LUMINANT GENERATION COMPANY, LLC v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00098-MCW
District Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Luminant Generation Company LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Edward Ashman +1 202 353 7578 +1 202 307 0972 joseph.ashman@usdoj.gov
Space Kevin Brooks Crawford +1 202 305 9640 +1 202 307 2503 kevin.crawford@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/28/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, SNF, STAYED
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 37 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [34] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by LUMINANT GENERATION COMPANY, LLC.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Stouck, Jerry)
    LREF
    Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Court Filing
    ORDER granting [32] Motion for Extension of Time JPSR due by 9/24/2008. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
      LREF
      Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER granting [33] motion to change caption to reflect the new name of the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 34 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
        MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
          LREF
          Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008, Terminated: 8/22/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
          Unopposed MOTION Change Caption to Reflect New Name of Plaintiff, filed by TXU GENERATION COMPANY LP.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Stouck, Jerry)
            LREF
            Legal Document 32 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008, Terminated: 8/22/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/24/2008 to to Submit Joint Status Report, filed by TXU GENERATION COMPANY LP.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Stouck, Jerry)
              LREF
              Legal Document 31 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007
              NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerry Stouck (Stouck, Jerry)
                LREF
                Legal Document 30 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Court Filing
                ORDER CONTINUING STAY OF CASE Status Report due by 9/2/2008 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT and Motion to Extend Stay, filed by TXU GENERATION COMPANY LP, USA. (Stouck, Jerry)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Edward Ashman for USA. (Ashman, Joseph)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Court Filing
                      ORDER granting joint motion to extend stay.Notice of Compliance due by 10/1/2007. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT and Motion to Extend Stay, filed by TXU GENERATION COMPANY LP, USA. (Stouck, Jerry)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Court Filing
                          ORDER extending stay. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005
                            STATUS REPORT AND MOTION TO EXTEND STAY, filed by TXU GENERATION COMPANY LP. (Stouck, Jerry)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Court Filing
                              ORDER granting [22] Motion for Extension of Time.Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005
                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2005. (jat, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005, Terminated: 10/13/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until December 2, 2005 to file Joint Status Report required pursuant to Court's December 29, 2004 Order filed by TXU GENERATION COMPANY LP, USA. Response due by 10/28/2005. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005
                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerry Stouck (Stouck, Jerry)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting in part [19] Joint Motion for Entry of an Order Governing the Preservation of E-Mail and other Electronic Evidence. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005, Terminated: 3/16/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                        Joint MOTION for Entry of an Order Governing the Preservation of E-mail and Other Electronic Evidence filed by TXU GENERATION COMPANY LP, USA. Response due by 3/25/2005 (Stouck, Jerry)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting [17] Stay of Proceedings filed December 29, 2004 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004, Terminated: 12/29/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                            Consent MOTION to Extend the Existing Stay until the Federal Circuit Issues a Decision in Indiana Michigan v. United States by TXU GENERATION COMPANY LP. Response due by 1/10/2005 (Stouck, Jerry)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 18, 2004 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting [6] Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, ) Modified on 5/20/2004 for punctuation (dw1).
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Court Filing
                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/12/2005 03:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004
                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/18/2004. (vp1, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004
                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams: Status Conference. (teg, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004
                                                        *** Attorney John Clifford Ekman terminated. (dw1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/18/2004 03:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dy1,)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                            RESPONSE to [8] Order regarding pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER denying [10] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (ra1)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004, Terminated: 4/22/2004 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration re [8] Order For Pre-Discovery Conference in New Spent Fuel Cases by TXU GENERATION COMPANY LP. Response due by 5/6/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 and 2# (2) Exhibit 3 through 8)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Brooks Crawford for USA. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004
                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Parties case Discovery Reports due by 4/23/2004. Pre-Discovery Conference set for 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004
                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply by 4/26/2004. (dw1)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER Order for parties to submit case discovery reports by April 23 and to appear before J. Sypolt for pre-discovery conference on April 30.Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (ra1)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004
                                                                      RESPONSE to [6] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by TXU GENERATION COMPANY LP. Reply due by 4/26/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Order 1/30/04# (2) Exhibit Order 6/26/03)(Freas, Monica) Modified on to reflect correct reply due date 4/14/2004 (dw1).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004, Terminated: 5/19/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                        MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by USA. Response due by 4/15/2004 (Ekman, John)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by John Clifford Ekman for USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (lg1, ).
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                                                Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by TXU GENERATION COMPANY LP. Service: 1/28/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Complaint
                                                                                  COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059580), filed by TXU GENERATION COMPANY LP.Answer Due by 3/29/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 318 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?