DOMINION RESOURCES, INC. et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00083-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DOMINION NUCLEAR CONNECTICUT, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
No Logo Dominion Resources, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Lefante Donahue +1 202 353 9498 +1 202 514 8624 lisa.donahue@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/23/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case 04-0084C
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status TrlHeld
Flags ECF, PROTO, SNF
  Entries (120) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 105 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Court Filing
ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ff)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008
    ORDER denying [100] Motion to Coordinate Discovery and Develop a Litigation Plan for the Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ff)
      LREF
      Legal Document 104 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008
      SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, filed by DOMINION RESOURCES, INC., DOMINION NUCLEAR CONNECTICUT, INC.. (Fagg, Arnold)
        LREF
        Legal Document 103 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008
        SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Donahue, Lisa)
          LREF
          Legal Document 102 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008
          RESPONSE to August 21, 2008 E-Mail Inquiry, filed by USA. (Donahue, Lisa)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008
            ORDER granting [101] Motion for Extension of Time Supplemental Pleadings due by 9/2/2008Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (alc)
              LREF
              Legal Document 101 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008, Terminated: 8/25/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/2/08 to to file supplemental brief, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Donahue, Lisa)
                LREF
                Legal Document 100 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008, Terminated: 9/3/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 99 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Court Filing
                  ORDER for Supplemental Briefs due by 8/27/08. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ff)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008
                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Supplemental Briefs due by 8/27/2008. (jt1)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008
                      Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, D.C. on 5/5/2008, ended on 5/16/2008, before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink: Trial. [Total number of days of proceeding: 10]. Official record of proceeding taken by court reporter. (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(ff)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Court Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-160) held on July 30, 2008 before Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 8/14/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2008. (dw1)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 97 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008
                          Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on July 30, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008
                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines for 7/30/08 proceeding: Transcript due by 8/11/2008. (lld)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 96 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008
                              POST TRIAL BRIEF : Plaintiffs' Post-Trial Reply Brief, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 95 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
                                POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Donahue, Lisa)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 94 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Transcript - Cumulative Index
                                  Cumulative Index (pages 1-22) for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 5, 2008 through May 16, 2008. Filed with plaintiff and defendant exhibits. (dw1)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 93 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008
                                    POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by DOMINION RESOURCES, INC., DOMINION NUCLEAR CONNECTICUT, INC.. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 92 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008
                                      Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on May 13, 2008 held in Washington, D.C.. (dw1)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Court Filing
                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 13, 2008 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/27/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/19/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2008. (dw1)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 90 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008
                                          Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on May 12, 2008 in Washington, D.C.. (dw1)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Court Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 12, 2008 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/27/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/19/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2008. (dw1)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 88 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008
                                              Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on May 16, 2008 in Washington, D.C.. (dw1)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Court Filing
                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 16, 2008 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/27/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/19/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2008. (dw1)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document 86 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008
                                                  Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on May 15, 2008 in Washington, D.C.. (dw1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Court Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 15, 2008 before Judge Eric G. Bruggink. For copy contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888 Transcripts Order Forms. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/23/2008. Electronic Transcripts and Redactions Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2008. (dw1)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document 84 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008
                                                      Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceeding held on May 14, 2008. (dw1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Court Filing
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 05/14/2008 before Judge Eric G. Bruggink. For copy contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888 Transcripts Order Forms. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/22/2008. Electronic Transcripts and Redactions Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2008. (dw1) Modified on 5/15/2008 (Jordan, George).
