PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC, v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00070-LMB
District Judge Lawrence M. Baskir, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sonia Marie Orfield +1 202 353 0534 +1 202 514 8624 sonia.m.orfield@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/22/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case 04-0037 et al.
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, PROTO, SNF
  Entries (109) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 96 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008
JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
    LREF
    Legal Document 95 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
    RESPONSE to [94] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Chu, Jack)
      LREF
      Legal Document 94 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
      MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
        LREF
        Legal Document 93 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008
        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
          LREF
          Legal Document 92 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008
          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
            LREF
            Legal Document 91 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008
            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
              LREF
              Legal Document 90 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                LREF
                Legal Document 89 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007
                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 88 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 87 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 86 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007
                      STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [57] Cross Motion [Dispositive], Cross Motion [Dispositive], [47] Motion for Summary Judgment, [56] Motion for Summary Judgment,, filed by all parties. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 85 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [84] Motion for Extension of Time. CSUF due 6/5/07. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 84 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007, Terminated: 5/31/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                          MOTION for Extension of Time until June 5, 2007 to to file consolidated statement of uncontroverted facts, filed by USA.Response due by 6/12/2007.(Orfield, Sonia)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 83 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Court Filing
                            ORDER granting [82] Motion for Extension of Time to file CSUF. CSUF to be filed nlt 5/29/07. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 82 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007, Terminated: 5/23/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                              MOTION for Extension of Time until May 29, 2007 to to file Consolidated Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, filed by USA.Response due by 6/8/2007.(Orfield, Sonia)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 81 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007
                                JOINT STATUS REPORT and Motion for Leave to File Report One Day Out-Of-Time, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 80 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007 Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting [79] Motion for Extension of Time to file CSUF by 5/22/07. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 79 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007, Terminated: 5/10/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until May 22, 2007 to file Consolidated Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, filed by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC, USA.Response due by 5/25/2007.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 78 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting [77] Motion for Extension of Time to file CSUF nlt 5/8/07. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 77 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007, Terminated: 4/24/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until May 8, 2007 to file Consolidated Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, filed by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC, USA.Response due by 5/7/2007.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 76 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007 Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting [74] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages . Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 75 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007
                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [56] MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Counts I And II Of Plaintiff's Complaint, And Motion To Dismiss Count III Of Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Orfield, Sonia)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 74 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007, Terminated: 4/13/2007 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                              MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Defendant's Reply by 26 pages, filed by USA.Response due by 4/30/2007.(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 73 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007 Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting [71] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by 4/11/07; granting [72] Motion for Extension of Time to file CSUF by 4/20/07. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 72 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007, Terminated: 3/29/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until April 20, 2007 to File the Consolidated Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, filed by USA.Response due by 4/16/2007.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 71 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007, Terminated: 3/29/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until April 11, 2007 to File Response or Reply as to [69] Reply to Response to Motion,, filed by USA.Response due by 4/16/2007.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 70 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [68] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 69 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007
                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [57] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [47] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC,CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [47] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC,, [47] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability, filed by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1# (2) Appendix Part 2# (3) Appendix Part 3# (4) Appendix Part 4)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 68 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007, Terminated: 3/23/2007 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                                          MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability and Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint by 23 pages, filed by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC.Response due by 4/9/2007.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 67 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [66] Motion for Extension of Time til 3/21/07 to file response to D's CMs and reply to Ps M/SJ on liability. CSUF due 3/28/07. Also granting M/Stay Supp Briefing. JSR due every 60 days, beginning 5/14/07. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 66 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007, Terminated: 3/12/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 03/21/2007 to Response to Cross-Motion & Reply on Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability and Unopposed Motion to Stay Supplemental Briefing, filed by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC.Response due by 3/26/2007.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 65 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [55] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 64 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [63] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/CSUF Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 63 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: 2/7/2007, Terminated: 2/12/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply, filed by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC.Response due by 2/26/2007.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 62 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007
