HIBBARD v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00038-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROBERT B. HIBBARD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Warren Walluk +1 210 226 4384 +1 210 226 4526 awalluklaw@hotmail.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas K. Mickle +1 202 307 0383 +1 202 353 7988 douglas.mickle@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/14/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $150000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 9/2/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [14] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (vro, )
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004, Terminated: 8/4/2004 Terminated:
      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to [9] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record,until August 16, 2004, by ROBERT B. HIBBARD.Service: 6/25/04. Response due by 7/12/2004 (jat, )
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Administrative Record
        ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD in One Volume by USA. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
          ORDER granting [11] Dft's Motion for Leave to File the Administrative Record in conjunction with its dispositive motion. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004, Terminated: 6/9/2004 Terminated:
            MOTION Seeking Leave of Court to File the Administrative Record by USA.Service: 5/28/2004. Response due by 6/14/2004. (jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Statement of Facts
              STATEMENT OF FACTS by USA. Service: 5/28/2004.(jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Terminated:
                MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), or, in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon the Administrative Record by USA.Service: 5/28/2004. Response due by 6/28/2004.(jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [7] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.Answer Due no later than Friday, 5/28/2004. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone for Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, ) Modified on 5/19/2004 (jcp, ).
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004, Terminated: 5/18/2004 Terminated:
                    UNOPPOSED MOTION for a Second Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint until 5/28/2004 by USA.Service: 5/10/2004. Response due by 5/27/2004. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER re: Defendant's March 3, 2004 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED. Answer or Responsive pleading due by 5/14/2004. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (dw1)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004
                        ORDER granting [4] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 5/14/2004. (signed by the Clerk) (dls)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004, Terminated: 3/4/2004 Terminated:
                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 5/14/2004 filed by USA.Service: 3/3/04. (dls)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas K. Mickle for USA. Service: 2/3/2004.(jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Loren A. Smith. (lg1, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT against USA (AF) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059499), filed by ROBERT B. HIBBARD.Answer Due by 3/15/2004.(lg1, )
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 150 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?