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document 82 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Court Filing
                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-1520) held on May 5-9, 2008 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 81 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008
                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct [66] Exhibit List, filed by DOMINION RESOURCES, INC., DOMINION NUCLEAR CONNECTICUT, INC..Response due by 5/12/2008.(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 80 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-57) held on April 7, 2008 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 79 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008
                                                                MEMORANDUM re: [72] Response,, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 78 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008
                                                                  Objection to Witness List, filed by all plaintiffs. Related document: [74] Pretrial Order,.(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 77 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008
                                                                    Objection to Exhibit List, filed by all plaintiffs. Related document: [74] Pretrial Order,.(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 76 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008
                                                                      Objection to Witness List, filed by USA. Related document: [74] Pretrial Order,.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 75 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008
                                                                        Objection to Exhibit List, filed by USA. Related document: [74] Pretrial Order,.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 74 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Court Filing
                                                                          PRETRIAL ORDER Opposing Exhibit List due by 4/14/2008; Opposing Witness List due by 4/14/2008; Trial set for 5/5/2008 at 09:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ff)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 73 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER denying [62] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on AFUDC; denying [64] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Pre-Acquisition Claims. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ff)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008
                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines for 4/7/2008 proceeding: Transcript due from Heritage by 4/17/2008. (lld)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 72 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008
                                                                                RESPONSE to [61] Notice (Other) of Desposition and Trial Testimony Designations, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Counter-Designations 1# (3) Counter-Designations 2# (4) Counter-Designations 3# (5) Counter-Designations 4# (6) Counter-Designations 5# (7) Counter-Designations 6# (8) Counter-Designations 7# (9) Counter-Designations 8# (10) Counter-Designations 9# (11) Certificate of Filing and Service)(Slater, Scott)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 71 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008, Terminated: 4/4/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [61] Notice (Other) of Deposition and Trial Testimony Designations, filed by USA.Response due by 4/21/2008.(Slater, Scott)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 70 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008
                                                                                  Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by USA. (Slater, Scott)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 69 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008
                                                                                    Exhibit List, filed by USA. (Slater, Scott)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 68 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008
                                                                                      Witness List, filed by USA. (Slater, Scott)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 67 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008
                                                                                        Witness List, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 66 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008
                                                                                          Exhibit List, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 65 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008
                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [64] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Pre-Acquisition Claims, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Appendix Part 1# (2) Appendix Appendix Part 2# (3))(Slater, Scott)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 64 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008, Terminated: 4/8/2008 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                              MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Pre-Acquisition Claims, filed by USA.Response due by 4/17/2008.(Slater, Scott)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 63 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008
                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [62] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on AFUDC, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Certificate of Filing)(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 62 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008, Terminated: 4/8/2008 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                  MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on AFUDC, filed by USA.Response due by 4/17/2008.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 61 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008
                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by DOMINION RESOURCES, INC., DOMINION NUCLEAR CONNECTICUT, INC. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 60 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [57] Motion to Amend Pre-trial Schedule. Exhibit List due by 3/24/2008. Witness List due by 3/24/2008. Pre-trial Motion(s) due by 3/17/2008. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2008 09:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink.(jpk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 59 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008
                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [57] MOTION to Amend Schedule , Or In The Alternative, To Exclude Evidence Of Plaintiffs' Alternative Causation Model, filed by USA. (Slater, Scott)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008
                                                                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for 2/27/2008 10:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink to discuss Defendant's 2/22/08 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The call will not be recorded. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 58 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008
                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [57] Motion to Amend Schedule, filed by DOMINION RESOURCES, INC., DOMINION NUCLEAR CONNECTICUT, INC.. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 57 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008, Terminated: 2/27/2008 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend Schedule , Or In The Alternative, To Exclude Evidence Of Plaintiffs' Alternative Causation Model, filed by USA.Response due by 3/10/2008.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 56 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008
                                                                                                                Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [55] Motion for Extension of Time Exhibit List due by 2/22/2008, Witness List due by 2/22/2008. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ff) Modified on 1/3/2008 to remove document number (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 55 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008, Terminated: 1/3/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/22/08 to exchange exhibit and witness lists, filed by USA.Response due by 1/22/2008.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 54 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER:Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink.,Trial set for 5/5/2008 through 5/16/2008, beginning at 09:00 AM each day in Courtroom, National Courts Building, Wash., DC, before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007
