NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00124-LSM
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Stanford Blanton +1 205 226 3417 +1 205 488 5879 sblanton@balch.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/29/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, SNF, STAYED
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 42 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [41] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Blanton, Melvin)
    LREF
    Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
    MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
      LREF
      Legal Document 40 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER STAYING CASE until 12/8/2008. Status Report due by 12/5/2008. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dtm)
        LREF
        Legal Document 39 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008
        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION. (Haden, Edgar)
          LREF
          Legal Document 38 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Court Filing
          ORDER STAYING CASE Status Report due by 6/11/2008 Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dtm)
            LREF
            Legal Document 37 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007
            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION, USA. (Blanton, Melvin)
              LREF
              Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Court Filing
              ORDER CONTINUING STAY; STATUS REPORT ORDER. Stay remains in effect until 12-14-07; Joint Status Report due by 12/14/2007 Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lmc)
                LREF
                Legal Document 35 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007
                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Blanton, Melvin)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Court Filing
                  ORDER CONTINUING STAY TO 6/29/07. Status Report due by 6/29/2007 Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lmc)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Blanton, Melvin)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 Court Filing
                      ORDER STAYING CASE Status Report due by 12/15/2006. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lmc)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Blanton, Melvin)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Court Filing
                          ORDER CONTINUING STAY UNTIL 6/30/2006. Status Report due by 6/30/2006. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lmc)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Blanton, Melvin)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Court Filing
                              ORDER STAYING CASE until December 15, 2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (ef1)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005
                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION, USA. (Blanton, Melvin)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005
                                  NOTICE by USA Of Filing Of Defendant's Reply To [25] Plaintiff Constellation Generation Group, LLC's Response To [22] Defendant's Motion To Transfer And Consolidate Directly Related Cases (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004
                                    RESPONSE to [22] Notice of Directly Related Case(s) Opposition filed by CONSTELLATION GENERATION GROUP, LLC. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 Court Filing
                                      ORDER. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the Rules of the Court of Federal Claims, for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to reassign this case to the docket of Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (sms)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Add and Terminate Judges
                                        Judge Lawrence S. Margolis added. Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt no longer assigned to case. (dw1)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004
                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Blanton, Melvin)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004
                                            NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [04-0068, 04-0125] by USA And Defendant's Motion To Transfer And Consolidate In Accordance With RCFC 40.2(a)(3) and 42.1. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4))(Lester, Harold)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 Court Filing
                                            ORDER vacating 5/28/2004 order and granting a stay of all proceedings until 12/31/2004. Joint Status Report regarding propriety of continuing the stay due on or before 12/20/2004. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (wf1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004 Court Filing
                                              ORDER filing [19] Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Stay All Proceedings or, In the Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery, by leave of the court, and denying it as moot. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (lag, ) Modified on 6/9/2004 (dw1, ). [VACATED PURSUANT TO THE JUNE 8, 2004 ORDER]
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004
                                                RESPONSE to [17] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery filed by NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION. Reply due by 6/10/2004. (Blanton, Melvin)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [17] STAY through December 31, 2004, of discovery on the rate of acceptance or damages issues, and/or any discovery duplicative of information from previous coordinated discovery in SNF cases. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (wf1, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004, Terminated: 5/17/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                    MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery by USA. Response due by 5/27/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004
                                                      STATUS REPORT In Response To The Court's Request At The April 30, 2004 Conference by all parties. (Attachments: # (1))(Lester, Harold)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt : Pre-Discovery Status Conference held on 4/30/04. (lag, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                          RESPONSE to [11] Status Conference Order regarding conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [12] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 5/10/2004. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (lag, ) Modified on 4/26/2004 for punctuation (dw1).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                            RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Court by NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION.(Blanton, Melvin)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004, Terminated: 4/23/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 5/10/2004 by USA. Response due by 5/6/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Court Filing
                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (Attachments: # (1))(wf1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004
                                                                  NOTICE by all plaintiffs of Compliance with Court's Order of 03/31/04 to Obtain CM/ECF Account (Blanton, Melvin)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004
                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiffs' counsel shall comply with the requirements of the Notice of Designation by 4/14/2004. (dw1)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [8] Motion for Enlargement of Time to respond to complaint. Answer or Response Due by 4/19/2004. Plaintiff is ordered to comply with Notice of Designation as an electronic case and obtain a CM/ECF account on or before 4/14/04. The clerk shall serve a courtesy copy of this order on plaintiff via first class mail. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (lag, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004, Terminated: 3/31/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 4/19/2004 by USA. Response due by 4/15/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 3/30/2004 (dw1).
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Court Filing
                                                                            CHAMBERS PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (lag, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Notice of Indirectly Related Case(s)
                                                                                NOTICE of Indirectly Related Case(s) by NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION. Service: 1/29/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (lg1, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                                                    Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION. Service: 1/29/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Complaint
                                                                                      COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059609), filed by NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION.Answer Due by 3/29/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 165 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?