CONSTELLATION GENERATION GROUP, LLC et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00068-LSM
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CALVERT CLIFFS NUCLEAR POWER PLANT, INC.,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
No Logo CONSTELLATION GENERATION GROUP, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
No Logo Nine Mile Point Nuclear Station, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/22/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case 04-0037C et al.
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, SNF, STAYED
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 32 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [31] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by CONSTELLATION GENERATION GROUP, LLC, CALVERT CLIFFS NUCLEAR POWER PLANT, INC.,, NINE MILE POINT NUCLEAR STATION, LLC,.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Fagg, Arnold)
    LREF
    Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
    MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
      LREF
      Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER CONTINUING STAY TO 12/15/2008; Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2008 Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lmc)
        LREF
        Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008
        JOINT STATUS REPORT (CORRECTED VERSION), filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
          LREF
          Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008
          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
            LREF
            Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Court Filing
            ORDER STAYING CASEStatus Report due by 6/30/2008 Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dtm)
              LREF
              Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Fagg, Arnold)
                LREF
                Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Court Filing
                ORDER CONTINUING STAY; STATUS REPORT ORDER. Stay remains in effect until 12-14-07; Joint Status Report due by 12/14/2007 Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lmc)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Averbach, Andrew)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Court Filing
                    ORDER CONTINUING STAY; STATUS REPORT ORDER. Stay remains in effect until 6-29-07; Status Report due by 6/29/2007 Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lmc)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006
                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 Court Filing
                        ORDER STAYING CASE Status Report due by 12/15/2006. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lmc)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Court Filing
                            ORDER CONTINUING STAY UNTIL 6/30/2006. Status Report due by 6/30/2006. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lmc)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005
                              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by CONSTELLATION GENERATION GROUP, LLC, CALVERT CLIFFS NUCLEAR POWER PLANT, INC.,, NINE MILE POINT NUCLEAR STATION, LLC,. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: 7/21/2005
                                RESPONSE to [13] Notice of Indirectly Related Case(s), Notice of Indirectly Related Case(s) Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer and Suggestion of Consolidation filed by CONSTELLATION GENERATION GROUP, LLC, CALVERT CLIFFS NUCLEAR POWER PLANT, INC.,, NINE MILE POINT NUCLEAR STATION, LLC,. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005
                                  RESPONSE to Notice of Indirectly Related Case And Motion To Transfer and Suggestion of Consolidation By Plaintiff R.E. Ginna Nuclear Power Plant, LLC filed by USA. Reply due 7/25/05 (Thomas, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/12/2005 to add reply deadline (jat, ).
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 7/25/2005. (jat, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Court Filing
                                      ORDER STAYING CASE until December 15, 2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (ef1)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005
                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by CONSTELLATION GENERATION GROUP, LLC, CALVERT CLIFFS NUCLEAR POWER PLANT, INC.,, NINE MILE POINT NUCLEAR STATION, LLC,, USA. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005
                                          NOTICE of Indirectly Related Case(s) [04-118] by CONSTELLATION GENERATION GROUP, LLC, CALVERT CLIFFS NUCLEAR POWER PLANT, INC.,, NINE MILE POINT NUCLEAR STATION, LLC, and Motion to Transfer and Suggestion of Consolidation. (Response due by 7/11/2005) (Fagg, Arnold) Modified on 6/23/2005 (jat, ).
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 7/11/2005. (jat, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Court Filing
                                              NOTICE by USA Of Filing Of Defendant's Reply To [10] Plaintiffs' Response To [9] Defendant's Motion To Transfer And Consolidate Directly Related Cases, by leave of the Judge (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold) Modified on 1/14/2005 (dw1, ).
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005
                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by CONSTELLATION GENERATION GROUP, LLC, CALVERT CLIFFS NUCLEAR POWER PLANT, INC.,, NINE MILE POINT NUCLEAR STATION, LLC,, USA. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004
                                                RESPONSE to [9] Notice of Directly Related Case(s) Opposition filed by CONSTELLATION GENERATION GROUP, LLC, CALVERT CLIFFS NUCLEAR POWER PLANT, INC.,, NINE MILE POINT NUCLEAR STATION, LLC,. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004
                                                  NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [04-124, 04-125] by USA And Defendant's Motion To Transfer And Consolidate In Accordance With RCFC 40.2(a)(3) And 42.1. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4))(Lester, Harold)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [6] Motion to Stay. Joint Status Report due by 1/5/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jat, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004
                                                    RESPONSE to [6] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery filed by CALVERT CLIFFS NUCLEAR POWER PLANT, INC.,, CONSTELLATION GENERATION GROUP, LLC, NINE MILE POINT NUCLEAR STATION, LLC,. Reply due by 4/8/2004. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004, Terminated: 6/30/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                      MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery by USA. Response due by 4/8/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Notice of Indirectly Related Case(s)
                                                          NOTICE of Indirectly Related Case(s) [04-0037C, 04-0010C, 03-2832C, 03-2663C, 03-2627C, 03-2626C, 03-2625C, 03-2624C, 03-2623C, 03-2622C, 03-2621C, 03-2505C, 02-1894C, 02-926C, 02-898C, 01-551C, 01-249C, 01-116C, 01-115C, 00-703C, 00-697C, 00-440C, 99-447C, 98-621C, 98-614C, 98-488C, 98-486C, 98-484C, 98-483C, 98-474C, 98-154C, 98-126C] by CALVERT CLIFFS NUCLEAR POWER PLANT, INC.,, CONSTELLATION GENERATION GROUP, LLC, NINE MILE POINT NUCLEAR STATION, LLC,. Service: 1/22/2004.(lg1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lg1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059530), filed by CALVERT CLIFFS NUCLEAR POWER PLANT, INC.,, CONSTELLATION GENERATION GROUP, LLC, NINE MILE POINT NUCLEAR STATION, LLC,.Answer Due by 3/22/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 205 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?