ILLINOIS POWER COMPANY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00133-EJD
District Judge Edward J. Damich, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Illinois Power Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Balber, Pickard, Battistoni, Maldonado, & Van Der Tuin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry Stuart Hyman +1 312 258 5721 +1 312 258 5600 bhyman@schiffhardin.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Randy Damelin +1 202 305 2312 +1 202 307 2503 scott.damelin@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/30/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $1734000
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, SNF
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
    LREF
    Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Court Filing
    ORDER continuing the stay of proceedings in this case. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before December 5, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
      LREF
      Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008
      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Damelin, Scott)
        LREF
        Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Court Filing
        ORDER continuing stay of proceedings indefinitely. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before June 6, 2008. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
          LREF
          Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007
          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Damelin, Scott)
            LREF
            Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Court Filing
            STATUS REPORT ORDER and ORDER STAYING CASE: the stay in this case is extended indefinitely; the parties shall file a joint status report on or before December 6, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
              LREF
              Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007
              JOINT STATUS REPORT and Motion to Extend Stay, filed by USA. (Damelin, Scott)
                LREF
                Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Court Filing
                ORDER STAYING CASE, STATUS REPORT ORDER: stay extended to 6/1/2007; joint status report due on or before 6/1/2007 Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT and Motion to Extend Stay, filed by USA. (Damelin, Scott)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006
                    ORDER granting [18] the parties' Joint Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Joint Status Report (JSR): JSR due on or before 10/20/2006 Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006, Terminated: 10/19/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until October 20, 2006 to File Joint Status Report, filed by USA.Response due by 11/2/2006.(Damelin, Scott)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005
                        Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/16/2006. (mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005
                          ORDER STAYING CASE: in light of the parties' joint request, in their status report filed 12/15/2005, that the stay in this case be extended to 10/15/2006, pending decisions post trial in Cases # 98-126, # 98-488, and # 01-249, the stay in this case is hereby extended to (Monday) 10/16/2006. The parties shall file a joint status report by that same date as well as within 30 days after the decisions in any of the cases cited above. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT and Motion to Extend Stay, filed by USA. (Damelin, Scott)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005
                              ORDER STAYING CASE: this case is stayed through 12/15/2005; the parties shall file a joint status report on or before the same date. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005
                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Complaint)(Damelin, Scott)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/4/2005 Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting [13] Defendant's Motion to Stay all proceedings until the earlier of July 1, 2005, or decision of the Federal Circuit in Indiana Michigan, CFC #98-486C. Joint Status Report due on or before the earlier of 7/15/2005, or 30 days after the Indiana Michigan decision. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005
                                    RESPONSE to [13] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by ILLINOIS POWER COMPANY [by leave of the judge]. Reply due by 2/15/2005. (Hyman, Barry) Modified on 2/7/2005 to indicate that this has been filed by leave of the judge. (dls ).
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004, Terminated: 2/4/2005 Motion to Stay
                                      MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by USA. Response due by 1/18/2005 (Damelin, Scott)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt: pre-Discovery Hearing held on 4/30/04. (sms)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004 Court Filing
                                          ORDER entered on [8] Defendant's Motion to Stay: staying discovery on rate of acceptance or damages issues, with exceptions, through December 31, 2004. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                            RESPONSE to [9] Order Pre-Discovery Conference for New SNF Cases filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix)(Damelin, Scott)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Parties Discovery Report(s) due by 4/23/2004. Pre-Discovery Conference set for 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (dw1)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004
                                                RESPONSE to [8] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings or, in the Alternative, for Coordinated Discovery Regarding Rate and Schedule Issues filed by ILLINOIS POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 4/29/2004. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Hyman, Barry)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                ORDER directing the parties to submit discovery report by 4/23/04 and noting pre-discovery conference scheduled for 4/30/04 before Judge Sypolt. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (sms)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004, Terminated: 5/12/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                  MOTION to Stay All Proceedings or, in the Alternative, for Coordinated Discovery Regarding Rate and Schedule Issues, by USA. Response due by 4/16/2004. (Damelin, Scott) Modified on 3/31/2004 to add docket text (jcp, ).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Randy Damelin for USA. (Damelin, Scott)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Court Filing
                                                      Standard Special Procedures ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (sms)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Notice of Indirectly Related Case(s)
                                                        NOTICE of Indirectly Related Case(s) by ILLINOIS POWER COMPANY. Service: 1/30/2004 by hand.(lg1, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Edward J. Damich. (lg1, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                              Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by ILLINOIS POWER COMPANY. Service: 1/30/2004 by hand.(lg1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059625), filed by ILLINOIS POWER COMPANY.Answer Due by 3/30/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 181 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?