EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00103-ECH
District Judge Emily C. Hewitt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Exelon Generation Company, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman Melvin Hirsch +1 312 923 2782 +1 312 840 7782 nhirsch@jenner.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/28/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 8/9/2004
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
198-cv-00621-ECH
Related Cases
04-104, 104-cv-00102-ECH
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, MEMBER, SNF
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 ~Notice (other)
APPENDIX to Dft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Pltf's Recovery of Future or Prospective Damages by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 6/2/2004.(jcp, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004, Terminated: 8/9/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 4/26/2004 by USA. Response due by 5/6/2004 (Lester, Harold)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004
      ORDER granting [6] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 4/19/2004. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN LEAD CASE NO. 98-621C] Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004
        NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004, Terminated: 3/31/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 4/19/2004 by USA. Response due by 4/15/2004 (Lester, Harold)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004 Set Member Flag
            This case has been consolidated under case number 98-621 C pursuant to the order of March 17, 2004. (dls)
              LREF
              Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [04-102C, 04-104C ] by EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC. Service: 1/28/2004.(lg1, ).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (lg1, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                    Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC. Service: 1/28/2004.(lg1, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059585), filed by EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC.Answer Due by 3/29/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 162 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?