DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00034-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Delmarva Power And Light Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Conway +1 202 420 2235 conwayr@dicksteinshapiro.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/13/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 11/16/2007
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
104-cv-00034-CCM None
Related Case
Other Court Case '2008-5010'['CAFC']
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, ECF, LEAD, SNF
  Entries (193) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 145 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 CAFC Case Number
CAFC Case Number 2008-5010 for [144] Notice of Appeal filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. (mb2)
    LREF
    Legal Document 144 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Notice of Appeal
    NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 067371. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 143 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, in favor of defendant. No costs. (lld)
        LREF
        Legal Document 142 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Court Filing
        ORDER - granting defendant's renewed [53] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying plaintiffs' [121] Motion to Vacate Arbitration Ruling. This Opinion is PUBLISHED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for defendant. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (tk) Modified on 11/13/2007 (Reyes, Lisa).
          LREF
          Legal Document 141 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007
          RESPONSE to [138] Order,, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Conway, Richard)
            LREF
            Legal Document 140 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007
            RESPONSE to [138] Order, dated August 30, 2007, filed by PSEG NUCLEAR LLC, PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (NJBPU decision))(Chu, Jack)
              LREF
              Legal Document 139 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007
              RESPONSE to [138] Order,, filed by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                LREF
                Legal Document 138 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Court Filing
                ORDER - Supplemental Briefs by all parties to be filed by Sept. 12, 2007, addressing multiple listed issues. The Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this order on counsel for PSEG Nuclear, No. 01-551C. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 137 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-102) held on August 22, 2007 before Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (dw1)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007
                    ORDER - Filing plaintiffs' letter by Leave of Court -- See Deficiency Memorandum -- the caption is incorrect (missing) and it is filed incorrectly (a letter). However, the court will issue an order by September 7, 2007. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 136 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007
                      RESPONSE to [133] Notice (Other) Requesting Guidance from the Court Regarding Further Proceedings, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. (Conway, Richard)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 135 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007
                        NOTICE, filed by PSEG NUCLEAR LLC, PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY of Purchase Agreements (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1 - part 1 - Hope Creek Purchase Agreement pages 1-30# (2) Attachment 1 - part 2 - Hope Creek Purchase Agreement pages 31-60# (3) Attachment 1 - part 3 - Hope Creek Purchase Agremeement pages 61-88# (4) Attachment 2 - part 1 - DP&L-Salem PA pages 1-30# (5) Attachment 2 - part 2 - DP&L-Salem PA pages 31-60# (6) Attachment 2 - part 3 - DP&L-Salem PA pages 61-90# (7) Attachment 3 - Part 1 - ACE-Salem PA pages 1-30# (8) Attachment 3 - Part 2 - ACE-Salem PA pages 31-60# (9) Attachment 3 - part 3 - ACE-Salem PA pages 61-90)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 134 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 Court Filing
                          ORDER - The court has determined to defer the entry of an order calling for a Joint Status Report proposing a course for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 133 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007
                            NOTICE, filed by USA Regarding The Plaintiffs' Assignments Of Rights, Pursuant To The Parties' Discussion At The Hearing On August 22, 2007 (Lester, Harold)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 132 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007
                              NOTICE of Additional Authority submitted by PSEG Nuclear,LLC and Public Service Electric and Gas Company (Attachments: # (1) August 20 Order & Memo Decision from Superior Court of New Jersey)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 131 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007, Terminated: 8/20/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Arbitration Ruling, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY.Response due by 9/7/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Corrected Reply)(Conway, Richard)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007
                                  ORDER granting, pursuant to RCFC 7.2(a), plaintiffs' [129] Motion for Leave to have Frederick M. Lowther Appear pro hac vice for plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller.(smg)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007
                                    ORDER granting and filing this date Plaintiffs' [131] Motion for Leave to File Corrected Copy of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion To Vacate Arbitration Ruling. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 130 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007
                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [121] MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Ruling Motion to Vacate, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. (Conway, Richard)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 129 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: 8/13/2007, Terminated: 8/20/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Frederick M. Lowther, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY.Response due by 8/30/2007.(Conway, Richard)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 128 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007
                                          RESPONSE to [121] MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Ruling, filed by PSEG NUCLEAR LLC, PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY.Reply due by 8/20/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Purchase Agreement excerpt)# (2) Exhibit B (1/31/07 Cassidy letter)# (3) Exhibit C (2/22/07 Shaw letter)# (4) Exhibit D (3/15/07 Shaw letter)# (5) Exhibit E (4/16/07 arbitration demand)# (6) Exhibit F (4/23/07 amended arbitration demand)# (7) Exhibit G (Purchase Agreement excerpt)# (8) Exhibit H (7/2/07 show cause order)# (9) Exhibit I (5/3/07 supplemental arbitration agreement)# (10) Appendix J (4/23/07 interrogatories))(Chu, Jack)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 127 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting PSEG's [123] Motion to Intervene for the limited purpose of resolving the arbitrability of the transfer of claim and the effect of an arbitration award and for no other purpose. PSEG may file its brief by August 8, 2007; plaintiffs may reply by August 17, 2007; argument will be held at 3:00 p.m. on Wednesday, August 22, 2007, in the Nationals Courts Building. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller.(smg)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 126 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007
