TEXAS GENCO, LP et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00100-TCW
District Judge Thomas C. Wheeler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AEP TEXAS CENTRAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
No Logo AUSTIN, TEXAS (CITY OF), Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
No Logo SAN ANTONIO, TEXAS (CITY OF), Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
No Logo TEXAS GENCO, LP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Beau Bryan +1 202 616 8299 +1 202 307 2503 patrick.bryan@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/28/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, SNF
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 41 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [35] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by TEXAS GENCO, LP, AEP TEXAS CENTRAL COMPANY, AUSTIN, TEXAS (CITY OF), SAN ANTONIO, TEXAS (CITY OF).Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Stouck, Jerry)
    LREF
    Legal Document 40 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
    NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Edward J. Damich no longer assigned to the case. (jt1)
      LREF
      Legal Document 39 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (EJ1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 38 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/23/2008 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
        NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Edward J. Damich for all further proceedings. Judge Victor J. Wolski no longer assigned to the case. (dls)
          LREF
          Legal Document 37 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Court Filing
          ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (EJ1)
            LREF
            Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Court Filing
            ORDER granting [34] Motion for Extension of Time. Stay of proceedings in this case is extended through September 22, 2008. Parties shall file a joint status report on or before that date to apprise the Court how they wish to proceed. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
              LREF
              Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
              MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
                LREF
                Legal Document 34 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008, Terminated: 8/22/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/22/2008 to Submit The Parties' Joint Status Report, filed by USA.Response due by 9/4/2008.(Bryan, Patrick)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007
                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerry Stouck (Stouck, Jerry)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Court Filing
                    STATUS REPORT ORDER: Stay of proceedings in this case is extended through September 2, 2008; joint status report shall be filed on or before September 2, 2008, to apprise the Court how they wish to proceed. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 31 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007
                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stouck, Jerry)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Beau Bryan for USA. (Bryan, Patrick)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 Court Filing
                          STATUS REPORT ORDER: Stay of Proceedings in this case is extended until December 4, 2007. Parties shall file joint status report on or before that date, apprising the Court on how the parties wish to proceed in this case. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Stouck, Jerry)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Court Filing
                              ORDER Continuing Stay of Case until December 1, 2006 and Directing Parties to file Joint Status Report on or by December 1, 2006. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005
                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/1/2006 (bre, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005
                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting [24] Motion for Extension of Time to file Status Report; Status Report due by 12/2/2005. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005, Terminated: 10/25/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until December 2, 2005 to to file Joint Status Report pursuant to Court's December 28, 2004 Order filed by USA, TEXAS GENCO, LP, AEP TEXAS CENTRAL COMPANY, AUSTIN, TEXAS (CITY OF), SAN ANTONIO, TEXAS (CITY OF). Response due by 10/28/2005. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005
                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerry Stouck (Stouck, Jerry)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Court Filing
                                          ORDER: Court orders adoption of salient provisions of E-Mail Plan utilized in coordinated discovery proceedings as follows: (1) except as noted in 2 below, parties agree that no preservation or retention requirements with respect to e-mail and electronic evidence apply to any of the parties; (2) parties agree to preserve any e-mail backup tapes that exist from the 1988-96 time frame which may potentially contain relevant information. Department of Energy only has to preserve such tapes to the extent they are from the Office of Civilian Radioactive Waste Management ("OCRWM"); (3) parties shall agree to share evenly costs of any searches of any backup tapes preserved pursuant to 2 above, which costs should not exceed $15,000 for each tape. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski (jp)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005, Terminated: 3/14/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                            Joint MOTION for Entry of an Order Governing the Preservation of E-mail and Other Electronic Evidence filed by USA, TEXAS GENCO, LP, AEP TEXAS CENTRAL COMPANY, CITY OF AUSTIN, TEXAS, CITY OF OF SAN ANTONIO, TEXAS, ACTING THROUGH THE PUBLIC SERVICE BOARD OF SAN ANTONIO. Response due by 3/25/2005 (Stouck, Jerry)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/28/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004 Court Filing
                                              ORDER Granting Motion to Extend Stay until U.S. Court of Appeals for Federal Circuit Issues a decision in Indiana Michigan Power Co. v. United States, No. 04-5122. Parties Shall File a Joint Status Report Within 30 Days of Federal Circuit's Decision. Status Conference Scheduled for January 18, 2005, is canceled. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004
                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT and Motion to Extend the Existing Stay until the Federal Circuit Issues a Decision in Indiana Michigan v. United States by all parties. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER Signed by Judge Victor J.Wolski staying the proceedings in this case through January 31, 2005; joint status report due January 14, 2005; telephonic status conference will be held on January 18, 2005, at 10:00 a.m. (jp)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/14/2005. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/18/2005 10:00 AM before Judge Victor J. Wolski. (dw1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004 Court Filing
                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/9/2004 03:00 PM before Judge Victor J. Wolski. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                        ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for Tuesday, September 7, 2004, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004
                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/7/2004 09:30 AM before Judge Victor J. Wolski. (dw1)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004
                                                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004
                                                              ANSWER to [1] Complaint, by USA. JPSR due by 7/19/2004.(Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER denying [6] Motion to Stay and also denying, in the alternative, coordinated discovery. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                  RESPONSE to [8] Order regarding pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER denying [10] Motion for Reconsideration of Order for Pre-Discovery Conference in New Spent Fuel Cases. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004, Terminated: 4/21/2004 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re [8] Order For Pre-Discovery Conference in New Spent Fuel Cases by AEP TEXAS CENTRAL COMPANY, CITY OF AUSTIN, TEXAS, CITY OF OF SAN ANTONIO, TEXAS, ACTING THROUGH THE PUBLIC SERVICE BOARD OF SAN ANTONIO, TEXAS GENCO, LP. Response due by 5/6/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 and 2# (2) Exhibit 3 through 8)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Brooks Crawford for USA. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                      *** Attorney John Clifford Ekman terminated. (jcp, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004
                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 4/26/2004. (dw1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER re Pre-Discovery Conference New SNF Cases Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004
                                                                            RESPONSE to [6] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by AEP TEXAS CENTRAL COMPANY, CITY OF AUSTIN, TEXAS, CITY OF OF SAN ANTONIO, TEXAS, ACTING THROUGH THE PUBLIC SERVICE BOARD OF SAN ANTONIO, TEXAS GENCO, LP. Reply due by 4/26/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Order 1/30/04# (2) Exhibit Order 6/26/03)(Freas, Monica) Modified on 4/14/2004 to correct reply date (dw1).
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004, Terminated: 5/5/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                              MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by USA. Response due by 4/15/2004 (Ekman, John)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John Clifford Ekman for USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                  NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                                                    Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by AEP TEXAS CENTRAL COMPANY, CITY OF AUSTIN, TEXAS, CITY OF OF SAN ANTONIO, TEXAS, ACTING THROUGH THE PUBLIC SERVICE BOARD OF SAN ANTONIO, TEXAS GENCO, LP. Service: 1/28/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Victor J. Wolski. (lg1, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Complaint
                                                                                        COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059583), filed by AEP TEXAS CENTRAL COMPANY, CITY OF AUSTIN, TEXAS, CITY OF OF SAN ANTONIO, TEXAS, ACTING THROUGH THE PUBLIC SERVICE BOARD OF SAN ANTONIO, TEXAS GENCO, LP.Answer Due by 3/29/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 214 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?