PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00074-ECH
District Judge Emily C. Hewitt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

PG&E Corporation PG&E Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY"

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/22/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County None
Terminated 10/13/2006
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
104-cv-00074-ECH 04-0075C
Related Case
Other Court Case '07-5046'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, CRSAPP, ECF, LEAD, PROTO, SNF
  Entries (485) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
    CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, forwarded to Jerry Stouck. (bre, ) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
      JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $89,004,415.00 in damages through December 31, 2004, due to the governments partial breach of the Standard Contract. (lld) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        PUBLISHED OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (kl) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
          RESPONSE to 459 Notice of Additional Authority Filed By PG&E, filed by USA. (Greene, Seth) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Additional Authority (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM re: 457 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 455 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Objections. Attached response accepted as filed. Plaintiff's reply due by 12/9/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (kl) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None
                  NOTICE, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY PG&E's Objections to Government Citations to Designated Testimony in Post-Trial Reply Brief (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Leave to File Response To Plaintiff's Objections To Testimony Designations Cited In Defendant's Post-Trial Opening Brief, filed by USA.Response due by 12/18/2009.(Greene, Seth) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None
                      POST TRIAL BRIEF PG&E's Remand Post Trial Reply Brief, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None
                        POST TRIAL BRIEF Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's Remand Post-Trial Brief, filed by USA. (Greene, Seth) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
                          Cumulative Index for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 15, 2009 through October 21, 2009. Filed with plaintiff, defendant, and joint exhibits. (dw1) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                            POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Greene, Seth) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                              POST TRIAL BRIEF PG&E's Remand Post-Trial Brief, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None
                                NOTICE, filed by USA Defendant's Notice of Delivery of Demonstrative Exhibits and Trial Exhibit (Greene, Seth) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY PG&E's Notice of Delivery of Demonstrative Exhibits (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY PG&E's Notice of Filing Referencing Exhibits Mentioned in Designated Testimony (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE, filed by USA Defendant's Notice of Filing of "Crosswalk" Connecting Counter-Designated Testimony and Exhibits Discussed Therein (Sullivan, Marian) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1456-1574) held on October 21, 2009 before Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 10/29/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2010. (dw1) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                          Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript for proceedings held on October 21, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE, filed by USA Notice of Filing of Deposition and Trial Testimony Counter-Designations (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Appendix, # 5 Appendix, # 6 Appendix, # 7 Appendix, # 8 Appendix, # 9 Appendix, # 10 Appendix, # 11 Appendix, # 12 Appendix, # 13 Appendix, # 14 Appendix, # 15 Appendix)(Sullivan, Marian) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1067-1455) held on October 20, 2009 before Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 10/28/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2010. (dw1) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript for proceedings held on October 20, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 686-1066) held on October 19, 2009 before Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 10/28/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2010. (dw1) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript for proceedings held on October 19, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 403-685) held on October 16, 2009 before Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 10/27/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2010. (dw1) Modified on 10/20/2009 (dw1). (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript for proceedings held on October 16, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-402) held on October 15, 2009 before Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 10/27/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2010. (dw1) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                            Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript for proceedings held on October 15, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 10/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE, filed by USA Objection to Proposed Demonstrative Exhibit for Mr. Locke (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Demonstrative)(Keller, Joseph) (Entered: 10/18/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 10/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY PG&E's Objections to the Defendant's Proposed Demonstrative Exhibits for Mr. Maret (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 10/18/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 10/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY PG&E's Objections to the Defendant's Proposed Demonstrative Exhibits for Mr. Jones (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 10/18/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 10/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    STIPULATION Joint Stipulations, filed by all parties. (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 10/18/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE, filed by USA Defendant's Notice Of Filing Of Deposition And Trial Testimony Counter-Designations For Christine Gelles And David Zabransky (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Appendix, # 5 Appendix, # 6 Appendix)(Sullivan, Marian) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE, filed by USA Defendant's Notice Of Trial Testimony Counter-Designations For David Huizenga (Sullivan, Marian) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE, filed by USA Defendant's Notice of Position Concerning Kevin Klein's Deposition Designation and the Treatment of Demonstrative Exhibits at Trial (Greene, Seth) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            Exhibit List PG&E's Revised Trial Exhibit List, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER denying 412 Motion in Limine; denying 414 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 415 Motion Regarding Objections to Government Exhibits; denying 416 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (kl) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                TRIAL BRIEF PG&E's Remand Pretrial Reply Brief, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-259) held on October 6, 2009 before Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 10/14/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2010. (dw1) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript for proceedings held on October 6, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2009: # 1 Notice) (dw1). (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE, filed by all parties Joint Preliminary Trial Schedule (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE to 414 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Gregory A. Maret's Expert Testimony, filed by USA.Reply due by 10/19/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Connor, James) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          RESPONSE to 411 Notice (Other) PG&E'S NOTICE OF DEPOSITION AND TRIAL TESTIMONY DESIGNATIONS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ADMIT PRIOR TESTIMONY INTO EVIDENCE, filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Donahue, Lisa) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            RESPONSE to 412 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Expert Testimony of William G. Jones, Jr., filed by USA.Reply due by 10/19/2009. (Greene, Seth) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER with Pretrial Conference Draft Agenda attached. Pretrial Conference set for October 6, 2009, 10:00 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Conference Draft Agenda)(kl) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                TRIAL BRIEF Defendant's Memorandum Of Contentions Of Fact And Law, filed by USA. (Greene, Seth) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine To Preclude PG&E From Presenting Evidence Related To Legal Costs On Remand, filed by USA.Response due by 10/19/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Connor, James) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION Regarding Objections to Government Exhibits, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 10/19/2009.(Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Exclude Gregory A. Maret's Expert Testimony, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 10/19/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Objection to Exhibit List, filed by USA. Related document: 408 Exhibit List filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.(Donahue, Lisa) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Preclude Expert Testimony of William G. Jones, Jr., filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 10/19/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY Notice of Deposition and Trial Testimony Designations or, Alternatively, Motion for Leave to Admit Prior Testimony Into Evidence (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A-C)(Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER to inform the court of any request for expedited transcript of pretrial conference proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (kl) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Exhibit List Joint Exhibit List, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Exhibit List PG&E Remand Trial Exhibit List, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    TRIAL BRIEF PG&E's Remand Pre-Trial Brief, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Witness List, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Witness List, filed by USA. (Greene, Seth) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Exhibit List Defendant's Exhibit List For Remand Proceedings, filed by USA. (Greene, Seth) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER finding as MOOT 402 Motion for Status Conference. Status Conference was held 9/23/2009 11:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (kl) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Status Conference to Clarify Joint Exhibit Issues, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 10/9/2009.(Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER:Pretrial Brief due by 9/24/2009.Response due by 10/1/2009. Reply due by 10/8/2009. Exhibit List due by 9/24/2009. Witness List due by 9/24/2009. Motion in Limine due by 10/1/2009. Post-Trial Brief due 11/10/2009. Post-Trial Reply Brief due 11/19/2009. Trial Schedule due by 10/5/2009. Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2009 10:00 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Trial set for 10/15/2009-10/22/2009 09:00 AM in National Courts Building before Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. All pending motions are denied. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Trial Schedule Template)(el3) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-29) held on July 30, 2009 before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 8/10/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript for proceedings held on July 30, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT CORRECTED, filed by all parties. (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Clarification of 386 Order on Motion to Compel Regarding Mr. Zabransky's Deposition and for Expedited Consideration, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 7/30/2009.(Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 393 Motion for Status Conference Joint Status Report due by 7/29/2009. Status Conference set for 7/30/2009 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (el3) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Status Conference, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 7/24/2009.(Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-59) held on June 17, 2009 before Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/8/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/3/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on June 17, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 389 Motion to Amend/Correct Protective Order Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (el3) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 387 Order on Motion for Protective Order And Request For Expedited Consideration, filed by USA.Response due by 7/13/2009.