BWX TECHNOLOGIES, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00096-CFL
District Judge Charles F. Lettow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bwx Technologies, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott International, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Daniel Harvey +1 434 522 6690 +1 434 522 6950 sdharvey@mcdermott.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott D. Slater +1 202 616 0467 scott.slater@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/28/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 7/2/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, SNF
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties.. (Harvey, Stephen)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (jt1)
      LREF
      Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER: At a status conference held today, the parties reported that they are engaged in active settlement discussions requiring additional time. The court asks the parties to submit a joint status report by 8/20/08 addressing the status of settlement discussions and proposing a plan for future proceedings. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lnb)
        LREF
        Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008
        NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Slater for USA. (Slater, Scott)
          LREF
          Legal Document 18 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Court Filing
          SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic status conference shall be held on 2/20/2008 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lnb)
            LREF
            Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 8/31/2004 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004
              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/1/2004. (vp1, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles F. Lettow: Status Conference held on 08/31/04. (rs1,)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 Court Filing
                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/31/2004 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT (Preliminary) by USA. (Strohmeyer, Victoria)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004
                      DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to [1] Complaint by USA. JPSR due by 6/21/2004.(Strohmeyer, Victoria)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                        RESPONSE to [12] Order of pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Strohmeyer, Victoria)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Court Filing
                        ORDER for pre-discovery conference in new SNF cases. Pre-discovery conference scheduled for April 30, 2004. Reports to be submitted as set forth in Order on or before April 23, 2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Court Filing
                          ORDER denying [9] Motion to Stay. Defendant shall file its answer or other response to the complaint on or before 4/30/2004. JPSR due as prescribed by RCFC App. A, para. 4. Defendant's alternative motion for coordinated discovery is also denied without prejudice to renewal of the motion. Status Report due by 6/18/2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004
                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's answer or other response to the complaint due by 4/30/2004. (dw1)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004
                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 4/19/2004. (dw1)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004
                                RESPONSE to [9] MOTION to Stay ALL PROCEEDINGS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR COORDINATED DISCOVERY REGARDING RATE AND SCHEDULE ISSUES filed by BWX TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. Reply due by 4/19/2004. (Harvey, Stephen) Modified on 4/8/2004 to correct the reply date (dw1).
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004, Terminated: 4/8/2004 Motion to Stay
                                  MOTION to Stay ALL PROCEEDINGS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR COORDINATED DISCOVERY REGARDING RATE AND SCHEDULE ISSUES by USA. Response due by 4/15/2004 (Strohmeyer, Victoria)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Louise Strohmeyer for USA. (Strohmeyer, Victoria)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Court Filing
                                      ORDER Removing Case from the ADR process. Further proceedings shall progress in accordance with the Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dls)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Order of RecusalCourt Filing
                                          ORDER OF RECUSAL. A review of the pleadings indicates that I am disqualified from this proceeding pursuant to 28 USC 455(b)(3). Accordingly, the matter is returned to the Clerk of the Court of random reassignment to another judge. Judge Nancy B. Firestone recused. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                            Case reassigned to Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dls)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Notice of Assignment - Auto ADRCourt Filing
                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller for ADR Pilot proceedings. (lg1, ).
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lg1),
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059575), filed by BWX TECHNOLOGIES, INC..Answer Due by 3/29/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 238 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?