TEICHMAN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-01132-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HARRY P. TEICHMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry P. Teichman +1 813 857 2248 +1 954 962 2128 hpteichman@yahoo.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy Myung-Jin Kim +1 202 353 0546 +1 202 514 8640 nancy.kim@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/8/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 5/13/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '05-5180'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 2/3/2006 CAFC Order
Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit ORDER directing the reinstatement of the notice of appeal. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 20 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005
    MANDATE of CAFC dismissing [18] Notice of Appeal filed by HARRY P. TEICHMAN. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 CAFC Appeal Fees
      CAFC Appeal Fees received $5.00, receipt number 063273 re [18] Notice of Appeal filed by HARRY P. TEICHMAN. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Terminated:
        CAFC Case Number 05-5180 for [18] Notice of Appeal filed by HARRY P. TEICHMAN. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 18 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Terminated:
          NOTICE OF APPEAL by HARRY P. TEICHMAN. Filing fee $ 250.00, receipt number 063194. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005
            JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, in favor of the defendant and the complaint is dismissed. Costs to the defendant. (lld, )
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Published Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
              PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION granting [10] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA,. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for the defendant. Costs to the defendant. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (lld, )
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005, Terminated: 5/12/2005 Cross Motion [Dispositive]
                CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [10] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6), Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA, by HARRY P. TEICHMAN. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 1/10/2005. Response due by 4/4/2005. (mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005
                  COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS and Proposed Additional Facts by HARRY P. TEICHMAN. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 1/10/2005.(mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Statement of Facts
                    COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS by USA. Service: 01/31/05.(mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Description not available
                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [10] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA. Service: 01/31/05.(mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 Administrative Record
                        ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD in One Volume by USA. (jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004, Terminated: 5/12/2005 Terminated:
                          MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), and MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record by USA.Service: 11/30/2004. Response due by 1/3/2005. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                            ORDER: The court GRANTS IN PART the [6] Dft's Motion, and ORDERS the dft to file one copy of the administrative record with the clerk's office on or before Friday, 12/3/2004. On or before Friday, 12/3/2004, dft shall refile its motion, reflecting proper service upon pltf. The pltf shall respond to the dft's motion on or before Monday, 1/10/2005 and the dft shall reply on or before Monday, 1/31/2005. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motion(s) due by 12/3/2004. Response due by 1/10/2005. Reply due by 1/31/2005. (jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/15/2004 Terminated:
                                MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, by USA.Service: 11/8/2004. Response due by 12/9/2004.(jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/15/2004 Statement of Facts
                                  STATEMENT OF FACTS by USA. Service: 11/8/2004.(jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/15/2004 Terminated:
                                    MOTION for Leave to File the Administrative Record, and MOTION to Waive Copy Requirements, by USA.Service: 11/8/2004. Response due by 11/26/2004.(jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [4] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft shall file its response to the complaint on or before Monday, 11/8/2004. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/7/2004, Terminated: 9/8/2004 Terminated:
                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint until 11/8/2004 by USA.Service: 9/2/2004. Response due by 9/20/2004. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy Myung-Jin Kim for USA. Service: 7/16/2004.(jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn. (dw1)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT against USA (NAV) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 060956), filed by HARRY P. TEICHMAN.Answer Due by 9/7/2004.(dw1)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 153 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?