DAVIDSON v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00553-EJD
District Judge Edward J. Damich, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ETHEL L. DAVIDSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Michael Cassell
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael James Dierberg +1 202 353 0536 michael.dierberg@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/2/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 6/30/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, without prejudice. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 19 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Court Filing
    PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION granting [15] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA,. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 18 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
      REPLY to Response to Motion re [15] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA. Service: 3/9/2005.(mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 Response to Motion
        RESPONSE to [15] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by ETHEL L. DAVIDSON. Reply due by 3/11/2005. Service: 2/22/2005.(mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Appearance by Michael James Dierberg for USA. Service: 2/23/2005.(mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005, Terminated: 6/30/2005 Terminated:
            MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) by USA.Service: 01/24/05. Response due by 2/24/2005 (mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
              ORDER denying [13] Motion to Continue the stay. It is thus ordered that, on or before 1/24/2005, one of the following documents shall be filed: (1) Defendant's Answer; (2) Defendant's dispositive motion; or (3) a joint status report that indicating that the parties have resolved this case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (hw1, )
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004, Terminated: 12/22/2004 Terminated:
                MOTION to Continue the Stay of Proceedings by ETHEL L. DAVIDSON.Service: 12/9/2004. (dw1)
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [11] Motion to Stay.Joint Status Report due by 12/14/2004. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jat, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/21/2004, Terminated: 10/21/2004 Terminated:
                    MOTION to continue the Stay of proceedings until 12/14 /2004 by USA.Service: 10/15/04. Response due by 11/1/2004 (vro, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [9] Pltf's Motion for a Continuation of Stay. The parties will file a Joint Status Report on or before 10/15/2004. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/15/2004. (jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004, Terminated: 8/18/2004 Terminated:
                          MOTION on Behalf of the Parties to Continue the Stay of Proceedings, by ETHEL L. DAVIDSON.Service: 8/11/2004. Response due by 8/30/2004. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 8 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [7] Motion to Continue Stay. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before August 16, 2004 that will detail the parties' progress toward resolution of this case. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra for Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (lld, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
                              Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: . Status Report due by 8/16/2004 (lld, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004, Terminated: 8/3/2004 Terminated:
                                MOTION on behalf of all the parties to Continue Stay of Proceedings. by USA.Service: 07/30/2004. Response due by 8/16/2004 (lld, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [5] Dft's Motion for a Stay and ORDERS that this case is henceforth STAYED. The parties will file a Joint Status Report on or before 8/2/2004. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004, Terminated: 6/2/2004 Terminated:
                                    MOTION on Behalf of the Parties to Stay Proceedings, by USA.Service: 5/27/2004. Response due by 6/14/2004. (jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                      STANDARD SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER (Revised March 3, 2004). Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by John Sinclair Groat for USA. Service: 4/26/2004.(jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Edward J. Damich. (lg1, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 060158), filed by ETHEL L. DAVIDSON.Answer Due by 6/1/2004.(lg1, )
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 181 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?