DOMINION RESOURCES, INC. et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00084-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dominion Resources, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
No Logo Virginia Electric And Power Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Lefante Donahue +1 202 353 9498 +1 202 514 8624 lisa.donahue@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/23/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case 04-0083C
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status TrlHeld
Flags ECF, PROTO, SNF
  Entries (92) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 78 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Court Filing
ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ff)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008
    ORDER denying [73] Motion to Coordinate Discovery and Develop a Litigation Plan for the Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ff)
      LREF
      Legal Document 77 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008
      SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
        LREF
        Legal Document 76 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008
        SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Donahue, Lisa)
          LREF
          Legal Document 75 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008
          RESPONSE to August 21, 2008 E-Mail Inquiry, filed by USA. (Donahue, Lisa)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008
            ORDER granting [74] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ff)
              LREF
              Legal Document 74 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008, Terminated: 8/28/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/2/08 to to file supplemental brief, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Donahue, Lisa)
                LREF
                Legal Document 73 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008, Terminated: 9/3/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 72 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Court Filing
                  ORDER for Supplemental Briefs due by 8/27/08 Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ff)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008
                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Supplemental Briefs due by 8/27/2008. (jt1)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008
                      Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, D.C. on 5/5/2008, ended on 5/16/2008, before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink: Trial. [Total number of days of proceeding: 10]. Official record of proceeding taken by court reporter. (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(ff)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008
                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines for 7/30/08 proceeding: Transcript due from Heritage by 8/11/2008. (lld)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 71 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008
                          POST TRIAL BRIEF : Plaintiffs' Post-Trial Reply Brief, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 70 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
                            POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Donahue, Lisa)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 69 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008
                              POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 68 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Court Filing
                                POST TRIAL ORDER:Post Trial Brief due 6/18/2008; Response due 7/10/2008; Reply due 7/21/2008. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ff)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 67 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Court Filing
                                  ORDER Admitting Deposition Designations and Counter-Deposition Designations. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ff)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008
                                    ORDER granting [65] Motion for Leave to File ; granting [66] Motion to Amend/Correct Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ff) Modified on 4/28/2008 to remove document number(mb2, ).
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 66 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008, Terminated: 4/25/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                      Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct [51] Exhibit List, filed by DOMINION RESOURCES, INC., VIRGINIA ELECTRIC AND POWER COMPANY.Response due by 5/12/2008.(Fagg, Arnold)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 65 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008, Terminated: 4/25/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File amended exhibit list, filed by USA.Response due by 5/5/2008. (Attachments: # (1) amended exhibit list)(Averbach, Andrew)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 64 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008
                                          MEMORANDUM re: [57] Response,, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 63 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008
                                            Objection to Witness List, filed by all plaintiffs. Related document: [59] Pretrial Order,.(Fagg, Arnold)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 62 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008
                                              Objection to Exhibit List, filed by all plaintiffs. Related document: [59] Pretrial Order,.(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 61 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008
                                                Objection to Witness List, filed by USA. Related document: [59] Pretrial Order,.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 60 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008
                                                  Objection to Exhibit List, filed by USA. Related document: [59] Pretrial Order,.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 59 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Court Filing
                                                    PRETRIAL ORDER Opposing Exhibit List due by 4/14/2008; Opposing Witness List due by 4/14/2008; Trial set for 5/5/2008 at 09:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ff)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 58 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER denying [49] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ff)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008
                                                        ORDER granting [20] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to "Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition and Trial Testimony Designations or, Alternatively, Motion for Leave to Admit Prior Testimony into Evidence" Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ff) Modified on 4/7/2008 to remove document number (mb2, ).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008
                                                          Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, D.C. on 4/7/2008 before Judge Eric G. Bruggink : Initial Pretrial Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(ff)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 57 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008
                                                            RESPONSE to [48] Notice (Other) of Deposition and Trial Testimony Designations, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Counter-Designations 1# (3) Counter-Designations 2# (4) Counter-Designations 3# (5) Counter-Designations 4# (6) Counter-Designations 5# (7) Counter-Designations 7# (8) Counter-Designations 7# (9) Counter-Designations 8# (10) Counter-Designations 9# (11) Certificate of Service and Filing)(Slater, Scott)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 56 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008, Terminated: 4/4/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [48] Notice (Other) of Deposition and Trial Testimony Designations, filed by USA.Response due by 4/21/2008.(Slater, Scott)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 55 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008
                                                              Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by USA. (Slater, Scott)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 54 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008
                                                                Exhibit List, filed by USA. (Slater, Scott)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 53 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008
                                                                  Witness List, filed by USA. (Slater, Scott)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 52 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008
                                                                    Witness List, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 51 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008
                                                                      Exhibit List, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 50 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008
                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [49] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on AFUDC, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Certificate of Filing)(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 49 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008, Terminated: 4/8/2008 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                          MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on AFUDC, filed by USA.Response due by 4/17/2008.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 48 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008
