ABOULHOSN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-09431-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HAFIZ W. ABOULHOSN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office COFC
Filed 6/22/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 6/24/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the claims of the 522 plaintiffs on the list attached to this judgment are dismissed, with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costsm attorney fees and expenses pursuant to the Settlement Agreement. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004 Court Filing
    ORDER granting [3] MOTION to Amend [2] Judgment MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Stipulation for Entry of Judgment filed by HAFIZ W. ABOULHOSN. The Clerk is directed to amend the June 24, 2004 judgment, consistent with the July 8, 2004 amended stipulation for entry of judgment and corresponding amended attachment 1, containing the names of the plaintiffs who have elected, or are deemed to have elected, the payment option under the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Response to Motion
      RESPONSE to [3] Pltfs' MOTION to Amend [2] Judgment, filed by USA. Service: 7/8/2004.(jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER: Pltfs' counsel shall provide to the government the corrected list of pltfs who have elected, or are deemed to have elected, the lump-sum payment option under the Settlement Agreement on or before Wednesday, 7/7/2004. The government shall FILE a Response to the pltf's motion on or before Friday, 7/9/2004. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004, Terminated: 8/25/2004 Terminated:
          UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend the [2] Judgment, and MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Stipulation for Entry of Judgment by HAFIZ W. ABOULHOSN.Service: 7/1/2004 by hand. Response due by 7/15/2004. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004 Court Filing
            JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the claims of the 520 plaintiffs on the list attached are dismissed, with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, attorney fees and expenses pursuant to the Settlement Agreement. (lld, ) Amended per Order of Judge Marian Blank Horn on 8/25/2004 (lld, ).
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Court Filing
              ORDER severing the claims of 520 plaintiffs from Case No. 98-943C; assigning them to Case No. 98-9431C; and directing the Clerk to dismiss plaintiffs' claims with prejudice. (See attachment to order for a complete listing of the plaintiffs.) Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (dls)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004
                SEE CASE NO. 98-943C FOR STIPULATION for entry of judgment filed by all parties. (dls)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 86 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?