MILLER et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-vv-00122-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ISAIAH MILLER, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Catherine Joan Smith +1 504 365 7490 +1 504 365 7493 cmit100@bellsouth.net
No Logo KIESHA MILLER, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Catherine Joan Smith +1 504 365 7490 +1 504 365 7493 cmit100@bellsouth.net
No Logo THOMAS MILLER, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Catherine Joan Smith +1 504 365 7490 +1 504 365 7493 cmit100@bellsouth.net
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexis B Babcock +1 202 616 7678 +1 202 616 4310 alexis.babcock@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/29/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Dismissed by Special Master
County None
Terminated 9/1/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that the petition is dismissed with prejudice. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004
    DECISION Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (jat, )
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004 Transcript
      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 8, 2004 before Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (dw1)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Margaret Sweeney : A Status Conference was held on July 8, 2004. Ms. Catherine Smith represented petitioners and Ms. Alexis Babcock represented respondent. (kb1, )
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004 Order
          ORDER regarding on-the-record status conference held on 7/08/04. Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004
            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 8/9/2004. (vp1, )
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Terminated:
              MOTION to Dismiss by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Service: 7/06/04. Response due by 7/23/2004 (tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Respondent's Report
                Respondent's Report by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Service: 7/06/04. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Description not available
                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference reset for 7/8/2004 03:30 PM (EDT) before Special Master Margaret Sweeney. Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Description not available
                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/6/2004 10:00 AM before Special Master Margaret Sweeney. Respondent's Rule 4(b) Report is vacated. Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (jat, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Margaret Sweeney : A Status Conference was held on March 12, 2004. Ms. Catherine Joan Smith represented petitioners and Ms. Alexis Babcock represented respondent. (kb1, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004
                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Telephonic Status Conference reset for 3/12/2004 03:45 PM before Special Master Margaret Sweeney. Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (jat, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Description not available
                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Telephone Status Conference set for 3/11/2004 03:00 PM before Special Master Margaret Sweeney. Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis Bronwyn Babcock for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 2/05/04.(tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Order
                              ORDER re: Petitioner shall confer with Respondent and contact the Court by 2/27/04 to suggest dates and times for the initial conference call. Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (jat, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Notice Of Assignment
                                NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Margaret Sweeney (tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Petition
                                  PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059607) , filed by ISAIAH MILLER, KIESHA MILLER, THOMAS MILLER.Respondents Report Due by 4/28/2004.(tjk, )
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 141 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?