                                            RESPONSE to [123] MOTION to Intervene For The Limited Purpose Of Opposing Plaintiffs' Motion To Vacate Arbitration Award, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY.Reply due by 8/6/2007. (Conway, Richard)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 125 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007
                                              RESPONSE to [123] MOTION to Intervene For The Limited Purpose Of Opposing Plaintiffs' Motion To Vacate Arbitration Award, filed by USA.Reply due by 8/6/2007. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 124 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Court Filing
                                                ORDER re [123] MOTION to Intervene For The Limited Purpose Of Opposing Plaintiffs' Motion To Vacate Arbitration Award filed by PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY and PSEG NUCLEAR, LLC. Plaintiffs and defendant shall respond by 7/25/2007. The court will rule without a reply. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 123 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007, Terminated: 7/30/2007 Motion to Intervene
                                                  MOTION to Intervene For The Limited Purpose Of Opposing Plaintiffs' Motion To Vacate Arbitration Award, filed by PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PSEG NUCLEAR LLC.Response due by 8/6/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 (Opposition To Motion To Vacate Arbitration Ruling)# (2) Exhibit 2 (Exhibits For Opposition To Motion To Vacate))(Chu, Jack)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 122 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007
                                                    RESPONSE to [121] MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Ruling, filed by USA.Reply due by 8/2/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 121 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007, Terminated: 11/13/2007 Motion to Vacate
                                                      MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Ruling, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY.Response due by 7/19/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7)(Conway, Richard)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 120 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007
                                                      STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Opinion of Arbitrators)(Conway, Richard)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007
                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/29/2007 (lg1, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 119 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Court Filing
                                                          ORDER Plaintiff shall file a Status Report by June 29, 2007, reporting on the status of the arbitration panel's decision. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 118 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007
                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. (Conway, Richard)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 117 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                              ORDER STAYING CASE Status Report due by 5/30/2007 Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (Attachments: # (1) Corrected Order to Show Cause) (jwk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 116 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: 4/6/2007
                                                                **SEALED**SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: [112] Order to Show Cause, filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 115 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: 4/6/2007
                                                                  RESPONSE TO [112] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, filed by USA. (Finn, Stephen)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 114 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: 4/6/2007, Terminated: 11/16/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Response To Show Cause Order, filed by PSEG NUCLEAR LLC.Response due by 4/23/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 (PSEG's response to the Court's Show Cause Order))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 113 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: 4/6/2007, Terminated: 4/6/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief Requested By the Court's March 27, 2007 Order to Show Cause Under Seal, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY.Response due by 4/23/2007.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: 4/6/2007
                                                                        ORDER granting [113] Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief Requested By the Court's March 27, 2007 Order To Show Cause Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 112 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 4/6/2007. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jwk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 111 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007
                                                                            **SEALED**SUR-REPLY re [97] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1 with this case, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 110 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007, Terminated: 3/12/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Surreply in Response to the United States' February 28, 2007 Reply to Delmarva Power and Light Company's Response to Defendant's Motion to Consolidate or, in the Alternative, for Issuance of a Summons Pursuant to RCFC 14(a) and Notice Pursuant to RCFC 14(b) Under Seal, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY.Response due by 3/29/2007.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 109 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007, Terminated: 3/12/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File A Copy Of The Court's Order In PSEG Nuclear L.L.C. v. United States, filed by USA.Response due by 3/29/2007. (Attachments: # (1))(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007
                                                                                  ORDER granting [109] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Copy of the Court's Order in PSEG Nuclear L.L.C. v. United States. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007
                                                                                    ORDER granting Plaintiffs' [110] Motion To File, Under Seal, Electronically a Copy of Plaintiffs' Surreply in Response to the United States' February 28, 2007 Reply to Delmarva Power and Light Company's Response to Defendant's Motion To Consolidate or, in the Alternative, for Issuance of a Summons Pursuant to RCFC 14(A) and Notice Pursuant to RCFC 14(B) Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller.(smg)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 108 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007, Terminated: 3/2/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to the United States' Reply to Delmarva Power and Light Company's Response to Defendant's Motion to Consolidate or, in the Alternative, for Issuance of a Summons Pursuant to RCFC 14(a) and Notice Pursuant to RCFC 14(b), filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY.Response due by 3/19/2007.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007
