DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00106-EJD
District Judge Edward J. Damich, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dairyland Power Cooperative, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan J. Lo Re +1 202 307 0226 alan.lo.re@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/28/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status TrlHeld
Flags ECF, PROTO, SNF
  Entries (437) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 353 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [349] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Stouck, Jerry)
    LREF
    Legal Document 352 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
    Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on August 28, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-24) held on August 28, 2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 9/9/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/3/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2008. (dw1)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 350 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Transcript - Cumulative Index
        **SEALED**(Revised) Cumulative Index (pages 1-31) for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 7, 2008 through July 23, 2008. (dw1)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Post Trial Brief due 9/19/2008. Defendant's Post Trial Response Brief due 10/1/2008. (jt1)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008
            ORDER: Pursuant to the discussion during the status conference of August 28, 2008, Plaintiff's initial post-trial brief shall be due on September 19, 2008, and Defendant's response shall be due on October 1, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008
              Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 8/28/2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich: Telephonic Status Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(EJ1)
                LREF
                Legal Document 349 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
                MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 348 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Court Filing
                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for August 28, 2008, at 10:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                    LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 347 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Transcript - Cumulative Index
                    **SEALED**Cumulative Index ( pages 1-22) for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 7, 2008 through July 23, 2008. Filed with plaintiff and defendant exhibits. (dw1)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 346 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Court Filing
                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for Wednesday, August 27, 2008, at 10:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 2542-2772) held on July 21, 2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 8/5/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2008. (dw1)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 344 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                          Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on July 21, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 3076-3296) held on July 23, 2008 before Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/31/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/25/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/22/2008. (dw1)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 342 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                              Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on July 23, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                                LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 341 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Court Filing
                                **SEALED**TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 2773-3075) held on July 22, 2008 before Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. (dw1)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 340 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008
                                  Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on July 22, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008
                                    Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 7/7/2008, ended on 7/23/2008, before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich: Trial. [Total number of days of proceeding: 13]. Official record of proceeding taken by court reporter. (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(EJ1)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 2298-2541) held on July 18, 2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/28/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2008. (dw1)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 338 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                        Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on July 18, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                                          LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 337 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                          **SEALED**TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 2018-2297) held on July 17, 2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. (dw1)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 336 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                            Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on July 17, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1734-2017) held on July 16, 2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/28/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2008. (dw1)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 334 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on July 16, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 333 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                  **SEALED**TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1484-1733) held on July 15, 2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. (dw1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 332 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                    Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on July 15, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Sealed Legal Document 331 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                      **SEALED**TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1247-1483) held on July 14, 2008 before Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. (dw1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 330 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                        Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on July 14, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 329 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008
                                                          MEMORANDUM, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Sealed Legal Document 328 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Court Filing
                                                            **SEALED**TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1484-1733) held on July 15, 2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. (dw1)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 327 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008
                                                              Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on July 15, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1014-1246) held on July 11, 2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/21/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/14/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2008. (dw1)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 402 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER denying 399 Defendant's Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb) Copy to parties.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 325 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                    Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on July 11, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 744-1013) held on July 10, 2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/21/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/14/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2008. (dw1)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 323 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                        Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on July 10, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 507-743) held on July 9, 2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/21/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/14/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2008. (dw1)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 321 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                            Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on July 9, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 397 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              PUBLISHED OPINION: The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff for damages for private fuel storage. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb) Copy to parties.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 246-506) held on July 8, 2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/14/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/14/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2008. (dw1)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 319 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                  Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on July 8, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-245) held on July 7, 2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/15/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2008. (dw1)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 317 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008
                                                                                      Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on July 7, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 316 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                        **SEALED**TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-35) held on June 23, 2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. (dw1)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 315 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008
                                                                                          Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on June 23, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 314 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER regarding [270], [271], [303], and [304] Objections and Responses to Exhibit Lists. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Ruling on Objections to Exhibits) (ahb)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 390 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER denying 386 Defendant's Motion to Reopen the Evidentiary Record Regarding Private Fuel Storage. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 313 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER denying [311] Motion to Preclude Admission of Defendant's Cross-Designations of Testimony and Request for Expedited Consideration. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 312 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER denying [137] Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim For Recovery Of Off-Site Fuel Storage Investments. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 311 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008, Terminated: 7/2/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                    MOTION to Preclude Admission of Defendant's Cross-Designations of Testimony and Request for Expedited Consideration re [310] Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 7/14/2008.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 310 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008
                                                                                                      NOTICE, filed by USA Defendant's Cross-Designations of Deposition and Prior Trial Testimony Transcripts (Attachments: # (1) Appendix, # (2) Appendix, # (3) Appendix, # (4) Appendix, # (5) Appendix, # (6) Appendix, # (7) Appendix, # (8) Appendix, # (9) Appendix, # (10) Appendix, # (11) Appendix, # (12) Appendix, # (13) Appendix, # (14) Appendix, # (15) Appendix, # (16) Appendix, # (17) Appendix, # (18) Appendix, # (19) Appendix, # (20) Appendix, # (21) Appendix, # (22) Appendix)(Moses, Anthony)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 6/23/2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich: Pretrial Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official record of proceeding taken by court reporter. (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(EJ1)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 309 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER regarding [259] Dairyland's Notice of Deposition and Trial Testimony Designations or, Alternatively, Motion for Leave to Admit Prior Testimony into Evidence. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 308 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER regarding [257], [258], [262], [263], [264], [266], [267], [268] and [269], the parties' Motions in Limine filed on April 29, 2008, and the parties' Proposed Procedures for Sequestration. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 307 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008, Terminated: 6/20/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Trial Exhibit List, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 7/7/2008.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [307] Dairyland's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Trial Exhibit List. Dairyland shall provide the Court will two copies of any new or corrected exhibits at the Pre-trial Conference on Monday, June 23, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 306 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008
                                                                                                                Exhibit List Amended Final, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Amended Final Exhibit List, # (2) Certificate of Filing)(Slater, Scott)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 305 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [296] Response to Notice of Testimony Designations or Alternative Motion for Leave to Admit Prior Testimony, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [302] Motion for Leave to File Amended Final Exhibit List. The Government's Amended Final Exhibit List shall designate exhibits as required in the Rules of the Court of Federal Claims Appendix A, Paragraph 16. The Government may also add the three additional documents that were recently identified to the Amended Exhibit List. The Amended Exhibit List shall be filed on or before June 19, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 304 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [271] Objection to Exhibit List, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Appendix of Dairyland's Responses to Government Objections)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 303 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant's Trial Exhibits, filed by USA. (Moses, Anthony)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 302 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008, Terminated: 6/17/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Amended Final Exhibit List, filed by USA.Response due by 7/3/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Amended Exhibit List, # (2) Certificate of Filing)(Slater, Scott)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 301 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008
