WISCONSIN PUBLIC SERVICE CORPORATION v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00071-LB
District Judge Lawrence J. Block, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wisconsin Public Service Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/22/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case 04-0037 et al.
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, SNF, STAYED
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [22] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by WISCONSIN PUBLIC SERVICE CORPORATION.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Fagg, Arnold)
    LREF
    Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
    MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008
      ORDER--Having considered the parties' [21] joint status report, it is ORDERED that the STAY in this matter shall CONTINUE until Thursday, 12/18/08. Additionally, the parties shall file by Thursday, 12/18/08, a joint status report. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
        LREF
        Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008
        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by WISCONSIN PUBLIC SERVICE CORPORATION.(Fagg, Arnold) Modified on 8/22/2008 to correct filer. (dls).
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007
          ORDER--Having considered the parties' [20] joint status report, it is ORDERED that the STAY in this matter shall CONTINUE until Monday, 6/30/08. Additionally, the parties shall file by Monday, 6/30/08, a joint status report. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
            LREF
            Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007
            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Fagg, Arnold)
              LREF
              Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007
              REPLY to Response to Motion re [17] MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff and Amend Complaint, and for Limited Relief from Stay, filed by Dominion Energy Kewaunee, Inc.. (Fagg, Arnold)
                LREF
                Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007
                RESPONSE to [17] MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff and Amend Complaint, and for Limited Relief from Stay, filed by USA.Reply due by 11/23/2007. (Lester, Harold)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007
                  MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff and Amend Complaint, and for Limited Relief from Stay, filed by Dominion Energy Kewaunee, Inc., WISCONSIN PUBLIC SERVICE CORPORATION.Response due by 11/8/2007. (Attachments: # (1) First Amended Complaint)(Fagg, Arnold)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007
                    ORDER--Having considered the parties' [16] joint status report, it is ORDERED that the STAY in this matter shall CONTINUE until Friday, 12/14/07. Additionally, the parties shall file by Friday, 12/14/07, a joint status report. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007
                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Averbach, Andrew)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007
                        ORDER--Having considered the parties' [15] joint status report, it is ORDERED that the STAY in this matter shall CONTINUE until Friday, 6/29/07. Additionally, the parties shall file by Friday, 6/29/07, a joint status report. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by WISCONSIN PUBLIC SERVICE CORPORATION. (Fagg, Arnold)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006
                            ORDER STAYING CASE--For reasons noted in the parties' [14] joint status report, the stay of proceedings in this case is extended until Friday, 12/15/06. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report no later than 12/15/06, identifying their positions regarding further activity in this case. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by WISCONSIN PUBLIC SERVICE CORPORATION. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005
                                ORDER STAYING CASE--For the reasons noted in the parties' [13] joint status report, the stay of proceedings in this case is extended until Friday, 6/30/06. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report no later than 6/30/06, identifying their positions regarding further activity in this case. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005
                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005
                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by WISCONSIN PUBLIC SERVICE CORPORATION, USA. (Bessette, Paul)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005
                                      ORDER STAYING CASE--Having considered the parties' [12] joint status report, in which they request a continuation until 12/15/05 of the stay in this matter, it is ORDERED that the STAY IS CONTINUED until Thursday, 12/15/05, by which date the parties SHALL FILE a FURTHER JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005
                                        SCHEDULING ORDER--It is ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report by Friday, 6/24/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005
                                          ORDER STAYING CASE--Having considered the parties' request within their [11] joint status report, and for reasons stated therein, it is ORDERED that PROCEEDINGS in this matter are STAYED until 6/24/05. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005
                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by WISCONSIN PUBLIC SERVICE CORPORATION, USA. (Bessette, Paul)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER--It is ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report by Monday, 1/31/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004
                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part [6] motion to stay. It is ORDERED that all proceedings in this matter, including discovery, are STAYED until Monday, 1/17/05. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004
                                                  Minute Entry--A pre-discovery conference was held on 4/30/04, 2:00 pm, in the National Courts Building, before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (smm)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                    RESPONSE to [8] Order of Entry regarding pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                    RESPONSE to [8] Order of Entry and Report filed by WISCONSIN PUBLIC SERVICE CORPORATION. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Parties Discovery Report (s) due by 4/23/2004. Pre-Discovery Conference set for 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dw1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                        NOTICE--Pre-Discovery Conference New SNF Cases. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004
                                                          RESPONSE to [6] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery filed by WISCONSIN PUBLIC SERVICE CORPORATION. Reply due by 4/8/2004. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004, Terminated: 7/13/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                            MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery by USA. Response due by 4/8/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004
                                                                ORDER -- Parties are requested to deliver to the undersigned two hard copies of each future filing transacted electronically in this matter, except unopposed, non-dispositive motions and joint motions, which need only be filed electronically. Signed Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                  NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Notice of Indirectly Related Case(s)
                                                                    NOTICE of Indirectly Related Case(s) [04-0037C, 04-0010C, 03-2832C, 03-2663C, 03-2627C, 03-2626C, 03-2625C, 03-2624C, 03-2623C, 03-2622C, 03-2621C, 03-2505C, 02-1894C, 02-926C, 02-898C, 01-551C, 01-249C, 01-116C, 01-115C, 00-703C, 00-697C, 00-440C, 99-447C, 98-621C, 98-614C, 98-488C, 98-486C, 98-485C, 98-484C, 98-483C, 98-747C, 98-154C, 98-126C] by WINCONSIN PUBLIC SERVICE CORPORATION. Service: 1/22/04.(lg1, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lawrence J. Block. (lg1, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Complaint
                                                                        COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059527), filed by WINCONSIN PUBLIC SERVICE CORPORATION.Answer Due by 3/22/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 181 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?