CAROLINA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00037-TCW
District Judge Thomas C. Wheeler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carolina Power And Light Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
No Logo Florida Power Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew P. Averbach +1 202 353 0527 +1 202 305 2118 andrew.averbach@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/14/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County None
Terminated 5/19/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, BOC, CLOSED, ECF, SNF
  Entries (104) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 91 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008
NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 90 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Court Filing
    ORDER directing the Clerk to return Plaintiffs' Bill of Costs as untimely filed. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
      LREF
      Legal Document 89 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008
      CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, forwarded to Arnold Bradley Fagg. See letter in file. (bre, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 88 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008
        Objections to [84] Bill of Costs, And, To The Extent That The Bill Of Costs Is Not Denied Without Prejudice As Premature Or Returned Unfiled, Defendant's Motion To Deem The Bill Of Costs As "Later Filed" Or, In The Alternative, For An Enlargement Of Time, filed by USA.Reply due by 8/4/2008. (Lester, Harold)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008
          Remark Certified Transcript of Judgment dated May 22, 2008 returned and destroyed. (lld)
            LREF
            Legal Document 87 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008
            AMENDED JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiffs recover of and from the United States the sum of $82,789,289.00. Costs are awarded to plaintiffs. (lld)
              LREF
              Legal Document 86 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Court Filing
              Published Order granting in part and denying in part [80] Motion for Reconsideration. The Clerk is directed to amend the Court's May 19, 2008 Opinion and Order and enter judgment in the amount of $82,789,289. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                LREF
                Legal Document 85 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008
                REPLY to Response to Motion re [80] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [79] Judgment, [78] Published Opinion/Order, filed by USA. (Averbach, Andrew)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 84 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008
                  BILL OF COSTS, filed by CAROLINA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, FLORIDA POWER CORPORATION.Objection to Bill of Costs due by 7/21/2008 (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Appendix I, # (3) Appendix II, # (4) Appendix III (part 1 of 2), # (5) Appendix III (part 2 of 2), # (6) Appendix IV, # (7) Appendix V, # (8) Appendix VI)(Fagg, Arnold)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 83 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008
                    RESPONSE to [80] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [79] Judgment, [78] Published Opinion/Order, filed by CAROLINA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, FLORIDA POWER CORPORATION.Reply due by 6/30/2008. (Fagg, Arnold)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 82 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Certified Transcript to Attorney
                      CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT forwarded to Arnold Bradley Fagg. See letter in file. (bre, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 81 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Court Filing
                        ORDER requesting Plaintiffs to file a response to Defendant's June 2, 2008 Motion For Reconsideration on or before June 16, 2008. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 80 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008, Terminated: 6/19/2008 Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a)
                          MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [79] Judgment, [78] Published Opinion/Order, filed by USA.(Averbach, Andrew)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Response due by 6/16/2008. (dw1)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 79 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008
                              JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiffs recover of and from the United States the sum of $82,845,926.00. Costs are awarded to plaintiffs.(dls) AMENDED BY COURT'S ORDER OF JUNE 19, 2008. (lld).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 78 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Court Filing
                                PUBLISHED OPINION awarding damages to plaintiffs in the amount of $82,845,926.00 through December 31, 2005. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Costs to plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008
                                  Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 4/4/2008 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler: Closing Argument. (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(pn)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 77 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 2182-2295) held on April 4, 2008 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 76 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Court Filing
                                      The Court will hear closing arguments on Friday, April 4, 2008 at 10:00 AM at the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Place, N.W., Washington, D.C. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 75 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008
                                        RESPONSE to plaintiffs' proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law, filed by USA. (Averbach, Andrew)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 74 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008
                                          RESPONSE to Defendant's Post-Trial Brief, filed by CAROLINA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, FLORIDA POWER CORPORATION. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 73 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008
                                            Cumulative Index for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-14) held on November 5, 2007 through November 16, 2007. Filed with plaintiff and defendants exhibits. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (dw1)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 72 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008
                                              POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Averbach, Andrew)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 71 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008
                                                POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by CAROLINA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, FLORIDA POWER CORPORATION. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 70 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008, Terminated: 1/9/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/22/08 to file post-trial briefs, filed by USA.(Averbach, Andrew)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Opening Brief(s) due by 1/22/2008. Reply Brief (s) due by 2/19/2008. (dw1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008
                                                      On January 9, 2008, Defendant filed an unopposed motion for an enlargement of four days for the parties to file their post-trial briefs. For good cause shown, Defendant's motion is GRANTED. The parties shall file their opening briefs on January 22, 2008, and their reply briefs on February 19, 2008. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007
                                                        ORDER granting [67] Plaintiffs' December 14, 2007 Motion for the Admission of Counter-Designations of Mr. Christopher Kouts. The designated testimony of Mr. Kouts is admitted into the record. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 68 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007
