SOUTH CAROLINA ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00101-CFL
District Judge Charles F. Lettow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo South Carolina Electric & Gas Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman Melvin Hirsch +1 312 923 2782 +1 312 840 7782 nhirsch@jenner.com
No Logo SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC SERVICE AUTHORITY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman Melvin Hirsch +1 312 923 2782 +1 312 840 7782 nhirsch@jenner.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office COFC
Filed 1/28/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 4/24/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case 98-126C
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, PROTO, SNF
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 49 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties.. (Hirsch, Norman)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/3/2008 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)1(ii) this day. (lld)
      LREF
      Legal Document 48 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: 4/11/2006 Court Filing
      STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 4/26/2006. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 47 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 16, 2005 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
          LREF
          Legal Document 46 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Court Filing
          SCHEDULING ORDER: the parties' pre-trial obligations under the Rules of the Court of Federal Claims, Appendix A, paragraphs 13-17, are suspended, and the court's Scheduling Order of September 9, 2004 is rescinded insofar as the dates for a pre-trial conference and commencement of trial are concerned. The dates for a pre-trial conference and commencement of trial may be addressed by a further scheduling order. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005
            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 1/3/2006. (vp1, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 45 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 1, 2005 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                LREF
                Legal Document 44 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Court Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER: The court's order of December 1, 2005 is amended to provide that the telephonic status conference scheduled for December 13, 2005 shall instead be held on December 16, 2005, commencing at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 43 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Court Filing
                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/13/2005 at 11:00 AM before Judge Charles F. Lettow. The court will initiate the call. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005
                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 12/16/2005. (vp1, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 42 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 14, 2005 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 41 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Court Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/1/2005 11:00 AM before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2006 10:00 AM at the National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Trial scheduled to commence on 1/23/2006 9:30 AM at the National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow.Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005
                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 11/29/2005. (vp1, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 40 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Court Filing
                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic status conference on 11/14/05 at 11:30 a.m. Court will initiate the call. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (rs1,)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/14/2005 11:30 AM before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 39 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [38] Motion for Enlargement of Time to Complete Expert Discovery. Discovery to be completed by 10/7/2005.Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005, Terminated: 9/28/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery,until October 7, 2005, filed by USA. Response due by 10/17/2005. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting [36] Motion for Extension of Time. Rebuttal expert reports to be exchanged by 09/09/2005 and expert discovery to conclude by 09/29/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 9/29/2005. (jat, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: 8/12/2005, Terminated: 8/16/2005 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                        Joint MOTION to Amend Schedule To Enlarge Deadline For Submission Of Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Expert Reports And Deadline For Completion Of Expert Discovery filed by SOUTH CAROLINA ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY, SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC SERVICE AUTHORITY. Response due by 8/29/2005. (Hirsch, Norman)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 35 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Court Filing
                                          ORDER denying [33] Motion for Order Regarding Treatment of Depositions and Trial Testimony from Other Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting [27] Motion for Entry of Order Limiting Scope of Trial and Preserving Future Claims. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005, Terminated: 6/29/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                              Joint MOTION For Order Regarding The Treatment Of Depositions And Trial Testimony From Other Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases filed by SOUTH CAROLINA ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY, SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC SERVICE AUTHORITY. Response due by 7/8/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Stipulation And Order)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005
                                                RESPONSE to [27] MOTION For Entry Of An Order Limiting The Scope Of Trial And Preserving Plaintiffs' Right To Bring Subsequent Actions For Damages Incurred After December 31, 2004 filed by USA. Reply due by 7/5/2005. (Finn, Stephen)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [28] Motion for an Order Regarding Discovery of Draft Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [29] Motion for Leave to File Instanter Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of an Order Limiting the Scope of Trial and Preserving Plaintiffs' Right to Bring Subsequent Actions for Damages Incurred After December 31, 2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005, Terminated: 6/14/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit A To Plaintiffs' Motion For Entry Of An Order Limiting The Scope Of Trial And Preserving Plaintiffs' Right To Bring Subsequent Actions For Damages Incurred After December 31, 2004 filed by SOUTH CAROLINA ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY, SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC SERVICE AUTHORITY. Response due by 6/24/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A -- Proposed Order)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005, Terminated: 