PANSIER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00027-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GARY L. PANSIER, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/12/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $14000000
Nature of Suit 528 - Miscellaneous - Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 5/7/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 4/29/2004 before Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Response
    RESPONSE to [9] 5/4/2004 Unpublished Order/Opinion Granting Motion to Dismiss, filed by GARY L. PANSIER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 5/13/2004.(jcp, )
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004
      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [4] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA, and denying plaintiff's motion for judgment on the pleadings. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing the complaint. No costs. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Response to Motion
          OPPOSITION to [6] Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Pltf's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, until 5/4/2004, filed by GARY L. PANSIER. Reply due by 5/10/2004. Service: 4/26/2004.(jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Wiese : Preliminary Status Conference held on 4/29/04. (jwg)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004
              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/1/2004. (vp1, )
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/29/2004 02:30 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004 Terminated:
                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [5] Pltf's Motion for Judgment Upon the Pleadings, until 5/4/2004, by USA.Service: 4/20/2004. Response due by 5/7/2004.(jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Response to Motion
                    RESPONSE to [4] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by GARY L. PANSIER. [Styled as Pltf's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings] Reply due by 4/20/2004. Service: 4/3/2004.(jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004, Terminated: 5/5/2004 Terminated:
                      MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) by USA.Service: 3/12/2004. Response due by 4/12/2004. (jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA. Service: 1/29/2004.(jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge John P. Wiese. (lg1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059479), filed by GARY L. PANSIER.Answer Due by 3/12/2004.(lg1, )
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 109 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?