                                                          STIPULATION JOINT LIST OF ADMITTED EXHIBITS, filed by all parties. (Averbach, Andrew)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 67 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007, Terminated: 12/17/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                            Corrected MOTION (with attachment) re [66] Unopposed MOTION Admission of Counter-Designations of Christopher Kouts, filed by CAROLINA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, FLORIDA POWER CORPORATION.Response due by 12/31/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Counter-Designations)(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 66 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007, Terminated: 12/17/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                              Unopposed MOTION Admission of Counter-Designations of Christopher Kouts, filed by CAROLINA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, FLORIDA POWER CORPORATION.Response due by 12/31/2007.(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [64] Defendants December 10, 2007 Motion for the Admission of Testimony Designations of Mr. Christopher Kouts. The designated testimony of Mr. Kouts, along with Defendants exhibits DX 52, DX 59, DX 70, DX 71, DX 81, and DX 96, and Plaintiffs' exhibits PX 29, PX 36, and PX 61 are admitted into the record. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 64 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007, Terminated: 12/11/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                  Unopposed MOTION admit testimony designations of Christopher Kouts, filed by USA.Response due by 12/27/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Attacment 1a -- PG&E designations pt 1# (2) Attachment 1b -- PG&E designations pt 2# (3) Attachment 1c -- PG&E Designations pt 3# (4) Attachment 1d --SMUD Designations# (5) Attachment 1e -- Southern Nuclear Designations# (6) Attachment 1f -- ANO Designations# (7) Attachment 1g -- BECO Designations# (8) Attachment 2 -- DX-D3# (9) Attachment 3 -- Exhibit number cross-reference chart)(Averbach, Andrew)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [62] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. Defendant shall file the designated testimony of Christopher Kouts on or before December 10, 2007, and Plaintiffs shall file their counter-designations on or before December 14, 2007. The parties shall jointly file a list of admitted exhibits on or before December 14, 2007. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler.(pn)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 62 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007, Terminated: 12/4/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/10/2007 to designate testimony of Christopher Kouts, filed by USA.(Averbach, Andrew)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 61 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Court Filing
                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1381-2181) held on November 13-16, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 60 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER closing the evidentiary record and establishing the post-trial briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 59 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [53] MOTION to Strike [52] Notice (Other) Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Designations, filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 58 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007, Terminated: 5/19/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                              MOTION For The Admission Of Testimony Designations of Mr. Loring Mills, filed by USA.Response due by 12/3/2007. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 57 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-1380) held on November 5, 2007 through November 9, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mb2) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2007 (mb2, ).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                  On October 22, 2007, Plaintiff filed a Notice Of Deposition And Trial Testimony Designations, Or, Alternatively, Motion For Leave To Admit Prior Testimony Into Evidence. Defendant opposed Plaintiffs proposed designations and filed its Motion To Strike under RCFC Rule 32(a) and Federal Rule of Evidence 801(d). After considering the parties written submissions and the arguments presented during trial, Plaintiffs motion is GRANTED IN PART. The prior testimony of the following persons is admitted into evidence: Lake H. Barrett, Alan Brownstein, Ronald A. Milner, Robert M. Rosselli, Nancy H. Slater, and Victor W. Trebules. Defendant may designate portions of prior testimony of those persons it wishes to offer. The prior testimony of Michael J. Lawrence and Ben Rusche, however, is excluded under Federal Rule of Evidence 801(d)(2)(D). Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 69 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-29) held on October 30, 2007 before Judge Thomas Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 55 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-39) held on October 30, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mb2) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2007 (mb2, ).
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 54 Filed: 11/4/2007, Entered: 11/4/2007
                                                                                        RESPONSE to [53] Motion to Strike Notice of Deposition and Trial Testimony Designations, filed by CAROLINA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, FLORIDA POWER CORPORATION. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 53 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007, Terminated: 5/19/2008 Motion to Strike
                                                                                          MOTION to Strike [52] Notice (Other), filed by USA.Response due by 11/19/2007. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 52 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007
                                                                                          NOTICE, filed by all plaintiffs of Deposition and Trial Testimony Designations (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Designations)(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [50] Defendant's Unopposed Motion For Leave To File Amended Exhibit List. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler.(pn)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 50 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007, Terminated: 10/22/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct [46] Exhibit List, filed by USA.Response due by 11/8/2007.(Carney, Christopher)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 49 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007
                                                                                                STIPULATION OF FACT, filed by all parties. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 48 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007
                                                                                                  Objection to Exhibit List, filed by CAROLINA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, FLORIDA POWER CORPORATION. Related document: [30] Pretrial Order,.(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 47 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007
                                                                                                    Objection to Exhibit List, filed by USA. Related document: [30] Pretrial Order, [36] Scheduling Order.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 46 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                      Exhibit List, filed by USA. (Averbach, Andrew)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 45 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                        Witness List, filed by USA. (Averbach, Andrew)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 44 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                                                          Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by USA. (Averbach, Andrew)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 43 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting Plaintiffs' motion requesting leave to file an amended list of exhibits to be offered at trial. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 42 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007, Terminated: 10/10/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct [39] Exhibit List, filed by CAROLINA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, FLORIDA POWER CORPORATION.Response due by 10/26/2007. (Attachments: # (1))(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 41 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007