(Keller, Joseph) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 376 MOTION to Strike The Expert Report Attached To Plaintiff's Opposition To The Government's Motion For Entry Of Judgment Upon The Existing Record, filed by USA. (Greene, Seth) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 380 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (el3) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part 375 Motion to Compel Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (el3) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 376 Motion to Strike, Frank Graves' Expert Witness Report As Attachment to Plaintiff's Opposition to Government's Motion to Narrow Scope of Remand, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 380 MOTION for Protective Order Addendum And Request For Expedited Consideration, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 380 MOTION for Protective Order Addendum And Request For Expedited Consideration, filed by USA.Reply due by 6/29/2009. (Donahue, Lisa) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 375 MOTION to Compel Responses to Contention Interrogatories and Request for Expedited Consideration, filed by USA.Reply due by 6/29/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Donahue, Lisa) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Response due by 6/16/2009 at 5:00 pm; Reply due by 6/18/2009 at noon. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jh4) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Protective Order Addendum And Request For Expedited Consideration, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 6/29/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: TSC set for 6/17/2009 03:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (el3) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-32) held on May 12, 2009 before Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/8/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on May 12, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike The Expert Report Attached To Plaintiff's Opposition To The Government's Motion For Entry Of Judgment Upon The Existing Record, filed by USA.Response due by 6/18/2009.(Greene, Seth) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Responses to Contention Interrogatories and Request for Expedited Consideration, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 6/15/2009.(Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to PG&E's Opposition To The Government's Motion For Entry Of Judgment Upon The Existing Record, filed by USA. (Greene, Seth) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part 372 Motion for Extension of Time Defendant's Expert Reports due by 6/12/2009. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 7/7/2009. All fact and expert depositions due by 7/20/2009. Status Report due by 7/21/2009. Status Conference on 7/22/2009 at 10:00 a.m. EDT at National Courts Building. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (el3) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION for Extension of Time until July 28, 2009 to Expert Reports And Remaining Dates in Court's Scheduling Order Dated January 15, 2009, filed by USA.Response due by 5/28/2009.(Greene, Seth) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 365 Response, PG&E's Opposition to the Government's Motion for Entry of Judgment on the Existing Record, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Part 1, # 2 Appendix Part 2)(Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-36) held on April 15, 2009 before Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 4/24/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/18/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on April 15, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 366 Motion Confirming Date for Response. Response due by 5/1/2009. Reply due by 5/18/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (el3) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/15/2009 04:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (el3) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Confirm Due Date for Response to Motion re 365 Response,, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 4/27/2009.(Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 345 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER finding as moot [342] Motion for Extension of Time; finding as moot [343] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (mem)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Statement of Damages Due, And Issues To Be Addressed, On Remand, And Motion For Entry Of Judgment Upon The Existing Record, filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Greene, Seth) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 344 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Settlement Joint Statement Of Settlement Regarding Sanctions, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY, USA (Lo Re, Alan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 362 Motion for Extension of Time (Response Brief due by 4/2/2009). Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (el3) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 343 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008, Terminated: 8/27/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/26/2008 to To File The Parties' Joint Stipulation Of Fees In Response To The Court's June 27, 2008 Order, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 362 First MOTION for Extension of Time until April 2, 2009 to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Damages and Issues on Remand MOTION for Extension of Time until April 2, 2009 to File Response or Reply, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Reply due by 4/13/2009. (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 342 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008, Terminated: 8/27/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/21/2008 to To File The Parties' Joint Stipulation Of Bill Of Costs, Pursuant To The Court's June 27, 2008 Order, filed by USA.Response due by 9/2/2008.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time until April 2, 2009 to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Damages and Issues on Remand, MOTION for Extension of Time until April 2, 2009 to File Response or Reply (Response due by 4/13/2009.), filed by USA.(Greene, Seth) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 341 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [340] Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Stipulation due by 8/15/2008. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (mem)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY re 358 Scheduling Order,, Plaintiff PG&E's Statement of Damages Due, and Issues to be Addressed, On Remand (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Part #1, # 2 Appendix Part #2, # 3 Appendix Part #3, # 4 Appendix Part #4)(Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 340 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008, Terminated: 8/14/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/15/2008 to To File The Parties' Joint Stipulation In Response To The Court's June 27, 2008 Order, filed by USA.Response due by 8/25/2008.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-33) held on January 15, 2009 before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 1/28/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 339 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part [338] Motion for Extension of Time Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (nag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on January 15, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 338 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008, Terminated: 7/16/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/1/2008, 8/22/2008, 9/8/2008 to File Joint Stipulation on Amount of Sanctions, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 7/28/2008.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's statement and notice due by 2/20/2009. Defendant's response to plaintiff's statement and notice due by 3/27/2009. Plaintiff's Expert Report due by 4/17/2009. Defendant's Expert Report due by 5/29/2009. Fact Discovery due by 7/7/2009. Interrogatories and document requests due by 4/17/2009. Status Report due by 7/8/2009 at or before 5:00 p.m. Status Conference set for 7/9/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (el3) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 337 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER FOR SANCTIONS Joint Statement due by 7/25/2008; Defendant's Bill due by 8/8/2008; Plaintiff's Counsel's Response due by 8/25/2008. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jh4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/15/2009 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (el3) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 336 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to [334] Supplemental Brief, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE, filed by all parties of Joint Request for Status Conference (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 335 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [334] Supplemental Brief Regarding Sanctions or Remedies as Requested in the Court's December 12, 2007 Order, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Defendant's Status Report, filed by USA. (Greene, Seth) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 334 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: [332] Order on Motion to Compel Regarding Appropriate Sanctions Or Remedies For Violation Of Protective Order, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 333 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerry Stouck (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 352 Motion for Extension of Time Status Report due by 12/17/2008 Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (el3) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 332 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [329] Motion to Compel Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (nag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until December 17, 2008 to To File a Status Report, filed by USA.Response due by 12/26/2008.(Greene, Seth) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 331 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [329] MOTION to Compel Compliance With The Court's May 14, 2006 Order Limiting Distribution And/Or Use Of Privileged Documents, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Seth W. Greene for USA. (Greene, Seth) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 330 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [329] MOTION to Compel Compliance With The Court's May 14, 2006 Order Limiting Distribution And/Or Use Of Privileged Documents, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Reply due by 6/18/2007. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Edward Crowley for USA. (Crowley, Stephen) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 329 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007, Terminated: 12/12/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Compliance With The Court's May 14, 2006 Order Limiting Distribution And/Or Use Of Privileged Documents, filed by USA.Response due by 6/8/2007. (Attachments: # (1))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 348 Motion for Extension of Time Status Report due by 12/12/2008 Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (el3) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 328 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/11/08 to File Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule for Further Proceedings, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 12/1/2008.(Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 327 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL, filed by USA. Copy to opposing party, judge and CAFC. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER:JSR due by 12/1/2008. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (el3) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 326 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Remark: Revised Notice of Docketing. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MANDATE of CAFC affirming in part and reversing in part 323 Published Opinion/Order, and Remanding. (hw1, ) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 325 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 CAFC Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CAFC Case Number 07-5046 for [324] Notice of Appeal filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 324 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 066029. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 323 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER denying plaintiff's motion, with the judgment entered on October 13, 2006, to stand as is. signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ef2, ). Document modified on 12/22/06 to indicate judgment has already been entered. Modified on 12/26/2006 to edit docket text. (dls).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 322 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [317] MOTION to Amend/Correct Findings and Judgment, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 321 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [317] MOTION to Amend/Correct Findings and Judgment, filed by USA.Reply due by 12/4/2006. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 320 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Notice of Compliance due by 11/20/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ef2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 317 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006, Terminated: 12/22/2006 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct Findings and Judgment, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 11/13/2006.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 319 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Certified Transcript to Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated October 16, 2006, forwarded to Jerry Stouck. See letter in file. (bre, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 318 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Transcript - Cumulative Index
