PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00075-ECH
District Judge Emily C. Hewitt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

PG&E Corporation PG&E Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY"

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Clifford Ekman +1 202 353 0897 +1 202 307 2503 john.ekman@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/22/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County None
Terminated 10/13/2006
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
104-cv-00074-ECH 04-0074C
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, MEMBER, SNF
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $89,004,415.00 in damages through December 31, 2004, due to the governments partial breach of the Standard Contract. (lld) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006
    JUDGMENT entered See 04-74C (lld, )
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until December 17, 2008 to File Status Report, filed by USA.Response due by 12/26/2008.(Greene, Seth) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006 Court Filing
        ORDER for plaintiff to cause to be delivered documents sought by defendant's [159] Motion to Compel to chambers on or before 3/7/06, the same day that plaintiff's response to defendant's [159] Motion to Compel is due. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. [duplicate filed in the lead case] (ahr, ) Modified on 3/1/2006 (mb2, ).
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Appearance by Seth W. Greene for USA. (Greene, Seth) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005
            On 10/17/05, document was inadvertently filed in this case instead of the lead case and has been deleted and re-filed in the proper docket. (dls) Modified on 10/17/2005 to correct text (jat, ).
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Edward Crowley for USA. (Crowley, Stephen) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005, Terminated: 10/13/2006 Motion for Discovery
                First MOTION for Discovery --Compel Discovery & Request Expedited Hearing filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 9/6/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit 10# (11) Exhibit 11# (12) Exhibit 12)(Stouck, Jerry)
                LREF
                Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Court Filing
                ORDER granting [23] Motion to Consolidate Cases and designating case No. 04-74C as the lead case. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (cn1, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005, Terminated: 4/12/2005 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                  Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases 04-00074 with this case filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 4/25/2005 (Stouck, Jerry)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 4/25/2005 (jat, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Court Filing
                      ORDER granting [21] Joint Motion for Entry of an Order Governing the Preservation of E-Mail and Other Electronic Evidence and adopting the order proposed in Exhibit 1 as an order, to remain in effect until further order of the court. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (cn1, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005, Terminated: 3/10/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                        Joint MOTION for Entry of an Order Governing the Preservation of E-Mail and Other Electronic Evidence filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY, USA. Response due by 3/25/2005 (Stouck, Jerry)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 Court Filing
                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Disclosures completed by 4/22/05. Fact Discovery concluded by 10/21/05. Plaintiff's Expert Reports due by 11/10/05. Defendant's Responsive Expert Reports due by 1/20/06. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 2/24/06. Expert Discovery concluded by 3/10/06. Meeting of Counsel by 3/17/06. Plaintiff's App.A Filings (Pretrial Brief, Exhibit & Witness Lists, Motions) due by 4/7/06. Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's App.A Motions due by 4/21/06. Defendant's Opposing App.A Filings (Opposing Pretrial Brief, Exhibit & Witness Lists, Motions) due by 5/1/06. Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's App.A Motions due by 5/15/06. Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/06 in National Courts Building before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Trial set for 6/5-9/06 & 6/12-16/06 at 09:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt.(cn1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 3/10/2006; Plaintiff's expert report due by 11/10/2005; Defendant's responsive expert report due by 1/20/2006; Plaintiff's rebuttal expert report due by 2/24/2006; Defendant's reponses to any motions filed by plaintiff by 4/21/2006; and Plaintiff's responses to any motions filed by Defendant due by 5/15/2006. (jat, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Court Filing
                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Disclosures completed by 4/1/05. Fact Discovery concluded by 9/23/05. Plaintiff's Expert Reports due by 10/21/05. Defendant's Responsive Expert Reports due by 12/30/05. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 2/3/06. Expert Discovery concluded by 2/17/06. Meeting of Counsel by 3/3/06. Plaintiff's App.A Filings (Pretrial Brief, Exhibit & Witness Lists, Motions) due by 3/24/06. Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's App.A Motions due by 4/3/06. Defendant's Opposing App.A Filings (Opposing Pretrial Brief, Exhibit & Witness Lists, Motions) due by 4/14/06. Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's App.A Motions due by 4/24/06. Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/06 in National Courts Building before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Trial set for 5/8-12/06 & 5/15-19/06 at 09:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (cn1, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Court Filing
                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/13/2005 at 2:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Held concurrently with status conference in case No. 04-74C. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (cn1, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/3/2005
                                  STATUS REPORT , Motion to Enter Pretrial Schedule, and Request for Status Conference to Set Trial Date by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/3/2005
                                    STATUS REPORT Requesting Continuance of Stay by USA. (Ekman, John)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting [8] Motion to Stay and finding as moot [12] Motion for Reconsideration. This case is STAYED until further order of the court. The parties shall file a joint status report, or separate status reports if they cannot agree, on or before Friday, 12/31/2004 addressing whether the stay should continue and suggesting further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                        RESPONSE to [11] Order re: Notice of Pre-Discovery Conference filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix)(Ekman, John)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004 Court Filing
                                        ORDER: The court is inclined to stay the case until the earlier of the dates suggested by the parties in [8] defendant's motion for stay and [10] plaintiff's response, 12/31/04, or until further order of the court. If the parties or either of them object to or wish to discuss the foregoing in a status conference, they shall advise the court by motion filed on or before Friday, 4/30/04. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004, Terminated: 5/5/2004 Motion for Reconsideration
                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re [11] Order For Pre-Discovery Conference in New Spent Fuel Cases by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 5/6/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 and 2# (2) Exhibit 3 through 8)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Court Filing
                                            Notice of Pre-Discovery Conference. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jb2)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004
                                              RESPONSE to [8] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 4/22/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1- 01/30/2004 Order# (2) Exhibit 2- 06/26/03 Order)(Freas, Monica)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by John Clifford Ekman for USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                *** Attorney Harold Dewitt Lester terminated. (dls)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004, Terminated: 5/5/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                  MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery by USA. Response due by 4/8/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                      Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Service: 1/28/2004 (copy to defendant).(lg1, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT , filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.(lg1, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                                                            NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [04-0075C] by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Service: 1/22/04(copy to defendant).(lg1, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (lg1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059533), filed by PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.Answer Due by 3/22/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 224 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?