                                                                                                                            Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on June 2, 2008 in Genoa, Wisconsin. (lld)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 2, 2008 (pgs. 1-18) in Genoa, Wisconsin before Judge Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/23/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2008. (lld)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [299] Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time until June 16, 2008, to File a Response to the Government's Objections to Dairyland's Proposed Trial Exhibits. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 299 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008, Terminated: 6/16/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/16/08 to to File Response to Goverment Objections to Dairyland's Proposed Trial Exhibits, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 6/30/2008.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 298 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Alan J. Lo Re for USA. (Lo Re, Alan)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 297 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008
                                                                                                                                      Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by USA. (Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 296 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition and Trial Testimony Designations or, Alternatively, Motion for Leave to Admit Prior Testimony Into Evidence, filed by USA. (Moses, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 295 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008
                                                                                                                                          Witness List, filed by all parties. (Slater, Scott)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 294 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008
                                                                                                                                            Witness List, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 293 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008
                                                                                                                                              Exhibit List Joint Exhibits, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Lists of Common Exhibits and Exhibits Without Objection)(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 292 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008
                                                                                                                                                Exhibit List, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 291 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008
                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit List Defendant's Final, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Defendant's Exhibit List)(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 290 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008
                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of Facts, filed by USA. (Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 289 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008
                                                                                                                                                      Witness List, filed by USA. (Slater, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 288 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [285] Unopposed MOTION to Amend Trial Preparation Order. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 285 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008, Terminated: 6/4/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION Amend Trial Preparation Order re [245] Order,, filed by USA.Response due by 6/23/2008.(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 287 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on May 29, 2008 in Wasington, DC. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 29, 2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/10/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2008. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008
                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceeding held in Genoa, Wisconsin on 6/2/2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich: Site Visit. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official record of proceeding taken by court reporter. (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(EJ1)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 284 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER regarding Defendant's request at the hearing on May 29, 2008, for an enlargement of time to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Admit Prior Testimony into Evidence and to submit its proposed cross-designation of transcript pages. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's motion by June 6, 2008, and shall file its proposed cross-designation of transcript pages by June 23, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines for 5/29/08 proceeding: Transcript due from Heritage by 6/11/2008. (lld)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 5/29/2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich: Oral Argument on Motions in Limine. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official record of proceeding taken by court reporter. (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(EJ1)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 283 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER regarding the hearing on the parties' motions in limine scheduled for May 29, 2008, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 282 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Additional Authority in Support of its Response to Government's Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony Regarding Overhead Costs (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 281 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [268] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Admission at Trial of Documents Prepared by Government Contractors, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 5/30/2008. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 280 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [267] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Ivan F. Stuart, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 5/30/2008. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 279 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [264] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Jonathan A. Neuberger's Testimony, filed by USA.Reply due by 5/30/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix, # (2) Appendix)(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 278 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [263] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Warren K. Brewer's Testimony, filed by USA.Reply due by 5/30/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Appendix Part 1, # (2) Appendix Appendix Part 2)(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 277 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [257] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Inconsistent with the Government's Contention Interrogatory Answers, filed by USA.Reply due by 5/30/2008. (Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 276 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [269] MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Testimony Of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Frank C. Graves, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 5/30/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1, # (2) Appendix Part 2, # (3) Appendix Part 3, # (4) Appendix Part 4, # (5) Appendix Part 5, # (6) Appendix Part 6)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 275 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [258] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of the Reasons for DOE's "Delay" in Performance - i.e., Its Breach of Contract, filed by USA.Reply due by 5/30/2008. (Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 274 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [262] First MOTION in Limine To Exclude Expert Testimony Regarding Overhead Costs, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 5/30/2008. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 273 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [266] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Larry Johnson's Testimony, filed by USA.Reply due by 5/30/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix, # (2) Appendix)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 272 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 271 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection to Exhibit List, filed by USA. Related document: [245] Order, Order on Motion to Amend Schedule,.(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 270 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection to Exhibit List, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. Related document: [245] Order,.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 269 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008, Terminated: 6/20/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Testimony Of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Frank C. Graves, filed by USA.Response due by 5/16/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix # (5) Appendix # (6) Appendix)(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 268 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008, Terminated: 6/20/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Admission at Trial of Documents Prepared by Government Contractors, filed by USA.Response due by 5/16/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Certificate of Filing)(Moses, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 267 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008, Terminated: 6/20/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Ivan F. Stuart, filed by USA.Response due by 5/16/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Certificate of Service)(Slater, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 266 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008, Terminated: 6/20/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Exclude Larry Johnson's Testimony, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 5/16/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1# (2) Appendix Part 2)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 265 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE, filed by USA re [245] Order, Proposed Procedures for Sequestration (Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 264 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008, Terminated: 6/20/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude Jonathan A. Neuberger's Testimony, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 5/16/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1# (2) Appendix Part 2# (3) Appendix Part 3# (4) Appendix Part 4# (5) Appendix Part 5# (6) Appendix Part 6# (7) Appendix Part 7# (8) Appendix Part 8)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 263 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008, Terminated: 6/20/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude Warren K. Brewer's Testimony, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 5/16/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1# (2) Appendix Part 2# (3) Appendix Part 3)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 262 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008, Terminated: 6/20/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First MOTION in Limine To Exclude Expert Testimony Regarding Overhead Costs, filed by USA.Response due by 5/16/2008.(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 261 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM re: [245] Order,, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 260 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE, USA re [245] Order, Joint Statement of Good Faith Conduct (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 259 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE of Deposition and Trial Testimony Designations or, Alternatively, Motion for Leave to Admit Prior Testimony Into Evidence (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Attachment 1# (2) Appendix Appendix A & B# (3) Appendix Appendix C)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 258 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008, Terminated: 6/20/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of the Reasons for DOE's "Delay" in Performance - i.e., Its Breach of Contract, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 5/16/2008.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 257 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008, Terminated: 6/20/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Inconsistent with the Government's Contention Interrogatory Answers, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 5/16/2008.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part [256] Joint Motion to Amend Trial Preparation Order. The parties shall file their respective objections to the proposed trial exhibits on or before May 2, 2008. All other deadlines in the Trial Preparation Order of February 21, 2008, remain unchanged. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 256 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008, Terminated: 4/24/2008 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Amend Schedule of Trial Preparation Order re: [245] Order,, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE, USA.Response due by 5/12/2008.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [255] Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Cancel Telephonic Status Conference. The parties need not appear for the status conference previously scheduled for Friday, April 4, 2008, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 255 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008, Terminated: 4/3/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION To Cancel Telephonic Status Conference, filed by USA.Response due by 4/21/2008.