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Cumulative Index for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 5, 2006 through June 15, 2006. (Attachments: # (1) List of Exhibits) (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 316 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $42,765,453.00. No costs. (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 315 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PUBLISHED OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ef2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 314 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [313] Order, filed by USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 313 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Notice of Compliance due by 10/11/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ef2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 312 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [309] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [1] Complaint, [5] Amended Complaint, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 311 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [309] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [1] Complaint, [5] Amended Complaint, filed by USA.Reply due by 8/23/2006. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 310 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER Re: [309] Motion to Amend.Response due by 8/9/2006. Reply due by 8/14/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 309 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006, Terminated: 10/13/2006 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [1] Complaint, [5] Amended Complaint, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 8/9/2006.(Stouck, Jerry) Modified on 8/3/2006 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 308 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [305] MOTION to Strike as Improper and Inadmissible Hearsay, Def's Counter-Designations of Deposition and Prior Trial Testimony, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 307 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [305] MOTION to Strike as Improper and Inadmissible Hearsay, Def's Counter-Designations of Deposition and Prior Trial Testimony, filed by USA.Reply due by 7/26/2006. (Sullivan, Marian) Modified on 7/20/2006 to correct reply deadline (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 306 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Before the court is [305] plaintiff's Motion to Strike.Response due by 7/19/2006. Reply due by 7/26/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 305 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006, Terminated: 10/13/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike as Improper and Inadmissible Hearsay, Def's Counter-Designations of Deposition and Prior Trial Testimony, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 7/24/2006.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 304 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [301] Post Trial Brief, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 303 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [300] Post Trial Brief, filed by USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 302 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Striking [299] Response.Objections shall be filed in appendix to Post Trial Reply Briefs due July 7, 2006 in accordance with Order of May 25, 2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 301 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 300 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 299 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            **STRUCK** RESPONSE to [292] Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Objections to Government's Counter-Designations, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry) Modified on 7/7/2006 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 298 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLISHED OPINION reissuing [208] Order of 4/27/06 granting-in-part and denying-in-part [174] Motion for Reconsideration with addition of footnote marked by *. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 297 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [295] Motion to Publish. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 296 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1928-3130) held on June 12-15, 2006 before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 295 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006, Terminated: 6/20/2006 Motion to Publish
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Publish [208] Order on Motion for Reconsideration, filed by USA.Response due by 7/6/2006.(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 294 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS FROM THE DEPOSITION OF DAVID DUKE (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/20/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 293 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: 6/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE, filed by USA Deposition Designations for David Duke (Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 292 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: 6/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE, filed by all parties re [290] Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, [286] Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) JOINT NOTICE OF DEPOSITION AND PRIOR TRIAL TESTIMONY DESIGNATIONS AND JOINT NOTICE OF EXHIBITS TO BE ENTERED THROUGH DESIGNATIONS (Attachments: # (1) Appendix 1# (2) Appendix 2# (3) Appendix 3# (4) Appendix 4# (5) Appendix 5# (6) Appendix 6# (7) Appendix 7# (8) Appendix 8# (9) Appendix 9# (10) Appendix 10# (11) Appendix 11# (12) Appendix 12# (13) Appendix 13# (14) Appendix 14# (15) Appendix 15# (16) Appendix 16# (17) Appendix 17# (18) Appendix 18# (19) Appendix 19# (20) Appendix 20# (21) Appendix 21# (22) Appendix 22# (23) Appendix 23# (24) Appendix 24)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 291 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 5-9, 2006 before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 290 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [289] Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff shall file a corrected copy on or before June 16, 2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 289 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006, Terminated: 6/12/2006 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct [286] Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) JOINT DEPOSITION AND PRIOR TRIAL TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATIONS TOGETHER WITH JOINT NOTICE OF EXHIBITS TO BE ADMITTED BY SUCH DESIGNATIONS, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 6/26/2006.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 288 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY of Filing of Corrected, Revised Exhibit List (Attachments: # (1) Corrected Revised Exhibit List)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 287 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE, filed by USA Of Filing Of Objections To Admission Of Exhibits Through Deposition Designations (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 286 Filed: 6/4/2006, Entered: 6/4/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE, filed by all parties of JOINT DEPOSITION AND PRIOR TRIAL TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATIONS TOGETHER WITH JOINT NOTICE OF EXHIBITS TO BE ADMITTED BY SUCH DESIGNATIONS (Attachments: # (1) Appendix 1# (2) Appendix 2# (3) Appendix 3# (4) Appendix 4# (5) Appendix 5# (6) Appendix 6# (7) Appendix 7# (8) Appendix 8# (9) Appendix 9# (10) Appendix 10# (11) Appendix 11# (12) Appendix 12# (13) Appendix 13# (14) Appendix 14# (15) Appendix 15# (16) Appendix 16# (17) Appendix 17# (18) Appendix 18# (19) Appendix 19# (20) Appendix 20# (21) Appendix 21# (22) Appendix 22# (23) Appendix 23# (24) Appendix 24)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 285 Filed: 6/4/2006, Entered: 6/4/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 284 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY of Filing Revised Trial Schedule (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 283 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [273] Response to Paragraph 10 of the Court's Order Regarding the Admissibility of Documents Created by the Nuclear Regulatory Commission, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 282 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY re [270] Notice (Other), [267] Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, of Filing PG&E's Counter-Designations to Defendant's Deposition Designations of James D. Shiffer (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 281 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE, filed by USA Of Its Counter-Designations Of Deposition Testimony (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 280 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: issues to be addressed, in addition to the trial schedule, at the TSC set for Friday, June 2, at 1:30 pm. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 279 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part [276] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 278 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [272] Notice (Other) of Filing of Trial Schedule and Motion to Compel Based Upon More Definite Statement, filed by USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 277 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [276] MOTION for Protective Order Or, In the Alternative, An Order Compelling the Further Deposition of Mr. David Zabransky, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Reply due by 6/14/2006. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 276 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006, Terminated: 6/1/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Protective Order Or, In the Alternative, An Order Compelling the Further Deposition of Mr. David Zabransky, filed by USA.Response due by 6/19/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 275 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006, Terminated: 10/13/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Discovery Concerning Document Produced By Plaintiff On May 24, 2006, filed by USA.Response due by 6/19/2006. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 274 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit List Supplement, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Supplemental Exhibit List)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/24/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 273 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [267] Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 272 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY Proposed Trial Schedule (Attachments: # (1) Trial Schedule)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 271 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY of its Supplemental Deposition and Prior Trial Testimony Designations (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 270 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE, filed by USA re [267] Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, of Defendant's Deposition Designations For James D. Shiffer (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 269 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 351-494) held on May 24, 2006 before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2006 (dw1, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 268 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-350) held on May 23, 2006 before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 267 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Post-Pretrial ORDER providing scheduling and requirements with respect to supplementation to deposition designations, deposition designations, and counter-designations; providing rulings on the parties' objections to exhibits; providing other miscellaneous orders; and denying [195] Motion in Limine, granting [205] Motion in Limine, granting [210] Motion in Limine, denying [212] Motion in Limine, denying [219] Motion in Limine, granting in part and denying in part [220] Motion in Limine, denying [245] Motion in Limine, denying [259] Motion to Have the Court Give Full Consideration to Certain Documentary Evidence. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 266 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [265] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Brief is due 5/30/06. Plaintiff's Reply is due 6/1/06. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 265 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006, Terminated: 5/25/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/30/06 to File Briefing On Whether Nuclear Regulatory Commission Documents Constitute "Admissions Of Party Opponent" In This Litigation, As Identified At Page 319 Of The Transcript Of The Court's May 23, 2006 Pre-Trial Conference, filed by USA.Response due by 6/12/2006.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 264 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [263] Motion for Authorization of Service 100+. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 263 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006, Terminated: 5/25/2006 Motion for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles, filed by USA.Response due by 6/12/2006.(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 262 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. Notice that plaintiff may pick up box left in chambers at the marshal's desk in the Lobby of the National Courts Building at or before 5:00 pm on 5/25/06. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 261 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [245] MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE FROM TRIAL DOCUMENTS PREPARED BY GOVERNMENT CONTRACTORS AND PROTECTIVE MOTION TO EXCLUDE ALL DOCUMENTS REGARDING THE STANDARD CONTRACT UPON PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST, filed by USA. (Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 260 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Witness List, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY, Exhibit List, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Revised Exhibit List and May Add Exhibit List)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 259 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006, Terminated: 5/25/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION TO GRANT FULL CONSIDERATION TO CERTAIN DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE RELATING TO REASONABLE PERFORMANCE AND GTCC WASTE, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 6/8/2006.