CLEVELAND ELECTRIC ILLUMINATING COMPANY, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00069-LB
District Judge Lawrence J. Block, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cleveland Electric Illuminating Company,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
No Logo PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
No Logo TOLEDO EDISON COMPANY,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/22/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case 04-0037C et al
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, SNF, STAYED
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 34 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [29] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by CLEVELAND ELECTRIC ILLUMINATING COMPANY, PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY,, TOLEDO EDISON COMPANY,.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Fagg, Arnold)
    LREF
    Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
    NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Lawrence J. Block for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Edward J. Damich no longer assigned to the case. (jt1)
      LREF
      Legal Document 32 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Lawrence J. Block. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (EJ1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/23/2008 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
        NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Edward J. Damich for all further proceedings. Judge Victor J. Wolski no longer assigned to the case. (dls)
          LREF
          Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Court Filing
          ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (EJ1)
            LREF
            Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
            MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
              LREF
              Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Court Filing
              STATUS REPORT ORDER granting continuation of stay requested in Joint Status Report. Proceedings shall be stayed until December 15, 2008, by which date the parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                LREF
                Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008
                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Court Filing
                  ORDER continuing stay of case until June 30, 2008, on or by which date parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Fagg, Arnold)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 Court Filing
                      ORDER STAYING CASE: Case is stayed until December 14, 2007, by which date parties shall file joint status report. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Averbach, Andrew)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Court Filing
                          STATUS REPORT ORDER: Proceedings in this case shall be stayed until 6/29/07, on which date parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006 Court Filing
                              STATUS REPORT ORDER: Stay of Proceedings is continued until 12/15/06. Status Report due by 12/15/2006. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006 Court Filing
                                STATUS REPORT ORDER: Court grants continuation of stay until December 15, 2006. Status Report due by 12/15/2006. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006
                                  ORDER: Document No. 19 was filed in error and is hereby stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp1, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Court Filing
                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER: Court continues stay reqested in Joint Status Report until 6/30/06; Joint Status Report is due 6/30/06. signed by Victor J. Wolski, Judge. (jp)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005
                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Court Filing
                                          ORDER continuing the stay of all proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2005. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jat, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005
                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Bessette, Paul)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Court Filing
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Stay in case is extended to 6/24/05; Joint Status Report due by 5/24/05. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004
                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. (Cochran, Todd)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part [6] Motion to Stay. Joint Status Report due by 10/22/2004. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                    RESPONSE to [8] Order regarding pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                    RESPONSE to [8] Order and Report filed by CLEVELAND ELECTRIC ILLUMINATING COMPANY, PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY,, TOLEDO EDISON COMPANY,. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER re Pre-Discovery Conference New SNF Cases Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004
                                                        RESPONSE to [6] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery filed by CLEVELAND ELECTRIC ILLUMINATING COMPANY, PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY,, TOLEDO EDISON COMPANY,. Reply due by 4/8/2004. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004, Terminated: 7/21/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                          MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery by USA. Response due by 4/8/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Notice of Indirectly Related Case(s)
                                                                NOTICE of Indirectly Related Case(s) [04-0037C, 04-0010C, 03-2832C, 03-2663C, 03-2627C, 03-2626C, 03-2625C, 03-2624C, 03-2623C, 03-2622C, 03-2621C, 03-2505C, 02-1894C, 02-926C, 02-898C, 01-551C, 01-849C, 01-116C, 01-115C, 00-703C, 00-697C, 00-440C, 99-447C, 98-621C, 98-614C, 98-488C, 98-486C, 98-485C, 98-484C, 98-483C, 98-474C, 98-154C, 98-126C] by PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY, THE CLEVELAND ELECTRIC ILLUMINATING COMPANY,, THE TOLEDO EDISON COMPANY,. Service: 1/22/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Victor J. Wolski. (lg1, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Complaint
                                                                    COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059529), filed by PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY, THE CLEVELAND ELECTRIC ILLUMINATING COMPANY, THE TOLEDO EDISON COMPANY,.Answer Due by 3/22/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, ).
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 230 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?