paragraph 1 Of The Court's July 17, 2006 Order, filed by USA.Response due by 8/21/2006.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 47 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006, Terminated: 8/7/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/11/2006 to To File The Parties' Proposed Protective Order, As Required By Paragraph 1 Of The Court's Order Dated July 17, 2006, filed by USA.Response due by 8/21/2006.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 8/14/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 46 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (1-52) held on July 13, 2006 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 45 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: the parties' motions re proprietary information, RIS access, and email protection due by 8/4/2006; Joint Status Report proposing discovery and trial schedule due by 8/11/2006; initial disclosures due by 9/8/2006; Plaintiff's documentary support for its initial disclosures due by 10/16/2006; Plaintiff's Amended Complaint due by 10/16/2006; Defendant's Status Report on sufficiency of Plaintiff's initial disclosures due by 11/13/2006. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 44 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [39] MOTION To Set Schedule For Discovery And Trial On Damages Or, In The Alternative, For A Status Conference, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 6/28/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [43] Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file its reply to [42] Defendant's response to [39] Plaintiff's motion to set a discovery and trial schedule or, in the alternative, for a status conference:Plaintiff's Reply due by 6/28/2006. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 43 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/21/2006, Terminated: 6/22/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [42] Response to Motion, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 7/10/2006.(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/13/2006 at 2:00 PM in National Courts Building before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [39] Plaintiff's Motion to Set Schedule for Discovery and Trial on Damages or, in the Alternative, for a Status Conference: the court will hold an on-the-record, in-court status conference on July 13, 2006, at 2:00 p.m. If Plaintiff will also have any counsel or co-counsel participating by telephone, then such counsel shall email chambers at damich_chambers@ao.uscourts.gov, no later than one business day beforehand, to provide the phone number (and name and affiliation) where he/she can be reached for the status conference. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 42 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [39] MOTION To Set Schedule For Discovery And Trial On Damages Or, In The Alternative, For A Status Conference, filed by USA.Reply due by 6/23/2006. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part [40] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time within which to respond to [39] Plaintiff's Motion to Set Discovery Schedule. Defendant's Response due by 6/9/2006. Signed by chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 41 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [40] MOTION for Extension of Time until June 23, 2006 to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Set Schedule For Discovery And Trial, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Reply due by 6/9/2006. (Hirsch, Norman) Modified on 5/25/2006 to correct reply deadline(mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 6/9/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 40 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006, Terminated: 5/30/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until June 23, 2006 to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Set Schedule For Discovery And Trial, filed by USA.Response due by 6/12/2006.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 39 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006, Terminated: 6/16/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION To Set Schedule For Discovery And Trial On Damages Or, In The Alternative, For A Status Conference, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Response due by 5/26/2006.(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ERRATA correcting [38] Published Opinion: on page 2 of the filed opinion, in the first full paragraph, the citation to Energy Northwest v. United States, No. 04-10C, should read thereafter "(Fed. Cl. May 9, 2005)." (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PUBLISHED OPINION on [26] Defendant's Corrected MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response To The Court's May 9, 2005, Show Cause Order: Defendant's Motion is DENIED and the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter summary judgment in favor of Plaintiff on contractual liability. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 37 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [32] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 36 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [35] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [30] Response,until September 19, 2005, Reply to Defendant's Response to The Court's Order to Show Cause and Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix # (5) Appendix # (6) Appendix)(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 10/3/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [35] Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [30] Plaintiff's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause and Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's Reply is due on or before October 3, 2005. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005, Terminated: 8/26/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [30] Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, until September 19, 2005 filed by USA. Response due by 9/12/2005. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPENDIX (in paper form), consisting of five bound volumes, to [30] Response filed [by leave of the judge]. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ENERGY NORTHWEST, ENERGY NORTHWEST re [30] Response To Court's Order To Show Cause And Memorandum In Opposition To Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment (Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to accept for filing Plaintiff's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause and Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Counsel should take note, however, that such submissions in the future should instead be filed as two separate "events" under ECF. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 32 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [26] Corrected MOTION for Summary Judgment And Response To The Court's May 9, 2005 Show Cause Order by ENERGY NORTHWEST. (Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [27] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by ENERGY NORTHWEST filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST. (Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [26] Motion for Summary Judgment (reply due by 8/29/2005), [21] Order to Show Cause, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST. (Hirsch, Norman) Modified on 8/12/2005 to add reply deadline (jat, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/12/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 8/29/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [29] Plaintiff's Motion to file paper appendix to Plaintiff's response to the Court's show cause order [21] and to Plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to [23] Defendant's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005, Terminated: 8/10/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION For Leave To File In Paper Form The Appendix To Plaintiff's Response To The Court's Order To Show Cause And Memoranudm In Opposition To Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST. Response due by 8/25/2005. (Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motion Response due by 8/11/2005 and Show Cause Response due by 8/11/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [28] Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time until 08/11/2005 to File Response/Reply to [26] Defendant's Corrected MOTION for Summary Judgment And Response To The Court's May 9, 2005 Show Cause Order. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: 7/21/2005, Terminated: 7/25/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [26] Corrected MOTION for Summary Judgment And Response To The Court's May 9, 2005 Show Cause Order,until 08/11/05, filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST. Response due by 8/8/2005. (Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [26] Corrected MOTION for Summary Judgment And Response To The Court's May 9, 2005 Show Cause Order , Filed In Accordance With The Court's June 21, 2005 Order by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005, Terminated: 1/30/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corrected MOTION for Summary Judgment And Response To The Court's May 9, 2005 Show Cause Order filed by USA. Dispositive Motion Response due by 7/29/2005, (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12) # (13) # (14) # (15) # (16) # (17) # (18) # (19) # (20) # (21) # (22) # (23) # (24) # (25) # (26) # (27) # (28) # (29) # (30) # (31) # (32) # (33) # (34) # (35) # (36) # (37) # (38))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses to Response to Show Cause and Dispositive Motion due by 7/28/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [25] Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, to and including July 28, 2005, to File Response to [23] Defendant's Response to Order to Show Cause and Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005, Terminated: 6/27/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [23] Response to Order to Show Cause,,, [24] Response to Order to Show Cause filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST. Response due by 7/11/2005. (Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Compliance due by 6/28/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: on 6/17/2005, Defendant filed [24] a document described in the docket text as "Response to [21] Order to Show Cause," but titled as "Defendant's Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact." In addition, the filing was not signed by the attorney of record. The Court hereby ORDERS Defendant to resubmit the document, on or before 6/28/2005, with the proper ECF "event" and docket text, and to ensure that it bears the proper electronic signature. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE TO [21] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE TO [21] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12) # (13) # (14) # (15) # (16) # (17) # (18) # (19) # (20) # (21) # (22) # (23) # (24) # (25) # (26) # (27) # (28) # (29) # (30) # (31) # (32) # (33) # (34) # (35) # (36) # (37)) Response due by 7/18/2005. (Snyder, Sharon) Modified on 6/21/2005 (jat, ) to correct docket text and set response deadline to motion for summary judgment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motion Response due by 7/18/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response to show cause order due by 6/17/2005; Plaintiff's response due by 7/1/2005; Defendant's reply due by 7/8/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [22] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time, until 6/17/2005, to File Response to [21] Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff may file a response on or before 7/01/2005; Defendant may reply on or before 7/8/2005. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: 6/9/2005, Terminated: 6/10/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [21] Order to Show Cause,,until 6/17/2005, filed by USA. Response due by 6/27/2005. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant is hereby ordered to show cause, on or before 6/9/2005, why Court's grant of summary judgment on contract liability in favor of plaintiff in Consumers Energy, #02-1894, should not apply in this case as well. Plaintiff's response, if any, due by 6/23/2005; Defendant's reply, if any, due by 6/30/2005. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (Attachment: # (1) Consumers Energy, #02-1894, Opinion on Contract Liability, etc.). (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-44) of Proceedings held on 3/30/05 before Judge Edward J. Damich. (eph, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2005 (eph, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER memorializing the Court's plans for further proceedings pursuant to the status conference held March 30, 2005. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/30/2005 at 10:00 AM in the National Courts Building, Washington, D.C., before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich to discuss the matters raised in the Joint Preliminary Status Report (JPSR). If either party intends to raise any issue(s) not directly addressed in the JPSR, the parties shall file an addendum to the JPSR on such issue(s) on or before March 24, 2005. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Attachments: # (1))(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [16] Plaintiff's Joint Motion for Leave to File Joint Preliminary Status Report (JPSR). The parties are directed to re-submit the JPSR as a separate filing for entry on the docket. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004, Terminated: 12/6/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Joint Preliminary Status Report by ENERGY NORTHWEST, USA. Response due by 12/9/2004 (Attachments: # (1))(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to [1] Complaint by USA. JPSR due by 10/4/2004.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answer Due by 8/17/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [14] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Answer to Complaint. Defendant shall resubmit its Answer to the Complaint, on or before August 17, 2004, in order to be noted as a separate filing on the case docket. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004, Terminated: 8/10/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Answer to the Complaint by USA. Response due by 8/23/2004 (Attachments: # (1))(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Ann Snyder for USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        *** Attorney Harold Dewitt Lester terminated. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt: pre-Discovery Hearing held on 4/30/04. (sms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER entered on [7] Defendant's Motion to Stay: staying discovery on rate of acceptance or damages issues, with exceptions, through December 31, 2004. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich.(jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [9] Order regarding pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery Plans And Objectives by ENERGY NORTHWEST. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Parties Discovery Report(s) due by 4/23/2004. Pre-Discovery Conference set for 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER directing parties to submit discovery report by 4/23/04 and noting pre-discovery conference scheduled for 4/30/04 before Judge Sypolt. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (sms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [7] MOTION to Stay Case Or, In Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery Regarding Rate And Schedule Issues filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST. Reply due by 4/8/2004. (Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004, Terminated: 5/12/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay Case Or, In Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery Regarding Rate And Schedule Issues by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Response due by 3/25/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 3/11/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Standard Special Procedures ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (sms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Indirectly Related Case(s) [98-126C, 98-154C, 98-474C, 98-483C, 98-484C, 98-485C, 98-486C, 98-488C, 98-614C, 98-621C, 99-447C, 00-440C, 00-697C, 00-703C, 01-115C, 01-116C, 01-249C, 01-551C, 02-898C, 02-926C, 02-1894C, 03-2505C, 03-2621C, 03-2622C, 03-2623C, 03-2624C, 03-2625C, 03-2626C, 03-2627C, 03-2663C, 03-2832C] by ENERGY NORTHWEST. Service: 1/7/04.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Assigned to Judge Edward J. Damich. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059448), filed by ENERGY NORTHWEST.Answer Due by 3/8/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 180 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?