EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00104-ECH
District Judge Emily C. Hewitt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AMERGEN ENERGY COMPANY, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman Melvin Hirsch +1 312 923 2782 +1 312 840 7782 nhirsch@jenner.com
No Logo Exelon Generation Company, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman Melvin Hirsch +1 312 923 2782 +1 312 840 7782 nhirsch@jenner.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/28/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 8/9/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Cases
104-cv-00102-ECH, 104-cv-00103-ECH
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, SNF
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004
Data Quality Correction re: [16] Stipulation of Dismissal. The motion for voluntary dismissal as filed by plaintiff has been deleted and re-entered correctly as a stipulation of dismissal. (dls)
    LREF
    Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
      LREF
      Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004, Terminated: 8/9/2004 Motion to Stay
      MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery by USA. Response due by 5/24/2004 (Lester, Harold)
        LREF
        Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004
        ANSWER to [1] Complaint by USA. JPSR due by 6/28/2004.(Lester, Harold)
          LREF
          Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
          RESPONSE to [9] Order regarding pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
          LREF
          Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
          STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery Plans And Objectives by AMERGEN ENERGY COMPANY, LLC, EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC. (Hirsch, Norman)
            LREF
            Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004 Court Filing
            ORDER granting [10] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 5/7/2004. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1) Modified on 4/22/2004 for punctuation (dw1).
              LREF
              Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004, Terminated: 4/22/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 5/7/2004 by USA. Response due by 5/6/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                LREF
                Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Court Filing
                Notice of Pre-Discovery Conference. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jb2)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Court Filing
                  ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 4/19/2004. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004, Terminated: 3/30/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 4/21/2004 by USA. Response due by 4/15/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                          NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [04-102C, 04-103C] by AMERGEN ENERGY COMPANY, LLC, EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC. Service: 1/28/2004.(lg1, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (lg1, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                              Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by AMERGEN ENERGY COMPANY, LLC, EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC. Service: 1/28/2004.(lg1, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059586), filed by AMERGEN ENERGY COMPANY, LLC, EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC.Answer Due by 3/29/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 174 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?