UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00097-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Union Electric Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon Ann Snyder +1 202 616 0347 +1 202 514 7969 sharon.snyder@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/28/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, SNF, STAYED
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 36 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [35] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Stouck, Jerry)
    LREF
    Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
    MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
      LREF
      Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007
      NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerry Stouck (Stouck, Jerry)
        LREF
        Legal Document 33 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Court Filing
        ORDER Granting [32] Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mc3)
          LREF
          Legal Document 32 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007, Terminated: 10/1/2007 Motion to Continue
          Joint MOTION to Continue Stay, filed by UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY, USA.Response due by 10/18/2007.(Stouck, Jerry)
            LREF
            Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 Court Filing
            ORDER granting [30] Motion to Continue Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (clb, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 30 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006, Terminated: 10/3/2006 Motion to Continue
              Joint MOTION to Continue Stay, filed by UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY, USA.Response due by 10/16/2006.(Stouck, Jerry)
                LREF
                Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Court Filing
                ORDER STAYING CASE Stay Extended 10 Months; Status Report due by 10/2/2006 Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (clb, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT and Motion to Extend Stay, filed by UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY, USA. (Stouck, Jerry)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Court Filing
                    ORDER re [26] Joint Status Report filed by USA, UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY, Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2005. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (clb, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005
                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2005. (jat, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY, USA. (Stouck, Jerry)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005
                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerry Stouck (Stouck, Jerry)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT Filed Pursuant to the Court's Order of January 4, 2005 by UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY, USA. (Stouck, Jerry)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Court Filing
                              ORDER granting [22] Parties' Joint Motion for Entry of an Order Governing the Preservation of E-Mail and Other Electronic Evidence. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005, Terminated: 3/9/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                Joint MOTION for Entry of an Order Governing the Preservation of E-mail and Other Electronic Evidence filed by UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY, USA. Response due by 3/25/2005 (Stouck, Jerry)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting [19] Motion to extend stay. Counsel will file a status report when Federal Circuit issues a decision in Indiana Michigan but no later than April 1, 2005. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 4/1/2005. (dw1)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Ann Snyder for USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 1/4/2005 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                        *** Attorney Victoria Louise Strohmeyer terminated. (dw1)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004, Terminated: 1/4/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                          Consent MOTION to Extend the Existing Stay until the Federal Circuit Issues a Decision in Indiana Michigan v. United States by UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 1/10/2005 (Stouck, Jerry)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004 Court Filing
                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for 1/3/2005 02:00 PM before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr.Stay granted to 1/3/2005 Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004
                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/31/2004 02:00 PM before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (dw1)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                ORDER STAYING CASE - Stay is granted until December 31. We will hold a telephonic status conference on December 31 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004
                                                  STATUS REPORT in Response to the Court's June 9, 2004 Order by UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 of 1)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Court Filing
                                                    ORDER - We ask that the parties file a status report concerning the posture of this case. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                      RESPONSE to [12] Order of pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Strohmeyer, Victoria)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004
                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re [12] Order For Pre-Discovery Conference in New Spent Fuel Cases by UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 5/10/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 and 2# (2) Exhibit 3 through 8)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Parties Discovery Report(s) due by 4/23/2004. Pre-Discovery Conference set for 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr.. (dw1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                          ORDER - The court will host a pre-discovery conference on April 30, 2004 with Judge Diane Sypolt as presiding judge, to explore the motion for stay and the discovery needed in the new SNF cases. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004
                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 4/26/2004. (dw1)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004
                                                              RESPONSE to [10] MOTION to Stay ALL PROCEEDINGS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR COORDINATED DISCOVERY REGARDING RATE AND SCHEDULE ISSUES filed by UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 4/26/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1/30/04 Order# (2) Exhibit 6/26/03 Order)(Freas, Monica) Modified on 4/14/2004 to reflect correct reply due date (dw1).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004
                                                              MOTION to Stay ALL PROCEEDINGS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR COORDINATED DISCOVERY REGARDING RATE AND SCHEDULE ISSUES by USA. Response due by 4/15/2004 (Strohmeyer, Victoria)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Louise Strohmeyer for USA. (Strohmeyer, Victoria)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 6/10/2004 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                  *** Attorney Harold Dewitt Lester terminated. (jcp, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 2/24/2004 before Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004
                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 3/24/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/23/2004
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER - hearing scheduled for February 24 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER - We solicit the parties' suggestions for expediting the pre-trial process. We suggest a status conference during the week of February 9 to discuss these matters. Counsel will agree on a time and contact the court. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                                                Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY. Service: 1/28/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (lg1, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Complaint
                                                                                    COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059579), filed by UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY.Answer Due by 3/29/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 178 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?