HAMILTON et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-vv-01077-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HEATHER HAMILTON, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas P. Gallagher +1 609 926 6450 +1 609 926 6455 thomasgallagherlawfirm@aol.com
No Logo LOGAN HAMILTON, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas P. Gallagher +1 609 926 6450 +1 609 926 6455 thomasgallagherlawfirm@aol.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynn Elizabeth Ricciardella +1 202 616 4356 lynn.ricciardella@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/28/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Judgment in Lump Sum
County None
Terminated 5/5/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $21,092.37, in addition to the July 29, 2005 judgment of compensation. This award consists of $19,080.00 in fees and $2,012.37 in costs, and shall be payable jointly to petitioner and her attorney. (lld, ) JUDGMENT ENTERED IN ERROR. SEE ATTORNEY'S FEES JUDGMENT OF 07/29/2005.
    LREF
    Blank 24 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded Attorneys' Fees and costs in the amount of $21,092.37, in addition to the May 5, 2005 judgment of compensation. This award consists of $19,080.00 in fees and $2,012.37 in costs. The award shall be payable jointly to petitioner and her attorney. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 23 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Notice Not to Seek Review
      JOINT NOTICE Not to Seek Review by HEATHER HAMILTON, LOGAN HAMILTON, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re [22] DECISION of Special Master - Fees. (tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 22 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 DECISION of Special Master - Fees
        DECISION on Attorney's Fees and Costs Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
          LREF
          Blank 21 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005, Terminated: 7/29/2005 Motion for Attorney Fees
          MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by HEATHER HAMILTON, LOGAN HAMILTON.Service: 3/18/05. Response due by 6/1/2005. (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment
            Petitioner's Election to Accept [19] Judgment. Service: 5/10/05.(tjk, )
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005
              JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded compensation in the amount of $200,000.00 in the form of a check payable to petitioner. (lld, )
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Notice Not to Seek Review
                JOINT NOTICE Not to Seek Review by HEATHER HAMILTON, LOGAN HAMILTON, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re [17] DECISION of Special Master. Service: 5/03/05.(tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 5/1/2005 DECISION of Special Master
                  DECISION Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 16 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Status Report
                    STATUS REPORT by HEATHER HAMILTON, LOGAN HAMILTON. Service: 4/22/05.(tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Stipulation
                      STIPULATION by HEATHER HAMILTON, LOGAN HAMILTON, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 14 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Status Report
                        STATUS REPORT by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/15/05.(tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 13 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 15-Week Stipulation Order
                          15-Week STIPULATION ORDER: Respondent shall, within 15 weeks, send petitioner(s) the joint stipulation and file a status report. Within 30 days after the receipt of the stipulation, the petitioner(s) shall file a status report. Within 15 days after receiving the stipulation from petitioner(s), the respondent shall file the signed stipulation.Respondents Status Report due by 6/3/2005. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 12 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004 Order Reassigning Case Special Master
                            ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz for all further proceedings. Special Master E. LaVon French no longer assigned to case Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 11 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004 Order
                              ORDER: The parties have agreed to participate in an in-person mediation proceeding, which has been scheduled for 1/11/05 at The Westin Oklahoma City, 1 North Broadway, Oklahoma City, Oklahoma. If the parties wish to focus the Chief Special Master's attention to any particular records in this case, the parties shall submit jointly a letter to his attention no later than 1/03/05. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Scheduling Order
                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondents Report Due by 11/15/2004. Signed by Special Master E. LaVon French. (tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004 notice of filing
                                  THIRD SUBMISSION OF REQUIRED DOCUMENTS by HEATHER HAMILTON, LOGAN HAMILTON. Service: 9/02/04.(tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 notice of filing
                                    Second Submission and all Medical Records by HEATHER HAMILTON, LOGAN HAMILTON. Service: 8/10/04.(tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Scheduling Order
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER:Petitioner's Expert Report due by 10/15/2004. Respondent's Rule 4 Report shall be filed within thirty days of the filing of the forementioned expert report. Signed by Special Master E. LaVon French. (tjk, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: 8/13/2004 Description not available
                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference reset for 8/12/2004 12:00 PM before Special Master E. LaVon French. Signed by Special Master E. LaVon French. (tjk, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004
                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/11/2004 03:00 PM (EDT) before Special Master E. LaVon French. Signed by Special Master E. LaVon French. (tjk, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn Elizabeth Ricciardella for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/13/04.(jat, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004 Order
                                              ORDER re: Petitioner shall confer with respondent and then contact the court by 8/02/04 to schedule the initial conference call. Signed by Special Master E. LaVon French. (tjk, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 Notice Of Assignment
                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master E. LaVon French (tjk, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 Petition
                                                  PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES [filed with 1 volume of medical records]( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 060894) (, filed by HEATHER HAMILTON, LOGAN HAMILTON.Respondents Report Due by 9/27/2004.(tjk, )
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 146 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?