                                                                      RESPONSE to [47] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability DEFENDANT'S CORRECTED RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON LIABILITY, DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT UPON COUNTS I AND II OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, AND DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT III, filed by USA.Reply due by 2/12/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12) # (13))(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 61 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [60] Motion to Amend/Correct. Because Appendix is over 300 pages, D to file in paper format, 2 BOUND copies of the corrected Appendix -- one for Clerk's ofc and one for Chambers. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 60 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007, Terminated: 1/24/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                          MOTION to Amend/Correct, filed by USA.Response due by 2/9/2007.(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 59 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007
                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ADDRESSING THE APPLICABILITY TO THIS CASE OF THE D.C. CIRCUITS WRIT OF MANDAMUS IN NORTHERN STATES POWER CO. V. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, filed by USA. (Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 58 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [54] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 57 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007
                                                                                CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [47] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC,, filed by USA.Response due by 2/20/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12) # (13) # (14) # (15) # (16) # (17) # (18) # (19) # (20) # (21) # (22) # (23) # (24) # (25) # (26) # (27) # (28) # (29) # (30) # (31))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 56 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007
                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Counts I And II Of Plaintiff's Complaint, And Motion To Dismiss Count III Of Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 2/20/2007.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 55 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007, Terminated: 2/15/2007 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability, Defendant's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment Upon Counts I And II Of Plaintiff's Complaint, And Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Count III Of Plaintiff's Complaint by 20 pages, filed by USA.Response due by 2/5/2007.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 54 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007, Terminated: 1/22/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/22/2007 to To File Supplemental Brief Regarding "Unavoidable Delays" Clause, filed by USA.Response due by 2/5/2007.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 53 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007
                                                                                      RESPONSE to [47] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability, filed by USA.Reply due by 2/1/2007. (Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 52 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting [51] Motion for Extension of Time. D's response/supp briefs due 1/18/07; P's reply/supp brief due 2/12/07; CSUF due 2/20/07. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 51 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006, Terminated: 12/20/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until January 18, 2007 to file defendant's responsive and supplemental Briefs, filed by USA.Response due by 1/5/2007.(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 50 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER Striking Ps Proposed Findings of Fact filed 10/31/06. Parties are directed to review SPO - file CSUF instead of individual findings of fact. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 49 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM re: [47] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Dyszel damages declaration))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 48 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006
                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [47] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability, filed by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 47 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006
                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability, filed by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC.Response due by 12/1/2006.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 46 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                    FINAL PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 45 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006
                                                                                                      RESPONSE to THE COURT'S ORDER DATED OCTOBER 2, 2006, filed by USA. (Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 44 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting [43] Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Modifications to the Provisional Protective Order Until 10/12/2006 Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (sw1, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 43 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006, Terminated: 10/12/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until October 12, 2006 to to propose modifications to the Provisional Protective Order, filed by USA.Response due by 10/27/2006.(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 42 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [41] Motion for Extension of Time. Order provides revised briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 41 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006, Terminated: 10/4/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/31/2006 to File Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability, filed by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC.Response due by 10/20/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (DOJ letter re discovery requests))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 40 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part [23] Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (Attachments: #(1) Provisional Protective Order; #(2) E'Mail Preservation Order; #(3) Database Review Order) (dcl)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 39 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006
                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Attachments: # (1))(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 38 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-31) held on July 26, 2006 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay; Request JSR on other SNF cases due 8/15/06; briefing schedule for Plaintiff's M/SJ outlined. Supp Briefs also requested. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/26/2006 10:00 AM (Telephonic) before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 35 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER requesting Status Conference dates regarding JSR filed 6/20/06, by 7/6/906. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006