                                                                                                                Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by CAROLINA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, FLORIDA POWER CORPORATION. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 40 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007
                                                                                                                  Witness List, filed by CAROLINA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, FLORIDA POWER CORPORATION. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 39 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007
                                                                                                                    Exhibit List, filed by CAROLINA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, FLORIDA POWER CORPORATION. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [37] Motion for Extension of Time. Th due date for Plaintiff's pretrial filings is adjusted from September 10, 2007, to September 12, 2007. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mo)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 37 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007, Terminated: 8/29/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until September 12, 2007 to Pretrial Filings, filed by CAROLINA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, FLORIDA POWER CORPORATION.Response due by 9/14/2007.(Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 36 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mon)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [34] Joint Motion seeking to adjust the discovery and pretrial deadlines previously established. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mo'n)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007, Terminated: 6/22/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time,until August 1, 2007, to Complete Discovery and complete expert reports and to adjust pretrial submission deadlines, filed by USA.Response due by 7/9/2007.(Averbach, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [32] Motion for Enlargement of Time: For good cause shown, Defendants unopposed motion for an enlargement of time to produce expert reports, and to respond to Plaintiffs cost summaries and schedules is hereby GRANTED. On or before July 15, 2007, Defendant shall produce its expert reports and responses regarding cost summaries and schedules. The other deadlines set in the Courts March 23, 2006 Scheduling Order and the January 20, 2007 Pretrial Order are unaffected. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (MO)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 32 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007, Terminated: 3/27/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 07-16/07 to produce expert reports and response to cost schedules and summaries, filed by USA.Response due by 4/13/2007.(Averbach, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 31 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-11) held on January 30, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      PRETRIAL ORDER Plaintiff's Exhibit and Witness Lists and Pretrial Brief due by 9/5/2007. Defendant's Exhibit and Witness Lists and Pretrial Brief due by 10/5/2007. Trial set for 11/5/2007 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mpo)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-19) held on January 11, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. Averbach for USA. (Averbach, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [26] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006, Terminated: 8/21/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Protective Order , E-Mail Preservation Order, and Stipulated Order Governing Review of the Record Information System Database, filed by USA.Response due by 8/31/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 22, 2006 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 4/24/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs expert reports due on or before January 23, 2007. Defendant's expert reports due on or before May 22, 2007. Discovery shall close on July 15, 2007. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      PRETRIAL ORDER Pre-trial Order on Damages. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 7/15/2007. Plaintiffs Expert Report due by 1/23/2007. Defendant's Expert Report due by 5/22/2007. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                          JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Attachments: # (1))(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 12, 2006 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: JPSR due by 3/17/2006. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: JPSR due by 3/17/2006. Scheduling Conference set for 3/22/2006 02:00 PM before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 1/13/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: To inform the parties of the issues to be discussed at the January 12, 2006 status hearing. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/12/2006 02:00 PM before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler for all further proceedings. Judge Emily C. Hewitt no longer assigned to case. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER tranferring case to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-29) of Proceedings held on 7/19/05 before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/25/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER STAYING CASE. Status Report due by 12/15/2005. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (cn1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference rescheduled for 7/19/2005 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. The court's Order of Jan. 4, 2005 shall otherwise remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (sn1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER; ORDER STAYING CASE: Continuance of stay granted. Status Conference set for 6/24/2005 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (cn1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [9] Motion to Stay. The parties shall file with the court a joint status report, or separate status reports if they cannot agree, on or before Friday, 12/31/04 addressing whether the stay should continue and suggesting further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [8] Order regarding pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004, Terminated: 8/3/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Stay All Proceedings and Report in Response to Pre-Discovery Conference Notice by CAROLINA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, FLORIDA POWER CORPORATION. Response due by 5/10/2004 (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Pre-Discovery Conference. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jb2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [6] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff[s'] Complaint. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004, Terminated: 3/18/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Leave to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by USA. Response due by 4/5/2004 (Attachments: # (1))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Notice of Indirectly Related Case(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Indirectly Related Case(s) [03-2832C, 99-447C, 98-621C, 98-154C, 02-1894C, 02-926C, 98-485C, 04-0010C, 03-2625C, 03-2627C, 03-2626C, 03-2622C, 03-2663C, 98-483C, 03-2505C, 00-440C, 98-486C, 98-474C, 01-116C, 98-484C, 01-115C, 01-551C, 00-703C, 98-488C, 98-614C, 03-2623C, 03-2621C, 03-2624C, 01-249C, 02-898C, 00-697C, 98-126C] by CAROLINA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, FLORIDA POWER CORPORATION. Service: 1/14/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059492), filed by CAROLINA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY, FLORIDA POWER CORPORATION.Answer Due by 3/15/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 172 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?