UNITED ILLUMINATING COMPANY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00129-LB
District Judge Lawrence J. Block, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo UNITED ILLUMINATING COMPANY,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiggin & Dana LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shaun Stuart Sullivan +1 203 498 4315 +1 203 782 2889 ssullivan@wiggin.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Clifford Ekman +1 202 353 0897 +1 202 307 2503 john.ekman@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/30/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 5/11/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, SNF
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Court Filing
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice by UNITED ILLUMINATING COMPANY. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/30/04.(jat, ) Modified on 5/11/2004 (jat, ).
    LREF
    Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
    RESPONSE to [7] Order of Entry filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix)(Ekman, John)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Parties Discovery Report(s) due by 4/23/2004. Pre-Discovery Conference set for 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dw1)
      LREF
      Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Court Filing
      NOTICE--Pre-Discovery Conference New SNF Cases. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004
        ORDER granting [6] motion for extension of time to answer. Answer due by 5/14/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm) Modified on 4/1/2004 (dw1).
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004, Terminated: 3/31/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 5/14/2004 by USA. Response due by 4/16/2004 (Ekman, John)
            LREF
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004
            NOTICE of Appearance by John Clifford Ekman for USA. (Ekman, John)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004
              ORDER--Parties are requested to deliver to the undersigned two hard copies of each future filing transacted electronically in this matter, except unopposed, non-dispositive motions and joint motions, which need only be filed electronically. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                LREF
                Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lawrence J. Block. (lg1, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                    Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by THE UNITED ILLUMINATING COMPANY. Service: 1/30/2004.(lg1, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059614), filed by THE UNITED ILLUMINATING COMPANY.Answer Due by 3/30/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 130 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?