SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00109-LMB
District Judge Lawrence M. Baskir, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Southern California Edison Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher James Carney +1 202 305 7597 +1 202 514 8624 chris.carney@usdoj.gov
Space Marian Elizabeth Sullivan +1 202 307 0365 +1 202 307 2503 marian.sullivan@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/29/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, SNF, STAYED
  Entries (123) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, forwarded to Arnold Bradley Fagg. (bre, ) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $142,394,294.00. Each party shall bear its own costs. (dls) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      PUBLISHED OPINION ordering final judgment in accord w/ Court's findings in this Opinion and award P $142,394,294 in damages. Parties to bear own costs. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: None
        POST TRIAL BRIEF ; Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Sur-Reply, filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 108 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply (attached to Motion). P to file response by 8/21/09. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
            MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply To Plaintiff's Post-trial Reply Brief, filed by USA.Response due by 8/24/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Sur-reply)(Donahue, Lisa) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
              POST TRIAL BRIEF : POST-TRIAL REPLY BRIEF, filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
                POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Donahue, Lisa) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
                  POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None
                    Cumulative Index (pages 1-8) for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 20, 2009 through May 6, 2009. (dw1) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 1 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 2 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 3 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 4 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 5 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 6 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 7 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 8 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 9 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 10 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 11 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 12 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 13 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 14 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 15 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 16 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 17 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 18 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 19 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 20 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 21 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 22 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 23 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 24 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 25 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 26 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 27 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 28 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 29 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 30 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 31 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 32 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 33 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 34 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 35 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 36 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 37 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 38 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 39 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 40 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 41 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 42 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 43 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 44 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 45 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 46 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 47 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 48 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 49 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 50 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 51 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 52 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 53 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 54 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 55 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 56 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 57 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 58 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 59 Exhibit) (dw1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2009: # 60 Exhibit) (dw1). (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1276-1390) held on May 6, 2009 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/14/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/8/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
                        Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on May 6, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1040-1275) held on April 27, 2009 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/5/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: None
                            Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on April 27, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 793-1039) held on April 23, 2009 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/1/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on April 23, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 569-792) held on April 22, 2009 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 4/30/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None
                                    Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on April 22, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 304-568) held on April 21, 2009 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 4/29/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                        Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on April 21, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-303) held on April 20, 2009 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 4/28/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/22/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                            Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on April 20, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-37) held on March 30, 2009 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 4/13/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/7/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on March 30, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER summarizing PTC held 3/30/09. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                    STIPULATION (Joint Stipulations), filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, USA. (Bessette, Paul) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Exhibit List (Joint), filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, USA. (Bessette, Paul) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Exhibit List (Corrected), filed by USA. (Donahue, Lisa) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                          Exhibit List, filed by USA. (Greene, Seth) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                            Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by USA. (Donahue, Lisa) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                              Witness List, filed by USA. (Donahue, Lisa) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER re pre-trial conference agenda. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 79 MOTION in Limine Regarding "Acceptance Rate" Evidence, filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    RESPONSE to 79 MOTION in Limine Regarding "Acceptance Rate" Evidence, filed by USA.Reply due by 3/20/2009. (Donahue, Lisa) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION in Limine Regarding "Acceptance Rate" Evidence, filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 3/9/2009.(Fagg, Arnold) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER confirm pre-trial conference date for 3/30/09 at 10am and trial date for 4/20-28/09, starting at 10am each morning. Counsel to attend in person for both sessions. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          Exhibit List, filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            Witness List, filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Donahue, Lisa) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-27) held on November 5, 2008 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 11/24/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 63 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
                                                                                    RESPONSE to [62] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on November 5, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 62 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
                                                                                        MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER summarizing Status Conf (by phone) held 11/5. Discov deadline extended to 12/16/08; P to file its Memo of Contentns of fact & law by 2/13/09; D to file its memo by 3/16/09. JSR due by 12/16/08 proposing complete pretrial schedule (as outlined on Order). Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-36) held on August 6, 2008 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 8/27/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2008. (dw1)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, USA. (Bessette, Paul) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 60 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008
                                                                                                Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on August 6, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER confirming SC/Pre-trial Conf by phone at 12N on 11/5/08. D to call P before calling Judge at 202-357-6504. Clerk to file attached agenda sched provided by parties. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (Attachments: #(1) Agenda) (dcl) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008
                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines for 8/6/08 proceeding: Transcript due from Heritage by 8/22/2008. (lld)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT Defendant's Proposed Discovery Schedule, filed by USA. (Donahue, Lisa) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 59 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER summarizing telephonic SC held 8/6/08. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER req 3 dates in Nov for Status Conference via phone. Notice of Compliance due by 10/31/2008. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008
