PURVIS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-01190-DGS
District Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES LARRY PURVIS, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Allen Harrington +1 202 616 0465 +1 202 307 0972 David.Harrington@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/20/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 1/31/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ENDADR
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Memorandum
STATEMENT to Refute the Defendant's Claim of Collateral Estoppel by JAMES LARRY PURVIS. Service: 11/29/04.(mb2, )
    LREF
    Blank 22 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Court Filing
      ORDER and OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing the case. The clerk is directed not to accept any motion, petition pleading or other fileable paper from plaintiff. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (lld, )
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 ~Notice (other)
        STATEMENT in Support of Equitable Estoppel by JAMES LARRY PURVIS. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 11/11/2004.(jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 ResponseCourt Filing
          RESPONSE to ADR Order filed by JAMES LARRY PURVIS, by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/17/2004.(dw1)
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 SurreplyCourt Filing
            SUR-REPLY re [13] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by JAMES LARRY PURVIS, by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/4/2004.(dw1)
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/4/2004 Description not available
              REPLY in Support of [13] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 10/27/2004.(jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/4/2004 Response to Motion
                RESPONSE to [13] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by JAMES LARRY PURVIS. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 11/18/2004. Service: 10/13/2004.(jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/4/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER: On 10/18/2004, pltf submitted a "Response to this courts filing 6 Oct 2004 to clerk Ms. Laurice Ghougasian" and "Pltf's Response to Dft's Motion to Dismiss." The clerk shall return the October 6 Response unfiled, because there is no provision in the rules for this filing, proof of service on dft is missing, the two copies required were missing, and no motion for leave of the court to file the response was provided. The clerk shall file pltf's Motion to Dismiss Response by leave of the court. Pltf shall file the original copy of the Response on or before 11/12/2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/8/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                    CHAMBERS PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Terminated:
                      MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 9/29/2004. Response due by 11/1/2004. (jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [11] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time. Dft shall have until 9/30/2004, within which to file a response to the complaint. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004, Terminated: 9/29/2004 Terminated:
                          MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/30/2004 to file a Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted by USA.Service: 9/20/2004. Response due by 10/7/2004. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                            NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(b) of the RCFC a case may be transferred by order of the assigned judge to another judge upon the agreement of both judges for the efficient administration of justice. Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt has agreed to have this case transferred to her docket. The Clerk of the Court is directed to TRANSFER the case to Judge Sypolt. Judge Nancy B. Firestone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Terminated:
                                PETITION to Clarify Dft's Notice of Appearance, by JAMES LARRY PURVIS.Service: 8/8/2004. Response due by 8/25/2004. (jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/13/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                  NOTICE of Agreement Under the ADR Pilot Program, by JAMES LARRY PURVIS. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by David Allen Harrington for USA Service: 7/30/04.(vro, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 Order Removing Case from ADRCourt Filing
                                      ORDER Removing Case from the ADR Pilot Program process. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (lld, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Terminated:
                                        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JAMES LARRY PURVIS.Service: 7/20/2004. Response due by 8/6/2004 (lg1, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Notice of Assignment - Auto ADRCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller for ADR Pilot proceedings. (lg1, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lg1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT against USA (VA) , filed by JAMES LARRY PURVIS.Answer Due by 9/20/2004.(lg1, )
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 206 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?