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 254 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-29) held on March 20, 2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 253 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER regarding Defendant's Notice of Production and Amended Privilege Log filed February 29, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 252 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [248] Joint Motion to Amend Trial Preparation Order. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 251 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for April 4, 2008, at 10:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 250 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008, Terminated: 3/20/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/4/2008 to Produce Documents Pursuant To The Court's March 17, 2008 Order, filed by USA.Response due by 4/7/2008.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines for 3/20/08 proceeding: Transcript due by 4/1/2008. (lld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [250] Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time to Produce Documents Pursuant to the Court's March 17, 2008 Order. Defendant shall produce the six documents subject to the Order of March 17, 2008, on or before April 4, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 3/20/2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich : Telephonic Status Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(EJ1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 249 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [144] Dairyland's Motion to Compel Production of "Presidential Communications" Documents; granting in part and denying in part [211] Dairyland's Motion to Compel Production of All Five Remaining Presidential Communications Privilege Documents. The Government shall produce documents to Dairyland on or before 5:00 p.m. on March 21, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 248 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008, Terminated: 3/20/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION To Amend Trial Preparation Order, filed by USA.Response due by 3/24/2008.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 247 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE, filed by USA of Production and Submission of Amended Privilege Log (Slater, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 246 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part [158] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Withheld On Deliberative Process Privilege, Attorney-Client Privilege And/Or Work Product Doctrine Grounds. Defendant shall produce documents or an amended privilege log on or before February 29, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 245 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER: A telephonic status conference shall be held on Thursday, March 20, 2008, at 2:00 p.m. A hearing on the parties' motions in limine shall be held on Thursday, May 29, 2008, at 10:00 a.m. A pretrial conference shall be held on June 23, 2008, at 10:00 a.m. Trial shall begin on July 7, 2008 and conclude on July 23, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 244 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for Thursday, March 20, 2008, at 2:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [242] Plaintiff's Motion to Establish Due Date for Motions In Limine Regarding Experts and Request for Expedited Consideration. In lieu of establishing a due date for motions in limine regarding experts a Trial Preparation Order shall be issued. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 243 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [242] MOTION to Establish Due Date for Motions in Limine Regarding Experts and Request for Expedited Consideration, filed by USA.Reply due by 3/3/2008. (Slater, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 242 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008, Terminated: 2/21/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Establish Due Date for Motions in Limine Regarding Experts and Request for Expedited Consideration, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 3/3/2008.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 241 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [211] MOTION to Compel Production of All Five Remaining Presidential Communications Privilege Documents, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 240 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [211] Motion to Compel Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's December 14, 2007 Motion To Compel And Notice Of Filing Of Formal Invocation Of Presidential Communications Privilege Pursuant To The Court's December 19, 2007 Order, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 239 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Government's Supplemental Brief on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re PFS-Related Damages, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 238 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT re [220] Order,, Certifying Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set Of Interrogatories by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [237] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until January 18, 2008 to Submit the Government's Affidavit Certifying the Government's Responses to Interrogatories Pursuant to the Court's December 21, 2007 Order. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 237 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008, Terminated: 1/16/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until January 18, 2008 to Submit The Government's Affidavit Certifying The Government's Responses To Interrogatories Pursuant To The Court's December 21, 2007 Order, filed by USA.Response due by 2/1/2008.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 236 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Trial in this case will begin at 10:00 a.m. on Monday, July 7, 2008, and granting [212] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for the Court to Schedule a Site Visit. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 235 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE, filed by USA re Order on Motion for Leave to File Out of Time, [220] Order,, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Supplemental Response Interrogatory 13)(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [234] Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Submit Supplemental Interrogatory Response Out of Time. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 234 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008, Terminated: 1/11/2008 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Attached Supplemental Response to Interrogatory 13 Out of Time, filed by USA.Response due by 1/28/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Supplemental Response to Interrogatory 13)(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 233 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            **SEALED**RESPONSE to [215] Order, Defendant's Supplemental Brief In Response To The Court's December 21, 2007 Order Regarding Defendant's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment, filed by USA.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 232 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008, Terminated: 1/8/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendant's Memorandum Of Law In Response To The Court's December 21, 2007 Order, filed by USA.Response due by 1/25/2008.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [232] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of Law in Response to the Court's December 21, 2007 Order Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [230] Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time to Submit Supplemental Interrogatory Response. Defendant's supplemental response to Plaintiff's Interrogatory number 13 shall be submitted on or before January 9, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 231 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [217] Supplemental Brief Defendant's Memorandum Of Law in Response To The Court's December 12, 2007 Order And Plaintiff's December 21, 2007 Supplemental Brief, filed by USA. (Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 230 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008, Terminated: 1/8/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time until January 9, 2008 to Submit Supplemental Interrogatory Response, filed by USA.Response due by 1/25/2008.(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [229] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [229] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until January 9, 2008 to File Response or Reply To The Court's December 21, 2007 Order Regarding Defendant's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment. Response/Reply due 1/9/2008. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [228] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response/Reply due 1/7/2008. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 229 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008, Terminated: 1/7/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until January 9, 2008 to File Response or Reply To The Court's December 21, 2007 Order Regarding Defendant's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment, filed by USA.Response due by 1/22/2008.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 228 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008, Terminated: 1/7/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until January 7, 2008 to File Response or Reply To The Court's December 11, 2007 Order, filed by USA.Response due by 1/22/2008.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 227 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [225] Defendant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time. The affidavit(s) reflecting a formal invocation of the presidential communications privilege and the response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel shall be filed on or before January 22, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich.(ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 226 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for Friday, January 11, 2008 at 2:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 225 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008, Terminated: 1/3/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until January 22, 2008 to TO SUBMIT THE WHITE HOUSE'S FORMAL INVOCATION OF PRESIDENTIAL COMMUNICATIONS PRIVILEGE PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S DECEMBER 19, 2007 ORDER, AND TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF THE FIVE REMAINING PRESIDENTIAL COMMUNICATIONS PRIVILEGE DOCUMENTS, filed by USA.Response due by 1/22/2008.(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [223] Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting the Government's Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Respond to Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 224 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [223] MOTION for Reconsideration re [222] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting the Government's Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Respond to Motion to Compel Production of Five Remaining Docu MOTION for Reconsideration re [222] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting the Government's Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Respond to Motion to Compel Production of Five Remaining Docu, filed by USA.Reply due by 1/11/2008. (Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 223 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/26/2007, Terminated: 12/28/2007 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re [222] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting the Government's Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Respond to Motion to Compel Production of Five Remaining Documents withheld on Claims of Presidential Communications Privilege, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 222 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/26/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [218] Defendant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for the Production of the Five Remaining Documents Withheld Pursuant to the Presidential Communications Privilege. Response due by January 8, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb) Modified on 1/2/2008 Note: No PDF or paper is associated with document number 222 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 221 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE, filed by USA Of Supplemental Document Production (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 220 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re [96] Motion for Sanctions - Rule 37: final disposition of pending motion for supplementation of interrogatory responses and sanctions. Motion granted as to interrogatory number 13; supplementation of Defendant's response to interrogatory number 13 due on or before 1/7/2008. Motion for supplementation of interrogatory numbers 9, 15, 16, and 17 and sanctions denied. Affidavit as to truth of all responses due on or before 1/15/2008. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 219 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION Modify The Court's Trial Preparation Order re [184] Pretrial Order,,,,, filed by USA.Response due by 1/7/2008.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 218 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007, Terminated: 12/26/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond To Plaintiff's December 14, 2007 Motion To Compel The Production Of The Five Remaining Documents Withheld Pursuant To The Presidential Communications Privilege, filed by USA.Response due by 1/7/2008.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 217 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF for Sanctions Regarding RCFC 30(B)(6) Deposition, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 216 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: upon review of documents provided for in camera inspection pursuant to the Court's order of June 29, 2007, the Court orders Defendant to produce certain documents to Plaintiff on or before January 2, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 215 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING: Defendant shall file a supplemental brief concerning its [137] Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim For Recovery Of Off-Site Fuel Storage Investments on or before 1/7/2008; Plaintiff shall file a response on or before 1/22/2008. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 214 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PUBLISHED OPINION AND ORDER deferring ruling on [144] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of "Presidential Communications" Documents and denying [179] Defendant's Cross-Motion for a Protective Order: Defendant is ordered to file a formal affidavit invoking the presidential communications privilege and to submit to the Court the five subject documents for in camera review on or before January 7, 2008. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 213 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: upon review of documents provided for in camera inspection pursuant to the Court's order of June 29, 2007, the Court orders Defendant to produce certain documents to Plaintiff on or before December 26, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (sg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 212 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007, Terminated: 1/14/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION For the Court to Schedule a Site Visit, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 1/3/2008.