                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceeding held in WDC on 8/6/2008 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir: Telephonic Status Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1].Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.) (dcl)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 58 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER confirming Status Conference (via phone) sched for 10am on Wed., 8/6/08. D to call P, then call Chambers. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Lefante Donahue for USA. (Donahue, Lisa) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 57 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008
                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 62 MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 56 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER JSR on status of discovery & current status of other SNF cases, w/ special attention to issues common to this matter due by 7/1/2008. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 55 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008
                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 54 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [53] Motion for Extension of Time. Expert Report & Response to Ps damages schedules due by 3/7/2008. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra for Judge Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 53 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008, Terminated: 1/16/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until March 7, 2008 to Submit the Government's Expert Reports, filed by USA.Response due by 2/1/2008.(Carney, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 52 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Carney for USA. (Carney, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 51 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  SUPP PROTECTIVE ORDER granting [50] Motion for Supp Protective Order (TN). Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 50 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007, Terminated: 1/3/2008 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order (to Supplement the Final Protective Order), filed by USA.Response due by 1/3/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Carney, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 49 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [48] Motion for Extension of Time til 1/25/08 to file D's Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 48 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 12/3/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until January 25, 2008 to Submission of Expert Reports, filed by USA.Response due by 12/17/2007.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 47 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER finding as moot [45] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [46] Motion for Extension of Time; finding as moot [21] Motion for Extension of Time (Discovery ends 2/15/2008, Joint Status Report due by 2/22/2008); finding as moot [22] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 46 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [33] Order, filed by USA.Response due by 8/6/2007.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 45 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [33] Order, filed by USA.Response due by 5/7/2007.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 44 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [43] Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Attachments: #(1) Final Protective Order) (dcl)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 43 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006, Terminated: 11/16/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order To Modify Protecitve Order, filed by USA.Response due by 11/20/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 42 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [35] Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(b). P's request that this Court issue order confirming P's right to pursue subsequent proceedings damages incurred after 12/31/05 is denied w/o prejudice. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [35] First MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 , and to file Supplemental Complaint under Rule 15(a) and (d), filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 40 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part [38] Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (Attachments: #(1) Protective Order #(2) E'mail Preservation Order #(3) Database Review Order) (dcl)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 39 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [35] First MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 , and to file Supplemental Complaint under Rule 15(a) and (d), filed by USA.Reply due by 8/30/2006. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 38 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006, Terminated: 8/17/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order , E-Mail Preservation Order, and Stipulated Order Governing Review of the Record Information System Database, filed by USA.Response due by 8/31/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006
                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE, filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY regarding damages expert (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006, Terminated: 9/7/2006 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15
                                                                                                                                                                  First MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 , and to file Supplemental Complaint under Rule 15(a) and (d), filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 8/17/2006. (Attachments: # (1))(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 24, 2006 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER lifting stay. If P intends to file Amended Complaint, do so by 7/31/06. Discov sched listed. JSR due 7/31/06 re status of all other SNF cases. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 32 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER scheduling Status Conference (phone) for 10am on 5/24/06. Defendant to initiate the call with Plaintiff before calling Judge. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER requesting dates for Status Conference (5/24 morning only, 30 or 31). JSR due 5/8/06. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, USA. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 28 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [27] Motion for Extension of Time til 4/7/06 to file JSR. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006, Terminated: 4/5/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until April 7, 2006 to Joint Status Report, filed by USA. Response due by 4/17/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER STAYING CASE until 3/31/06. Joint Status Report due by 3/31/2006. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, USA. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting parties request (in 2/28/05 JSR) for continuation of Stay until September 6, 2005, signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. JSR due 8/10/05. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/10/2005 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, USA. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Protective Order by USA. Response due by 9/27/2004 (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until September 7, 2004 to file Joint Status Report by USA. Response due by 9/16/2004 (Strohmeyer, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [18] Motion for Extension of Time to file JSR no later than 8/30/04 re protective order and access to existing discovery. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 8/30/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 6/25/2004 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004, Terminated: 7/29/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until August 26, 2004 to file Joint Status Report by USA. Response due by 8/12/2004 (Strohmeyer, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/6/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir: Preliminary Status Conference (by phone) held on 6/25/04. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [9] motion to stay proceedings until 3/1/05, and file joint status report by that date. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Per [17] order, parties are directed to file a joint status report by 7/26/04, advising the court that arrangements for future discovery have been completed. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir.(jmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/26/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Preliminary Status Conference set for 6/25/2004 10:45 AM before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER confirms the telephonic PSC for 10:45am, 6/25/04. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER (signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir) requesting 3 dates during June 23 - July 16, 2004 for telephonic preliminary status conference. Response due NLT 6/20/04. (dcl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Attachments: # (1))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to [1] Complaint by USA. JPSR due by 5/28/2004.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Marian Elizabeth Sullivan for USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            *** Attorney John Clifford Ekman terminated. (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER deferring ruling on [9] Motion to Stay. Defendant shall file ANSWER forthwith. Parties shall file JPSR no later than May 14, 2004. JPSR to include 3 dates for telephonic preliminary status conference. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl) Modified on 4/2/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Parties JPSR due by 5/14/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl) Modified on 3/30/2004 (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004, Terminated: 6/25/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by USA. Response due by 4/15/2004 (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John Clifford Ekman for USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Removing Case from the ADR process. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Notice of Assignment - Auto ADRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink for ADR Pilot proceedings. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Notice of Indirectly Related Case(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Indirectly Related Case(s) by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. Service: 1/29/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. Service: 1/29/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059594), filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY.Answer Due by 3/29/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 244 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?