POOLE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00460-NBF
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES E. POOLE, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Duane Austin +1 202 616 0321 +1 202 305 7644 michael.austin@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/19/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $88000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 7/20/2006
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
102-cv-00454-NBF
Related Case
102-cv-00454-NBF
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006
JUDGMENT entered (See 02-454C). (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
    SCHEDULING ORDER:Defendant shall file its Dispositive Motion(s) due by 7/30/2004. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dw1)
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Status Report
      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/24/04.(jat, )
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [7] Dft's Unopposed Motion to Stay Further Proceedings Pending. The case is STAYED. Dft shall file a status report within 30 days of the Federal Circuit's decision. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004, Terminated: 5/24/2004 Terminated:
          UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings by USA.Service: 5/17/2004. Response due by 6/3/2004. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Duane Austin for USA.Service: 4/7/2004.(jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Order Removing Case from ADRCourt Filing
              ORDER: This case is hereby removed from the ADR Pilot Program. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Add and Terminate Judges
                Judge Eric G. Bruggink no longer assigned to case. (dls)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Notice of Assignment - Auto ADRCourt Filing
                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink for ADR Pilot proceedings. (lg1, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004
                    NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [02-454] by JAMES E. POOLE. Service: 3/18/2004.(lg1, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Court Filing
                      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lg1, ).
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004
                        COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 060047), filed by JAMES E. POOLE.Answer Due by 5/18/2004.(lg1, )
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 112 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?