CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC., v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00033-TCW
District Judge Thomas C. Wheeler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Churchill +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066 dchurchill@jenner.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Beau Bryan +1 202 616 8299 +1 202 307 2503 patrick.bryan@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/13/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, PROTO, SNF
  Entries (174) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-37) held on September 4, 2008 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 9/17/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/14/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2008. (dw1)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 148 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
    Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on September 4, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
      LREF
      Legal Document 147 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
      RESPONSE to [138] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Chu, Jack)
        LREF
        Legal Document 146 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Court Filing
        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/15/2008 2:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (lb)
          LREF
          Legal Document 145 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
          RESPONSE to [138] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Robertson, Cynthia)
            LREF
            Legal Document 144 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Court Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 6/1/2009-6/26/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (lb)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008
              Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 9/4/2008 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler: Scheduling Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.) (lb)
                LREF
                Legal Document 143 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Court Filing
                PUBLISHED OPINION granting [123] Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (lb) (lld).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 142 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Court Filing
                  PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order: Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2008 10:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (lb)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Court Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-57) held on August 22, 2008 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 9/3/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2008. (dw1)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 140 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008
                      Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on August 22, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                        LREF
                        Blank 139 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [137] Motion for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Supplemental Brief. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008
                          Minute Entry for oral argument held in Washington, DC on 8/22/2008 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(pn)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 138 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
                            MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
                              LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 137 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008, Terminated: 8/22/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                              **SEALED** MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for Joinder, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,.Response due by 9/8/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Churchill, David)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 136 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [135] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. Plaintiff shall provide Defendant with a redacted version of Defendant's August 19, 2008 motion and attachments by 6:00 PM today so that it may be served immediately upon counsel for Entergy Nuclear Indian Point 2, LLC. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (lb)
                                  LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 135 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008, Terminated: 8/20/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                  **SEALED** MOTION for Leave to File The Attached Supplemental Brief In Support Of Defendant's Motion For Joinder To Address Plaintiff's Newly Amended RCFC 26 Disclosures, filed by USA.Response due by 9/5/2008. (Bryan, Patrick)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 134 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Court Filing
                                    AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 133 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008
                                      RESPONSE to, RESPONSE to [123] MOTION for Joinder of Plaintiff Entergy Nuclear Indian Point, LLC, or, in the Alternative, Renewed Motion for Notice Pursuant to RCFC 14(b) and 41 U.S.C. Section 114(b) MOTION for Joinder of Plaintiff Entergy Nuclear Indian Point, LLC, or, in the Alternative, Renewed Motion for Notice Pursuant to RCFC 14(b) and 41 U.S.C. Section 114(b) (Reply due by 8/18/2008.), filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Excerpt from October 2005 response brief))(Chu, Jack)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 132 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Court Filing
                                        ORDER setting oral argument on [123] motion for joinder on 8/22/2008 at 08:00 AM at the National Courts Building. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 131 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Beau Bryan for USA. (Bryan, Patrick)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 130 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting [129] Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Submit Expert Witness Reports. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 129 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008, Terminated: 7/17/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until August 4, 2008 to To Submit Expert Witness Reports, filed by USA.Response due by 8/4/2008.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 128 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Court Filing
                                                ORDER directing both parties to prepare redacted versions of their briefs regarding Defendant's June 2, 2008 sealed motion for joinder and provide copies of the redacted versions to counsel for Entergy Nuclear Indian Point, LLC. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 127 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008
                                                  **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re [123] MOTION for Joinder of Plaintiff Entergy Nuclear Indian Point, LLC, or, in the Alternative, Renewed Motion for Notice Pursuant to RCFC 14(b) and 41 U.S.C. Section 114(b) MOTION for Joinder of Plaintiff Entergy Nuclear Indian Point, LLC, or, in the Alternative, Renewed Motion for Notice Pursuant to RCFC 14(b) and 41 U.S.C. Section 114(b), filed by USA.(Damelin, Scott)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 126 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008