                                                                                                                        ORDER Cancelling Deadline/Hearing Trial originally scheduled for April 2008 has been rescheduled. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 53 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/29/2007 10:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 52 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [51] Motion for Extension of Time Discovery due by 12/5/2007. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ff)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 51 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007, Terminated: 10/17/2007 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [50] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, filed by USA.Response due by 11/2/2007.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 50 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [49] Motion for Extension of Time Discovery due by 12/20/2007. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (cl2)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 49 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to complete discovery, filed by USA.Response due by 8/6/2007.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 48 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    PUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER granting [33] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6) Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (cl2) Modified on 6/28/2007 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 47 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-59) held on June 7, 2007 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 46 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [45] Notice (Other) by Defendant Regarding Statutory Authority for Set-off, filed by DOMINION RESOURCES, INC., DOMINION NUCLEAR CONNECTICUT, INC.. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 45 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE, filed by USA To The Court Regarding Statutory Authority For Set-Off (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 44 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:Trial set for 4/7/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (cl2)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007
                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/9/2007. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 43 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [42] Motion for Extension of Time Defendant shall produce expert reports and respond to plaintiffs' damages schedules on or before 9/17/2007. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (cl2)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 42 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007, Terminated: 5/25/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until September 17, 2007 to produce expert reports and respond to plaintiffs' damages schedules., filed by USA.Response due by 6/11/2007.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 41 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument regarding plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss set for 6/7/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (cl2)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 40 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [33] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and/or Strike Defendant's Counterclaims and Defenses Based Upon The "One-Time Fee" MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and/or Strike Defendant's Counterclaims and Defenses Based Upon The "One-Time Fee", filed by DOMINION RESOURCES, INC., DOMINION NUCLEAR CONNECTICUT, INC.. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [33] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and/or Strike Defendant's Counterclaims and Defenses Based Upon The "One-Time Fee" MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and/or Strike Defendant's Counterclaims and Defenses Based Upon The "One-Time Fee", filed by USA.Reply due by 4/30/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 38 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [37] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendant's Response due by 4/11/2007. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (cl2)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 37 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007, Terminated: 4/3/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [33] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and/or Strike Defendant's Counterclaims and Defenses Based Upon The "One-Time Fee" MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and/or Strike Defendant's Counterclaims and Defenses Based Upon The "One-Time Fee", filed by USA.Response due by 4/19/2007.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Lefante Donahue for USA. (Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [35] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [35] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until April 2, 2007 to File Response or Reply as to [33] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and/or Strike Defendant's Counterclaims and Defenses Based Upon The "One-Time Fee" Response due by 4/2/2007. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 2/27/2007, Terminated: 2/28/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until April 2, 2007 to File Response or Reply as to [33] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and/or Strike Defendant's Counterclaims and Defenses Based Upon The "One-Time Fee", filed by USA.Response due by 3/16/2007.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 34 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-52) held on January 10, 2007 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007, Terminated: 6/27/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and/or Strike Defendant's Counterclaims and Defenses Based Upon The "One-Time Fee", filed by DOMINION RESOURCES, INC., DOMINION NUCLEAR CONNECTICUT, INC..Response due by 3/1/2007.(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 32 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial rescheduled for 3/10/2008 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (cl2, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 3/5/2007.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/9/2007, Terminated: 1/9/2007 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time
                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Attached Defendant's Answer To Plaintiffs' Complaint Out of Time, filed by USA.Response due by 1/26/2007. (Attachments: # (1))(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [30] Motion for Leave to File Out of Time. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: 12/21/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/10/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-44) held on August 2, 2006 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATED ORDER GOVERNING REVIEW OF THE DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY'S ELECTRONIC "RECORD INFORMATION SYSTEM" DATABASE re [24] MOTION for Protective Order , E-Mail Preservation Order, and Stipulated Order Governing Review of the Record Information System Database filed by USA, Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      E-MAIL PRESERVATION ORDER re [24] MOTION for Protective Order , E-Mail Preservation Order, and Stipulated Order Governing Review of the Record Information System Database filed by USA, Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER (related to Order on Motion for Protective Order). Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [24] Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006, Terminated: 8/15/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order , E-Mail Preservation Order, and Stipulated Order Governing Review of the Record Information System Database, filed by USA.Response due by 8/31/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 9/5/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER LIFTING STAY, SCHEDULING ORDER:Discovery due by 10/31/2007. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (kmg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/2/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006, Terminated: 7/10/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/10/2006 to File The Parties' Joint Status Report, In Accordance With The Court's January 5, 2006 Order, filed by USA.Response due by 7/24/2006.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006, Terminated: 7/10/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until July 7, 2006 to File Joint Status Report, filed by USA.Response due by 7/17/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT ORDER, ORDER STAYING CASE. Status Report due by 6/30/2006. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT ORDER: ORDER STAYING CASE. Status Report due by 12/15/2005. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by DOMINION RESOURCES, INC., DOMINION NUCLEAR CONNECTICUT, INC., USA. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT ORDER, ORDER STAYING CASE Status Report due by 6/24/2005. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Discovery in this case on the rate of acceptance or damages issues, and/or any discovery duplicative of information from previous coordinated discovery in SNF cases is hereby STAYED until Friday, December 31, 2004. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, ) Modified on 5/19/2004 to correct typo (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt : Pre-Discovery Status Conference held on 4/30/04. (lag, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [8] Status Conference Order regarding conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [8] Status Conference Order and Report filed by DOMINION NUCLEAR CONNECTICUT, INC., DOMINION RESOURCES, INC.. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Pre-Discovery Conference set for 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in Courtroom before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/26/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [6] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery filed by DOMINION NUCLEAR CONNECTICUT, INC., DOMINION RESOURCES, INC.. Reply due by 4/9/2004. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004, Terminated: 5/18/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery by USA. Response due by 4/9/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [04-0084C] by DOMINION NUCLEAR CONNECTICUT, INC., DOMINION RESOURCES, INC. Service: 1/23/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059553), filed by DOMINION NUCLEAR CONNECTICUT, INC., DOMINION RESOURCES, INC..Answer Due by 3/23/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 186 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?