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 211 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007, Terminated: 3/17/2008 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Production of All Five Remaining Presidential Communications Privilege Documents, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 12/31/2007.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 210 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerry Stouck (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines: Brief due by 12/21/2007. Response due by 1/4/2008. re: [209] Order (mb2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 209 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [197] Motion for Reconsideration and Order for Supplemental Briefing: the motion for reconsideration as to two portions of the three opinion segments re [195], [196] the motion concerns is denied; decision on the third segment is held in abeyance pending completion of supplemental briefing. Dairyland's supplemental brief is due on or before Friday, December 21, 2007; the government's supplemental brief is due on or before Friday, January 4, 2008. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 208 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [203] Defendant's Motion for Clarification. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (sg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 207 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [202] Response Dairyland's Reply to Government's Response to Dairyland's Report on the Sufficiency of the Government's Answers to Certain Contention Interrogatories, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Attachments: # (1))(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 206 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Post-discovery Status Conference set for 1/18/2008 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 205 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [203] First MOTION for Clarification of [201] Order on Motion for Clarification, [189] Order, November 19 and December 4, 2007First MOTION for Clarification of [201] Order on Motion for Clarification, [189] Order, November 19 and December 4, 2007First MOTION for Clarification of [201] Order on Motion for Clarification, [189] Order, November 19 and December 4, 2007, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 12/24/2007. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 204 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: upon review of documents provided for in camera inspection pursuant to the Court's order of June 29, 2007, the Court orders Defendant to produce certain documents to Plaintiff on or before December 19, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (sg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 203 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007, Terminated: 12/12/2007 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION for Clarification of [201] Order on Motion for Clarification, [189] Order, November 19 and December 4, 2007, filed by USA.Response due by 12/24/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix September 20, 2007 Hearing Transcript# (2) Appendix 9.20.07 Hearing Transcript pp. 1-4# (3) Appendix 9.20.07 Hearing Transcript pp. 61-64# (4) Appendix 9.20.07 Hearing Transcript pp 65-68# (5) Appendix 9.20.07 Hearing Transcript pp. 69-72)(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 202 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [199] Memorandum Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's December 3, 2007 Report, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 201 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [198] Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification of Order of November 19, 2007, regarding production of documents withheld under deliberative process privilege. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 200 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE, filed by USA re [192] Order on Motion for Sanctions - Rule 37, Order on Cross Motion,, Notice of Supplemental Response to Interrogatory Number 5 (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Supplemental Interrogatory)(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 199 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM re: [192] Order on Motion for Sanctions - Rule 37, Order on Cross Motion,,, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 198 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 12/4/2007 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Clarification of [189] Order, and Enforce Paragraph of November 19, 2007 Order and Request for Expedited Consideration, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 12/17/2007.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 197 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007, Terminated: 12/12/2007 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re [195] Order, [191] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, [196] Order, [192] Order on Motion for Sanctions - Rule 37, Order on Cross Motion,,, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2))(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 196 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORRECTED ORDER re [192] Order granting in part and denying in part [96] Plaintiff's motion for sanctions pursuant to Rule 37 and to enforce discovery order; denying [104] Defendant's cross-motion for reciprocal obligations (contains minor stylistic changes made in preparation for publication) Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 195 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORRECTED ORDER re [191] granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's motion for relief from Defendant's discovery violations regarding RCFC 30(b)(6) deposition testimony (contains minor stylistic changes made in preparation for publication). Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 194 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 1/25/2008. (Slater, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 193 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM re: [179] Response to Motion, [186] Reply to Response to Motion,, filed by USA. (Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 192 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007, Terminated: 11/29/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part [96] Plaintiff's motion for sanctions pursuant to Rule 37 and to enforce discovery order; denying [104] Defendant's cross-motion for reciprocal obligations. Defendant's supplemental interrogatory response and Plaintiff's report on sufficient response to certain other interrogatories due on or before December 3, 2007. Signed by chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 191 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part [118] Plaintiff's Motion for relief from Defendant's discovery violations regarding RCFC 30(b)(6) deposition testimony. Plaintiff is entitled to reopen the depositin of Mr. Zabransky for certain limited inquiries. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [190] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time within which to file a reply to [186] Plaintiff's reply to [179] Defendant's response and cross-motion for a protective order to [144] Plaintiff's motion to compel production of documents withheld under the presidential communications privilege. Defendant's reply due on or before November 21, 2007 Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 190 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007, Terminated: 11/20/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until November 21, 2007 to File Reply To Plaintiff's Opposition To The Government's Cross-Motion For A Protective Order Regarding Documents Withheld Pursuant To The Presidential Communications Privilege, filed by USA.Response due by 12/6/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 189 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: upon review of documents provided for in camera inspection pursuant to the Court's order of June 29, 2007, the Court orders Defendant to produce certain documents to Plaintiff on or before December 10, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 188 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 187 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [158] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld on Deliberative Process Privilege, Attorney-Client Privilege and/or Work Product Doctrine Grounds, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Exhibit)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 186 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [144] MOTION to Compel Production of "Presidential Communications" Documents and Opposition to Motion for Protective Order, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 185 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [158] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld on Deliberative Process Privilege, Attorney-Client Privilege and/or Work Product Doctrine Grounds, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying as moot [171] Defendant's motion to reschedule the trial date, in light of the Court's Trial Preparation Order issued on October 31, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 184 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER: the parties shall serve proposed stipulations, witness and exhibits lists on or before January 17, 2008; the meeting of counsel shall be held on or before January 23; Plaintiff's memorandum of fact and law shall be filed on or before January 28; the parties' joint statement of good faith, notice re sequestration, testimony designations, and motions in limine shall be filed on or before January 29; responses to motions in limine due on or before February 15; Defendant's responsive memorandum of fact and law shall be filed on or before February 25; the Court shall hear argument on the motions in limine on February 27 at 10:00 a.m.; the parties' objections re testimony designations, the parties' joint stipulations of fact, witnesses, and exhibits, and each party's final list of witnesses and exhibits shall be filed on or before February 29; the final pre-trial conference shall be held March 10 at 10:00 a.m.; and trial shall commence on March 24, 2008, at 10:00 a.m. for 13 trial days. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 183 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re [137] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim For Recovery Of Off-Site Fuel Storage Investments, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix)(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 182 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Pretrial Order Joint Proposal for Revised Trial Preparation Schedule and Statement Regarding Damages Period, filed by all parties. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 181 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [158] Motion to Compel,, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [180] Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendant's Reply To Plaintiff's Opposition To The Government's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 180 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007, Terminated: 10/29/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendant's Reply To Plaintiff's Opposition To The Government's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment, filed by USA.Response due by 11/13/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 179 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [144] MOTION to Compel Production of "Presidential Communications" Documents, filed by USA.Reply due by 11/5/2007. (Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 178 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [158] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld on Deliberative Process Privilege, Attorney-Client Privilege and/or Work Product Doctrine Grounds, filed by USA.Reply due by 11/5/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Slater, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [177] Defendant's motion to exceed the page limit of its response to [158] Plaintiff's motion to compel the production of documents withheld on attorney-client privilege and/or work product doctrine grounds; to accommodate the protocols of electronic case filing (ECF), Defendant must formally file the response, which was attached as an appendix to its motion to exceed. Defendant is further granted leave to file its response out of time, but no later than October 24, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 177 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007, Terminated: 10/24/2007 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Response to Dairyland's Attorney-Client Privilege and Work Product Challenges As Set Forth In Dairyland's Motion To Compel by 6 pages, filed by USA.Response due by 11/9/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Slater, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [176] Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [158] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld on Deliberative Process Privilege, Attorney-Client Privilege and/or Work Product Doctrine Grounds: Defendant's Response regarding attorney-client privilege and/or work product doctrine shall be due on or before October 23, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 176 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007, Terminated: 10/23/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/23/2007 to File Response or Reply as to [158] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld on Deliberative Process Privilege, Attorney-Client Privilege and/or Work Product Doctrine Grounds, filed by USA.Response due by 11/8/2007.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 175 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Trial in this case is now postponed until Monday, March 24, 2007. Discovery will now close on Tuesday, January 15, 2008. A revised pretrial schedule and indication of a cut-off date for damages claimed is due on Monday, October 29, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [174] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Response due by 10/29/2007. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 174 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007, Terminated: 10/22/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until October 29, 2007 to File Response or Reply as to [147] Response to Motion [Dispositive], Response to Motion [Dispositive], filed by USA.Response due by 11/5/2007.(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 173 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for 10/22/2007 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 172 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [169] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, Regarding Waiver Of Objections To Special Master's Report, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 171 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007, Terminated: 11/2/2007 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend Schedule To Reschedule The Trial In This Case, filed by USA.Response due by 11/5/2007.