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 258 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Witness List, filed by USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 257 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [235] Response to [202] Notice (Other) Of Plaintiff's Deposition Designations, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix a# (2) Appendix b)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 256 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [255] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Reply due by the end of today, 5/22/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 255 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006, Terminated: 5/22/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until End of Day, May 22, 2006 to Reply, filed by USA.Response due by 6/8/2006.(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 254 Filed: 5/20/2006, Entered: 5/20/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRETRIAL ORDER. Proposed pretrial agenda attached. Pretrial Conference set for 5/23/2006 09:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 253 Filed: 5/20/2006, Entered: 5/20/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [251] Motion for Extension of Time. Revised witness and exhibit lists due 5/22/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 252 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [245] MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE FROM TRIAL DOCUMENTS PREPARED BY GOVERNMENT CONTRACTORS AND PROTECTIVE MOTION TO EXCLUDE ALL DOCUMENTS REGARDING THE STANDARD CONTRACT UPON PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Reply due by 6/5/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Stouck, Jerry) Modified on 5/22/2006 to correct reply deadline (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 251 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006, Terminated: 5/20/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/22/2006 to to Submit Revised Exhibit and Witness lists, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 6/5/2006.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 250 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [249] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [245] MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE FROM TRIAL DOCUMENTS PREPARED BY GOVERNMENT CONTRACTORS AND PROTECTIVE MOTION TO EXCLUDE ALL DOCUMENTS REGARDING THE STANDARD CONTRACT UPON PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST. Response due by 5/19/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reset Deadlines: Reply to [245] MOTION in Limine due by 6/5/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 249 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006, Terminated: 5/19/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/19/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [245] MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE FROM TRIAL DOCUMENTS PREPARED BY GOVERNMENT CONTRACTORS AND PROTECTIVE MOTION TO EXCLUDE ALL DOCUMENTS REGARDING THE STANDARD CONTRACT UPON PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 6/5/2006.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 248 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit List of Designated "Will Use" Exhibits, filed by USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 247 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. Plaintiff shall file a reply to [235] defendant's response to plaintiff's designations on or before 3:00 pm on Monday, May 22, 2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 246 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [195] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony from John R. McGrath, filed by USA.Reply due by 5/30/2006. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 245 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006, Terminated: 5/25/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE FROM TRIAL DOCUMENTS PREPARED BY GOVERNMENT CONTRACTORS AND PROTECTIVE MOTION TO EXCLUDE ALL DOCUMENTS REGARDING THE STANDARD CONTRACT UPON PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST, filed by USA.Response due by 6/1/2006. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 244 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [219] MOTION in Limine to Exclude R. Larry Johnson's Expert Testimony, filed by USA.Reply due by 5/30/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 243 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [220] MOTION in Limine To Exclude Certain Expert Testimony At Trial, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Reply due by 5/30/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A# (2) Appendix B# (3) Appendix C)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 242 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection to Exhibit List, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Related document: [179] Scheduling Order,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Objections to Exhibit List)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 241 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [240] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of John R. McGrath is due on 5/16/06. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 240 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006, Terminated: 5/15/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until May 16, 2006 to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude John R. McGrath, filed by USA.Response due by 6/1/2006.(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 239 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Objection to Exhibit List, filed by USA. Related document: [179] Scheduling Order,.(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 238 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [212] MOTION in Limine Regarding Testimony Concerning The Meaning Of The Nuclear Waste Policy Act And The Standard Contract, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Reply due by 5/30/2006. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 237 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [210] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Jonathan Neuberger, filed by USA.Reply due by 5/30/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 236 Filed: 5/14/2006, Entered: 5/14/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part [231] Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 235 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [202] Notice (Other) Of Plaintiff's Deposition Designations, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 234 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Telephonic Request from the Court, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 233 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [230] Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 232 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [230] Motion to Strike Reply on Motion to Exclude Testimony from Warren Brewer, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines: Reply due by 5/26/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 231 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006, Terminated: 5/14/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents Withheld Under the Deliberative Process Privilege, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 5/30/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, Part I# (2) Exhibit A Part II# (3) Exhibit A Part III# (4) Exhibit B-D)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 230 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006, Terminated: 5/12/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike [225] Reply to Response to Motion in limine to Exclude Warren K. Brewer's Testimony, filed by USA.Response due by 5/30/2006.(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 229 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [227] Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel due 5/11/06. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 228 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [227] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 05/11/06 to File Motion to Compel, filed by USA.Reply due by 5/25/2006. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 227 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006, Terminated: 5/11/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 05/11/06 to File Motion to Compel, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 5/30/2006.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 226 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [224] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 225 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      **STRUCK** REPLY to Response to Motion re [205] Corrected MOTION in Limine to Exclude Warren K. Brewer's Expert Testimony, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry) Modified on 5/12/2006 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 224 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006, Terminated: 5/9/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/5/2006 to Deliver One Of The 29 Documents Required To Be Produced Pursuant To The Court's April 27 And May 4, 2006 Orders , One Day Out Of Time, filed by USA.Response due by 5/22/2006.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 223 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER:"Contractor" Motion due by 5/15/06. Response due 5/18/06. Reply due 5/22/06. Post-Trial Briefs due by 6/30/2006. Responses due by 7/7/06. 29 Documents and Revised Redacted Affidavits due to be produced Today. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, if any, due 5/10/06. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 222 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 221 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit List, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Exhibit List Cross Reference# (2) Supplement Exhibit List)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 220 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006, Terminated: 5/25/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine To Exclude Certain Expert Testimony At Trial, filed by USA.Response due by 5/22/2006. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12))(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 219 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006, Terminated: 5/25/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude R. Larry Johnson's Expert Testimony, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 5/22/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1 of Appendix A# (2) Appendix Part 2 of Appendix A)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 218 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit List, filed by USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 217 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [215] Motion for Extension of Time. Exhibit Lists and Objections to Witnesses due by 5/3/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 216 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [214] Motion for Extension of Time. Objections to Plaintiff's Depositions and Trial Designations due 5/12/06. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 215 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006, Terminated: 5/2/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 05/03/2006 to To File Exhibit Lists and Ojbections to Witnesses, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 5/18/2006.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 214 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006, Terminated: 5/2/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until May 12, 2006 to File Objections To Plaintiff's Deposition And Trial Designations, filed by USA. Response due by 5/18/2006.(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 213 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [211] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 5/3/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 212 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006, Terminated: 5/25/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine Regarding Testimony Concerning The Meaning Of The Nuclear Waste Policy Act And The Standard Contract, filed by USA. Response due by 5/18/2006.(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 211 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006, Terminated: 5/1/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until May 3, 2006 to File Defendant's Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by USA. Response due by 5/15/2006.(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 210 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006, Terminated: 5/25/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Jonathan Neuberger, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 5/15/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix pp. 1-35# (2) Appendix pp. 36-80)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 209 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [205] Corrected MOTION in Limine to Exclude Warren K. Brewer's Expert Testimony, filed by USA. Reply due by 5/12/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 208 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006, Terminated: 6/20/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [174] Motion for Reconsideration . Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 207 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY re [174] MOTION for Reconsideration re [169] Order on Motion to Compel, [171] Published Opinion, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 206 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PUBLISHED OPINION on [90] MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Counts II And III Of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by USA, . Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 205 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006, Terminated: 5/25/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corrected MOTION in Limine to Exclude Warren K. Brewer's Expert Testimony, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 5/12/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Part #2# (2) Part #3)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 204 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER accepting plaintiff's Designations.Defendant shall file any objections to plaintiff's Designations by 5/1/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 203 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [201] Motion for leave to Amend/Correct . Plaintiff shall file the corrected copy of its motion in limine as a separate document. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 202 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY ,of PG&E'S DEPOSITION AND TRIAL TESTIMONY DESIGNATIONS (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 201 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006, Terminated: 4/25/2006 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION to Amend/Correct [191] MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE WARREN K. BREWER'S EXPERT TESTIMONY, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 5/11/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Continuation of Appendix A# (2) Appendix Completion of Appendix A)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 200 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [199] Motion for Leave to File surreply Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 199 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006, Terminated: 4/24/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Surreply on Government Motion for Reconsideration of Court's March 14, 2006 Order Regarding Deliberative Process Privilege, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 5/11/2006.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 198 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by USA. (Ekman, John) Modified on 4/21/2006 to remove JPSR due date (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 197 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [174] MOTION for Reconsideration re [169] Order on Motion to Compel, [171] Published Opinion, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 196 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER:. Pretrial Conference set for 5/23/2006 at 09:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 195 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006, Terminated: 5/25/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony from John R. McGrath, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 5/5/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix pp. 1 - 25# (2) Appendix pp. 26 - 60)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 194 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Witness List, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 193 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Witness List, filed by USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 192 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/14/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [159] Motion to Compel . Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 191 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: 4/11/2006, Terminated: 10/13/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE WARREN K. BREWER'S EXPERT TESTIMONY, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 4/28/2006.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 190 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: 4/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE, filed by USA re [178] Scheduling Order, Of Submission Of Documents And Ex Parte Affidavits For In Camera Review (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 189 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: 4/11/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER for defendant to file answer.due by 4/21/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 188 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 187 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [186] Motion for Extension of Time .Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 4/10/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 186 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006, Terminated: 4/10/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/10/06 to File Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 4/24/2006.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 185 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [174] MOTION for Reconsideration re [169] Order on Motion to Compel, [171] Published Opinion, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 4/19/2006. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 184 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [183] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [174] MOTION for Reconsideration re [169] Order on Motion to Compel, [171] Published Opinion. Plaintiff's Response due by 4/5/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 183 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006, Terminated: 4/4/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 04/05/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [174] MOTION for Reconsideration re [169] Order on Motion to Compel, [171] Published Opinion, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 4/20/2006.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 3/23/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 182 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PUBLISHED OPINION on [101] MOTION to Strike Portions Of The Expert Report Of Brad Cornell Related To Future Damages filed by USA, and [125] MOTION To Establish Time Frame for Consideration of Future Damages filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY . Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 181 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [180] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority .Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 180 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006, Terminated: 3/28/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority Regarding Time Frame for Consideration of Damages, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 4/14/2006.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 179 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER:. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due 4/7/06. Response due 5/1/06. Witness Lists due by 4/17/2006. Objections made in motions due 5/1/06. Response to any motion due 5/15/06. Exhibit Lists due 5/1/06. Objections made in motions due 5/15/06. Revised exhibit and witness lists due 5/19/06. Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/06 at 09:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 178 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER:Defendant shall submit Ex Parte Affidavits and Documents it continues to withhold for review in camera. due by 4/11/2006. Plaintiff's Response still due by 4/3/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 177 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 22, 2006 before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 176 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE, filed by USA of Joint Certification (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 175 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re [174] MOTION for Reconsideration re [169] Order on Motion to Compel, [171] Published Opinion filed by USA, Response to Motion for Reconsideration due by 4/3/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 174 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006, Terminated: 4/27/2006 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration re [169] Order on Motion to Compel, [171] Published Opinion, filed by USA. Response due by 4/7/2006.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 173 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER scheduling hearing on motions regarding the establishment of a date through which plaintiff may seek damages in this case to be held at 11:00 am E.S.T. on 3/22/06. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, ) Modified on 3/20/2006 to clarify text. (dls ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Hearing set for 3/22/2006 at 11:00 AM before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dls )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 172 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER for plaintiff to produce to defendant documents. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 171 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PUBLISHED OPINION granting [53] Motion to Compel 458 Documents Withheld Under the Deliberative Process Privilege. Refiling [169] Order for clerical purposes. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 170 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [152] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 169 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [53] Motion to Compel 458 Documents Withheld under the Deliberative Process Privilege. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 168 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [159] MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents Improperly Withheld by Plaintiff on the Basis of Privilege, in Compliance With the Court's Order Dated January 25, 2006, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 167 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [159] MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents Improperly Withheld by Plaintiff on the Basis of Privilege, in Compliance With the Court's Order Dated January 25, 2006, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 3/23/2006. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 166 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [163] Motion for Reconsideration re [145] Published Opinion. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 165 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [164] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [159] MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents Improperly Withheld by Plaintiff on the Basis of Privilege, in Compliance With the Court's Order Dated January 25, 2006. Response due by 3/9/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 164 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006, Terminated: 3/8/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [159] MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents Improperly Withheld by Plaintiff on the Basis of Privilege, in Compliance With the Court's Order Dated January 25, 2006, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 3/24/2006. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 163 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006, Terminated: 3/9/2006 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re [145] Published Opinion,, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 3/20/2006. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 162 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER for plaintiff to cause to be delivered documents sought by defendant's [159] Motion to Compel to chambers on or before 3/7/06, the same day that plaintiff's response to defendant's [159] Motion to Compel is due. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 161 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [157] Motion for Extension of Time Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Report due by 3/10/2006. The parties shall complete depositions of expert witnesses by 4/14/06. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 160 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [148] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 159 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006, Terminated: 4/14/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents Improperly Withheld by Plaintiff on the Basis of Privilege, in Compliance With the Court's Order Dated January 25, 2006, filed by USA. Response due by 3/17/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix)(Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 158 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [152] MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ESTABLISH TIME FRAME FOR CONSIDERATION OF FUTURE DAMAGES, filed by USA. Reply due by 3/13/2006. (Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 157 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006, Terminated: 3/1/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until April 14, 2006 to To File Rebuttal Expert Witness Reports, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 3/13/2006. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 156 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [153] Order, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Chart of Affidavits and Corresponding Documents)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 155 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [154] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Motion to Compel, if filed, is due on 2/28/06. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 154 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006, Terminated: 2/22/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until February 28, 2006 to Submit Remaining Disputes Concerning Plaintiff's Privilege Logs to the Court, filed by USA. Response due by 3/10/2006. (Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 153 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER for plaintiff to file with the court the requested on or before 2/22/06. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 152 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006, Terminated: 3/14/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ESTABLISH TIME FRAME FOR CONSIDERATION OF FUTURE DAMAGES, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 2/27/2006. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 151 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [148] MOTION for Leave to File Notice Of Supplemental Authority Relating To Plaintiff's October 19, 2005 Motion To Compel, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 2/22/2006. