GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00108-GWM
District Judge George W. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

General Electric Company General Electric Company, Plaintiff
Unknown Role, Genpact Ltd.
Unknown Role, Gei, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sportstech, Inc.
Unknown Role, Superior Essex Inc.
Unknown Role, Genicom Corp
Unknown Role, Imatron Inc.
Unknown Role, Regal Beloit Corp
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
Unknown Role, Lunar Corp
Unknown Role, Mecon Inc
Unknown Role, Positron Corp
Unknown Role, GE India Ventures LLC
Unknown Role, Townsquare Media, LLC
Unknown Role, Antares Capital Corp
Unknown Role, Bear Newco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Unknown Role, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Unknown Role, Xoom, Inc.
Unknown Role, Plug Power, Inc.
Unknown Role, Hpsc, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ionics, Inc.
Unknown Role, Idx Systems Corp
Unknown Role, iVillage, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew P. Averbach +1 202 353 0527 +1 202 305 2118 andrew.averbach@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/29/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 9/2/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
104-cv-00107-GWM
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, SNF
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 39 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice, filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Fagg, Arnold)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) this day. (jt1)
      LREF
      Legal Document 40 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
      NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge George W. Miller for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Edward J. Damich no longer assigned to the case. (jt1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 38 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Court Filing
        ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge George W. Miller. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (EJ1)
          LREF
          Legal Document 37 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/23/2008 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
          NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Edward J. Damich for all further proceedings. Judge Victor J. Wolski no longer assigned to the case. (dls)
            LREF
            Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Court Filing
            ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (EJ1)
              LREF
              Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008, Terminated: 9/2/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
                LREF
                Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Court Filing
                STATUS REPORT ORDER granting continuation of stay requested in Joint Status Report. Proceedings shall be stayed until December 15, 2008, by which date the parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Court Filing
                    ORDER granting stay of proceedings until June 30, 2008, on or by which date parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 31 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007
                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Fagg, Arnold)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 Court Filing
                        ORDER STAYING CASE: Case is stayed until December 14, 2007, by which date parties shall file joint status report. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Averbach, Andrew)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Court Filing
                            STATUS REPORT ORDER: Proceedings in this case shall be stayed until 6/29/07 at which time parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006
                              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006 Court Filing
                                STATUS REPORT ORDER: Stay of Proceedings continued until 12/15/06. Status Report due by 12/15/2006. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. Averbach for USA. (Averbach, Andrew)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006
                                      *** Attorney Todd Jason Cochran terminated. (bre, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Court Filing
                                        STATUS REPORT ORDER: Court grants continuation of stay until 6/30/06 as requested in Joint Status Report. Joint Status Report due by 6/30/2006.Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005
                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Court Filing
                                            ORDER continuing the stay of all proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2005. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jat, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005
                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, USA. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Court Filing
                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Stay Extended until 6/24/05; Joint Status Report due by 5/24/05. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004
                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. (Cochran, Todd)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004 Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [12] Motion to Stay, granting in part and denying in part [14] Motion to Stay. Joint Status Report due by 10/22/2004. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Jason Cochran for USA. (Cochran, Todd)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004
                                                        ***Attorney Todd Jason Cochran for USA added. Attorney Harold Dewitt Lester terminated. (dw1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004
                                                          RESPONSE to [14] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 6/7/2004. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004, Terminated: 7/21/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                            MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery by USA. Response due by 5/27/2004 (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                              RESPONSE to [9] Order regarding pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004, Terminated: 7/21/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                              MOTION to Stay All Proceedings and Report in Response to Pre-Discovery Conference Notice by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 5/10/2004 (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [10] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Complaint. Answer Due by 5/10/2004. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp) Modified on 4/22/2004 for punctuation (dw1).
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004, Terminated: 4/22/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 5/10/2004 by USA. Response due by 5/6/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER re Pre-Discovery Conference New SNF Cases Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint; answer Due by 4/19/2004. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004, Terminated: 4/8/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 4/19/2004 by USA. Response due by 4/15/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                                                                              NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [04-107C] by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. Service: 1/29/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Victor J. Wolski. (lg1, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                                                  Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. Service: 1/29/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Complaint
                                                                                    COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059593), filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.Answer Due by 3/29/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 179 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?