DOE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00090-SGB
District Judge Susan G. Braden, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Doe, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/26/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $189000
Nature of Suit 348 - Military Pay - Reinstatement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 6/30/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '06-5119'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, SEALED
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 67 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [63] Unpublished Opinion/Order directing the Clerk to enter judgment.(hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 66 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number 06-5119 for [65] Notice of Appeal filed by JOHN DOE. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 65 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006, Terminated: 5/29/2007 Notice of Appeal
      NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by JOHN DOE. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 065281. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 64 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. (lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 63 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 Court Filing
          UNPUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER granting [53] MOTION for Relief from Judgment pursuant to Rule 60 re [52] Judgment filed by JOHN DOE,. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment to be dated June 23, 2006 amd vacate the June 30, 2005 entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 62 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006 Terminated:
            MOTION to Substitute Attorney Pro Se in place of James Thomas O'Reilly , filed by JOHN DOE. Service: 6/9/2006.Response due by 6/26/2006.(mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 61 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
              REPLY to Response to Motion re [53] MOTION for Relief from Judgment pursuant to Rule 60 re [52] Judgment , filed by JOHN DOE. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 5/30/2006.(mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 60 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Letter
                Letter from Plaintiff. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 59 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Response to Motion
                  RESPONSE to [53] MOTION for Relief from Judgment pursuant to Rule 60 re [52] Judgment , filed by USA.Reply due by 6/5/2006. Service: 5/22/2006.(mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 58 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 Terminated:
                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/22/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [53] MOTION for Relief from Judgment pursuant to Rule 60 re [52] Judgment , filed by USA. Service: 5/15/2006.Response due by 6/1/2006.(mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 57 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 Terminated:
                      MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/15/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [53] MOTION for Relief from Judgment pursuant to Rule 60 re [52] Judgment , filed by USA. Service: 4/28/2006.Response due by 5/15/2006.(mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 56 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Memorandum
                        ADDENDUM re: [53] Relief from Judgment - Rule 60, filed by JOHN DOE. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/8/2006.(mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 55 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/12/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [54] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [53] MOTION for Relief from Judgment pursuant to Rule 60 re [52] Judgment. Response due by 5/1/2006. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dw1)
                            LREF
                            Blank 54 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006, Terminated: 4/7/2006 Terminated:
                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/1/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [53] MOTION for Relief from Judgment pursuant to Rule 60 re [52] Judgment , filed by USA. Service: 4/4/2006. Response due by 4/21/2006.(mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 53 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006, Terminated: 6/26/2006 Terminated:
                              MOTION for Relief from Judgment pursuant to Rule 60 re [52] Judgment , filed by JOHN DOE. Service: 3/24/2006. Response due by 4/10/2006.(mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 52 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005
                                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. (lld, ) Vacated per 6/26/2006 Order (lld, ).
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 51 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Court Filing
                                  PUBLISHED MEMORANDUM ORDER and OPINION granting [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA,. The Clerk is directed to dismiss the complaint. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (lld, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Transcript
                                    TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-42) of Proceedings held on 4/6/05 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (eph, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 50 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                      NOTICE of Termination of Legal Representation and Revocation and Disavowal of Court-Appointed Attorney's 11 April 2005 Letter of Judge Braden, filed by JOHN DOE. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/19/2005.(mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 49 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Terminated:
                                        MOTION for Relief from Order pursuant to Rule 60 re [43] Order, filed by JOHN DOE. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/19/2005. Response due by 5/9/2005. (mb2, ) Modified on 4/26/2005 (mb2, ).
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 48 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Affidavit
                                          AFFIDAVIT re [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record by JOHN DOE. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/19/2005.(mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 47 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Statement of Facts
                                            STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [46] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record by JOHN DOE. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/19/2005.(mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 46 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Terminated:
                                              MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by JOHN DOE. Service: 4/19/2005. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Dispositive Motion Response due by 5/23/2005.(mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 45 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Terminated:
                                                MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by JOHN DOE. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/11/2005. Response due by 5/5/2005. (mb2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER: Allowing supplemental brief from Plaintiff re: Motion for Summary Judgement.Brief, not to exceed 20 pages, due by 5/2/2005. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (mb2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER: denying Plaintiff's Motion to Lift the Stay and for a Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (b2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/6/2005 to File Status Report,` filed by USA.Service: 4/1/2005. Response due by 4/18/2005.(mb2, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/24/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/6/2005 at 11:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (mb2, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Terminated:
                                                          Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney James T. O'Reilly in place of John Doe, Pro Se filed by JOHN DOE.Service: 3/7/2005. (mb2, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                            ***Attorney James Thomas O'Reilly for JOHN DOE added. (mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 39 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER: Appointing Professor James T. O'Reilly to serve as counsel to plaintiff. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (mb2, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER placing the entire record under seal and changing the case caption to John Doe v. United States. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER denying [26] Motion for Sanctions pursuant to Rule 11. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION for Hearing re [26] MOTION for Sanctions pursuant to Rule 11 by JAMES C. COOPER.Service: 01/27/05. Response due by 2/14/2005 (mb2, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/9/2004 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [26] MOTION for Sanctions pursuant to Rule 11 filed by JAMES C. COOPER, by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/27/2004.(dw1)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                        RESPONSE to [26] MOTION for Sanctions pursuant to Rule 11 filed by USA. Reply due by 11/1/2004. Service: 10/20/04.(vro, ) Modified on 11/5/2004 to correct due date for reply. (dls).
