LAW ENGINEERING AND ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00145-EJD
District Judge Edward J. Damich, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Law Engineering And Environmental Services, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Hordell +1 202 220 1232 +1 202 220 1665 hordellm@pepperlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/3/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 114 - Contract - Service (CDA)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 6/3/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by all parties.. (Jaeger, Gregory)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (jat, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 Court Filing
      ORDER granting [25] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact Discovery due by 6/29/2005. Plaintiff's expert reports are due 7/31/2005, and Defendant's expert reports are due 8/29/2005. All discovery closes 9/29/2005. Status Report due by 10/5/2005, and a Telephonic Status Conference is set for 10/11/2005 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jpk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005
        Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 9/29/2005; Plaintiff's Expert Report due by 8/1/2005; and Defendant's Expert Report due by 8/29/2005. (jat, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 25 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005, Terminated: 3/11/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by USA. Response due by 3/28/2005 (Jaeger, Gregory)
            LREF
            Legal Document 24 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Court Filing
            ORDER cancelling and rescheduling status conferences and status reports: Joint Status Reports now due 4/6/2005 and 7/7/2005, instead of 4/8/2005 and 7/8/2005. Telephone Status Conferences canceled for 4/15/2005 and 7/15/2005 and rescheduled for 4/13/2005 10:00 AM and 7/12/2005 at 10:00 am, both before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jpk).
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
              Set Deadlines/Hearings: . Status Conference set for 7/12/2005 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jat, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/7/2005 (jat, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/6/2005 (jat, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Court Filing
                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Status Conference rescheduled for 7/15/2005 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Joint Status Report now due on or before 7/8/2005. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jpk)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 7/8/2005. (dw1)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Court Filing
                        DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery shall be completed by 3/31/2005. A Joint Status Report is due by 4/8/2005, and a status conference will be held via telephone on 4/15/2005 at 10:00 AM. Plaintiff's expert reports shall be served on or before 5/2/2005, and Defendant's shall be served on or before 5/31/2005. All discovery shall be completed by 7/1/2005. A post-discovery Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before July 11, 2005, and a telephonice status conference will be held on July 19, 2005. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jpk)(jpk, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 Court Filing
                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary telephonic status conference set for 10/27/2004 at 10:00 am before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jpk)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004
                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Jaeger, Gregory)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/8/2004 Court Filing
                              ORDER denying [18] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. JPSR due on or before 10/12/2004. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jpk)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/8/2004, Terminated: 10/8/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until November 2, 2004 to file Joint Preliminary Status Report by LAW ENGINEERING AND ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.. Response due by 10/25/2004 (Persico, Jennifer)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting [16] Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to file JPSR. JPSR due by 10/12/2004. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jpk)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004, Terminated: 8/6/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until October 12, 2004 to file Joint Preliminary Status Report by LAW ENGINEERING AND ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.. Response due by 8/23/2004 (Persico, Jennifer)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004 Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting [14] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. JPSR due on or before 8/9/2004. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jpk)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004, Terminated: 7/26/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 9, 2004 to file Joint Preliminary Status Report by USA. Response due by 8/12/2004 (Jaeger, Gregory)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/2/2004 Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting [12] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. JPSR due on or before 7/26/2004. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jpk)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004, Terminated: 7/2/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 7-26-04 to file Joint Preliminary Status Report by USA. Response due by 7/19/2004 (Jaeger, Gregory)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004
                                              ANSWER to [1] Complaint by USA. JPSR due by 7/12/2004.(Jaeger, Gregory)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting [9] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Answer is due on or before 5/20/2004. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jpk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004, Terminated: 4/7/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 5/20/2004 by USA. Response due by 4/23/2004 (Jaeger, Gregory)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004
                                                    ORDER re [8] Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The Clerk's Office is hereby directed to strike Defendant's motion because the electronic signature of the counsel of record is deficient; the electronic signature must be recorded as "s/[name]" above the line that otherwise reflects counsel's name. The Court acknowledges the many fine nuances of electronic case filing; however, the Court nevertheless insists on proper signature protocol. The Court will accept Defendant's refiled motion as timely, as long as it is refiled on or before 4/9/2004. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jpk).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004, Terminated: 4/7/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 5/20/2004 by USA. Response due by 4/22/2004 (Jaeger, Gregory)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Court Filing
                                                        ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel shall become registered and trained in the CM/ECF system. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jpk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA. (Jaeger, Gregory)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Court Filing
                                                            Standard Special Procedures ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (sms)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Edward J. Damich. (lg1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                                  Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by LAW ENGINEERING AND ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.. Service: 2/3/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Complaint
                                                                    COMPLAINT against USA (HUD) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059645), filed by LAW ENGINEERING AND ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC..Answer Due by 4/5/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 87 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?