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 170 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [167] Order on Motion for Clarification, Dairyland's Statement of Need for Documents Withheld on Claims of Presidential Communications Privilege, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 169 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part [166] Defendant's motion for an enlargement of time to file its response to [158] Plaintiff's motion to compel production of documents: Defendant's response regarding documents withheld on the basis of attorney-client privilege and/or attorney work product doctrine shall be due on or before October 22, 2007; Defendant's response regarding deliberative process privilege documents shall be filed on or before 3:00 p.m. on October 29, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 168 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [166] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [158] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld on Deliberative Process Privilege, Attorney-Client Privilege and/or Work Product Doctrine Grounds MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [158] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld on Deliberative Process Privilege, Attorney-Client Privilege and/or Work Product Doctrine Grounds, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 11/1/2007. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: a telephonic status conference shall be held on October 19, 2007, at 4:00 p.m. to review outstanding matters relating to discovery and the trial schedule. The status conference will be audio-recorded. The parties shall contact chambers at 202-357-6483 by no later than 10:00 a.m. on that day to advise of the phone numbers at which counsel can be reached for the telephone conference and the names of those who will be participating in the discussion. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 167 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [161] Defendant's Motion for Clarification: on or before 5:00 p.m. on October 19, 2007, Plaintiff shall file a statement of need for the five specified documents; on or before 5:00 p.m., October 24, 2007, Defendant shall file its response to [144] Plaintiff's motion to compel production of "presidential communications" documents. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 166 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007, Terminated: 10/18/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [158] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld on Deliberative Process Privilege, Attorney-Client Privilege and/or Work Product Doctrine Grounds, filed by USA.Response due by 11/5/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 165 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: telephonic status conference set for October 17, 2007 at 11:30 AM. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 164 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [161] MOTION for Clarification of [160] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Defendant's Expedited Motion For Clarification Of The Court's October 9, 2007 Order MOTION for Clarification of [160] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Defendant's Expedited Motion For Clarification Of The Court's October 9, 2007 Order, filed by USA. (Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 163 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [161] MOTION for Clarification of [160] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Defendant's Expedited Motion For Clarification Of The Court's October 9, 2007 Order MOTION for Clarification of [160] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Defendant's Expedited Motion For Clarification Of The Court's October 9, 2007 Order, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 10/29/2007. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 162 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE, USA Joint Notice of Proposed Special Masters (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 161 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007, Terminated: 10/17/2007 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Clarification of [160] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Defendant's Expedited Motion For Clarification Of The Court's October 9, 2007 Order, filed by USA.Response due by 10/29/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 160 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part [153] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [144] MOTION to Compel Production of "Presidential Communications" Documents; Response due by 10/19/2007. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 159 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRE-TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER:1) A telephonic status conference shall be held at 4:00 p.m. on Tuesday, November 13, 2007; 2) the parties shall serve proposed stipulations of fact, witness lists, and exhibit lists on or before November 14, 2007; 3) the meeting of counsel shall be held on or before November 21, 2007; 4) counsel shall file a joint statement of good faith conduct, a joint notice of proposed procedures for sequestration, any motions to present substantive evidence by way of deposition testimony or prior trial testimony, and any objections, including motions in limine, to the opposing party's proposed witnesses or exhibits on or by December 3, 2007, with responses to motions in limine due on or by December 21, 2007; 5) Plaintiff shall file a Memorandum of Fact and Law on or by December 14, 2007; 6) Defendant shall file a Responsive Memorandum of Fact and Law on or by January 11, 2008; 7) the parties shall file any objections to the opposing party's motions regarding deposition testimony and proposed cross-designation of transcript pages, a joint stipulation of facts, witnesses, and exhibits, and each party's final witness and exhibit list on or by January 11, 2008; 8) a pre-trial conference will be held in person at the U.S. Court of Federal Claims on Tuesday, January 15, 2008; and 9) trial shall commence on January 28, 2008 and shall continue for ten trial days, or such time as agreed to at the pretrial conference, 10:00 a.m. to 4:00 p.m. each day. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 158 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007, Terminated: 2/22/2008 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld on Deliberative Process Privilege, Attorney-Client Privilege and/or Work Product Doctrine Grounds, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 10/22/2007.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 157 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [153] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [144] MOTION to Compel Production of "Presidential Communications" Documents MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [144] MOTION to Compel Production of "Presidential Communications" Documents Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Enlargement, and Motion for Showing of Particularized Need, filed by USA. (Slater, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 156 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007, Terminated: 10/5/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [147] Response to Motion [Dispositive], Response to Motion [Dispositive], filed by USA.Response due by 10/22/2007.(Slater, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [156] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [147] Response to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Response/Reply due on October 23, 2007. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [154] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Notice of Additional Authority on [137] Defendant's motion for summary judgment regarding PFS-related damages. In this circumstance, Plaintiff need not formally re-file its brief of additional authority. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 155 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [153] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [144] MOTION to Compel Production of "Presidential Communications" Documents MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [144] MOTION to Compel Production of "Presidential Communications" Documents, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 10/19/2007. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 154 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007, Terminated: 10/5/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Notice of New Authority on Government's Summary Judgment Motion Regarding PFS-Related Damages, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 10/22/2007.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 153 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007, Terminated: 10/9/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [144] MOTION to Compel Production of "Presidential Communications" Documents, filed by USA.Response due by 10/22/2007.(Slater, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 152 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Pretrial Order Joint Proposal for Trial Preparation Schedule, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE, USA. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [149] Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file proposal for trial preparation schedule: the parties' joint proposal shall be filed on or before October 3, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 151 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [149] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposal Regarding Trial Preparation Schedule, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 10/15/2007. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 150 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Dairyland's Motion for Sanctions, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE, USA. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 149 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007, Terminated: 10/2/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposal Regarding Trial Preparation Schedule, filed by USA.Response due by 10/18/2007.(Slater, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 148 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [138] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 147 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [137] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim For Recovery Of Off-Site Fuel Storage Investments, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 10/9/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit John Parkyn# (2) Affidavit Keith Stubbendick# (3) Affidavit Charles Sans Crainte)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 146 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-77) held on September 20, 2007 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 145 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER:1) Defendant shall forward its formal privilege declarations to Plaintiff on or by 5:00 p.m., Friday, September 21, 2007; 2) Defendant shall submit to the Court documentation outlining the reasons for consolidating the management of discovery in all spent nuclear fuel cases under one judge of the U.S. Court of Federal Claims on or by 5:00 p.m., Friday, September 28, 2007; 3) Plaintiff shall file a motion to compel production of documents withheld under assertions of privilege on or by 5:00 p.m., Friday, October 5, 2007; 4) both parties shall submit to the Court a joint proposal for a trial preparation schedule on or by 5:00 p.m., Monday, October 1, 2007; 5) Plaintiff shall submit to the Court a response, if any, to the government's arguments in favor of consolidating the management of discovery in the spent nuclear fuel cases under a single judge of the U.S. Court of Federal Claims; and 6) the parties shall submit to the Court the names of five (5) members of the Bar of the Court of Federal Claims to act as a special master in this case on or by 5:00 p.m., Monday, October 15, 2007, if the parties have not already done so by the unofficial deadline of Friday, October 5, 2007. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (ejs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 144 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007, Terminated: 3/17/2008 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Production of "Presidential Communications" Documents, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 10/5/2007.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 143 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/20/2007 rescheduled from 10:00 a.m. to 09:00 AM in National Courts Building before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (ejs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 142 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for 9/20/2007 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (ejs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [141] Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response to [137] Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim For Recovery Of Off-Site Fuel Storage Investments: Plaintiff's Response shall be filed on or before September 21, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 141 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007, Terminated: 9/11/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [137] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim For Recovery Of Off-Site Fuel Storage Investments, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 9/27/2007.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 140 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [139] Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Government Response to Dairyland Filings Regarding Government's Failure to Serve Privilege Log Dairyland's Reply to Government Response to Dairyland Filings Regarding Government's Failure to Serve Privilege Log, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [139] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply: Plaintiff's Reply shall formally be filed, separate from its motion for leave, on or before August 31, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 139 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007, Terminated: 8/30/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Government Response to Dairyland Filings Regarding Government's Failure to Serve Privilege Log, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 9/17/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Reply# (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Exhibit 2)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 138 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              **SEALED**PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [137] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim For Recovery Of Off-Site Fuel Storage Investments, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix # (5) Appendix # (6) Appendix # (7) Appendix # (8) Appendix # (9) Appendix # (10) Appendix)(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 137 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007, Terminated: 7/2/2008 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                **SEALED** MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim For Recovery Of Off-Site Fuel Storage Investments, filed by USA.Response due by 9/12/2007 (per court order). (Bryan, Patrick) Modified on 8/29/2007 (Reyes, Lisa).