NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00125-LSM
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Central Hudson Gas & Electric Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Stanford Blanton +1 205 226 3417 +1 205 488 5879 sblanton@balch.com
No Logo New York State Electric And Gas Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Stanford Blanton +1 205 226 3417 +1 205 488 5879 sblanton@balch.com
No Logo Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Stanford Blanton +1 205 226 3417 +1 205 488 5879 sblanton@balch.com
No Logo Rochester Gas & Electric Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Stanford Blanton +1 205 226 3417 +1 205 488 5879 sblanton@balch.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/29/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, SNF, STAYED
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 28 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [27] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION, NEW YORK STATE ELECTRIC & GAS CORPORATION, ROCHESTER GAS AND ELECTRIC CORPORATION, CONSTELLATION GENERATION GROUP, LLC, CENTRAL HUDSON GAS & ELECTRIC CORPORATION.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Blanton, Melvin)
    LREF
    Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
    MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
      LREF
      Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
      NOTICE of Reassignment to Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dls )
        LREF
        Legal Document 25 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Court Filing
        ORDER: Pursuant to RCFC 40.1(b), and further concurrence of Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, it is ORDERED that this civil action shall be transferred to Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Add and Terminate Judges
          Judge Lawrence S. Margolis added. Judge Francis M. Allegra no longer assigned to case. (dw1)
            LREF
            Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005
            NOTICE by USA Of Filing Of Defendant's Reply To [22], [23] Plaintiffs' Responses To [21] Defendant's Motion To Transfer And Consolidate Directly Related Cases (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
              LREF
              Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004
              RESPONSE to [21] Notice of Directly Related Case(s) and Defendant's Motion to Transfer and Consolidate in Accordance with RCFC 40.2(a)(3) and 42.1 filed by NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION, NEW YORK STATE ELECTRIC & GAS CORPORATION, ROCHESTER GAS AND ELECTRIC CORPORATION, CONSTELLATION GENERATION GROUP, LLC, CENTRAL HUDSON GAS & ELECTRIC CORPORATION. (Blanton, Melvin)
                LREF
                Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004
                RESPONSE to [21] Notice of Directly Related Case(s) Opposition filed by CONSTELLATION GENERATION GROUP, LLC. (Fagg, Arnold)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004
                  NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [04-0068, 04-0124] by USA And Defendant's Motion To Transfer And Consolidate In Accordance With RCFC 40.2(a)(3) And 42.1. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4))(Lester, Harold)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 Court Filing
                  ORDER revoking briefing schedule set forth in the May 21, 2004, order. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004
                    RESPONSE to [18] MOTION for Leave to File Status Report , And Defendant's Status Report filed by CENTRAL HUDSON GAS & ELECTRIC CORPORATION, NEW YORK STATE ELECTRIC & GAS CORPORATION, NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION, ROCHESTER GAS AND ELECTRIC CORPORATION. Reply due by 7/22/2004. (Blanton, Melvin)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004, Terminated: 11/9/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                      MOTION for Leave to File Status Report , And Defendant's Status Report by USA. Response due by 7/12/2004 (Attachments: # (1))(Lester, Harold)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 5/21/2004 before Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 Court Filing
                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion for summary judgment addressing the one-time fee issue due by 6/18/2004. All other proceedings in this case shall be stayed pending resolution of defendant's motion, or until further order of the court. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004
                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/7/2004. (vp1, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004
                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 6/1/2004. (dw1)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004
                                RESPONSE to [13] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery filed by CENTRAL HUDSON GAS & ELECTRIC CORPORATION, NEW YORK STATE ELECTRIC & GAS CORPORATION, NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION, ROCHESTER GAS AND ELECTRIC CORPORATION. Reply due by 6/1/2004. (Blanton, Melvin) Modified on 5/20/2004 to correct reply due date (dw1).
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Court Filing
                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/21/2004 02:00 PM in Courtroom before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004, Terminated: 5/21/2004 Motion to Stay
                                    MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, For Coordinated Discovery by USA. Response due by 5/27/2004 (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt : Pre-Discovery Hearing held on 4/30/04. (lag, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                        RESPONSE to [9] Scheduling Order regarding pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                        RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Court by all plaintiffs.(Blanton, Melvin)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004
                                          ORDER granting [10] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 5/10/2004. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis) Modified on 4/26/2004 for punctuation (dw1).
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004, Terminated: 4/22/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint, until 5/10/2004 by USA. Response due by 5/6/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Court Filing
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER:Memoranda on discovery due by 4/23/2004; Hearing set for 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Court Filing
                                                SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004
                                                  ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 4/19/2004. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis) Modified on 3/30/2004 (dw1).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004, Terminated: 3/30/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint, until 4/19/2004 by USA. Response due by 4/15/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 3/30/2004 (dw1).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Notice of Indirectly Related Case(s)
                                                          NOTICE of Indirectly Related Case(s) by CENTRAL HUDSON GAS & ELECTRIC CORPORATION, NEW YORK STATE ELECTRIC & GAS CORPORATION, NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION, ROCHESTER GAS AND ELECTRIC CORPORATION. Service: 1/29/2004.(lg1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra. (lg1, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                              Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by CENTRAL HUDSON GAS & ELECTRIC CORPORATION, NEW YORK STATE ELECTRIC & GAS CORPORATION, NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION, ROCHESTER GAS AND ELECTRIC CORPORATION. Service: 1/29/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059610), filed by CENTRAL HUDSON GAS & ELECTRIC CORPORATION, NEW YORK STATE ELECTRIC & GAS CORPORATION, NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION, ROCHESTER GAS AND ELECTRIC CORPORATION.Answer Due by 3/29/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 195 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?