                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Compliance due by 7/6/2006. (mij, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006
                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT JOINT, filed by all parties. (Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006
                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: JSR due by 6/20/2006. (mij, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [32] Motion for Extension of Time til 6/20/06 to file JSR. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006, Terminated: 6/6/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 06/20/06 to to file status report, filed by USA.Response due by 6/22/2006.(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 31 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [29] Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Arnold Bradley Fagg replaced with Alex D. Tomaszczuk. Stay in this case continued until further notice. JSR every 60 days, starting 6/5/06. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 8/23/2008 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                        ***Attorney Alexander D. Tomaszczuk for PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC added. (dls)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006
                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006, Terminated: 4/5/2006 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Substitute Attorney Alex D. Tomaszczuk in place of Brad Fagg, filed by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC. Response due by 4/17/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Appointment of Alex D. Tomaszczuk# (2) Exhibit 2 - Consent to Substitution of Counsel)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER STAYING CASE until 3/31/06. Joint Status Report due by 3/31/2006.Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC, USA. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting parties request (in 2/28/05 JSR) for continuation of Stay until September 6, 2005, signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. JSR due 8/10/05. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/10/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC, USA. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Sonia Marie Orfield for USA. (Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004, Terminated: 10/2/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Protective Order , E-Mail Preservation Order And Order Governing Access To The RIS-WEB by USA. Response due by 9/27/2004 (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Strohmeyer, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time (until September 7, 2004) to file Joint Status Report by USA. Response due by 9/16/2004 (Strohmeyer, Victoria) Modified on 8/30/2004 to correct date which "JSR" is due (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [19] Motion for Extension of Time to file JSR re Protective Order and Access to Existing Discovery no later than August 30, 2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 8/30/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 6/25/2004 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004, Terminated: 7/29/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until August 26, 2004 to file Joint Status Report by USA. Response due by 8/12/2004 (Strohmeyer, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/6/2004
                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir: Preliminary Status Conference (by phone) held on 6/25/04. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [7] motion to stay proceedings until 3/1/05, and file a joint status report by that date. Status report due by 3/1/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jmb)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004
                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Per [18] order, parties are directed to submit a joint status report by 7/26/04 advising the court that preliminary arrangements for future discovery have been completed. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir.(jmb)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004
                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/26/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004
                                                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Preliminary Status Conference set for 6/25/2004 10:00 AM before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [14] Joint Motion to Remove Case from ADR Pilot Program. Also confirms PSC (phone) for 10am, on 6/25/04. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir.(dcl)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER (signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir) requesting 3 dates during June 23-July 16, 2004 for telephonic preliminary status conference. Response due NLT 6/20/04. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                  *** Attorney Harold Dewitt Lester terminated. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Status of Spent Fuel Cases in Court of Federal Claims)(Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004, Terminated: 6/14/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION Remove this action from the Court's ADR Pilot Program re [3] Notice of Assignment - ADR Pilot, Add and Terminate Judges, [13] Notice of Assignment - ADR Pilot by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC, USA. Response due by 5/24/2004 (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Re-assignment to ADR Judge Christine Odell Cook Miller for ADR Pilot proceedings. (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                          ADR Judge Christine O.C. Miller added. ADR Judge Marian Blank Horn no longer assigned to case. (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                            DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to [1] Complaint by USA. JPSR due by 5/24/2004.(Strohmeyer, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER deferring ruling on [7] Motion to Stay. Defendant shall file ANSWER forthwith. Parties shall file JPSR no later than May 7, 2004. JPSR to include 3 dates for telephonic preliminary status conference. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl) Modified on 4/2/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Parties JPSR due by 5/7/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl) Modified on 3/30/2004 (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Louise Strohmeyer for USA. (Strohmeyer, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant Reply due by 4/5/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [7] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery filed by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC. Reply due by 4/5/2004. (Bessette, Paul) Modified on 3/25/2004 to update reply deadline (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004, Terminated: 6/25/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery by USA. Response due by 4/8/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Notice of Indirectly Related Case(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Indirectly Related Case(s) [04-0037C, 04-0010C, 03-3828C, 03-2663C, 03-2627C, 03-2626C, 03-2625C, 03-2624C, 03-2623C, 03-2622C, 03-2621C, 03-2505C, 02-1894C, 02-926C, 02-898C, 01-551C, 01-249C, 01-116C, 01-115C, 00-703C, 00-697C, 00-440C, 99-447C, 98-621C, 98-614C, 98-488C, 98-486C, 98-485C, 98-484C, 98-483C, 98-474C, 98-154C, 98-126C] by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC. Service: 1/22/04.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Notice of Assignment - Auto ADRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn for ADR Pilot proceedings. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059528), filed by PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC.Answer Due by 3/22/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 119 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?