LOEH v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-01143-VJW
District Judge Victor J. Wolski, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROBERT L. LOEH, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn J. Craig +1 202 305 7562 +1 202 305 7644 carolyn.craig@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/12/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $10000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 1/31/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
ORDER denying [24] Motion for Reconsideration re [20] Judgment Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, )
    LREF
    Blank 24 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005, Terminated: 2/11/2005 Terminated:
    MOTION for Reconsideration re [19] Unpublished Order/Opinion by ROBERT L. LOEH.Service: 2/7/05. Response due by 2/24/2005 (mb2, )
      LREF
      Blank 23 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Response
      RESPONSE to [13] Response to Motion filed by ROBERT L. LOEH. Service: 1/13/05.(mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank 22 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
        ORDER granting [21] Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Out of Time. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 21 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005, Terminated: 1/31/2005 Terminated: Court Filing
          MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Out of Time by ROBERT L. LOEH.Service: 01/31/05. Response due by 1/31/2005. Filed by leave of the Judge.(mb2, ) Modified on 2/1/2005 (mb2, ).
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005
            JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Court Filing
              ORDER and OPINION granting[6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA,. The Clerk is directed to close the case. No costs. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (lld, )
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005 Terminated:
                Second MOTION for Discovery by ROBERT L. LOEH.Service: 01/13/05. Response due by 1/31/2005 (mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/17/04 before Judge Victor J. Wolski. (eph, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 16 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Terminated:
                    Defendant's MOTION for Leave to supplement Defendant's December 14, 2004 status report by USA. Service: 1/6/05. Response due by 1/27/2005 (eph, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004
                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 1/18/2005. (vp1, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 14 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 Status Report
                        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 12/14/04.(jat, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 13 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 Response to Motion
                          RESPONSE to [12] MOTION for Leave to File Pltf's First Request for Court Ordered Discovery filed by USA. Reply due by 12/27/2004. Service: 12/13/04.(dw1)
                            LREF
                            Blank 15 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                            ORDER Setting Hearing on [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1):Hearing set for 12/17/2004 at 2:00 PM before Judge Victor J. Wolski. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (dls)
                              LREF
                              Blank 12 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Terminated:
                              MOTION for Leave to File Pltf's First Request for Court Ordered Discovery by ROBERT L. LOEH.Service: 11/26/2004. Response due by 12/13/2004. (jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 11 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 ResponseCourt Filing
                                RESPONSE to [8] Reply to Response to Motion filed by ROBERT L. LOEH. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/14/04.(jat, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to file plaintiff's document (Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's 7 October, 2004 Reply) received on 10/15/04. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jat, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Terminated:
                                    MOTION for Oral Argument by ROBERT L. LOEH.Service: 10/14/2004. Response due by 11/1/2004. (dw1)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA. Service: 10/7/2004.(lg1, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Response to Motion
                                        Reply to [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by ROBERT L. LOEH. Reply due by 10/8/2004. Service: 9/20/2004.(lg1, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004, Terminated: 1/31/2005 Terminated:
                                          MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) by USA.Service: 9/10/2004. Response due by 10/12/2004. (jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/23/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn J. Craig for USA. Service: 7/21/2004.(jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004 Court Filing
                                              NOTICE of Reassignment Judge Victor J. Wolski. (lg1, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (dw1)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                                                  NOTICE of Related Case(s) [01-486C] by ROBERT L. LOEH. Service: 7/12/04.(dw1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT against USA (NAV) (Filing fee $150, Receipt number 060978), filed by ROBERT L. LOEH.Answer Due by 9/10/2004.(dw1)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 182 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?