SPW ENGINEERING GROUP, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00794-NBF
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SPW ENGINEERING GROUP, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MCMANUS, DARDEN & FELSEN, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph A. McManus, Jr. +1 202 296 9260 +1 202 659 3732 jmcmanus@mcmanus-darden.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/6/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $875000
Nature of Suit 116 - Contract - Supply (CDA)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 10/11/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags AUTO, CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 45 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, dismissing the complaint, with prejudice. (dls )
    LREF
    Legal Document 44 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Court Filing
    ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss the case pursuant to the parties' October 5, 2006 joint stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
      LREF
      Legal Document 43 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006
      STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties.. (Jaeger, Gregory)
        LREF
        Legal Document 42 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Court Filing
        ORDER: Case STAYED. Parties to file a joint status report by 10/31/2006. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 10/31/2006 (bre, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 41 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006
            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Jaeger, Gregory)
              LREF
              Legal Document 40 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Court Filing
              ORDER - Case remains STAYED. Parties to file a joint status report by 9/28/2006 indicating the status of settlement. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006
                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 9/28/2006 (bre, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 39 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006
                  STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Jaeger, Gregory)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006 Court Filing
                    STATUS REPORT ORDER. Case remains STAYED. Parties to file a Joint Status Report due by 8/17/2006 Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006
                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Jaeger, Gregory)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 36 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Court Filing
                        ORDER Notice of Compliance: Joint Status Report due by 7/17/2006.Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 35 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Jaeger, Gregory)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 34 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006 Court Filing
                            ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Conference set for 4/24/2006 at 10:00 AM in chambers and the court's third floor conference room before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink; and directing the parties to simultaneously SUBMIT position papers DIRECTLY to the ADR Judge by 4/14/2006. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, ) Modified on 3/13/2006 to clarify text. (dls).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 33 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 Court Filing
                              ORDER -- Case remains STAYED. Parties to file a joint status report by 5/16/2006. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 32 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/16/2006
                                STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Jaeger, Gregory)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Court Filing
                                  ORDER Case remains STAYED. The parties shall file a joint status report by 2/16/2006 indicating the progress of their settlement discussions.Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005
                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Jaeger, Gregory)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Court Filing
                                      ORDER Case remains STAYED in order to allow the parties to complete settlement discussions with ADR Judge Bruggink. Parties to file a joint status report by 12/16/2005 indicating the progress of settlement discussions. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/16/2005. (jat, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005
                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Jaeger, Gregory)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Court Filing
                                            ORDER Cancelling Deadline/Hearing - The status conference scheduled for Tuesday, September 13, 2005, is cancelled. Further, unless the parties inform the court that they have reached a settlement in principle, the parties shall file a joint status report by Thursday, September 15, 2005 indicating the progress made towards resolution of this matter.Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone.(dpk)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Court Filing
                                              ADR ORDER Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jh1)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 Court Filing
                                                ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Conference set for 8/11/2005 10:00 AM by telephone before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jh1)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Court Filing
                                                  ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Early Neutral Evaluation set for 6/30/2005 10:00 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Court Filing
                                                    ORDER The case is reassigned to Judge Bruggink for ADR proceedings. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (cs1, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005
                                                      Case Reassigned to Judge Eric G. Bruggink for ADR Proceedings. Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (jat, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 Court Filing
                                                        ORDER STAYING CASE: Case stayed to allow parties to conitnue settlement discussions. Joint Status Report due by 9/15/2005. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Court Filing
                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for 6/16/2005 10:00 AM before Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Counsel for each party shall appear via telephone. The court will initiate the conference call. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [19] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery Deadlines amended as follows: Fact Discovery shall close on 5/31/2005; Plaintiff's expert report due by 5/31/2005; Government's expert report due 6/28/2005; Plaintiff to submitt a supplementary expert report by 7/29/2005; Govenment's motion for leave to file a rebuttal report due by 9/13/2005; All Discovery shall close on 9/13/2005. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 9/13/2005 02:00 PM before Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Counsel for each party shall appear via telephone.Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005, Terminated: 3/9/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by USA. Response due by 3/25/2005 (Jaeger, Gregory)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005
                                                                NOTICE by SPW ENGINEERING GROUP, INC. Notice of Appearance (McManus, Joseph) filed [by leave of the judge]. Modified on 2/3/2005 indicate that the judge has directed this to be filed by her leave. (dls ).
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [16] Motion for Extension of Time Discovery due by 7/15/2005. Settlement Conference set for 7/15/2005 02:00 PM before Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact discovery to close, and plaintiff's expert report to be submitted to the government by 3/30/05; government's expert report to be submitted to plaintiff by 4/29/05; plaintiff's supplementary expert report to be submitted by 5/27/05; all discovery to be completed, and the government's rebuttal report (if leave is granted) to be submitted by 7/15/2005.(dls )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005, Terminated: 1/19/2005 Motion to Amend ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                      Consent MOTION to Amend Schedule Discovery by SPW ENGINEERING GROUP, INC., by leave of the Judge. Response due by 1/31/2005 (McManus, Joseph) Modified on 1/26/2005 (dw1).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Court Filing
                                                                        DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER:Discovery to close by 5/10/2005. Fact Discovery to close by 1/31/2005. Status Conference via telephone scheduled for 5/10/2005 02:30 PM before Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004 Court Filing
                                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Joint Preliminary Status Conference set for 10/6/2004 02:30 PM before Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004
                                                                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Jaeger, Gregory)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [11] Motion for Extension of Time. JPSR due by 9/17/2004. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004, Terminated: 9/14/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until September 17, 2004 to file Joint Preliminary Status Report by USA. Response due by 9/27/2004 (Jaeger, Gregory)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER - This case has been referred to us for Alternative Dispute Resolution. Counsel are advised that we are available at any time to discuss the merits of this case. Signed by (ADR) Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004
                                                                                    ANSWER to [1] Complaint by USA. JPSR due by 9/10/2004.(Jaeger, Gregory)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004
                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE granting [7] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Pursuant to RCFC 77.2(a). Answer Due by 7/20/2004. Signed by Clerk of Court.(jcp, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004, Terminated: 7/13/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 7/20/2004 by USA. Response due by 7/15/2004 (Jaeger, Gregory)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA. (Jaeger, Gregory)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Notice of Assignment - Auto ADRCourt Filing
                                                                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. for ADR Pilot proceedings. (lg1, ).
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lg1, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                                                                  Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by SPW ENGINEERING GROUP, INC.. Service: 5/6/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 060451), filed by SPW ENGINEERING GROUP, INC..Answer Due by 7/6/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 177 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?