                                                                                        ORDER granting [108] Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Leave to File Surreply this date. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 107 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007
                                                                                          **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re [97] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1 with this case, filed by USA.(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007
                                                                                            ORDER granting [106] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File, Under Seal, Electronically a Copy of Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response, etc., filed on Feb. 27, 2007. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 106 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 2/27/2007, Terminated: 2/28/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File "Defendant's Reply To Delmarva Power And Light Company's Response To Defendant's Motion To Consolidate Or, In The Alternative, For Issuance Of A Summons Pursuant To RCFC 14(a) And Notice Pursuant To RCFC 14(b)" Under Seal, filed by USA.Response due by 3/16/2007.(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007
                                                                                                ORDER granting [105] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to February 27, 2007, within which to file its reply re defendant's motion to consolidate or for issuance of a summons.Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 105 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007, Terminated: 2/14/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until February 27, 2007 to To Reply To "Plaintiffs' Response To Defendant's Motion To Consolidate Or, In The Alternative, For Issuance Of A Summons Pursuant to RCFC 14(a) And Notice Pursuant to RCFC 14(b)", filed by USA.Response due by 3/2/2007.(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 104 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007
                                                                                                    **SEALED**NOTICE, filed by USA (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4))(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [103] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion To Stay Further Proceedings Pending Completion of Binding Arbitration filed in PSEG Nuclear L.L.C. and Public Service Electric and Gas Co. v. United States, No. 01-551C (Fed. Cl.). Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller.(smg)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 103 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007, Terminated: 2/12/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal, Electronically, a Copy of "Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Further Proceedings Pending Completion of Binding Arbitration Filed in PSEG Nuclear L.L.C. and Public Service Electric and Gas Company v. United States, No. 01-551C (Fed. Cl.), filed by USA.Response due by 2/26/2007.(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [102] Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Copy of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion To Consolidate Or, in the Alternative, for Issuance of a Summons Pursuant to RCFC 14(a) and Notice Pursuant to RCFC 14(b). Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 102 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007, Terminated: 2/2/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Copy of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Consolidate or, in the Alternative, for Issuance of a Summons Pursuant to RCFC 14(a) and Notice Pursuant to RCFC 14(b), filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY.Response due by 2/20/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Corrected Copy of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Consolidate or, in the Alternative, for Issuance of a Summons Pursuant to RCFC 14(a) and Notice Pursuant to RCFC 14(b))(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 101 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007
                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [97] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1 with this case, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY.Reply due by 2/14/2007. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [100] Motion for Extension of Time until 1/31/2007 to File Response to [97] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1 with this case. Plaintiffs' Response due by 1/31/2007. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller.(jpk)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 100 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007, Terminated: 1/22/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/31/2007 to File Response or Reply as to [97] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1 with this case, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY.Response due by 2/5/2007.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 99 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [98] Motion To Stay Discovery Schedule. Discovery deadlines suspended pending resolution of the Motion To Consolidate filed Jan. 5, 2007. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jwk)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 98 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007, Terminated: 1/18/2007 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery Schedule, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY.Response due by 2/2/2007.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 97 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007, Terminated: 11/16/2007 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1 with this case, filed by USA.Response due by 1/22/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1# (2) Appendix Part 2)(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 96 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006
                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 95 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [94] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to November 12, 2007. Joint Status Report by April 30, 2007. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 94 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006, Terminated: 11/17/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Exchange Expert Reports, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY.Response due by 12/4/2006.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 93 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER - granting [92]unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to meet discovery deadlines. Plaintiffs' Status Report due 11/30/2006; defendant's Status Report due 4/30/2007. Discovery to be completed by 9/28/2007. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 92 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006, Terminated: 7/6/2006 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [87] Order, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY.Response due by 7/24/2006.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 91 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard J. Conway (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006
                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact and expert discovery, including discovery in connection with any rebuttal reports due by 6/29/2007, Defendant, on behalf of the parties, shall file a Status Report on the progress of all discovery due by 2/28/2007. Plaintiffs, on behalf of the parties, shall file Status Report on behalf of the parties by 8/30/2006. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 90 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [89] Defendant's motion for leave to file response to plaintiffs' proposed schedule, and setting new discovery schedule. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 89 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006, Terminated: 2/27/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Response To Plaintiffs' Proposed Pre-Trial Schedule, filed by USA. Response due by 3/10/2006. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 88 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006