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 136 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Defendant shall file its motion for partial summary judgment electronically under seal on or before August 29, 2007; the Clerk of the Court is directed to docket the motion nunc pro tunc as of August 3, 2007; Plaintiff's response shall be due on or before September 12, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 135 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Order on Motion for Leave to File, Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's "Notice of Authority Regarding Consequences of Government Failure to Serve Privilege Log," Dated August 13, 2007, And Plaintiff's "Notice of New Developments Regarding Government's Failure to Serve Privilege Log," Dated August 17, 2007, filed by USA. (Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [134] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's August 13 and August 17, 2007, Notices of Authority: Defendant's Response due on or before August 28, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 134 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007, Terminated: 8/24/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's "Notice of Authority Regarding Consequences of Government Failure to Serve Privilege Log," Dated August 13, 2007, and Plaintiff's "Notice of New Developments Regarding Government's Failure To Serve Privilege Log," Dated August 17, 2007, filed by USA.Response due by 9/10/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 133 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE Second Notice of New Developments Regarding Government Failure to Serve Privilege Log (Attachments: # (1) Part 2)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 132 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE Second Notice of New Developments Regarding Government Failure to Serve Privilege Log (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 131 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [118] MOTION Relief for Government Discovery Violations Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 130 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [118] MOTION Relief for Government Discovery Violations Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony, filed by USA.Reply due by 8/31/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix #1# (2) Appendix #2# (3) Appendix #3# (4) Appendix #4# (5) Appendix #5# (6) Appendix #6# (7) Appendix #7# (8) Appendix #8)(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 129 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE of New Developments Regarding Government Failure to Serve Privilege Log (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 127 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: 8/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE Notice of Authority Regarding Consequences of Government Failure to Serve Privilege Log (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 128 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/14/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-121) held on August 7, 2007 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [126] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery: the deadline for completion of expert discovery is hereby extended to September 7, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [125] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to file a Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (and accompanying appendix) under seal: Defendant's motion shall be filed on or before August 5, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [124] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [118] Plaintiff's Motion for Relief for Government Discovery Violations Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony: Defendant's Response shall be filed on or before August 17, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 126 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007, Terminated: 8/6/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, filed by USA.Response due by 8/20/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 125 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007, Terminated: 8/6/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for leave to file motion for partial summary judgment under seal, filed by USA.Response due by 8/20/2007.(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 124 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007, Terminated: 8/6/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 08/17/2007 to File Response or Reply as to [118] MOTION Relief for Government Discovery Violations Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony, filed by USA.Response due by 8/16/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [123] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time within which to submit rebuttal expert reports: Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Reports shall be submitted on or before August 17, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 123 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007, Terminated: 7/27/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until August 17, 2007 to Submit Rebuttal Expert Reports, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 8/13/2007.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: the post-fact discovery status conference set for July 25, 2007, is hereby cancelled; it shall be held instead on August 7, 2007, at 10:00 AM in the National Courts Building. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [121] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to submit documents to the court for in camera inspection: remaining binders shall be submitted on July 23, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 122 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE, USA. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 121 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007, Terminated: 7/23/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Two Of The Five Binders Of Documents That The Court Ordered The Government To Provide For In Camera Inspection By Order Dated June 29, 2007, filed by USA.Response due by 8/6/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 120 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT pursuant to Court's June 29, 2007 Order, filed by all parties. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 119 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE of Corrected Motion for Relief for Government Discovery Violations Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Exhibits 1 through 4# (2) Appendix Exhibits 5-7)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re [118] Plaintiff's MOTION for Relief for Government Discovery Violations Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony, filed on July 18, 2007: in accord with RCFC 5.2(a)(1)(A), Plaintiff shall file an index to the appendices in its motion. This index (select the "notice" event under ECF) shall be filed by 5:00 p.m., July 20, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 118 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007, Terminated: 11/20/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Relief for Government Discovery Violations Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 8/6/2007.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Post-fact discovery Status Conference set for Wednesday, July 25, 2007, at 10:00 AM in the National Courts Building; the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before July 20, 2007, delineating matters they propose for discussion. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 117 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Published Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part [60] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel production of documents withheld under the deliberative process privilege. On on before July 20, 2007, Defendant shall produce certain documents to Plaintiff and provide other such documents to chambers for in camera inspection. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 116 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [106] Defendant's Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 115 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part [113] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time within which to submit its expert reports: Defendant's expert reports shall be submitted on or before June 15, 2007 (with the exception of one report due on or before June 29, 2007). Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 114 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [113] First MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/29/2007 to Submission of Expert Reports, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 6/18/2007. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 113 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007, Terminated: 6/6/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/29/2007 to Submission of Expert Reports, filed by USA.Response due by 6/18/2007.(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 112 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [104] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [96] Motion for Sanctions - Rule 37, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVECROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [96] Motion for Sanctions - Rule 37, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 111 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [106] MOTION to Strike [90] Reply to Response to Motion, In Part, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 110 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007, Terminated: 5/22/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/25/2007 to File Response or Reply as to [108] Response to Motion To Strike, filed by USA.Response due by 6/8/2007.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [110] Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [108] Plaintiff's Response to [106] Defendant's Motion To Strike: Defendant's Reply due by May 25, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [109] Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [107] Plaintiff's Response to [104] Defendant's Motion for Reciprocal Obligations: Defendant's Reply due by May 25, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 109 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007, Terminated: 5/18/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [107] Reply to Response to Motion, Response to Cross Motion,,,,, filed by USA.Response due by 6/4/2007.(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 108 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [106] MOTION to Strike [90] Reply to Response to Motion, In Part, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 5/21/2007. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 107 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [104] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [96] Motion for Sanctions - Rule 37, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVECROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [96] Motion for Sanctions - Rule 37, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE, RESPONSE and reply to [104] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [96] Motion for Sanctions - Rule 37, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVECROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [96] Motion for Sanctions - Rule 37, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 5/18/2007. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 106 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007, Terminated: 6/29/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike [90] Reply to Response to Motion, In Part, filed by USA.Response due by 5/21/2007.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/14/2007. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [105] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Depose Fact Witness: the fact discovery deadline is hereby enlarged to and including 5/3/2007 to allow for the referenced deposition. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 105 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007, Terminated: 4/25/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time,until May 3 2007, to Complete Discovery, filed by USA.Response due by 5/10/2007.(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 104 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007, Terminated: 11/20/2007 Cross Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [96] Motion for Sanctions - Rule 37, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE, filed by USA.Response due by 5/7/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) # (3) # (4))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [103] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [96] Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions pursuant to Rule 37 and to Enforce Feb. 5, 2007 Order: Defendant's Response due by 4/20/2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 103 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007, Terminated: 4/20/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/20/2007 to File Response or Reply as to [96] MOTION for Sanctions pursuant to Rule 37 and to Enforce Feb. 5, 2007 Order, filed by USA.Response due by 5/7/2007.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 102 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-54) held on April 12, 2007 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 101 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [88] Defendant's Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony: the fact depositions of Messrs. Brasel, Sans Crainte, and Stubbendick, et al., shall be completed on or before April 30, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Cancelling Deadline/Hearing: Post-fact discovery status conference set for April 24, 2007, is hereby cancelled. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 100 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY re [88] Second MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Improperly Withheld Upon the Basis of Privilege or Upon Doctrinal Grounds and Reply on Dairyland's Motion for Clarification of March 27, 2007 Order, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 99 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Hearing on Defendant's Motion [88] to Compel Deposition Testimony: Hearing to be held 4/12/2007 at 2:30 PM in the National Courts Building. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 98 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [89] Second MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Improperly Withheld Upon the Basis of Privilege or Upon Doctrinal Grounds - Appendix, [88] Second MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Improperly Withheld Upon the Basis of Privilege or Upon Doctrinal Grounds, filed by USA. (Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 97 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [89] Second MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Improperly Withheld Upon the Basis of Privilege or Upon Doctrinal Grounds - Appendix, [88] Second MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Improperly Withheld Upon the Basis of Privilege or Upon Doctrinal Grounds and Dairyland's Motion for Clarification of Order of March 27, 2007 and Request for Expedited Consideration, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 4/16/2007. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 96 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007, Terminated: 11/20/2007 Motion for Sanctions - Rule 37