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [29] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to plaintiff's motion for Rule 11 sanctions through 10/20/2004 Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (lg1, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                            BRIEF OPPOSING [29] Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [26] Pltf's MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11, until 10/20/2004, filed by JAMES C. COOPER. Reply due by 10/18/2004. Service: 10/4/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                              Letter from Pltf, James C. Cooper to Judge Braden. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (jcp, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER: Pltf's letter dated "20 September 2004," received on September 28, 2004, is, in the interest of justice, filed by leave of the Court. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004, Terminated: 10/19/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [26] Pltf's MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11, until 10/20/2004, by USA.Service: 9/28/2004. Response due by 10/15/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Response
                                                                                    REVISED REPLY to [24] Dft's Response to Pltf's Protest/Objection to Fraud Perpetuated in Dft's Reply to Pltf's Response to Dft's Motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record, filed by JAMES C. COOPER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 9/17/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Response
                                                                                      REPLY to [24] Dft's Response to Pltf's Protest/Objection to Fraud Perpetuated in Dft's Reply to Pltf's Response to Dft's Motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record, filed by JAMES C. COOPER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 9/14/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004, Terminated: 2/15/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 by JAMES C. COOPER.Service: 9/12/2004. Response due by 9/29/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                          BRIEF OPPOSING [22] Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [21] Pltf's Protest/Objection, until 9/9/2004, filed by JAMES C. COOPER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 9/15/2004. Service: 8/31/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004 Response
                                                                                            RESPONSE to [21] Pltf's PROTEST/OBJECTION to Fraud Perpetrated in [19] Dft's Reply to Pltf's Response to Dft's Motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record, filed by USA. Service: 9/9/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/7/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [22] Dft's Motion for Extension.Dft's Response may be filed by 9/9/2004. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004, Terminated: 9/1/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [21] Protest/Objection to Fraud Perpetuated in Dft's Reply to Pltf's Response to Dft's Motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record, until 9/9/2004, by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 8/25/2004. Response due by 9/13/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                  PROTEST/OBJECTION to Fraud Perpetrated in [19] Dft's Reply to Pltf's Response to Dft's Motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record, by JAMES C. COOPER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 8/9/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [17] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's reply in support of its motion for judgment on the administrative record, filed 7/30/04 is hereby entered. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jat, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA. Service: 07/30/2004.(lld, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                        BRIEF OPPOSING [17] Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [13] Pltf's Response to Dft's Motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record, until 7/30/2004, filed by JAMES C. COOPER. Reply due by 8/5/2004. Service: 7/22/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004, Terminated: 8/3/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [13] Pltf's Response to Dft's Motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record, until 7/30/2004, by USA.Service: 7/23/2004. Response due by 8/9/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/12/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [14] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of [11] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record. Reply may be filed by 7/23/2004. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                              BRIEF OPPOSING [14] Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [13] Response to Motion, until July 23, 2004, filed by JAMES C. COOPER. Reply due by 7/13/2004. Service: 6/28/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004, Terminated: 7/7/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [13] Response to Motion, (until July 23, 2004), by USA.Service: 6/22/04. Response due by 7/9/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by JAMES C. COOPER. Reply due by 7/2/2004. Service: 6/15/04.(dw1)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                    COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS by JAMES C. COOPER. Service: 6/15/04.(dw1)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004, Terminated: 6/30/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon the Administrative Record by USA.Service: 5/28/2004. Response due by 6/28/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF FACTS in Support of its Motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record, by USA. Service: 5/28/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [8] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 5/28/2004. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/26/2004, Terminated: 5/26/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint until 5/28/2004 by USA.Service: 5/24/2004. Response due by 6/10/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [6] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.Answer Due by 5/25/2004. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004, Terminated: 5/14/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint until 5/25/2004 by USA.Service: 5/3/2004. Response due by 5/20/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [4] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 5/10/2004. (signed by the Clerk) (dls)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004, Terminated: 3/26/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 5/10/2004 filed by USA.Service: 3/25/04. (dls)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA. Service: 2/23/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Susan G. Braden. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against USA (AF) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059568), filed by JAMES C. COOPER.Answer Due by 3/26/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 169 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?