6/14/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Joint Motion for an Order Regarding Discovery of Draft Expert Reports filed by USA. Response due by 6/24/2005. (Attachments: # (1))(Finn, Stephen)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005, Terminated: 6/29/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                          MOTION For Entry Of An Order Limiting The Scope Of Trial And Preserving Plaintiffs' Right To Bring Subsequent Actions For Damages Incurred After December 31, 2004 filed by SOUTH CAROLINA ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY, SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC SERVICE AUTHORITY. Response due by 6/20/2005. (Hirsch, Norman)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [25] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact Discovery to be completed by 5/13/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005, Terminated: 4/28/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery,until May 13, 2005, filed by SOUTH CAROLINA ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY, SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC SERVICE AUTHORITY. Response due by 5/13/2005. (Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [23] Motion for Extension of Time. Fact discovery to be completed on or before 05/06/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery due by 5/6/2005. (jat, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005, Terminated: 4/8/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 05/06/2005 to Complete Fact Witness Depositions filed by SOUTH CAROLINA ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY, SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC SERVICE AUTHORITY, USA. Response due by 4/25/2005 (Finn, Stephen)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER GRANTING in part [20] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [20] Motion for E-Mail Preservation Order. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/28/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004, Terminated: 1/4/2005 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                          Joint MOTION for Protective Order and E-mail Preservation Order by SOUTH CAROLINA ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY, SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC SERVICE AUTHORITY, USA. Response due by 1/14/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Proposed Protective Order# (2) Appendix Proposed E-mail Preservation Order)(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/9/2004 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004
                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/12/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [17] Motion for Leave to File Proposed Scheduling Order, scheduling discovery and other preparatory steps for trial. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bjw)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Expert Discovery due by 9/22/2005. Plaintiffs Expert Report due by 6/3/2005. Fact Discovery due by 4/8/2005. Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2006 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Trial set for 1/23/2006 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004, Terminated: 9/9/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Scheduling Order by SOUTH CAROLINA ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY, SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC SERVICE AUTHORITY. Response due by 9/27/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Scheduling Order)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004
                                                                                      Proposed Pretrial Order Proposed Scheduling Order by all defendants. (Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Defendant's request for stay of proceedings within the status report filed July 16, 2004 DENIED. A Status Conference is set for 9/9/2004 09:30 AM in Courtroom to be posted in the lobby of the building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow.(rs1)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004
                                                                                          JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004
                                                                                            ANSWER to [1] Complaint by all defendants. JPSR due by 7/19/2004.(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/26/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER denying [7] Motion to Stay. Defendant shall file its answer or other response to the complaint on or before 5/28/2004. Joint Preliminary Status Report to be filed as required by RCFC, Appendix A para. 4. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/26/2004
                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answer Due by 5/28/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [8] Order for Pre-Discovery Conference in New SNF Cases filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery Plans And Objectives by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Hirsch, Norman)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 4/26/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004
                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [7] MOTION to Stay all proceedings filed by SOUTH CAROLINA ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY, SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC SERVICE AUTHORITY. Reply due by 4/26/2004. (Hirsch, Norman) Modified on 4/16/2004 to correct reply due date (dw1).
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER for pre-discovery conference in new SNF cases. Pre-discovery conference scheduled for April 30, 2004. Reports to be submitted as set forth in Order on or before April 23, 2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004, Terminated: 4/26/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay all proceedings by USA. Response due by 4/15/2004 (Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Philip Finn for USA. (Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Notice of Indirectly Related Case(s)
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Indirectly Related Case(s) [98-126C, 98-154C, 98-474C, 98-483C, 98-484C, 98-485C, 98-486C, 98-488C, 98-614C, 98-621C, 99-447C, 00-440C, 00-697C, 00-703C, 01-115C, 01-116C, 01-249C, 01-551C, 02-898C, 02-926C, 01-1894C, 03-2505C, 03-2621C, 03-2622C, 03-2623C, 03-2624C, 03-2625C, 03-2626C, 03-2627C, 03-2663C, 03-2832C, 04-0010C, 04-0037C, 04-0067C, 04-0068C, 04-0069C, 04-0070C, 04-0071C, 04-0074C, 04-0075C,04-0083C, 04-0084C, 04-0088C] by SOUTH CAROLINA ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY, SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC SERVICE AUTHORITY. Service: 1/28/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                                                                                    Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by SOUTH CAROLINA ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY, SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC SERVICE AUTHORITY. Service: 1/28/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059582), filed by SOUTH CAROLINA ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY, SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC SERVICE AUTHORITY.Answer Due by 3/29/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 173 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?