KANSAS GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00099-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 27, 2016 at 5:28 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kansas City Power & Light Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Lawrence Shapiro +1 202 721 4776 +1 202 721 4649 shapiror@hugheshubbard.com
No Logo KANSAS ELECTRIC POWER COOPERATIVE, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Lawrence Shapiro +1 202 721 4776 +1 202 721 4649 shapiror@hugheshubbard.com
No Logo Kansas Gas And Electric Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Lawrence Shapiro +1 202 721 4776 +1 202 721 4649 shapiror@hugheshubbard.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office COFC
Filed 1/28/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, SNF, STAYED
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 37 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [36] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by KANSAS GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, KANSAS CITY POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, KANSAS ELECTRIC POWER COOPERATIVE, INC..Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Stouck, Jerry)
    LREF
    Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
    MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
      LREF
      Legal Document 35 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER - Further to the Joint Status Report [34], the parties' request to continue the stay is granted. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by Nov. 20, 2008, reporting on developments in the cases before the Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit affecting the outcome of this case. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
        LREF
        Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008, Terminated: 6/25/2008
        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stouck, Jerry)
          LREF
          Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007
          NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerry Stouck (Stouck, Jerry)
            LREF
            Legal Document 32 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Court Filing
            ORDER - Joint Status Report by June 25, 2008, or sooner if significant progress in other related SNF cases. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
              LREF
              Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stouck, Jerry)
                LREF
                Legal Document 30 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Court Filing
                ORDER - Joint Status Report by October 25, 2007, unless new developments in other cases discussed that warrants lifting the stay. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007
                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/25/2007 (lg1, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stouck, Jerry)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: 2/7/2007
                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/25/2007 (lg1, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 28 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Court Filing
                        ORDER - Joint Status Report by May 25, 2007, unless parties wish to notify court of other developments impacting case. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stouck, Jerry)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Court Filing
                            ORDER - Stay of discovery continued pending further order. Joint Status Report by January 29, 2007,unless new developments in other cases discussed in report. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006
                              JOINT STATUS REPORT and Motion to Extend Stay, filed by all parties. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Court Filing
                                ORDER - Joint Status Report to be filed 10/2/06 shall adress parties' views re continuation of stay. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (Attachments: # (1) SNF article)(smg)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Court Filing
                                  ORDER STAYING CASE - Status Report due by 10/2/2006, unless significant development in similar cases. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005
                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT and Motion to Extend Stay, filed by all parties. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005, Terminated: 11/4/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/5/2005 to to File Joint Status Report, filed by KANSAS GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, KANSAS CITY POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, KANSAS ELECTRIC POWER COOPERATIVE, INC.. Response due by 11/21/2005. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/6/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/5/2005. (jat, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005
                                          ORDER granting [21] Motion for Extension of Time to file Joint Status Report to 12/05/2005. (smg)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005
                                            ORDER granting [20] Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file their Joint Status Report until November 4, 2005. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller.(smg)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005, Terminated: 9/26/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until November 4, 2005 to to submit joint status report filed by USA. Response due by 10/11/2005. (Finn, Stephen)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005
                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerry Stouck (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [17] Joint Motion for preservation of electronic evidence. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005, Terminated: 3/9/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    Joint MOTION for Entry of an Order Governing the Preservation of E-mail and Other Electronic Evidence filed by KANSAS GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, KANSAS CITY POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, KANSAS ELECTRIC POWER COOPERATIVE, INC., USA. Response due by 3/25/2005 (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER - continuing stay pending final decision in Indiana Michigan Power Co. case on appeal before the Federal Circuit. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004
                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Finn, Stephen)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Court Filing
                                                          ORDER regarding stay of discovery. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/13/2004. (dw1)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                              ORDER - regarding discovery in all new SNF cases Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                RESPONSE to [9] Order for Pre-Discovery Conference New SNF Cases filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004
                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re [9] Order For Pre-Discovery Conference in New Spent Fuel Cases by KANSAS CITY POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, KANSAS ELECTRIC POWER COOPERATIVE, INC., KANSAS GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 5/6/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 and 2# (2) Exhibit 3 through 8)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004
                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 4/26/2004. (dw1)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004
                                                                    RESPONSE to [7] MOTION to Stay ALL PROCEEDINGS filed by KANSAS CITY POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, KANSAS ELECTRIC POWER COOPERATIVE, INC., KANSAS GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 4/26/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1/30/04 Order# (2) Exhibit 6/26/03 Order)(Freas, Monica) Modified on 4/14/2004 (dw1, ).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER - pre-discovery conference to be held in new SNF cases Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER to counsel with instructions for electronic filings with chambers. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004
                                                                        MOTION to Stay ALL PROCEEDINGS by USA. Response due by 4/15/2004 (Finn, Stephen)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Philip Finn for USA. (Finn, Stephen)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER re ECF filings Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                                              Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by KANSAS CITY POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, KANSAS ELECTRIC POWER COOPERATIVE, INC., KANSAS GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY. Service: 1/28/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (lg1, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Complaint
                                                                                    COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059581), filed by KANSAS CITY POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, KANSAS ELECTRIC POWER COOPERATIVE, INC., KANSAS GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY.Answer Due by 3/29/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, ).
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 243 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?