EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00102-ECH
District Judge Emily C. Hewitt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Exelon Generation Company, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman Melvin Hirsch +1 312 923 2782 +1 312 840 7782 nhirsch@jenner.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/28/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 8/9/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case 04-103C, 04-104C
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, SNF
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004
Data Quality Correction re: [15] Stipulation of Dismissal. The motion for voluntary dismissal as filed by plaintiff has been deleted and re-entered correctly as a stipulation of dismissal. (dls)
    LREF
    Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
      LREF
      Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004, Terminated: 8/9/2004 Motion to Stay
      MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery by USA. Response due by 5/24/2004 (Lester, Harold)
        LREF
        Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
        RESPONSE to [9] Order regarding pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
        STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery Plans And Objectives by EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC. (Hirsch, Norman)
          LREF
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004 Court Filing
          ORDER granting [10] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer Due by 5/7/2004. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004, Terminated: 4/22/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 5/7/2004 by USA. Response due by 5/6/2004 (Lester, Harold)
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Court Filing
              Notice of Pre-Discovery Conference. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jb2)
                LREF
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Court Filing
                ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer due by 4/19/2004. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004, Terminated: 3/30/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 4/19/2004 by USA. Response due by 4/15/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                      NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                        NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [04-103C, 04-104C] by EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC. Service: 1/28/2004.(lg1, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (lg1, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                            Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC. Service: 1/28/2004.(lg1, )(copy to defendant).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059584), filed by EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC.Answer Due by 3/29/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 110 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?