                                                    **SEALED**RESPONSE to [123] MOTION for Joinder of Plaintiff Entergy Nuclear Indian Point, LLC, or, in the Alternative, Renewed Motion for Notice Pursuant to RCFC 14(b) and 41 U.S.C. Section 114(b) MOTION for Joinder of Plaintiff Entergy Nuclear Indian Point, LLC, or, in the Alternative, Renewed Motion for Notice Pursuant to RCFC 14(b) and 41 U.S.C. Section 114(b), filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,.Reply due by 7/3/2008.(Churchill, David)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 125 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [124] Motion for Enlargement of Time. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 124 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008, Terminated: 6/6/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Defendant's Expert Reports and Complete Discovery, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,, USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Robertson, Cynthia)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 123 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008, Terminated: 9/3/2008 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                          **SEALED** MOTION for Joinder of Plaintiff Entergy Nuclear Indian Point, LLC, or, in the Alternative, Renewed Motion for Notice Pursuant to RCFC 14(b) and 41 U.S.C. Section 114(b), filed by USA.Response due by 6/19/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix, # (2) Appendix, # (3) Appendix, # (4) Appendix, # (5) Appendix, # (6) Appendix)(Finn, Stephen)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 122 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [119] Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; granting [120] Motion for Court Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 121 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008
                                                              RESPONSE to [120] MOTION For Court Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,.Reply due by 6/12/2008. (Churchill, David)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 120 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008, Terminated: 6/2/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                MOTION For Court Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal, filed by USA.Response due by 6/2/2008.(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 119 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008, Terminated: 6/2/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal "Defendant's Motion For Joinder Of Plaintiff Entergy Nuclear Indian Point, LLC, Or In The Alternative Renewed Motion For Notice Pursuant To RCFC 14(b) And 41 U.S.C. Section 114(b)", filed by USA.Response due by 4/24/2008.(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008
                                                                    ORDER granting [118] Motion for Enlargement of Time. Plaintiff may furnish copies of its expert reports to the Defendant on or before February 11, 2008. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler.(pn)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 118 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008, Terminated: 1/31/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/11/2008 to to Furnish Copies of its Expert Report to the Defendant, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,.Response due by 2/19/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Churchill, David)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 117 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007
                                                                        Joint MOTION For An Order Regarding Discovery Of Draft Expert Reports, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 116 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [115] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler.(mo)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 115 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007, Terminated: 8/27/2007 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,.Response due by 9/10/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-F)(Robertson, Cynthia)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 114 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007 Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [113] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mo)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 113 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007, Terminated: 7/27/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,.Response due by 8/10/2007.(Robertson, Cynthia)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 112 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER re Protective Order. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mo'n)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 111 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007
                                                                                    APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Robertson, Cynthia)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 110 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER (Correction) re [106] Status Report and Draft Proposed Consent Order & [107] Order on Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mo'n) (Entered: 06/06/2007) Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mo'n)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 109 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER re [106] Status Report and Draft Proposed Consent Order & [107] Order on Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mo'n)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 108 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007
                                                                                          RESPONSE to [105] Status Report, filed by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 107 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER: On May 25, 2007, Defendant filed an unopposed motion for leave to file a response to the Status Report and Draft Proposed Consent Order that Plaintiff filed on May 21, 2007. [106] For good cause shown, Defendants motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its response on or before May 31, 2007. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mo)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 106 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007, Terminated: 5/25/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File response to plaintiff"s status report and accompanying draft of proposed consent order, filed by USA.Response due by 6/8/2007.(Lo Re, Alan)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 105 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007
                                                                                                STATUS REPORT Regarding Proposed Consent Order, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Draft of Proposed Consent Order)(Robertson, Cynthia)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 104 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-71) held on May 7, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 103 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler: On May 7, 2007, the Court convened a hearing on Plaintiff's motions to compel discovery from the Government and from Entergy Corporation and Florida Power & Light Energy LLC [92]. Following the arguments of counsel, and based upon the Court's oral rulings on the record, the parties agreed to submit a proposed Consent Order to the Court within 14 days, on or before May 21, 2007. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (MO)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007
                                                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/14/2007. (vp1, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 102 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007
                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Notice Of An Error In Its Representations In Its April 9, 2007 Reponse To Plaintiff's Motion To Compel, filed by USA.Response due by 5/21/2007.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 101 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007
                                                                                                          **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re [91] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from the Government, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. (Attachments: # (1))(Robertson, Cynthia)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 100 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007