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Sanctions pursuant to Rule 37 and to Enforce Feb. 5, 2007 Order, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 4/19/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Exhibit # (5) Exhibit # (6) Exhibit # (7) Exhibit # (8) Exhibit # (9) Exhibit)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 95 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part [91] Defendant's "Motion for Enlargement of Time and for Modification of the Court's February 5, 2007 Order": Document production due by 4/6/2007; Interrogatory response revisions due by 4/2/2007; Modification of February Order denied. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 94 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2008 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building; Trial set for 1/28/2008 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 93 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  UNPUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part [64] Defendant's Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony and the Production of Documents. Certain documents shall be produced by Plaintiff on or before April 3, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb) Modified on 3/27/2007 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 92 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [91] MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/6/2007 to Complete Defendant's Production Of Documents In Response To The Court's February 5, 2007 Order And For Modification Of The Court's February 5, 2007 Order, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 4/6/2007. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 91 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007, Terminated: 3/28/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/6/2007 to Complete Defendant's Production Of Documents In Response To The Court's February 5, 2007 Order And For Modification Of The Court's February 5, 2007 Order, filed by USA.Response due by 4/9/2007.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 90 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re [60] MOTION to Compel Documents Withheld Under the "Deliberative Process" and Attorney-Client Privileges, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix # (5) Appendix # (6) Appendix # (7) Appendix # (8) Appendix # (9) Appendix # (10) Appendix # (11) Appendix)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 89 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007, Terminated: 9/19/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Improperly Withheld Upon the Basis of Privilege or Upon Doctrinal Grounds - Appendix, filed by USA.Response due by 4/5/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Exhibit # (5) Exhibit # (6) Exhibit # (7) Exhibit # (8) Exhibit)(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 88 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007, Terminated: 4/16/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Improperly Withheld Upon the Basis of Privilege or Upon Doctrinal Grounds, filed by USA.Response due by 4/5/2007.(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [87] Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [81] Defendant's Response to [60] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Documents Withheld Under the Deliberative Process. Plaintiff's Reply due by 3/22/2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 87 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007, Terminated: 3/15/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/22/2007 to File Response or Reply as to [81] Response to Motion, to Compel Documents Withheld Under the Deliberative Process, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 4/2/2007.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 86 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [82] Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to March 23, 2007, to comply with the court's order [72] compelling certain discovery responses and to April 30, 2007, for completion of fact discovery. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 85 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [82] MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/23/2007 to Comply With The Court's Order Upon Plaintiff's Motion To Compel, And To April 30, 2007 To Complete Fact Discovery, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 84 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [82] MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/23/2007 to Comply With The Court's Order Upon Plaintiff's Motion To Compel, And To April 30, 2007 To Complete Fact Discovery, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 3/22/2007. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 83 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re [64] Defendant's MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony And The Production Of Documents Improperly Withheld Upon The Basis Of Privilege Or Upon Doctrinal Grounds: Plaintiff shall produce certain documents to the court on or before March 16, 2007 for in camera inspection. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 82 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007, Terminated: 3/9/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/23/2007 to Comply With The Court's Order Upon Plaintiff's Motion To Compel, And To April 30, 2007 To Complete Fact Discovery, filed by USA.Response due by 3/26/2007.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 81 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            **SEALED**RESPONSE to [60] MOTION to Compel Documents Withheld Under the "Deliberative Process" and Attorney-Client Privileges, filed by USA.Reply due by 3/16/2007. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 80 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [78] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (gm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 79 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [60] Motion to Compel,, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 78 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007, Terminated: 3/1/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal For Leave To File Documents Under Seal Electronically, filed by USA.Response due by 3/19/2007.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 77 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [64] MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony And The Production Of Documents Improperly Withheld Upon The Basis Of Privilege Or Upon Doctrinal Grounds, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Appendix Part I# (2) Appendix Appendix Part II)(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Post-fact discovery Status Conference set for 4/24/2007 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 76 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [75] Plaintiff's unopposed motion to revise the scheduling order: Plaintiff's expert report(s) due by March 23, 2007; fact discovery closes March 30, 2007; Defendant's expert report(s) due by June 8, 2007; rebuttal expert report(s) due by July 27, 2007; dispositive motion(s) due by August 3, 2007; expert discovery closes August 10, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Cancelling Deadline/Hearing: the post-fact discovery status conference currently scheduled for March 15, 2007, is cancelled; a new date will be set in conjunction with a revised scheduling order. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 75 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007, Terminated: 2/22/2007 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 3/5/2007.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 74 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [64] MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony And The Production Of Documents Improperly Withheld Upon The Basis Of Privilege Or Upon Doctrinal Grounds, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 2/23/2007. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 73 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [69] Defendant's Motion to Strike re [60] Plaintiff's motion to compel production of documents withheld under deliberative process and attorney-client privileges: the parties shall meet and confer on or before February 14, 2007; Defendant's response to motion to compel, if any, is due on or before February 28, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 72 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [54] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and denying [63] Defendant's Cross Motion for protective order:Defendant's discovery responses due on or before March 9, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 71 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-78) held on January 25, 2007 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 70 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [69] MOTION to Strike [60] MOTION to Compel Documents Withheld Under the "Deliberative Process" and Attorney-Client Privileges, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 2/15/2007. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 69 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007, Terminated: 2/8/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike [60] MOTION to Compel Documents Withheld Under the "Deliberative Process" and Attorney-Client Privileges, filed by USA.Response due by 2/15/2007. (Attachments: # (1))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 68 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [52] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Depositions and denying [56] Defendant's cross-motion. The deadline for completion of fact discovery is extended to March 30, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [67] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File documents relevant to [65] Plaintiff's Reply On Its Motion to Compel Depositions. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 67 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007, Terminated: 1/25/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Two Documents Relevant To Plaintiff's January 23, 2007 Reply To Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Discovery Responses, filed by USA.Response due by 2/12/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 66 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [54] MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 65 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [52] MOTION to Compel Depositions, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 64 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007, Terminated: 3/27/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony And The Production Of Documents Improperly Withheld Upon The Basis Of Privilege Or Upon Doctrinal Grounds, filed by USA.Response due by 2/9/2007. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 63 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007, Terminated: 2/5/2007 Cross Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [54] Motion to Compel, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE,, filed by USA.Response due by 2/5/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix # (5) Appendix # (6) Appendix # (7) Appendix # (8))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 62 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Hearing on [52] Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Depositions, on [54] Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses, and on [56] Defendant's CROSS-MOTION for Protective Order or to Re-Institute Coordinated Discovery Proceedings:Oral Argument cancelled for 1/19/2007 and RE-SET for 1/25/2007, at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 61 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [57] Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to file response to [54] Plaintiff's motion to compel discovery regarding interrogatories and document requests: Defendant's response due by 1/18/2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 60 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007, Terminated: 6/29/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Documents Withheld Under the "Deliberative Process" and Attorney-Client Privileges, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 2/5/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1# (2) Appendix Part 2# (3) Appendix Part 3# (4) Appendix Part 4# (5) Appendix Part 5# (6) Appendix Part 6)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Plaintiff's Reply to [56] Defendant's Response to [52] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Depositions shall be filed on or before 1/23/2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 59 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [57] MOTION for Extension of Time until January 18, 2007 to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, filed by USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 58 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [57] MOTION for Extension of Time until January 18, 2007 to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 1/30/2007. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 57 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007, Terminated: 1/18/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until January 18, 2007 to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, filed by USA.Response due by 2/2/2007.(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 56 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [52] MOTION to Compel Depositions And Cross-Motion For A Protective Order To Preclude Those Depositions Or, In the Alternative, To Re-Institute The Coordinated Discovery Proceedings In the Pending Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Reply due by 1/26/2007. (Attachments: # (1))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [55] Defendant's unoppposed Motion for Extension of Time to file response to Plaintiff's motion to compel depositions: Defendant's response shall be filed no later than 1/12/2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 55 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007, Terminated: 1/12/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until January 12, 2007 to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Depositions, filed by USA.Response due by 1/29/2007.(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 54 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: 12/28/2006, Terminated: 2/5/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 1/16/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment #1# (2) Attachment #2# (3) Attachments #3 and #4# (4) Attachment #5)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 53 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006, Terminated: 12/22/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until January 10, 2007 to File Response or Reply as to [52] MOTION to Compel Depositions, filed by USA.Response due by 1/8/2007.(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [53] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to [52] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Depositions: Response due by 1/10/2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Hearing on [52] Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Depositions:Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 52 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006, Terminated: 1/29/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Depositions, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 1/4/2007.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 51 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [49] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time:Defendant's response to Plaintiff's First Request for Documents and First Set of Interrogatories due by 12/8/2006. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 50 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [49] Second MOTION for Extension of Time until December 8, 2006 to Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requrests., filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 12/15/2006. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 49 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006, Terminated: 12/4/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second MOTION for Extension of Time until December 8, 2006 to Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requrests., filed by USA.Response due by 12/18/2006.(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:the parties' post-fact discovery status conference is hereby re-set for 3/15/2007, at 10:00 AM in the National Courts Building; the 3/13/2007 status conference is cancelled. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 48 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [47] Defendant's joint motion for an order regarding discovery of draft expert reports. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 47 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006, Terminated: 11/14/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION Order Precluding Discovery of Draft Expert Reports, filed by USA.Response due by 11/27/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 46 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006, Terminated: 11/9/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until November 30, 2006 to Enlargement of Time to Respond to Request for Production of Documents and Respond to Interrogatories, filed by USA.Response due by 11/27/2006.(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [46] Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time:Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's first set of document requests and interrogatories shall be on or before 11/30/2006. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER:the parties' post-fact discovery Status Conference is hereby re-set for 3/13/2007, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 4; the 3/8/2007 status conference is canceled. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 45 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (Attachments: # (1)) (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pre-trial Conference set for 10/12/2007 at 10:00 AM in the National Courts Building. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 44 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [39] Emergency MOTION for Protective Order and Stay of Parties' Exchange of Confidential Material, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 43 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [39] Emergency MOTION for Protective Order and Stay of Parties' Exchange of Confidential Material, filed by USA.Reply due by 8/21/2006. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 42 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006, Terminated: 8/7/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Corrected Response To Plaintiff's Emergency Motion For Entry Of Protective Order, filed by USA.Response due by 8/24/2006. (Attachments: # (1))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [42] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Corrected Response to [39] Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Protective Order. Defendant's Corrected Response, although attached to the motion for leave, must nevertheless now be separately filed and shall be due on or before 8/11/2006. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [39] Emergency MOTION for Protective Order and Stay of Parties' Exchange of Confidential Material, filed by USA.Reply due by 8/18/2006. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 40 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [39] Plaintiff's motion for a protective order and stay of the exchange of confidential material: Defendant's response due by August 4, 2006; the exchange of confidential materials is stayed but the parties shall otherwise proceed with Rule 26 disclosures. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: telephonic Status Conference set for 8/1/2006 at 10:00 AM in Chambers on Plaintiff's motion for a protective order and a stay of the exchange of confidential materials. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 39 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006, Terminated: 8/2/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Emergency MOTION for Protective Order and Stay of Parties' Exchange of Confidential Material, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 8/14/2006.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part [37] Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Exchange RCFC 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures and Respond to Defendant's Discovery Requests. Such Initial Disclosures shall be due as previously ordered, by 7/28/2006. The first date for the parties to respond to any formal discovery, such as interrogatories and requests for production, shall be8/28/2006. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 38 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [37] MOTION for Extension of Time until August 28, 2006 to To Exchange RCFC 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures and Respond to Defendant's Discovery Requests, filed by USA.Reply due by 6/2/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Letter dated May 8, 2006)(Shultis, Russell) Modified on 5/18/2006 to correct reply deadline(mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 6/2/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 37 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006, Terminated: 5/23/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until August 28, 2006 to To Exchange RCFC 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures and Respond to Defendant's Discovery Requests, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Response due by 5/30/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 36 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery shall commence on August 28, 2006. Fact Discovery due by 2/16/2007. Plaintiff's Expert Report(s) due by 2/23/2007. Post-fact discovery Status Conference set for 3/8/2007, 10:00 AM, in National Courts Building before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Defendant's Expert Report(s) due by 4/27/2007. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 6/1/2007. Dispositive Motion(s) due by 6/8/2007. Expert Discovery due by 6/15/2007. Trial set for 10/29/2007, 10:00 AM, in National Courts Building before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 35 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The Court finds in favor of Plaintiff on the issue of contract liability. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 34 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [32] Status Report, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 33 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE TO [30] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Data Quality Correction re: [32] Supplemental Status Report. Filing has been deleted and re-entered using the correct relief (pursuant to instructions from chambers). (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL STATUS REPORT filed by USA. Service: 3/16/06.(dls ) PDF added on 3/21/2006 (dls ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant shall file a supplemental status report, on or before March 16, 2006, on the question why disposition of the GTCC issue is necessary prior to the start of discovery; Plaintiff may file a responsive status report on or before March 23, 2006. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant is ordered to show cause, on or before March 22, 2006, why the Court's holding on contract liability in favor of plaintiff in Energy Northwest v. U.S., #04-10C, should not apply in this case as well. Plaintiff's response, if any, shall be due on or before April 5, 2006; if Plaintiff files a response, Defendant may file a reply, which shall be due on or before April 12, 2006. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 4/5/2006. Reply due by 4/12/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/16/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 8, 2006 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 3/8/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT - CORRECTED. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION -- JOINT, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying, as moot, [25] Defendant's Motion for Leave to Respond to Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Submit Joint Preliminary Status Report. The court has reviewed Defendant's Motion for Leave to Respond, including the proposed Response which was attached and which accordingly constitutes a part of the electronic record (albeit not formally filed). As the court is thus cognizant of the government's preference to extend the stay in this case, the formal filing of Defendant's proposed Response is unnecessary and is denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/8/2006, at 02:00 PM, at the National Courts Building before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. The parties shall be prepared to discuss, inter alia, a schedule for dispositive motions (if any), discovery, and trial, and any other matters raised in the forthcoming JPSR. In addition, with respect to trial preparation scheduling, the parties' attention is directed to the court's "Proposed Trial Preparation Order," posted on the court's web-site under the biography of the undersigned. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: 1/11/2006, Terminated: 1/12/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Submit Joint Preliminary Status Report, filed by USA. Response due by 1/30/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Submit Joint Preliminary Status Report)(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [24] Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: the parties' JPSR shall be filed on or before 1/20/2006. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006, Terminated: 1/9/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/20/2006 to Submit Joint Preliminary Status Report, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. Response due by 1/23/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 and 2)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA. JPSR due by 1/6/2006.(Shultis, Russell) Modified on 11/14/2005 to correct JPSR deadline (jat, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: JPSR due by 1/6/2006. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Answer due by 11/14/2005; JPSR due by 1/6/2006; in-court Preliminary Status Conference to be held, date still to be determined, following receipt of the answer and JPSR. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER, revised 10/11/05. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT ORDER, ORDER STAYING CASE: this case is stayed through 30 days after the date the Federal Circuit issues a decision in Indiana Michigan (Fed. Cir. #04-5122); the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before December 15, 2005, or within 21 days after the decision in Indiana Michigan, whichever is earlier. The parties' Joint Status Report due July 15, 2005, which apparently has not been filed, is now unnecessary. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerry Stouck (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [17] Joint Motion for Entry of an Order Governing the Preservation of E-mail and Other Electronic Evidence. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005, Terminated: 3/14/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Entry of an Order Governing the Preservation of E-mail and Other Electronic Evidence filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE, USA. Response due by 3/25/2005 (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/4/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [15] Plaintiff's Motion to Stay. This case is stayed until the earlier of July 1, 2005, or decision of the Federal Circuit in Indiana Michigan, CFC #98-486C. Joint Status Report is due on or before the earlier of July 15, 2005, or 30 days after the Indiana Michigan decision. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: . Joint Status Report due by 7/15/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/28/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004, Terminated: 2/4/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Extend the Existing Stay until the Federal Circuit Issues a Decision in Indiana Michigan v. United States by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. Response due by 1/14/2005 (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt: pre-Discovery Hearing held on 4/30/04. (sms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER entered on [7] Defendant's Motion to Stay: staying discovery on rate of acceptance or damages issues, with exceptions, through December 31, 2004. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich.(jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Notice of Pre-Discovery Conference to be Convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix)(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [11] Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004, Terminated: 4/21/2004 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re [10] Order For Pre-Discovery Conference in New Spent Fuel Cases by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. Response due by 5/6/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 and 2# (2) Exhibit 3 through 8)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER directing the parties to submit discovery report by 4/23/04 and noting pre-discovery conference scheduled for 4/30/04 before Judge Sypolt.Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (sms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Parties Discovery Report due by 4/23/2004. Pre-Discovery Conference set for 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 4/26/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [7] MOTION to Stay ALL PROCEEDINGS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR COORDINATED DISCOVERY REGARDING RATE AND SCHEDULE ISSUES filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. Reply due by 4/26/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1/30/04 Order# (2) Exhibit 6/26/03 Order)(Freas, Monica) Modified on 4/14/2004 to reflect correct reply due date (dw1 ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Alan Shultis for USA. (Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *** Attorney Victoria Louise Strohmeyer terminated. (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004, Terminated: 5/12/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay ALL PROCEEDINGS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR COORDINATED DISCOVERY REGARDING RATE AND SCHEDULE ISSUES by USA. Response due by 4/15/2004 (Strohmeyer, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Louise Strohmeyer for USA. (Strohmeyer, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Standard Special Procedures ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (sms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Edward J. Damich. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE. Service: 1/28/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059587), filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Answer Due by 3/29/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 233 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?