ATLANTIC CITY ELECTRIC COMPANY, v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00036-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Atlantic City Electric Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Conway +1 202 420 2235 conwayr@dicksteinshapiro.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Edward Gardner +1 202 305 7583 +1 202 307 0972 joshua.e.gardner@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/13/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 11/16/2007
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
104-cv-00034-CCM None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADR, AUTO, CLOSED, ECF, MEMBER, PROTO, SNF
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 46 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
JUDGMENT entered [See 04-34 C] (lld)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Remark
    Remark: See lead case for notice of appeal. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 45 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006
      NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard J. Conway (Conway, Richard)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Set Member Flag
        This case has been consolidated under case number 04-34C pursuant to the order of January 21, 2005. (dls )
          LREF
          Legal Document 44 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
          NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Christine Odell Cook Miller. (dls)
            LREF
            Legal Document 43 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Court Filing
            Transfer ORDER. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (kxb, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 42 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Court Filing
              ORDER denying [17] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6) Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (kxb, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                Case reassigned to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. Judge George W. Miller no longer assigned to the case. (dls )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005
                  NOTICE by USA re [40] Order on Motion for Leave to File In Accordance With The Court's January 5, 2005 Order (Attachments: # (1) Hope Creek 1# (2) Hope Creek 2# (3) PECO 1# (4) PECO 2# (5) PSEG 1# (6) PSEG 2)(Gardner, Joshua)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 40 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Court Filing
                    ORDER granting [36] Motion for Leave to File Copies of Standard Contracts. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (kxb, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 39 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/3/2005
                      RESPONSE to [36] MOTION for Leave to File Standard Contracts filed by ATLANTIC CITY ELECTRIC COMPANY,. Reply due by 1/18/2005. (Conway, Richard)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/3/2005
                        RESPONSE to [37] MOTION to Stay Obligation To Respond To Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by ATLANTIC CITY ELECTRIC COMPANY,. Reply due by 1/18/2005. (Conway, Richard)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004, Terminated: 11/16/2007 Motion to Stay
                          MOTION to Stay Obligation To Respond To Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by USA. Response due by 1/3/2005 (Gardner, Joshua)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 36 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004, Terminated: 1/5/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                            MOTION for Leave to File Standard Contracts by USA. Response due by 1/3/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1 (part 1)# (2) Exhibit Exhibit 1 (part 2)# (3) Exhibit Exhibit 2 (part 1)# (4) Exhibit Exhibit 2 (part 2)# (5) Exhibit Exhibit 3 (part 1)# (6) Exhibit Exhibit 3 (part 2))(Gardner, Joshua)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 35 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004
                            NOTICE of Additional Authority by ATLANTIC CITY ELECTRIC COMPANY, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit One# (2) Exhibit two# (3) Exhibit three)(Conway, Richard)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: 12/13/2004
                              NOTICE of Additional Authority by ATLANTIC CITY ELECTRIC COMPANY, (Attachments: # (1) Original draft of Standard Contract# (2) Final version of Standard Contract# (3) Atlantic 12/3/04 Hearing Transcript Excerpts)(Conway, Richard)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004
                                AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Conway, Richard) Modified on 12/3/2004 [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (jcp, ).
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004
                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 1/3/2005. (vp1, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: 11/10/2004
                                    NOTICE by ATLANTIC CITY ELECTRIC COMPANY, of Related Case(s) (Conway, Richard)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/15/2004 Court Filing
                                      ORDER setting oral argument on defendant's Motion to Dismiss for 1 p.m. on Friday, December 3, 2004. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (kxb, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Oral Argument set for 12/3/2004 01:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge George W. Miller. (dw1)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004
                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [17] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Cover page, table of contents & table of authorities)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004, Terminated: 11/16/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                            Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [23] Response to Motion to Dismiss by USA. Response due by 10/12/2004. (Gardner, Joshua) Modified on 9/24/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 28 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the RCFC, and for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to reassign this case to the docket of Judge George W. Miller for all further proceedings. Judge Bohdan A. Futey no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004
                                                  NOTICE of Additional Authority by ATLANTIC CITY ELECTRIC COMPANY, (Attachments: # (1) SMUD Decision)(Conway, Richard)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [24] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [23] Response to Motion To Dismiss. Reply due by 9/23/2004. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mk1,)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004
                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 9/23/2004. (jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004, Terminated: 8/18/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [23] Response to Motion To Dismiss by USA. Response due by 8/30/2004. (Gardner, Joshua) Modified on 8/12/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004
                                                          RESPONSE to [17] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by ATLANTIC CITY ELECTRIC COMPANY,. Reply due by 8/23/2004. (Conway, Richard) Modified on 8/9/2004 to correct reply due date (dw1).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 8/23/2004. (dw1)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Court Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [21] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [17] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), until August 6, 2004. Response due by 8/6/2004. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dlk,)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004, Terminated: 6/1/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [17] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6),until August 6, 2004, by ATLANTIC CITY ELECTRIC COMPANY,. Response due by 6/14/2004 (Conway, Richard)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER: On April 16, 2004, this case was designated as an electronic case in the court's case management/electronic case filing (CM/ECF) system. Plaintiff has not complied with General Order No. 42. Plaintiff shall comply by Monday, June 7, 2004, or the court will issue a show cause order why the case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey (dlk, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Court Filing
                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dlk, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER: Discovery in this case on the rate of acceptance or damages issues, and/or any discovery duplicative of information from previous coordinated discovery in SNF cases is hereby STAYED until Friday, December 31, 2004. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dlk, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004
                                                                        *** Attorney Harold Dewitt Lester terminated. (dw1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004, Terminated: 1/11/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by USA. Response due by 6/14/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua E. Gardner for USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [14] defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file its response to plaintiff's complaint. Response due by 5/12/2004. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dlk,)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004, Terminated: 5/10/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 5/12/2004 by USA. Response due by 5/24/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt : Pre-Discovery Hearing held on 4/30/04. (lag, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                    RESPONSE to [11] Scheduling Order, regarding pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by ATLANTIC CITY ELECTRIC COMPANY,. (Wine, Bradley)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: The new SNF pltfs are directed to submit, on or before 4/23/2004, jointly or singly, a report or reports specifying their discovery plans and objectives. Also on or before 4/23/2004, dft shall submit a report presenting its views on the same matters. The Pre-Discovery Conference will be held on Friday, 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 of the National Courts Building before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                                                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jat, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER re: ADR process. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jat, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                            ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 5/5/2004. (signed by the Clerk) (dls)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004, Terminated: 4/6/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 5/5/2004 filed by USA.Service: 4/5/04. (dls)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 4/5/2004. (signed by the Clerk) (dls)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004, Terminated: 3/16/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 4/5/2004 filed by USA.Service: 3/15/04. (dls)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance filed by Harold Dewitt Lester for USA. Service: 3/15/04.(dls)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Notice of Assignment - Auto ADRCourt Filing
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. for ADR Pilot proceedings. (lg1, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (lg1, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059493), filed by ATLANTIC CITY ELECTRIC COMPANY,.Answer Due by 3/15/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 201 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?