PALMER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00225-MCW
District Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BRUCE PALMER, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Frank D'Alessandris +1 202 307 0139 +1 202 514 8624 david.d'alessandris@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/18/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 1/18/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting [7] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA, and denying as moot, [8] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BRUCE PALMER,. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing this action. No costs. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Response to Motion
      RESPONSE to [11] MOTION for Leave to File filed by USA. Reply due by 7/6/2004. Service: 6/18/04.(dw1)
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004 Terminated:
        MOTION to Answer Dft's Motion to Stay Consideration of Pltf's Summary Judgment Motion, by BRUCE PALMER.Service: 6/3/2004. Response due by 6/21/2004. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [9] Dft's Motion to Stay Consideration of Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment pending resolution of Dft's motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004, Terminated: 5/28/2004 Terminated:
            MOTION to Stay Consideration of Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment by USA.Service: 5/26/2004. Response due by 6/14/2004. (jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Terminated:
              MOTION for Summary Judgment by BRUCE PALMER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 4/30/2004. Response due by 6/1/2004. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Terminated:
                MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) by USA.Service: 4/13/2004. Response due by 5/14/2004. (jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 ~Notice (other)
                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BRUCE PALMER Pursuant to [5] Order of 3/29/2004. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER: On 3/23/2004, the Court received Pltf's filing entitled "Corrected Records." Pltf did not attach proof of service on Dft. The Clerk is directed to accept Pltf's filing this date by leave of the Court. Pltf is ordered to serve this filing on Dft and file proof of service by filing a Certificate of Service forthwith. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 ~Notice (other)
                      CORRECTED RECORDS by BRUCE PALMER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by David Frank D'Alessandris for USA. Service: 3/4/2004.(jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (lg1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against USA (NAV) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059751), filed by BRUCE PALMER.Answer Due by 4/19/2004.(lg1, )
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 117 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?