CARTER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00284-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TERRY LOUIS CARTER, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Doris Susan Finnerman +1 202 307 0300 +1 202 305 7643 dorie.finnerman@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/3/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $1105000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 9/17/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, without prejudice for want of subject matter jurisdiction. No costs. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Published Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
    PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION granting [4] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA,and denying [5] MOTION for Judicial Notice MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TERRY LOUIS CARTER. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. No costs. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Notice of Change of Address
      NOTICE of Change of Address by TERRY LOUIS CARTER. Service: 8/17/2004.(jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004 Terminated:
        MOTION to Correct Court Docket, by TERRY LOUIS CARTER.Service: 7/19/2004. Response due by 8/5/2004. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
          REPLY to Opposition to [7] Pltf's MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11, filed by TERRY LOUIS CARTER. Service: 7/19/2004.(jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004 Terminated:
            MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11(b)(1),(2),(3) and (4), by TERRY LOUIS CARTER.Service: 6/21/2004. Response due by 8/5/2004. (jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Response to Motion
              OPPOSITION to [7] Pltf's MOTION for Sanctions, filed by USA. Reply due by 7/23/2004. Service: 7/9/2004.(jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004 Terminated:
                MOTION for Sanctions pursuant to Rule 11 by TERRY LOUIS CARTER.Service: 6/21/2004. Response due by 7/9/2004 (hw1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Description not available
                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [4] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA. Service: 6/15/04.(jat, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 Terminated:
                    OPPOSITION to Dft's Motion to Dismiss; Pltf's MOTION for Judicial Notice; Notice of Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Pltf's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Motion to Dismiss, Pltf's Motion for Judicial Notice, and Pltf's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and Affidavit in Support of Motion for Judicial Notice and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by TERRY LOUIS CARTER.Service: 6/1/2004. Response due by 6/18/2004. Response due by 6/18/2004. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 Response to Motion
                      OPPOSITION to [4] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss; Pltf's Motion for Judicial Notice; Notice of Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Pltf's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Motion to Dismiss, Pltf's Motion for Judicial Notice, and Pltf's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and Affidavit in Support of Motion for Judicial Notice and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by TERRY LOUIS CARTER. Reply due by 6/18/2004. Service: 6/1/2004.(jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Terminated:
                        MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) by USA.Service: 5/3/2004. Response due by 6/3/2004. (jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Doris Susan Finnerman for USA. Service: 3/29/2004.(jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (lg1, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against USA (VAR) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059862), filed by TERRY LOUIS CARTER.Answer Due by 5/3/2004.(lg1, )
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 150 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?