                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Regarding Plaintiffs' Proposed Revised Schedule, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 87 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER -- Plaintiffs' proposed revised schedule due by 2/21/2006. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 86 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part [82] Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel -- further production by February 6, 2006. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 85 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [82] MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents from Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc., Public Service Electric and Gas Company, and PSEG Power, LLC and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 84 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [82] MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents from Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc., Public Service Electric and Gas Company, and PSEG Power, LLC and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, filed by PSEG NUCLEAR LLC. Reply due by 2/1/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (PSEG letter to DOJ)# (2) Exhibit B (PSEG letter to DOJ and Delmarva))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: . Reply due by 1/23/2006. Response due by 1/18/2006. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 83 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [81] Motion to Expedite briefing on plaintiffs' motion to compel. Response due by 1/18/2006; reply due 1/23/06. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 82 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006, Terminated: 1/27/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents from Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc., Public Service Electric and Gas Company, and PSEG Power, LLC and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. Response due by 1/30/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 81 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006, Terminated: 1/13/2006 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Production of Documents from the Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc., Public Service Electric and Gas Company, and PSEG Power, LLC, and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. Response due by 1/30/2006. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 80 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT, filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/6/2006. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting defendant's unopposed motion filed on December 21, 2005, for an enlargement of time. The parties shall file their Joint Status Report by January 6, 2006. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 79 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005, Terminated: 12/22/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/6/05 to File The Parties' Joint Status Report, As Required By The Court's September 30, 2005 Order, filed by USA. Response due by 1/9/2006. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 78 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - vacating discovery, pretrial, and trial schedule; revised proposed schedule by December 28, 2005 or Joint Status Report. Pretrial proceedings and trial will be rescheduled after a final decision in PSEG Nuclear v. United States, No. 01-551C (Fed. Cl.), appeal docketed, No. 05-5162 (Fed. Cir. Aug. 15, 2005). Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005
                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Revised Proposed Schedule or Joint Status Report due by 12/28/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 77 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [76] Joint Motion for an Order Regarding Discovery of Draft Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 76 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005, Terminated: 9/1/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Leave to File Motion For An Order Regarding Discovery Of Draft Expert Reports filed by USA. Response due by 9/19/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 75 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - granting [74] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 74 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005, Terminated: 8/30/2005 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. Response due by 9/15/2005. (Attachments: # (1))(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 73 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                PRETRIAL ORDERFact and expert discovery to close 4/7/06; meeting of counsel by 4/12/06; plf's exhibit and witness lists and pretrial memo due by 4/18/2006. Def's exhibit and witness lists and pretrial memo due by 4/28/2006. Pretrial conference set for Wednesday, 5/3/06 02:00 PM in National Courts Building; trial set for Monday, 5/8/06 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 4/7/2006. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 72 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT In Response To The Court's July 1, 2005 Order by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 71 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT Regarding Plaintiffs' Proposed Schedule by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 70 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT(pg 1-73) of Proceedings held on 6/28/05 before Judge Christine Odell Cook Miller. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 69 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Unpublished Memorandum Opinion and Order denying [53] Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice; denying [65] Motion to Strike; and parties to file Joint Schedule by July 15, 2005, proposing dates for discovery, pretrial proceedings, and trial. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Compliance due by 7/15/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/28/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 68 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [65] MOTION to Strike Material Submitted In Support Of Plaintiffs' Response To Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. Reply due by 7/11/2005. (Conway, Richard) Modified on 6/27/2005 to correct reply deadline (jat, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 7/11/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 67 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: 6/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Additional Authority by USA (Attachments: # (1) Opinion & Certificate of Service)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 66 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [53] MOTION for Summary Judgment In Accordance With The Court's June 8, 2005 Order filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) Appendix)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER - allowing defendant's motion filed on June 7, 2005, to exceed the page limit in its reply brief. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 65 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005, Terminated: 7/1/2005 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike Material Submitted In Support Of Plaintiffs' Response To Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment filed by USA. Response due by 6/24/2005. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 64 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005, Terminated: 6/8/2005 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply To Plaintiffs' Response To Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment by 20 pages filed by USA. Response due by 6/24/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Cover page, table of contents & table of authorities# (2) Reply brief# (3) Appendix)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 63 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER - rescheduling oral argument to 2:00 pm on Tuesday, June 28, 2005. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument reset for 6/28/2005 02:00 PM before Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 62 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [61] Defendant's unopposed motion filed on 6/3/05 for an extension of time to file its reply brief to 6/7/2005. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 61 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005, Terminated: 6/6/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until June 7, 2005 to file reply brief filed by USA. Response due by 6/20/2005. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 60 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT Pursuant To The Court's May 12, 2005 Order by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER - Plaintiff's telephonic request this date requesting removal of a page inadvertently attached to its appendix is granted, and page 49 (the first page of a letter from Yankee Atomic Electric Co.) is hereby removed from Plaintiff Delmarva Electric Company's Appendix to Brief in Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed on May 25, 2005. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER - granting plaintiff's motion filed on 5/25/05 to exceed the page limit as unopposed, defendant having telephonically this date agreed thereto. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 59 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [54] Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 58 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [53] MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limit filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. Reply due by 6/8/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment# (2) Index to Appendix# (3) Appendix)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 57 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER - Requiring a subsequent Joint Status Report by July 12, 2005, regarding action by the Federal Circuit on PSEG Nuclear, No. 01-551C.Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 7/12/2005. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 56 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [55] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Summary Judgment to 5/25/2005. Reply due by 6/3/2005. Argument rescheduled to 6/20/05. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Oral Argument set for 6/20/2005 02:00 PM before Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 55 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005, Terminated: 5/6/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [53] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. Response due by 5/23/2005. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 54 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [53] MOTION for Summary Judgment by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 53 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005, Terminated: 7/1/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by USA. Dispositive Motion Response due by 5/17/2005, (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix # (5) Appendix # (6) Appendix # (7) Appendix)(Lester, Harold) Modified on 5/2/2005 to correct response deadline (jat, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 52 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motion Response due by 5/17/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 50 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting defendant's unopposed motion filed on April 21, 2005, for an enlargement of time. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller.(smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Oral Argument set for 6/8/2005 02:00 PM before Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motion(s) due by 4/28/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 5/17/2005,. Reply due by 5/24/2005. Status Report due by 4/28/2005 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 51 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-39) of Proceedings held on 4/7/05 before Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 49 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005, Terminated: 11/16/2007 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [48] Scheduling Order filed by USA. Response due by 5/9/2005. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 48 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Jt. Status Report due 04/21/05; Def's renewed motion for summary judgment by 4/21/05; plf's response 05/10/05; def's reply 05/18/05; argument 05/24/05 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 47 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER - filing answer in No. 04-36C as unopposed, and granting defendant's motion to defer seeking joinder of third parties, as unopposed. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Oral Argument set for 5/24/2005 11:00 AM before Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 5/10/2005. Reply due by 5/18/2005. Joint Status Report due by 4/21/2005 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 46 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005, Terminated: 4/7/2005 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Stay Obligation To Seek Joinder Of Third Parties In Atlantic City Electric Company v. United States, No. 04-0036C filed by USA. Response due by 4/25/2005 (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 45 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005, Terminated: 4/7/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [30] Amended Complaint until 4/6/2005 filed by USA. Response due by 4/25/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Answer)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 44 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER - setting status conference for April 7, 2005. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/7/2005 03:00 PM before Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 43 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT In Response To The Court's March 7, 2005 Order by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 42 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [41] Motion for Extension of Time: Date for filing JPSR will be set by further order. Joint Status Report due by 3/11/2005. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: . Joint Status Report due by 3/11/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005, Terminated: 3/8/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/11/2005 to File The Joint Status Report Required By The Court's February 15, 2005 Order, And An Additional Extension Of Time For Filing The Parties' Joint Preliminary Status Report filed by USA. Response due by 3/24/2005 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 40 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - Joint Status Report by March 8, 2005, re settlement. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/8/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT Pursuant To The Court's Order Dated January 21, 2005 by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Consolidating with No. 04-36C (Atlantic City Elec.); settlement discussions by 1/25/05; Jt. S.R. 2/15/05 re settlement; granting defendant's 1/14/05 motion to defer seeking 3d party joinder. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to [30] Amended Complaint by USA. JPSR due by 3/7/2005.