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 150 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [149] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Motion to compel, if filed, is due by 2/21/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 149 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006, Terminated: 2/7/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until February 19, 2006 to File Motion To Compel, filed by USA. Response due by 2/23/2006. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 148 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006, Terminated: 3/1/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Notice Of Supplemental Authority Relating To Plaintiff's October 19, 2005 Motion To Compel, filed by USA. Response due by 2/21/2006. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 147 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER finding as moot [146] Motion for Extension of Time and ordering plaintiff to produce to defendant documents previously withheld . Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 146 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006, Terminated: 2/3/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/3/06 to Respond to Court's 1/25/06 Order Regarding Submission of Documents for In Camera Review, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 2/21/2006. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 145 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PUBLISHED OPINION on [67] Corrected MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents and Deposition Testimony Improperly Withheld On the Basis of Privilege filed by USA. Motion is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART . Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 144 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [125] MOTION To Establish Time Frame for Consideration of Future Damages, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 143 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [142] Motion for Extension of Time Defendant's Responsive Expert Report due by 2/6/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 142 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006, Terminated: 1/20/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until February 6, 2006 to Submit Expert Report, filed by USA. Response due by 2/6/2006. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 141 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY re [90] MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Counts II And III Of Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 140 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [139] Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 139 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006, Terminated: 1/18/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Motion for Summary Judgment on Restitution Claim, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 2/3/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Surreply)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 138 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [137] Motion for order regarding discovery of draft expert reports. Neither plaintiff nor defendant shall be required to produce draft expert reports. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 137 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006, Terminated: 1/17/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION For An Order Regarding Discovery Of Draft Expert Reports, filed by USA. Response due by 2/3/2006. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 136 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [90] MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Counts II And III Of Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 135 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [125] MOTION To Establish Time Frame for Consideration of Future Damages, filed by USA. Reply due by 1/23/2006. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 134 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [101] MOTION to Strike Portions Of The Expert Report Of Brad Cornell Related To Future Damages, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 133 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [131] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Replies due 1/9/06. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 132 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [130] Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Responsive Expert Report. Responsive Expert Report due by 1/27/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 131 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006, Terminated: 1/9/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until January 9, 2006 to File Reply Briefs, filed by USA. Response due by 1/23/2006. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 130 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006, Terminated: 1/9/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until January 27, 2006 to Submit Responsive Expert Reports, filed by USA. Response due by 1/23/2006. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 129 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/3/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [113] Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 128 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PUBLISHED OPINION reissuing [123] Order for Electronic Case Filing purposes. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 127 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: [113] Motion to Compel, filed by USA. (Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 126 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [124] Motion for Leave to Supplement [113] Motion. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 125 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005, Terminated: 3/30/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION To Establish Time Frame for Consideration of Future Damages, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 1/9/2006. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 124 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005, Terminated: 12/29/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement Motion for Entry of an Order Compelling the Production of Documents from Third Party Envirocare of Utah, LLC, filed by USA. Response due by 1/9/2006. (Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 123 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER reissuing 12/2/05 Order with addition of footnote marked by *. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 122 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [119] Motion to Publish. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 121 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [107] Motion for Clarification and ordering that footnote 2 in the court's 12/2/05 Order [104] be STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 120 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [118] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [114] Response to Motion, and [115] Response to Motion. Reply re [90] MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Counts II And III Of Plaintiff's Complaint due by 1/6/06. Reply re [101] MOTION to Strike Portions Of The Expert Report Of Brad Cornell Related To Future Damages due by 1/6/06. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 119 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005, Terminated: 12/22/2005 Motion to Publish
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Publish [104] Order on Motion to Compel, filed by USA. Response due by 1/9/2006. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 118 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005, Terminated: 12/21/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [114] Response to Motion,, [115] Response to Motion, filed by USA. Response due by 1/9/2006. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies to [114] and [115] due by 1/3/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 117 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [116] Motion for Leave to Forego Submitting Response to Defendant's Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 116 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005, Terminated: 12/19/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Leave to Forego Submitting Response re [91] Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 1/3/2006. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 115 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [90] MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Counts II And III Of Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 1/3/2005. (Stouck, Jerry) Modified on 12/20/2005 to correct reply deadline (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 114 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [101] MOTION to Strike Portions Of The Expert Report Of Brad Cornell Related To Future Damages, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 1/3/2006. (Stouck, Jerry) Modified on 12/20/2005 to correct reply deadline (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 113 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005, Terminated: 1/3/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Third Party Envirocare of Utah, LLC, filed by USA. Response due by 1/3/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix)(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 112 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [107] MOTION for Clarification of [104] Order on Motion to Compel, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 111 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [107] MOTION for Clarification of [104] Order on Motion to Compel, filed by USA. Reply due by 12/28/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 110 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER accepting deficient [109] filing. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 109 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [105] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until December 9, 2005 to File Response or Reply as to [98] Response to Motion, to Compel Documents Withheld Under the Deliberative Process Privilege, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part I# (2) Appendix Part II# (3) Appendix Part III# (4) Appendix Part IV# (5) Appendix Part V# (6) Appendix Part VI)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 108 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER responding to [107] Motion for Clarification. The court WILL CONSIDER plaintiff's Motion after expedited briefing. Defendant's Response due 12/13/05. Plaintiff's Reply due 12/15/05. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 107 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005, Terminated: 12/21/2005 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Clarification of [104] Order on Motion to Compel, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 12/27/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 106 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [105] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [53] Corrected MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld under the "Deliberative Process" Privilege Reply due by 12/9/2005. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 105 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005, Terminated: 12/7/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until December 9, 2005 to File Response or Reply as to [98] Response to Motion, to Compel Documents Withheld Under the Deliberative Process Privilege, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 12/23/2005. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 104 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part [55] Motion to Compel Doc Req 22. Plaintiff shall narrow and revise its request. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 103 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [102] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [53] Corrected MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld under the "Deliberative Process" Privilege. Reply due by 12/7/2005. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 102 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005, Terminated: 11/30/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/7/05 to File Response or Reply as to [98] Response to Motion,, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 12/16/2005. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 101 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005, Terminated: 3/30/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike Portions Of The Expert Report Of Brad Cornell Related To Future Damages, filed by USA. Response due by 12/16/2005. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 100 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Striking [96] duplicate of Reply to Response to Motion. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 99 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [95] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to [53] Corrected MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld under the "Deliberative Process" Privilege and the Court's November 16, 2005 Order. Response due by 11/23/2005. Reply due by 11/30/2005. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 98 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [53] Corrected MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld under the "Deliberative Process" Privilege and Court's November 16, 2005 Order, filed by USA. Reply due by 12/7/2005. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12) # (13) # (14) # (15) # (16) # (17) # (18) # (19))(Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 97 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [67] Corrected MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents and Deposition Testimony Improperly Withheld On the Basis of Privilege, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12))(Lo Re, Alan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 96 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [67] Corrected MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents and Deposition Testimony Improperly Withheld On the Basis of Privilege, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1# (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12))(Snyder, Sharon) Modified on 11/29/2005 Struck by Order [100] (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 95 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005, Terminated: 11/28/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [53] Corrected MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld under the "Deliberative Process" Privilege and the Court's November 16, 2005 Order, filed by USA. Response due by 12/9/2005. (Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 94 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER to file regulations regarding delegations of authority by 11/22/05. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 93 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [92] Motion for Extension of Time to respond to [53] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Response due 11/22/05. Reply due 11/29/05 . Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines: Regulations regarding delegations of authority due by 11/22/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines: re: [53] Motion to Compel. Response due by 11/22/2005. Reply due by 11/29/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 92 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005, Terminated: 11/16/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/22/05 to Respond To Motion To Compel, filed by USA. Response due by 12/2/2005. (Lo Re, Alan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 91 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [90] MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Counts II And III Of Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 90 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005, Terminated: 4/25/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Counts II And III Of Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by USA. Dispositive Motion Response due by 12/16/2005, (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 89 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [54] Motion for Leave to Take Third Party Deposition After Close of Discovery. Defendant permitted to take Holtec Deposition for one day of seven hours. See RCFC 30(d)(2). Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 88 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [67] Corrected MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents and Deposition Testimony Improperly Withheld On the Basis of Privilege, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 11/23/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Exh A - Part 1# (2) Appendix Exh A, Part 2# (3) Appendix Exh A, Part 3# (4) Appendix Exh B-D)(Stouck, Jerry) Modified on 11/15/2005 to correct the reply date (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 87 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [84] Motion for Leave to File Corrected Response. Plaintiff shall electronically file the corrected response as a new doc. Defendant's reply remains due on 11/23/05. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 86 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [85] Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to File its Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Docs Withheld under the "Deliberative Process" Privilege. Response due 11/15/05. Reply due 11/22/05 . Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reset Deadlines: regarding [67] Corrected MOTION to Compel: Reply due by 11/23/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 85 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005, Terminated: 11/15/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/15/05 to Respond To Motion To Compel, filed by USA. Response due by 12/1/2005. (Lo Re, Alan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 84 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005, Terminated: 11/15/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Response to Motion to Compel, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 12/1/2005. (Attachments: # (1))(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 83 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/11/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [67] Corrected MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents and Deposition Testimony Improperly Withheld On the Basis of Privilege, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 11/28/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A, Part I# (2) Appendix A, Part 2# (3) Appendix A, part 3# (4) Appendix B - D)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 82 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [81] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to plaintiff's response to [67] Corrected MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents and Deposition Testimony Improperly Withheld On the Basis of Privilege. Reply due by 11/23/2005. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 81 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005, Terminated: 11/10/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until November 23, 2005 to File Response or Reply as to [80] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, filed by USA. Response due by 11/28/2005. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 80 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [77] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [67] Corrected MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents and Deposition Testimony Improperly Withheld On the Basis of Privilege. Response due by 11/10/2005. Reply due by 11/17/2005. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 79 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [75] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [53] Corrected MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld under the "Deliberative Process" Privilege. Response due by 11/14/2005. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 78 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [76] Motion for Extension of Time within which to answer interrogatories . Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 77 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005, Terminated: 11/7/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 11-10-05 to File Response or Reply as to [49] MOTION to Compel Documents and Testimony Improperly Withheld on The Basis of Privilege, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 11/21/2005. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 76 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005, Terminated: 11/7/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/8/2005 to To Respond To Plaintiff's October 21, 2005 Interrogatories Regarding Document Production, filed by USA. Response due by 11/21/2005. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 75 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005, Terminated: 11/7/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/14/2005 to File Response or Reply as to [53] Corrected MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld under the "Deliberative Process" Privilege, filed by USA. Response due by 11/21/2005. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 74 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [71] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to [49] MOTION to Compel Documents and Testimony Improperly Withheld on The Basis of Privilege. Response due 11/4/05. Reply due 11/11/05. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 73 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [54] MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion for Leave to Take Third Party Deposition After Close of Discovery, filed by USA. (Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 72 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re [70] Response to Motion, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. The parties are advised that a proper signature is required on all filings. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 71 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005, Terminated: 11/1/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/4/05 to File Response or Reply as to [49] MOTION to Compel Documents and Testimony Improperly Withheld on The Basis of Privilege, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 11/18/2005. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 70 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [54] MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion for Leave to Take Third Party Deposition After Close of Discovery, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 11/4/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1- 3)(Stouck, Jerry) Modified on 11/1/2005 to correct reply date (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines: re: [49] MOTION to Compel. Response due by 11/4/2005. Reply due by 11/11/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: re: [54] MOTION for Extension of Time. Reply due by 11/4/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 69 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [68] Motion for Extension of Time to respond to interrogatories and also granting request to send a courtesy copy of responses in lieu of a fax. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 68 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005, Terminated: 10/28/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/3/2005 to To Respond To Plaintiff's Interrogatories Regarding Document Production, And Defendant's Motion To Modify The Requirement Contained In The Court's October 18, 2005 Order To Fax Its Written Responses To The Court, filed by USA. Response due by 11/14/2005. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 67 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005, Terminated: 1/25/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Corrected MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents and Deposition Testimony Improperly Withheld On the Basis of Privilege, filed by USA. Response due by 11/14/2005. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12) # (13) # (14) # (15) # (16) # (17) # (18) # (19) # (20))(Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 66 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [63] Motion to Amend/Correct defendant's [49] Motion to Compel the Production of Documents and Deposition Testimony Improperly Withheld on the Basis of Privilege. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 65 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [55] First MOTION to Compel Discovery for Document Request 22, filed by USA. Reply due by 11/8/2005. (Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 64 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER regarding [54]: Response due by 10/31/2005Reply due by 11/4/2005. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 63 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005, Terminated: 10/26/2005 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct [49] MOTION to Compel Documents and Testimony Improperly Withheld on The Basis of Privilege, filed by USA. Response due by 11/14/2005. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12) # (13) # (14) # (15) # (16) # (17) # (18) # (19) # (20) # (21))(Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 62 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [41] Motion for Leave to File Amended Declaration of Thomas E. Pollog Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 61 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 14, 2005 before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reset Deadlines: re: [65] RESPONSE. Reply due by 11/7/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines: Response due by 10/31/2005. Reply due by 11/4/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/24/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/19/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 60 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [57] Motion for Clarification Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 59 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part [56] Motion for Reconsideration re [51] Order on Motion for Discovery Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 58 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 17, 2005 before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 57 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005, Terminated: 10/24/2005 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Clarification of [51] Order on Motion for Discovery, filed by USA. Response due by 11/7/2005. (Lo Re, Alan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 56 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005, Terminated: 10/24/2005 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Motion to Compel Order, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 11/7/2005. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 55 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005, Terminated: 12/2/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First MOTION to Compel Discovery for Document Request 22, filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 11/7/2005. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 54 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005, Terminated: 11/15/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion for Leave to Take Third Party Deposition After Close of Discovery, filed by USA. Response due by 11/7/2005. (Cochran, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 53 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005, Terminated: 3/14/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Corrected MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld under the "Deliberative Process" Privilege filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 11/7/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1# (2) Appendix Part 2# (3) Appendix Part 3# (4) Appendix Part 4# (5) Appendix Part 5)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 52 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER for courtesy copy Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 51 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [37] Motion To Compel Discovery Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 50 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting motion for leave to file corrected copy Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 49 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005, Terminated: 1/25/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Documents and Testimony Improperly Withheld on The Basis of Privilege filed by USA. Response due by 10/31/2005. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12) # (13) # (14) # (15) # (16) # (17) # (18) # (19) # (20))(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 48 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005, Terminated: 10/17/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Version of October 7, 2005 Motion to Compel Production of Documents Withheld under the "Deliberative Process" Privilege filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 10/28/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Corrected Motion to Compel)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 47 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference regarding discovery dispute set for 10/14/2005 02:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 46 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [41] MOTION for Leave to File "Amended Declaration Of Thomas E. Pollog" To Accompany Defendant's September 15, 2005 Response To Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Discovery filed by USA. (Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 45 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005, Terminated: 3/14/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld Under the Deliberative Process Privilege filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 10/24/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1# (2) Appendix Part 2# (3) Appendix Part 3# (4) Appendix Part 4)(Stouck, Jerry) Modified on 3/15/2006 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 44 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER requesting that parties determine agreeable date and time for TSC regarding discovery dispute Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ahr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 43 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [41] MOTION for Leave to File "Amended Declaration Of Thomas E. Pollog" To Accompany Defendant's September 15, 2005 Response To Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Discovery filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 10/17/2005. (Stouck, Jerry) Modified on 10/5/2005 (dw1, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 10/17/2005. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 42 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [37] First MOTION for Discovery --To Compel Discovery and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 41 Filed: 9/17/2005, Entered: 9/17/2005, Terminated: 10/25/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File "Amended Declaration Of Thomas E. Pollog" To Accompany Defendant's September 15, 2005 Response To Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Discovery filed by USA. Response due by 10/4/2005. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 40 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [37] First MOTION for Discovery --To Compel Discovery and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by USA. Reply due by 9/29/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix)(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 39 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005, Terminated: 10/13/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [37] First MOTION for Discovery --To Compel Discovery and Request for Expedited Hearing,until 9/15/2005, filed by USA. Response due by 10/3/2005. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005, Terminated: 10/13/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [37] First MOTION for Discovery --To Compel Discovery and Request for Expedited Hearing,until 9/14/2005, filed by USA. Response due by 9/29/2005. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005, Terminated: 10/18/2005 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION for Discovery --To Compel Discovery and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 9/12/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit 10# (11) Exhibit 11# (12) Exhibit 12)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: On or before 8/29/2005, plaintiff shall refile its 8/19/2005 Motion to Compel Discovery, incorrectly filed as docket item no. 25 in case no. 04-75C, in this case, 04-74C, the designated lead of the consolidated cases. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (cn1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [34] Motion to Amend/Correct. The Clerk of the Court shall strike plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition, now appearing as document No. 33, from the record in this case. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (cn1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005, Terminated: 8/11/2005 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct [33] Notice (Other) Withdraw Inadvertent Filing filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 8/15/2005. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition (Stouck, Jerry) Modified on 8/11/2005 (jat, ). (See Order of 8/11/05 striking this document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerry Stouck (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (cn1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [25] MOTION for Protective Order Governing Confidential and Privileged or Protected Materials and Request for Expedited Consideration filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: As soon as practicable, the parties shall cause documents containing proposed protective order language from [25] plaintiff's motion, [28] defendent's response, and from any reply filed by plaintiff on or before April 18, 2005 to be delivered in a format amenable to editing (i.e., non-PDF format) to the following email address: Christy_Noel@ao.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (cn1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [25] MOTION for Protective Order Governing Confidential and Privileged or Protected Materials and Request for Expedited Consideration filed by USA. Reply due by 4/29/2005. (Attachments: # (1))(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: defendant shall file any response to plaintiff's [25] Motion for Protective Order on or before Friday, April 15, 2005, and plaintiff shall reply to any such response on or before Monday, April 18, 2005. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (cn1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 4/15/2005. Reply due by 4/18/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [23] Motion to Consolidate Cases and designating case No. 04-74C as the lead case. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (cn1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005, Terminated: 4/21/2005 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Protective Order Governing Confidential and Privileged or Protected Materials and Request for Expedited Consideration filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 4/25/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER deferring ruling on [23] Motion to Consolidate Cases until plaintiff also moves for consolidation in case No. 04-75C. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (cn1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005, Terminated: 4/12/2005 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases 04-75C with this case filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 4/18/2005 (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [21] Joint Motion for Entry of an Order Governing the Preservation of E-Mail and Other Electronic Evidence and adopting the order proposed in Exhibit 1 as an order, to remain in effect until further order of the court. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (cn1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005, Terminated: 3/10/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Entry of an Order Governing the Preservation of E-mail and Other Electronic Evidence filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY, USA. Response due by 3/25/2005 (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Disclosures completed by 4/22/05. Fact Discovery concluded by 10/21/05. Plaintiff's Expert Reports due by 11/10/05. Defendant's Responsive Expert Reports due by 1/20/06. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 2/24/06. Expert Discovery concluded by 3/10/06. Meeting of Counsel by 3/17/06. Plaintiff's App.A Filings (Pretrial Brief, Exhibit & Witness Lists, Motions) due by 4/7/06. Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's App.A Motions due by 4/21/06. Defendant's Opposing App.A Filings (Opposing Pretrial Brief, Exhibit & Witness Lists, Motions) due by 5/1/06. Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's App.A Motions due by 5/15/06. Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/06 in National Courts Building before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Trial set for 6/5-9/06 & 6/12-16/06 at 09:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (cn1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's responses to plaintiff's motions due by 4/21/2006; and Plaintiff's responses to defendant's motions due by 5/15/2006. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 3/10/2006; Plaintiff's expert report due by 11/10/2005; Defendant's responsive expert report due by 1/20/06; Plaintiff's rebuttal expert report due by 2/24/2006. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/13/05 before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (eph, ) Modified on 1/31/2005 to change document number to "0" as there is no pdf attached. The transcript is available for viewing in the Clerk's Office. (dls).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Disclosures completed by 4/1/05. Fact Discovery concluded by 9/23/05. Plaintiff's Expert Reports due by 10/21/05. Defendant's Responsive Expert Reports due by 12/30/05. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 2/3/06. Expert Discovery concluded by 2/17/06. Meeting of Counsel by 3/3/06. Plaintiff's App.A Filings (Pretrial Brief, Exhibit & Witness Lists, Motions) due by 3/24/06. Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's App.A Motions due by 4/3/06. Defendant's Opposing App.A Filings (Opposing Pretrial Brief, Exhibit & Witness Lists, Motions) due by 4/14/06. Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's App.A Motions due by 4/24/06. Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/06 in National Courts Building before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Trial set for 5/8-12/06 & 5/15-19/06 at 09:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (cn1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/13/2005 at 2:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Held concurrently with status conference in case No. 04-75C. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (cn1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/3/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT , Motion to Enter Pretrial Schedule and Request for Status Conference to Set Trial Date by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/3/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT Requesting Continuance of Stay by USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [7] Motion to Stay and finding as moot [11] Motion for Reconsideration. This case is STAYED until further order of the court. The parties shall file a joint status report, or separate status reports if they cannot agree, on or before Friday, 12/31/2004 addressing whether the stay should continue and suggesting further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [10] Order re: Notice of Discovery Conference filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix)(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The court is inclined to stay the case until the earlier of the dates suggested by the parties in [7] defendant's motion for stay and [9] plaintiff's response, 12/31/04, or until further order of the court. If the parties or either of them object to or wish to discuss the foregoing in a status conference, they shall advise the court by motion filed on or before Friday, 4/30/04. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004, Terminated: 5/5/2004 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration re [10] Order For Pre-Discovery Conference in New Spent Fuel Cases by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 5/6/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 and 2# (2) Exhibit 3 through 8)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Pre-Discovery Conference. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jb2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [7] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 4/22/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1- 01/30/04 Order# (2) Exhibit 2- 06/26/03 Order)(Freas, Monica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by John Clifford Ekman for USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *** Attorney Harold Dewitt Lester terminated. (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004, Terminated: 5/5/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery by USA. Response due by 4/8/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT , filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Corporate Disclosure Statement)(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [04-0075C] by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Service: 1/22/04.(copy to defendant)(lg1, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059534), filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Answer Due by 3/22/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 116 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?