INTERSTATE POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00067-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FPL ENERGY DUANE ARNOLD, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo Interstate Power And Light Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by U.S. Attorney's Office For The Southern District of Ne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mariana Teresa Acevedo +1 202 616 0316 +1 202 307 0972 mariana.acevedo@us.doj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Edward Gardner +1 202 305 7583 +1 202 307 0972 joshua.e.gardner@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/22/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case 04-0037C et al.
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, SNF, STAYED
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 44 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008
NOTICE of Appearance by Mariana Teresa Acevedo for USA (Corrected). (Acevedo, Mariana)
    LREF
    Legal Document 43 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008
    NOTICE of Appearance by Mariana Teresa Acevedo for USA. (Acevedo, Mariana)
      LREF
      Legal Document 42 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
      RESPONSE to [41] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by INTERSTATE POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY, FPL ENERGY DUANE ARNOLD, LLC.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Chu, Jack)
        LREF
        Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
        MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
          LREF
          Legal Document 40 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Court Filing
          ORDER - Continuing Stay requested [39] until January 7, 2009. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report notifying the court promptly of any decisions or developments that impact this case. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
            LREF
            Legal Document 39 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008
            JOINT STATUS REPORT and Motion to Continue Stay, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
              LREF
              Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Court Filing
              ORDER - Continuing the stay in this case until July 15, 2008. A Joint Status Report promptly of any decisions or other developments impacting this case. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                LREF
                Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008
                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 36 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Court Filing
                  ORDER - Continuing stay. Joint Status Report by Jan. 15, 2008, re any decisions or developments in other cases. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 35 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT and Motion to Continue Stay, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 34 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Court Filing
                      ORDER - granting Joint Motion To Continue Stay [33]; Joint Status Report by October 16, 2007, or sooner if applicable. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007
                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/16/2007 (lg1, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 33 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007, Terminated: 4/17/2007
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT and Motion to Continue Stay, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006
                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/16/2007 (lg1, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006 Court Filing
                              ORDER - granting motion to continue stay. Joint Status Report by April 16, 2007. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006
                                JOINT STATUS REPORT And Motion To Continue Stay, filed by INTERSTATE POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY, USA, FPL Energy Duane Arnold, LLC. (Chu, Jack)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting [27] Motion for Joinder, granting [28] Motion for Extension of Time, and granting motion to substitute counsel, all as unopposed. Status Report due by 10/13/2006. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller.(smg)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006
                                    RESPONSE to [27] MOTION for Joinder of FPL Energy Duane Arnold, LLC and Motion for Leave to Substitute Counsel of Record, filed by INTERSTATE POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY.Reply due by 10/13/2006. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 8/26/2008 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                      ***Attorney Alexander D. Tomaszczuk for INTERSTATE POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY and FPL Energy Duane Arnold, LLC added. Attorney Arnold Bradley Fagg terminated. (dls)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 28 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006, Terminated: 9/29/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until October 13, 2006 to file Joint Status Report, filed by INTERSTATE POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY.Response due by 10/16/2006.(Fagg, Arnold)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006, Terminated: 9/29/2006 ~Motion for Joinder
                                          MOTION for Joinder of FPL Energy Duane Arnold, LLC and Motion for Leave to Substitute Counsel of Record, filed by FPL Energy Duane Arnold, LLC.Response due by 10/16/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit of Appointment of Alex D. Tomaszczuk# (2) Exhibit Consent to Substitution of Lead Counsel# (3) Exhibit Excerpt of Purchase & Sale Agreement)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting [25] Motion for Extension of Time; parties to set forth their views re continuation of stay. Joint Status Report due by 9/28/06. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (Attachments: # (1) SNF article) (smg)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006, Terminated: 9/14/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until September 28, 2006 to to file a joint status report, filed by INTERSTATE POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY.Response due by 9/25/2006.(Bessette, Paul)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Court Filing
                                                ORDER - Granting extension of temporary stay of discovery - Status Report due by 9/8/2006, or sooner if significant decisions impact this case. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006
                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT and Motion for Extension of Temporary Stay, filed by INTERSTATE POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY, USA. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Court Filing
                                                    ORDER STAYING CASE, including discovery. Joint Status Report due by 3/31/2006, or promptly upon decisions or other developments impacting this case. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005
                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by INTERSTATE POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY, USA. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Court Filing
                                                        ORDER - granting extension of stay; Jt. S.R. 9/6/2005. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005
                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT and Motion for Extension of Temporary Stay by INTERSTATE POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY, USA. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER - Continuing stay of discovery until April 15, 2005. Joint Status Report promptly re decisions or other developments impacting this case. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004
                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by INTERSTATE POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY, USA. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER - regarding stay of discovery. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/13/2004 (dw1)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER - regarding discovery in all new SNF cases Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                      RESPONSE to [12] Order Pre-Discovery Conference New SNF Cases filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix 1# (2) Appendix 2# (3) Appendix 3)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                      RESPONSE to [12] Order and Report filed by INTERSTATE POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER - prediscovery conference to be held in new SNF cases Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004
                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Reply due by 4/12/2004. (dw1)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004
                                                                            RESPONSE to [9] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In the Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery Regarding Rate and Schedule Issues filed by INTERSTATE POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. Reply due by 4/12/2004. (Bessette, Paul) Modified on 4/1/2004 (dw1).
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER re: to counsel with instructions regarding electronic filings for chambers. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg) Modified on 3/30/2004 (dw1).
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004
                                                                                MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In the Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery Regarding Rate and Schedule Issues by USA. Response due by 4/8/2004 (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua E. Gardner for USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER: Counsel will deliver to the Clerk's Office for delivery to chambers one hard copy of every filing, including any appendix, that exceeds two pages, other than unopposed motions for extension of one date with respect to one filing. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg, ) Modified on 2/5/2004 to add descriptive text to entry (jcp, ).
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Christine Odell Cook Miller. (dls)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Charles F. Lettow recused. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004
                                                                                          Case reassigned to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (dls)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004
                                                                                            NOTICE of Indirectly Related Case(s) [04-0037C, 04-0010C, 03-2832C, 03-2663C, 03-2627C, 03-2626C, 03-2625C, 03-2624C, 03-2623C, 03-2622C, 03-2621C, 03-2505C, 02-1894C, 02-926C, 02-898C, 01-551C, 01-249C, 01-116C, 01-115C, 00-703C, 00-697C, 00-440C, 99-447C, 98-621C, 98-614C, 98-488C, 98-486C, 98-485C, 98-484C, 98-483C, 98-474C, 98-154C, 98-126C] by INTERSTATE POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. Service: 1/22/04.(lg1, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lg1, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059531), filed by INTERSTATE POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY.Answer Due by 3/22/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 172 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?