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005, Terminated: 1/21/2005 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Stay Or Defer Obligation To Seek Joinder Of Third Parties by USA. Response due by 1/31/2005 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT Pursuant To This Court's Order Dated December 3, 2004 by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Defendant's motion filed on December 29, 2004, for an enlargement of time to respond to the amended complaint and file their Joint Status Report to January 14, 2005, as unopposed. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response to Amended Complaint due by 1/14/2005. Joint Status Report due by 1/14/2005. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 146 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 12/7/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-43) held on December 3, 2004 before Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/3/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [32] MOTION for Extension of Time until January 14, 2005 to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint And File Joint Status Report filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. Reply due by 1/18/2005. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004, Terminated: 1/4/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until January 14, 2005 to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint And File Joint Status Report by USA. Response due by 1/18/2005 (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER deferring ruling on [15] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6) Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer Due by 1/3/2005. Status Report due by 1/3/2005. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 1/3/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Conway, Richard) Modified on 12/6/2004 [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - plaintiff's unopposed telephonic request to reschedule oral argument is granted and the order entered on November 5, 2004, is modified insofar as argument is reset to 3:00 p.m. on Friday, December 3, 2004. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/15/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Oral Argument set for 12/3/2004 03:00 PM before Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: 11/10/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY of Related Case(s) (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/5/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER scheduling oral argument -- 2:30 p.m. on Tues. Nov. 30, 2004. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Oral Argument set for 11/30/2004 02:30 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [15] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [25] Defendant's unopposed motion filed on September 23, 2004, for an enlargement of time. Defendant shall file its reply brief by September 24, 2004. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004, Terminated: 9/24/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [22] Response to Motion (until 9/24/2004) by USA. Response due by 10/12/2004. (Lester, Harold) Modified on 9/24/2004 for clarity (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Additional Authority by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit SMUD Decision)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/13/2004, Terminated: 11/16/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [22] Response to Motion To Dismiss by USA. Response due by 8/30/2004 (Gardner, Joshua) Modified on 8/13/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 9/23/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/13/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER - granting [23] defendant's unopposed motion filed on August 13, 2004, for an enlargement of time. Defendant shall file its reply brief to its motion to dismiss by September 23, 2004. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg, ) Modified on 8/16/2004 to add docket relationship to dft's motion (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [15] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. Reply due by 8/23/2004. (Conway, Richard) Modified on 8/9/2004 to correct reply due date (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 8/23/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response due by 8/6/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER - granting plaintiff's motion filed on May 27, 2004, for an enlargement of time. Plaintiff shall respond to defendant's motion to dismiss (docket entry #15) filed on May 12, 2004, by August 6, 2004. Paragraph 2 of the order entered on May 20, 2004, is vacated. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004, Terminated: 11/16/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [15] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6),until August 6, 2004, by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. Response due by 6/14/2004 (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [18] Def's Motion to Strike, and vacating paragraph 6 of 5/14/04 order Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004, Terminated: 5/20/2004 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike [16] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by USA. Response due by 6/4/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER - regarding discovery in all new SNF cases Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg, ) Modified on 5/20/2004 (dw1). [Paragraph 6 of this order is vacated pursuant to the order filed on May 20, 2004}.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004, Terminated: 5/20/2004 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by USA. Response due by 6/14/2004 (Gardner, Joshua) Modified on 5/20/2004 (dw1). [Document STRICKEN pursuant to the May 20, 2004 order].
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004, Terminated: 11/16/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by USA. Response due by 6/14/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting enlargement of time to respond to complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich for Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004, Terminated: 11/16/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 5/12/2004 by USA. Response due by 5/24/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt : Pre-Discovery Status Conference held on 4/30/04. (lag, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [9] Scheduling Order regarding conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. (Wine, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER (Pre-Discovery Conference New SNF Cases). Status Report(s) due by 4/23/2004 and pre-discovery conference set for 4/30/2004 02:00 PM before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer Due by 5/5/2004. (signed by the Clerk) (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004, Terminated: 4/6/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 5/5/2004 filed by USA.Service: 4/5/04. (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 4/5/2004. (signed by the Clerk) (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004, Terminated: 3/16/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 4/5/2004 filed by USA.Service: 3/15/04. (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance filed by Harold Dewitt Lester for USA. Service: 3/15/04.(dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Counsel will deliver to the Clerk's Office for delivery to chambers one hard copy of every filing, including any appendix, that exceeds two pages, other than unopposed motions for extension of one date with respect to one filing. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059495), filed by DELMARVA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY.Answer Due by 3/15/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 216 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?