                                                                            NOTICE, filed by all plaintiffs (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 47 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part [44] Motion to Amend Pre-trial Schedule. Exhibit List due by 3/24/2008. Witness List due by 3/24/2008. Pre-trial Motion(s) due by 3/17/2008. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2008 09:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jpk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 46 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008
                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [44] MOTION to Amend Schedule , Or In The Alternative, To Exclude Evidence Of Plaintiffs' Alternative Causation Model, filed by USA. (Slater, Scott)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008
                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for 2/27/2008 10:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink to discuss Defendant's 2/22/08 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The call will not be recorded. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 45 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008
                                                                                    RESPONSE to [44] Motion to Amend Schedule, filed by DOMINION RESOURCES, INC.. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 44 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008, Terminated: 2/27/2008 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                      MOTION to Amend Schedule , Or In The Alternative, To Exclude Evidence Of Plaintiffs' Alternative Causation Model, filed by USA.Response due by 3/10/2008.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 43 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008
                                                                                        Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008
                                                                                          ORDER granting [42] Motion for Extension of Time Parties to exchange witness and exhibit lists on or before Feb. 22, 2008. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 42 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008, Terminated: 1/3/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/22/08 to exchange exhibit and witness lists, filed by USA.Response due by 1/22/2008.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 41 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                              TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink.,Trial set for 5/5/2008 through 5/16/2008, beginning at 09:00 AM each day in Courtroom, Washington, DC, before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007
                                                                                                ORDER Cancelling Deadline/Hearing Trial originally scheduled for April 2008 has been rescheduled. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 40 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/29/2007 10:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document 39 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [38] Motion for Extension of Time Defendant shall produce its expert reports and responses to plaintiff's damages on or before Wednesday, December 5, 2007. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 38 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007, Terminated: 10/18/2007 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [37] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, filed by USA.Response due by 11/2/2007.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting [36] Motion for Extension of Time Discovery due by 12/20/2007. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (cl2)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to complete discovery, filed by USA.Response due by 8/6/2007.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 35 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:Trial set for 4/7/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (cl2)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 34 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [33] Motion for Extension of Time Defendant shall produce expert reports and respond to plaintiffs' damages schedules on or before 9/17/2007. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (cl2)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 33 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007, Terminated: 5/25/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until September 17, 2007 to produce expert reports and respond to plaintiffs' damages schedules, filed by USA.Response due by 6/11/2007.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 32 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Lefante Donahue for USA. (Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial rescheduled for 3/10/2008 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (cl2, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007
                                                                                                                      Defendant's ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 3/5/2007.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/9/2007, Terminated: 1/9/2007 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time
                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Attached Defendant's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint Out of Time, filed by USA.Response due by 1/26/2007. (Attachments: # (1))(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/9/2007
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [29] Motion for Leave to File Out of Time. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: 12/21/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/10/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                              STIPULATED ORDER GOVERNING REVIEW OF THE DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY'S ELECTRONIC "RECORD INFORMATION SYSTEM" DATABASE re [24] MOTION for Protective Order , E-Mail Preservation Order, and Stipulated Order Governing Review Of The Record Information System Database filed by USA, Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                E-MAIL PRESERVATION ORDER re [24] MOTION for Protective Order , E-Mail Preservation Order, and Stipulated Order Governing Review Of The Record Information System Database filed by USA, Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER (related to Order on Motion for Protective Order). Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [24] Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006, Terminated: 8/15/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Protective Order , E-Mail Preservation Order, and Stipulated Order Governing Review Of The Record Information System Database, filed by USA.Response due by 8/31/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER LIFTING STAY, SCHEDULING ORDER:Discovery due by 10/31/2007. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (kmg, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/2/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006, Terminated: 4/7/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/10/2006 to File The Parties' Joint Status Report, In Accordance With The Court's Order Dated January 5, 2006, filed by USA.Response due by 7/24/2006.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006, Terminated: 7/10/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until July 7, 2006 to File Joint Status Report, filed by USA.Response due by 7/17/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT ORDER, ORDER STAYING CASE. Status Report due by 6/30/2006. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER: ORDER STAYING CASE. Status Report due by 12/15/2005. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by DOMINION RESOURCES, INC., VIRGINIA ELECTRIC AND POWER COMPANY, USA. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT ORDER, ORDER STAYING CASE Status Report due by 6/24/2005. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Discovery in this case on the rate of acceptance or damages issues, and/or any discovery duplicative of information from previous coordinated discovery in SNF cases is hereby STAYED until Friday, December 31, 2004. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004
                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt : Pre-Discovery Status Conference held on 4/30/04. (lag, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [8] Status Conference Order, regarding conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) Appendix # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [8] Status Conference Order, and Report filed by Virginia Electric & Power Company and filed by DOMINION RESOURCES, INC.. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Pre-discovery Conference set for 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in Courtroom before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt; and directing parties to submit reports to chambers, with a copy to Judge Sypolt, by 4/23/04. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, ) Modified on 4/13/2004 to edit text. (dls).
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/26/2004
                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [6] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery Filed by Virginia Electric & Power Company and filed by DOMINION RESOURCES, INC.. Reply due by 4/9/2004. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004, Terminated: 5/18/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery by USA. Response due by 4/9/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [04-0083C] by DOMINION RESOURCES, INC., VIRGINIA ELECTRIC AND POWER COMPANY. Service: 1/23/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059552), filed by DOMINION RESOURCES, INC., VIRGINIA ELECTRIC AND POWER COMPANY.Answer Due by 3/23/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 229 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?