                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [92] MOTION to Compel Documents from Entergy and Florida Power & Light, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit L-M# (2) Exhibit N)(Robertson, Cynthia)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 99 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007
                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [91] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from the Government, filed by USA.Reply due by 4/23/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 98 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [97] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant shall file its Response/Reply on or before April 9, 2007. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler.(MO)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 97 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: 4/6/2007, Terminated: 4/9/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/9/07 to File Response or Reply as to [92] MOTION to Compel Documents from Entergy and Florida Power & Light, [91] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from the Government, filed by USA.Response due by 4/23/2007.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [93] Motion for Extension of Time For good cause shown, Defendant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time is hereby granted. Defendant shall reply to Plaintiff's Motions to Compel on or before April 6, 2007. Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (MO)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 95 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [92] MOTION to Compel Documents from Entergy and Florida Power & Light And Cross-Motion For A Protective Order, filed by FPL Energy, LLC.Reply due by 4/16/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Grand Gulf transcript excerpt)# (2) Exhibit B (ANO transcript excerpt))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 94 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [92] MOTION to Compel Documents from Entergy and Florida Power & Light And Cross-Motion For A Protective Order, filed by Entergy Corporation.Reply due by 4/16/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Grand Gulf transcript excerpt)# (2) Exhibit B (ANO transcript excerpt))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 93 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007, Terminated: 4/3/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until April 6, 2007 to Response To Plaintiff's Motions To Compel, filed by USA.Response due by 4/19/2007.(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 92 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Documents from Entergy and Florida Power & Light, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,.Response due by 4/2/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-C# (2) Exhibit D-G# (3) Exhibit H-K)(Robertson, Cynthia)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 91 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from the Government, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,.Response due by 4/2/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-C# (2) Exhibit D-F# (3) Exhibit G-H)(Robertson, Cynthia)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 90 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER on Motion for Extension of Time [86], [87] and Revised Discovery Schedule. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mpo)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 89 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007
                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [86] MOTION for Extension of Time to Discovery Deadlines, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 and 2# (2) Exhibit 3 and 4)(Robertson, Cynthia)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 88 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER Hearing on February 8, 2007 at 2:00 PM Regarding [86], [87] Motion for Extension of Time Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mpo)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Hearing set for 2/8/2007 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 87 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [86] MOTION for Extension of Time to Discovery Deadlines, filed by USA.Reply due by 2/12/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 86 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to Discovery Deadlines, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,.Response due by 2/5/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - E)(Robertson, Cynthia)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 85 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-39) held on August 28, 2006 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 84 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [83] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement) (rr1, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 83 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006, Terminated: 9/1/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order (Amended and Supplemental), filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Amended Protective Order# (2) Exhibit Proposed Supplemental Agreement and Protective Order)(Robertson, Cynthia)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 82 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER Correct Order for August 31, 2006. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 81 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Counsel for the parties and any interested third-party counsel should appear at the Court for a hearing on Friday, September 1, 2006 at 4:00 PM unless the discovery issue is resolved. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006
                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Hearing set for 9/1/2006 04:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 80 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment)(Churchill, David)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 9/28/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 79 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [77] MOTION for Protective Order (SUPPLEMENTAL) AND ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, filed by USA. Reply due by 9/8/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 78 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER confirming that the Court will hold a discovery conference on Monday, August 28, 2006, at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/28/2006 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 77 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006, Terminated: 1/18/2007 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order (SUPPLEMENTAL) AND ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. Response due by 9/5/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-C# (2) Exhibit D# (3) Exhibit E-F# (4) Exhibit G-H)(Churchill, David)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 76 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 9, 2006 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 4/10/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 75 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      PRETRIAL ORDER: Pretrial Order on Damages. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 74 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [66] MOTION for Reconsideration re [49] Published Opinion Regarding The Denial Of Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Count III Of Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 73 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [66] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 72 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Pretrial Order on Damages, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. (Churchill, David)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 71 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [66] MOTION for Reconsideration re [49] Published Opinion Regarding The Denial Of Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Count III Of Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. Reply due by 3/2/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit A)(Robertson, Cynthia)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 70 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [69] Joint Motion for Extension of Time . Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 69 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006, Terminated: 2/15/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until April 28, 2006 to Joint Proposed Schedule for Pretrial Order on Damages, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. (Robertson, Cynthia)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 68 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 20, 2006 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 67 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: All discovery due by 8/31/2007. Parties shall jointly submit a proposed schedule by 2/28/2006. Plaintiffs expert report due 3/2/2007 and defendants expert report due 6/1/2007. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: All Discovery due by 8/31/2007. Plaintiffs Expert Report due by 3/2/2007 and Defendants Expert Report due by 6/1/2007. Parties Joint Proposed Scedule due by 2/28/2006. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 2/21/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 66 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006, Terminated: 3/2/2006 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration re [49] Published Opinion Regarding The Denial Of Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Count III Of Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Cover page, table of contents, table of authorities)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 65 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler for all further proceedings. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 64 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 63 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER to transfer case to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (rs1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Thomas C. Wheeler added. Judge Charles F. Lettow no longer assigned to case. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 62 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [54] defendant's Renewed Motion to Consolidate this case with Entergy Nuclear Indian Point 2 v. United States, No. 03-2622C, granting in part and denying in part [60] parties' Joint Motion to Stay Filing of Joint Preliminary Status Report. Joint Preliminary Status Report now due by 12/7/2005.Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 61 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [54] Second MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03-2622C with this case, filed by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: JPSR due by 12/7/2005. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 60 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005, Terminated: 11/2/2005 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Stay Filing Of Joint Preliminary Status Report, filed by USA. Response due by 11/18/2005. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 59 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [54] Second MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03-2622C with this case, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. Reply due by 11/4/2005. (Churchill, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 58 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [57] Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response to Defendant's Renewed Motion to Consolidate. Plaintiff's response now due by 10/21/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 57 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005, Terminated: 10/4/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Renewed Motion to Consolidate Or, In The Alternative, For Issuance Of A Summons Pursuant To RCFC 14(a) And Notice Pursuant To RCFC 14(b) filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. Response due by 10/21/2005. (Churchill, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 56 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [55] Motion for Leave to File a corrected copy of defendant's Renewed Motion to Consolidate. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 55 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005, Terminated: 9/28/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Copy of Defendant's Renewed Motion To Consolidate Or, In The Alternative, For Issuance Of A Summons Pursuant To RCFC 14(a) And Notice Pursuant To RCFC 14(b) filed by USA. Response due by 10/13/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Motion# (2) Exhibit 1)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 54 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005, Terminated: 11/2/2005 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03-2622C with this case filed by USA. Response due by 10/11/2005. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 53 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to [1] Complaint filed by USA. JPSR due by 11/10/2005.(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 52 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005, Terminated: 1/18/2007 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney David A. Churchill in place of Richard J. Conway filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. (Churchill, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***Attorney David Churchill for CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC., added. Attorney Richard J. Conway terminated. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 51 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 9/19/2005.Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 50 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005, Terminated: 9/6/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 9/19/2005 filed by USA. Response due by 9/19/2005. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 49 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PUBLISHED OPINION denying government's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 48 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/5/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Additional Authority by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC., (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Delmarva decision regarding Government's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 47 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: 6/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Additional Authority by USA (Attachments: # (1) Opinion & Certificate of Service)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 46 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: 6/9/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-65) of Proceedings held on 5/26/05 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/10/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 45 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Additional Authority by USA (Attachments: # (1))(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 44 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Hearing on [29] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6): Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2005, 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 43 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [42] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 42 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005, Terminated: 4/1/2005 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply To Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Dismiss by 16 pages filed by USA. Response due by 3/24/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cover Page, Table of Contents & Table of Authorities# (2) Exhibit Reply Brief# (3) Exhibit Appendix to Reply Brief)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 41 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [39] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Reply due on or before 3/7/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 40 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC., re [38] Notice (Other) Corrected Index to Exhibits (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: . Reply due by 3/7/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 39 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005, Terminated: 2/15/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until March 7, 2005 to File Reply To Plaintiff's Opposition To The Government's Motion To Dismiss by USA. Response due by 2/28/2005 (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 38 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC., re Set/Reset Deadlines Index to Exhibits (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part [30] Motion to Stay, and granting [32] Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 36 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [35] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Index to the Appendix (Opposition to Motion to Dismiss) is due by 2/11/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 35 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005, Terminated: 1/31/2005 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by 24 pages by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. Response due by 2/14/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Opposition to Motion to Dismiss# (2) Exhibit 1 to Opposition# (3) Exhibit 2 to Opposition# (4) Exhibit 3 to Opposition# (5) Exhibit 4 to Opposition# (6) Exhibit 5 to Opposition# (7) Exhibit 6 to Opposition# (8) Exhibit 7 to Opposition# (9) Exhibit 8 to Opposition)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 34 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [32] MOTION for Leave to File A Copy of Plaintiff's Freedom Of Information Act Request Directed To The Nuclear Regulatory Commission filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. Reply due by 2/7/2005. (Attachments: # (1))(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [30] MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.. Reply due by 1/31/2005. (Conway, Richard) Modified on 1/28/2005 to correct reply due date. (dls ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005, Terminated: 1/31/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File A Copy of Plaintiff's Freedom Of Information Act Request Directed To The Nuclear Regulatory Commission by USA. Response due by 1/24/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Attachment)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 20, 2004 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/3/2005, Terminated: 1/31/2005 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Stay Discovery by USA. Response due by 1/20/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Attachments 1 & 2# (2) Attachments 3 & 4)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 1/21/2005 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004, Terminated: 1/18/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by USA. Response due by 1/27/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Cover Page, Table of Contents & Table of Authorities)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 1/4/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [14] Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bjw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/20/2004 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: 11/5/2004 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: 11/4/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part [19] Motion to Reassign Case and to Consolidate. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: 11/5/2004 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case reassigned to Judge Charles F. Lettow. Judge Eric G. Bruggink no longer assigned to the case. (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [19] MOTION to Reassign Case To A Single Judge, And Motion To Consolidate filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [23] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [23] Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [22] Response to Motion,,until 9/8/04, and Defendant's Reply to Consolidated Edison's and Entergy Nuclear Indian Point 2's Responses to Defendant's Motion to Reassign. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004, Terminated: 9/10/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [22] Response to Motion, (until 9/8/04) and Defendant's Reply to Consolidated Edison's and Entergy Nuclear Indian Point 2's Responses to Defendant's Motion to Reassign and Consolidate by USA. Response due by 9/27/2004 (Attachments: # (1))(Lester, Harold) Modified on 9/9/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [19] MOTION to Reassign Case To A Single Judge, And Motion To Consolidate filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC. Reply due by 9/7/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Excerpt from Mar. 18, 2004 Status Conference Transcript in Entergy Nuclear Generation Co. v. United States)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Defendant's Motion to Consolidate filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on August 6, 2004 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004, Terminated: 11/4/2004 Motion to Reassign CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of directly related cases, MOTION to Reassign Case To A Single Judge, And Motion To Consolidate by USA. Response due by 8/23/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Cover Page, Table Of Contents, And Table Of Authorities# (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Exhibit 1 (continued)# (4) Exhibit 2# (5) Exhibit 3)(Gardner, Joshua) Docket text Modified on 8/6/2004 to add Notice of directly related cases. (dls).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 9/7/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [14] MOTION to Stay ALL PROCEEDINGS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR COORDINATED DISCOVERY REGARDING RATE AND SCHEDULE ISSUES: Oral Argument set for 8/6/2004 10:00 AM in Courtroom before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [14] MOTION to Stay ALL PROCEEDINGS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR COORDINATED DISCOVERY REGARDING RATE AND SCHEDULE ISSUES filed by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [14] Motion to Stay All Proceedings or, in the Alternative, for Coordinated Discovery Regarding Rate and Schedule Issues filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. (Attachments: # (1))(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *** Attorney Harold Dewitt Lester terminated. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004, Terminated: 12/20/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay ALL PROCEEDINGS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR COORDINATED DISCOVERY REGARDING RATE AND SCHEDULE ISSUES by USA. Response due by 6/1/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua E. Gardner for USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [12] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 5/12/2004. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, ) Modified on 5/7/2004 for punctuation (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004, Terminated: 5/6/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 5/12/2004 by USA. Response due by 5/24/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt : Pre-Discovery Status Conference held on 4/30/04. (lag, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [9] Status Conference Order regarding conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. (Wine, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in Courtroom before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer Due by 5/5/2004. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004, Terminated: 4/6/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 5/5/2004 by USA. Response due by 4/22/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 4/5/2004. (signed by the Clerk) (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004, Terminated: 3/16/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 4/5/2004 filed by USA.Service: 3/15/04. (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance filed by Harold Dewitt Lester for USA. Service: 3/15/04.(dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059496), filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,.Answer Due by 3/15/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 159 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?