LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00161-RJY
District Judge Robert J. Yock, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Lockheed Martin Corporation Lockheed Martin Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Christopher Papson +1 202 496 7500 +1 202 496 7756 tpapson@mckennalong.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
No Logo Eds Information Services L.l.c., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiley Rein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip John Davis +1 202 719 7000 pdavis@wileyrein.com
Office COFC
Filed 2/6/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 138 - Contract - (Pre Award) Injunctions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 5/11/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 34 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorney's fees and costs. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 33 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Court Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting [32] MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a) filed by LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION, EDS INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing this action with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Further, the "with prejudice" dismissal of plaintiff's asserted pre-award claim concerning the continuation of the transition shall not operate as a bar to the pre-award claims that plaintiff and intervenor already have raised before the Gao in the protests designated as B-292836.5, B-292836.6, and B-292836.7, or to any other pre-award protest claims that plaintiff or intervenor may raise based on information obtained after the dates on which they filed their respective protests in B-292836.5, B-292836.6, and B-292836.7. In the event the parties require judicial intervention to enforce the Settlement Agreement, this matter may be re-filed in this court and the complaining party may notify the Clerk to refer this case to the undersigned judge. Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 32 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004, Terminated: 5/11/2004 Terminated:
      JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2), by EDS INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION.Service: 5/5/2004. Response due by 6/7/2004. (jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 31 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Status Report
        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 4/30/2004.(jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 30 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
          SCHEDULING ORDER: The Dft shall file an Administrative Record in this action no later than 4/30/2004. The opposition to the pltf's Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be filed on or before 5/5/2004. The Hearing upon the Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be held on 5/17/2004 before Senior Judge Robert J. Yock, or on a date convenient for all the parties and the Court.The pltf requested that it be permitted to file a reply to the opposition on or before 5/13/2004. The third party and the dft did not oppose this request. The dft's status report and request for enlargement of time, filed on 4/16/2004, is hereby allowed, and the new deadlines will be set as set forth above. Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 29 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Status Report
            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 4/16/2004.(jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 28 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
              SCHEDULING ORDER: The United States shall file an Administrative Record in this action no later than 4/16/2004. The opposition to the pltf's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction shall be filed on or before 4/21/2004. The Hearing upon the Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be held on 5/3/2004 before Senior Judge Robert J. Yock, or on a date convenient for all parties and the Court. The dft's status report and request for enlargement of time, is hereby allowed. Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 27 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004 Status Report
                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 4/2/2004.(jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 26 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER: The United States shall file an Administrative Record in this action no later than 4/2/2004. The oppositions to the pltf's Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be filed on or before 4/7/2004. The Hearing upon the Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be held on 4/19/2004, or on a date convenient for all the parties and the Court before Senior Judge Robert J. Yock. Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 25 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER: The United States shall file an Administrative Record in this action no later than 3/19/2004. The opposition to the pltf's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction shall be filed on or before 3/24/2004. The Hearing upon the Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be held on 4/5/2004, or on a date convenient for all the parties and the Court before Senior Judge Robert J. Yock. Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 24 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Status Report
                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 3/12/2004.(jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 23 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Joint Status Report
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 3/3/2004.(jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 22 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA. Service: 3/2/2004.(jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 21 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE of Filing of Proposed Protective Order by USA. Service: 2/27/2004.(jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Joint Status Report
                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 2/24/2004.(jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 20 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                DECISION of the General Accounting Office in Lockheed Martin Information Systems, Comap. Gen. B-20236, et al of 12/18/2003 by LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 19 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                  ORDER: [12] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Papers Under Seal is hereby allowed, and the GAO decision is to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. (jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 18 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                    ORDER: [13] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is hereby allowed.Administrative Record due 2/20/2004. Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. (jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 17 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                      ORDER allowing [15] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time.Administrative Record is hereby allowed 2/24/2004. Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. (jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 15 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Terminated:
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until 02/24/2004 to file Administrative Record by USA.Service: 02/20/2004. Response due by 3/8/2004 (lld, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 14 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [8] Motion to Intervene Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. (lld, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 13 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Terminated:
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 02/20/2004 to file Administrative Record by USA.Service: 02/18/2004. Response due by 3/8/2004 (lld, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 12 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Terminated:
                                              MOTION for Leave to File Dec. 18, 2003 Decision of GAO (UNDER SEAL) by LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION. Together with separate Exhibit 2 (UNDER SEAL)Service: 02/18/2004 by hand. Response due by 3/8/2004 (lld, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Yock : Hearing scheduled for Feb. 12, 2004, was cancelled by Judge. Hearing was not held. (mjc, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Yock : Status Conference held on Feb. 6, 2004. (mjc, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by EDS INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION, USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (jat, ) Modified on 2/24/2004 (jat, ).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court's prior scheduling Order dated 2/9/2004, is hereby vacated. The dft shall file an Administrative Record in this action no later than 2/18/2004. The parties shall submit, on or before 2/24/2004, a Joint Status Report. If the parties are unable to reach an agreement, the schedule of events for the hearing of pltf's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction shall be as follows: the dft and intervenor shall file their opposition to pltf's Motion by 2/25/2004. the pltf shall file its Reply to such oppositions by 3/4/2004. the Hearing on the Motion shall commence on 3/8/2004 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Robert J. Yock. Dft is responsible for filing any protective order needed in this action, and the pltf is responsible for filing under seal an unredacted copy of the GAO's decision. Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. (jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER: The [7] Transcript of the 2/6/2004 hearing is to be removed from the "Filed Under Seal" designation, placed in the file, and the transcript is to be made available to the public. Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. (jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004, Terminated: 2/19/2004 Terminated:
                                                          UNOPPOSED MOTION to Intervene by EDS INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 2/10/2004. Response due by 2/27/2004. (jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 2/6/2004 before Judge Robert J. Yock. (jcp, ) Modified on 2/18/2004 to remove "under seal" designation per Order of 2/11/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties must notify the Court as to the status of their negotiations by no later than 4:00 pm on Tuesday, 2/10/2004. If the parties are unable to reach an agreement by the 2/10/2004 deadline, then the dft and ther awardee must file their Responsive briefs by no later than 12:00 pm on Wednesday, 2/11/2004. The dft must file the Administrative Record by no later than 12:00 pm on Wednesday, 2/11/2004. A Hearing will then take place on Thursday, 2/12/2004 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Robert J. Yock. The awardee is welcome to file its intervention papers at any time and should do so as soon as possible. The pltf is resonsible for obtaining and filing under seal an unredacted copy of the GAO's decision as soon as possible. The dft is responsible for filing the necessary papers to implement a protective order for this case. Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. [VACATED PER ORDER OF 2/12/2004] (jcp, ) Modified on 2/19/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004
                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 2/9/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004, Terminated: 5/11/2004 Motion for TRO
                                                                  MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION.Service: 2/6/2004 by hand. Response due by 2/23/2004 (lg1, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004, Terminated: 5/11/2004 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                    MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION.Service: 2/6/2004 by hand. Response due by 2/23/2004 (lg1, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004
                                                                      Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION. Service: 2/6/2004 by hand.(lg1, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Court Filing
                                                                        NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Robert J. Yock. (lg1, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004
                                                                          COMPLAINT against USA (HUD) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059671), filed by LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION.Answer Due by 4/6/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 115 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?