TRICE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-00796-NBF
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RICHARD E. TRICE, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/6/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $40000000
Nature of Suit 134 - Contract - Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 7/14/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Cases
103-cv-00191-NBF, 103-cv-00402-NBF
Other Court Case '04-5145'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005
MANDATE of CAFC dismissing [13] Notice of Appeal filed by RICHARD E. TRICE. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 17 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004, Terminated: 1/18/2005 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number 04-5145 for [13] Notice of Appeal filed by RICHARD E. TRICE. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
      ORDER: [14] Pltf's Motion pursuant to Rule 60(b)(4) to void judgment or relief from 8/12/2004 order is DENIED. In addition, [15] Pltf's Motion pursuant to Rule 60(b)(6) for relief from judgment of the 8/12/2004 order is DENIED. The case is now on appeal in the US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. No further filings shall be accepted in this case. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004 Terminated:
        MOTION in Comity in Resolving Freedman Bureau Act Predicament & Relief From Judgment of [12] 8-12-04 Order and Certification to Supreme Court 28 USC 1255(2), by RICHARD E. TRICE. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 8/21/2004. Response due by 9/7/2004.(jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004, Terminated: 1/18/2005 Notice of Appeal
          NOTICE OF APPEAL by RICHARD E. TRICE. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. Fee wavied, motion to file in forma pauperis granted 7/14/2004.(hw1, )
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004, Terminated: 9/2/2004 Terminated:
            MOTION to Void Judgment or Order: Rule #60(b)(4) Relief From 8/12/2004 Order by RICHARD E. TRICE. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 8/17/2004. Response due by 9/3/2004. (jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/13/2004 Order on Motion for Relief from Judgment - Rule 60Court Filing
              ORDER: The court is in receipt of Mr. Trice's Objection to the Judge's Order of Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed on 7/30/2004. The court will treat this as a motion for reconsideration under Rule 59(a) of the RCFC. The court is also in receipt of [11] Pltf's Motion for Relief from Order/Judgment filed on 8/9/2004. The latter motion is filed under Rule 60(b) of the RCFC. For the reasons, pltf's motions are DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed not to accept any new complaints from Mr. Trice in connection with claims relating to the Freedmen's Bureau Act of 1865. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004 Terminated:
                MOTION for Relief from Order/Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60, by RICHARD E. TRICE. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 7/20/2004. Response due by 8/26/2004. (jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 ~Notice (other)
                  OBJECTION by RICHARD E. TRICE re [8] Unpublished Order/Opinion, Dismissal for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Service: 7/21/2004.(lg1, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004
                    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Each party to bear its own costs. (lld, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004 Court Filing
                      ORDER OF DISMISSAL mooting [7] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 8/5/2004 filed by USA, granting [4] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by RICHARD E. TRICE. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing the complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lld, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004, Terminated: 7/14/2004 Terminated:
                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 8/5/2004 by USA.Service: 6/22/04. Response due by 7/9/2004. (dw1)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA. Service: 6/1/2004.(jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER re: The Clerk of the Court is directed to withdraw this case from the ADR Pilot Program. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dw1)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Add and Terminate Judges
                              ADR Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt no longer assigned to case. (dls)
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Terminated:
                                MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RICHARD E. TRICE.Service: 5/6/2004(copy to defendant). Response due by 5/24/2004 (lg1, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Notice of Assignment - Auto ADRCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt for ADR Pilot proceedings. (lg1, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                    NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lg1, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT against USA (DOI) , filed by RICHARD E. TRICE.Answer Due by 7/6/2004.(lg1, )
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 73 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?